PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV v. Target Corporation et al

Plaintiff: PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, HYBRID PROMOTIONS LLC and Target Corporation
Petitioner: Delta Apparel Inc
Case Number: 6:2019cv00882
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERING this case and the #1 MOTION to Quash to the Central District of California to be filed in Pak's Trading Europe B.V. v. Target Corp., Hybrid Promotions, LLC, and Does 1-10, No. 8:18-cv-536-DOC-DFM (C.D. Cal.). Further, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action after this motion is transferred. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/22/19. (kmca)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 6-19-cv-882-TMC. (kmca)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Stephen Doniger added for Plaintiff. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 3/11/19.(kmca)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Doniger (Filing fee $250 receipt number 0420-8312526) by PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Shealey, Luke) (Main Document 10, Attachment 1 & 2 replaced on 3/11/2019: to make the Motion the main document & Application/Affidavit the Exhibit) (kmca).
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash Response filed by Delta Apparel Inc. (Pittman, Jason)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash. Response filed by PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV. Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/7/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Shealey, Luke) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/1/2019: to replace with corrected document (removed declaration) as provided by filing user). (Additional attachment added on 3/1/2019: #1 Declaration of Doniger (with corrected signature)) (kmca).
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Luke Adcock Shealey on behalf of PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV (Shealey, Luke)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Filing fee $47 receipt number 0420-8272085) by Delta Apparel Inc. Response to Motion due by 2/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Subpoena Issued, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Doe Amendment, #3 Exhibit C Delta Apparel's Objections, #4 Exhibit D 2-5-19 Emails, #5 Exhibit E Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(kmca) Modified on 2/19/2019: to add filing fee info (kmca).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYBRID PROMOTIONS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delta Apparel Inc
Represented By: Jason Alan Pittman
Represented By: Tim F Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAK'S TRADING EUROPE BV
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doniger
Represented By: Luke Adcock Shealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?