Feaster v. Stirling et al
Plaintiff: Jason D Feaster
Defendant: Victoria Norman, Kennard Dubose, Charles Williams, Myers, Cynthia Darden, Wilson, Tim E Rogers, Juanita Moss, Stanley Terry, Bell, Alyson Gladwell, Thomas Robertson, Stephanie Marshall, Deborah Richter, Bryan P Stirling, Beard, Cindy Richardson, Willie F Smith, Clarissa Jones and Ashley Maddox
Case Number: 5:2019cv00296
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Referring Judge: Kaymani D West
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Filing 28 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: 27 Text Order on Motion for Copies, placed in U.S. Mail to Jason D. Feaster, #333232, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (prou, )
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Jason Feaster has filed a Motion for Copies. ECF No. #26 . Plaintiff requests "copies of everything related to [his] case" based on his status as an indigent inmate. Id. Plaintiff has also requested copies of the grievances that he filed concerning this matter. Id.Plaintiff's motion for copies is denied. It is normally the Plaintiff's responsibility to keep a record of his file and pay for his own copies. When and if Plaintiff submits a self-addressed, stamped envelope to the clerk's office, along with payment for the copies at $.50 per page, the clerk's office will send Plaintiff his requested documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/27/2019.(prou, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Copies at no expense by Jason D Feaster. Response to Motion due by 4/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Beard, Bell, Cynthia Darden, Kennard Dubose, Alyson Gladwell, Clarissa Jones, Ashley Maddox, Stephanie Marshall, Juanita Moss, Myers, Victoria Norman, Cindy Richardson, Deborah Richter, Thomas Robertson, Tim E Rogers, Willie F Smith, Bryan P Stirling, Stanley Terry, Charles Williams, Wilson. Service due by 6/12/2019. (prou, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED: #20 Order 1983 w/NEF, 21 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel placed in U.S. Mail to Jason D. Feaster, #333232, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (prou, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying #17 Motion to Appoint Counsel per #20 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/14/2019.(prou, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER authorizing service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 3/14/2019. (prou, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason D Feaster. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Temporary Restraining Order by Jason D Feaster. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope).(prou, ) Modified on 3/1/2019 to edit text (prou, ).
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Jason D Feaster. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Letter from Jason Feaster, #3 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order w/NEF, 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, one Complaint form, one Summons, and twenty USM-285 forms, placed in U.S. Mail to Jason D. Feaster, #333232, McCormick Correctional Institution, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (prou, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis per #9 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/11/2019.(prou, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER: Plaintiff's Complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state any claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his current Complaint identified above by filing an amended complaint within 21 days of this Order, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded that an amended pleading replaces all prior complaints and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff files an amended complaint, the undersigned will conduct screening of that amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the court may recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. Case to be brought into proper form by 3/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 2/11/2019. (prou, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Greenwood. (prou, )
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jason D Feaster. Response to Motion due by 2/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #2 Financial Certificate, #3 Envelope) (prou, ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Beard, Bell, Cynthia Darden, Kennard Dubose, Alyson Gladwell, Clarissa Jones, Ashley Maddox, Stephanie Marshall, Juanita Moss, Myers, Victoria Norman, Cindy Richardson, Deborah Richter, Thomas Robertson, Tim E Rogers, Willie F Smith, Bryan P Stirling, Stanley Terry, Charles Williams, Wilson, filed by Jason D Feaster. Service due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(prou, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2019: #2 Supplement to Complaint) (prou, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feaster v. Stirling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennard Dubose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim E Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyson Gladwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan P Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie F Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarissa Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Maddox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D Feaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?