Jones v. Curtis et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Charles Jones
Defendant: Darren Vaughn, Robert Curtis, Jason L Brooks, Harold Robinson, Valentin Santos, Master Deputy Amendolare, Kyle Price, Bryson Dodson, Jamie Berggrun, Tyler Price and Dodson Bryson
Case Number: 6:2019cv03320
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 22 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 7/13/2020, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/16/2020. (kric, )
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 2/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/20/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 2/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/12/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/13/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/13/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/13/2020, Discovery due by 7/13/2020, Motions due by 8/12/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 11/10/2020, Mediation Due by 7/13/2020, Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 1/16/2020. (kric, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Master Deputy Amendolare, Jamie Berggrun, Dodson Bryson, Robert Curtis, Kyle Price, Tyler Price, Harold Robinson, Darren Vaughn.(Harter, Russell)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jason L Brooks.(Turner, Charles)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason L Brooks. (Turner, Charles) Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit text. LR 26.01 deleted and refiled as #19 (kric, ).
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 7,8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15 Reason: refiled as document 16 by counsel. Corrected Filing Document Number #16 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 12/20/2019 (kric, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Charles Jones. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service, #2 Affidavit of service, #3 Affidavit of service, #4 Affidavit of service, #5 Affidavit of service, #6 Affidavit of service, #7 Affidavit of service, #8 Affidavit of service, #9 Affidavit of service)(Radeker, Andrew) Modified on 12/20/2019 to edit descriptions (kric, ).
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (kric, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Thomas Charles Jones.(kric, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8796921.), filed by Thomas Charles Jones. Service due by 2/24/2020(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Curtis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Vaughn
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Curtis
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L Brooks
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Robinson
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valentin Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master Deputy Amendolare
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Price
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Berggrun
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Price
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodson Bryson
Represented By: Russell W Harter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Charles Jones
Represented By: Andrew Sims Radeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?