Pronin v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Dmitry Pronin
Defendant: Charles Wright, Neal Urch, Ashley McCann and L. Blackwell
Case Number: 5:2016cv03635
Filed: November 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Orangeburg Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Kaymani D West
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 OPINION AND ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court adopts the 193 Report and Recommendation and incorporates it herein. It is thereforeORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment, docket number 174 , is granted. It is further ORDERED that Pronin's motion to protect from court appearances, docket number 200 , is dismissed as moot. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 5/13/2019. (prou, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying without prejudice 173 Renewed Verified Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 10/05/2018.(dsto, )
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER FOR DISBURSEMENT re 71 USCA Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 7/12/2017. (mcot, )
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The court adopts the magistrate judge's Report and Recommendation 27 to the extent it is consistent with this order.It is therefore ORDERED that Pronin's complaint as to M cCann is dismissed without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Pronin file an amended complaint within 15 days of this order. It is further ORDERED that Pronin's motion for certification of a class action, docket number 22 , is denied. It is further ORDERED that this case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 04/03/2017. (dsto, )
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER directing claims of two Plaintiffs in action 5:16-cv-02924-HMH-KDW be separated for initial review. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/15/2016. (mcot, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pronin v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dmitry Pronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neal Urch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?