In re: Receiver for Scott A Kohn and Future Income Payments LLC
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Future Income Payments LLC and Scott A Kohn
Not Yet Classified: Beattie B Ashmore
Other: David Valencia
Case Number: 6:2019cv01112
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER placing in abeyance the Courts October 2, 2019 #14 Order to Show Cause with respect to Mr. David Valencia. The Receiver has requested that the Court hold this matter in abeyance pending the conclusion of the Receivers request for information from Mr. Valencia via his counsel and his compliance with the Court-ordered production of information. The request is granted, and this limited portion of the case is placed in abeyance. The Receiver is directed to inform the Court as soon as the conditions predicate to moving forward with further proceedings as to Mr. Valencia are satisfied and the abeyance can be lifted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/14/19. (alew, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beattie B Ashmore re #26 Order,, (Tollison, Lewis)
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY by Beattie B Ashmore to #23 Response to Order to Show Cause . (Tollison, Lewis)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER directing Paramount to respond to and engage in discovery with the Receiver regarding the approximately $8.5 million in ill-gotten money it allegedly received from a fraudulent investment scheme orchestrated and carried out by Kohn, FIP and others.PARAMOUNT IS CAUTIONED THAT FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER COULD RESULT IN SANCTIONS FOR CONTEMPT.The Receiver is directed to serve the Order on Paramount, and to file proof of service with the Court. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/7/19. (kmca, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: the Receiver is directed to file a reply to ECF No. #23 Response to #14 Order to Show Cause no later than Friday, November 8, 2019. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/29/19. (alew, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 24 Reason: per chambers (alew, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO #14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David Valencia. (Weaver, Zachary) Modified on 10/28/2019: to add link to #14 order (kmca).
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Lee Weaver on behalf of David Valencia (Weaver, Zachary)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beattie B Ashmore re #19 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Tollison, Lewis)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Order to Show Cause as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/17/19.(alew, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Mr. David Valencia through October 25, 2019 to file a response to the Court's #14 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/17/19. (alew, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 17 Letter from Attorney Walt Tollison re: extension of time to respond to #14 Show Cause Order. (alew, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Beattie B Ashmore re #14 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause (Tollison, Lewis)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Order to Show Cause as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 10/2/19.(alew, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Rule to Show Cause served on Douglas R. Andrew, Registered Agent for Paramount Financial Services, Inc. on 9/24/2019, filed by Beattie B Ashmore. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Return of Service)(Tollison, Lewis)
September 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Beattie B Ashmore. Response to Motion due by 10/8/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Receiver Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Spreadsheet)No proposed order.(Tollison, Lewis)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Rule to Show Case served on Yolanda Valencia (Wife of David Valencia) on 9-16-19, filed by Beattie B Ashmore. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Affidavit of Service)(Tollison, Lewis)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Beattie B Ashmore. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Receiver Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B- FIP Spreadsheet Excerpt)No proposed order.(Tollison, Lewis)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend/Correct #7 Order of Appointment as set out. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/18/19.(alew, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 7/31/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Watkins, William)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Order of Appointment filed April 15, 2019 Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/30/19.(fbos, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Order by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 5/13/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Watkins, William)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Watkins, Jr on behalf of United States of America (Watkins, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis Walter Tollison, III on behalf of Beattie B Ashmore (Tollison, Lewis)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER AND ESTABLISHING CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/15/19. (alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Receiver for Scott A Kohn and Future Income Payments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Future Income Payments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Kohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William J Watkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: David Valencia
Represented By: Zachary Lee Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?