MedARC LLC v. Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC et al
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Defendant: Hewitt Coleman & Associates LLC, Planned Administrators Inc, United Life Insurance Company, American Mining Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The, Summit Consulting LLC, Carefirst of Maryland, Ariel Third Party Administrators, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Federated Mutual Insurance Company, Vanliner Insurance Company, EMC Insurance Companies, Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC, Health Net Federal Services LLC, TC&C Medical Management Company LLC, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd, SC State Accident Fund, NALC Health Benefit Plan, Golden Rule Insurance Company, South Carolina School Board Association, The, Absolute Total Care, Southern Benefit Administrators, WellCare of South Carolina, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, Accident Fund Holdings Inc, ICW Group Holdings Inc, Rancho Santa Fe Insurance and Financial Services, Select Health of South Carolina, Esis Inc, New Jersey Property-Liability Insurance Guaranty Association, CNA Financial Corporation, UPMC, PHP Agency Inc and Claims Management Inc
Case Number: 6:2020cv03427
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC, Golden Rule Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.(Rebollo, Anthony)
November 23, 2020 Filing 47 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. by MedARC LLC. (Landis, Paul)
November 23, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to SC School Board Association (Landis, Paul)
November 19, 2020 Filing 45 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #41 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/19/2020.(abuc)
November 18, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to SC State Accident Fund (Landis, Paul)
November 18, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Accident Fund Holdings, Inc. (Landis, Paul)
November 18, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian K. Norman ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9480956) by Carefirst of Maryland. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Tollison, Lewis)
November 18, 2020 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by WellCare of South Carolina.(Schulz, Jonathan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Blair Norris ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9480921) by Carefirst of Maryland. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents PHV Application, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Tollison, Lewis)
November 18, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WellCare of South Carolina. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of William M. Yurkowski)No proposed order.(Schulz, Jonathan)
November 18, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to ICW Group Holdings, Inc. (Landis, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Unified Life Insurance Company (Landis, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Ltd. (Landis, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Federated Mutual Insurance Company (Landis, Paul)
November 17, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC answer due 11/24/2020; Golden Rule Insurance Company answer due 11/24/2020. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/17/20.(sfla)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, by Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC, Golden Rule Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Rebollo, Anthony)
November 12, 2020 Filing 29 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by UPMC.(Okeke, Cashida) (Main Document 29 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 11/12/2020) (abuc).
November 12, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by UPMC.(Okeke, Cashida)
November 11, 2020 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Planned Administrators Inc, TC&C Medical Management Company LLC.(Willard, Theodore)
November 11, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by Planned Administrators Inc, TC&C Medical Management Company LLC. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Supporting Documents Declaration of Barbara Windham, #3 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Barbara Windham - Tidelands Health Plan2015, #4 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Barbara Windham - Tidelands Health Plan2016, #5 Exhibit 3-Declaration of Barbara Windham - ThompsonConstructionPlan2017, #6 Exhibit 4-Declaration of Barbara Windham - Claflin University Plan 2016, #7 Exhibit 5-Declaration of Barbara Windham - SC Medical Assoc. Plan 2017, #8 Exhibit 6-Declaration of Barbara Windham - City of Myrtle Beach Plan 2016, #9 Supporting Documents Declaration of Peggy Austin, #10 Exhibit 7-Declaration of Peggy Austin - City of North Charleston Plan 2014, #11 Exhibit 8-Declaration of Peggy Austin - City of North Charleston Plan 2016, #12 Exhibit 9-Declaration of Peggy Austin - City of North Charleston Plan 2017, #13 Exhibit 10-Declaration of Peggy Austin - Town of Mt. Pleasant Plan 2015, #14 Exhibit 11-Declaration of Peggy Austin - Town of Mt. Pleasant Plan 2016, #15 Exhibit 12-Declaration of Peggy Austin - Charleston Water System Plan 2014)No proposed order.(Willard, Theodore)
November 10, 2020 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Select Health of South Carolina.(Molony, Michael)
November 9, 2020 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The.(Wallace, R) (Main Document 23 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 11/10/2020) (abuc).
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The. Response to Motion due by 11/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Executed Declaration of Larry Emory)No proposed order.(Wallace, R)
November 6, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Carefirst of Maryland answer due 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Letter)(Tollison, Lewis)
October 30, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Select Health of South Carolina answer due 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Executed Consent Letter)(Molony, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Molony on behalf of Select Health of South Carolina (Molony, Michael)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER WellCare of South Carolina answer due 11/18/2020. (Schulz, Jonathan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Builders Mutual Insurance Company (Landis, Paul)
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER TC&C Medical Management Company LLC answer due 11/16/2020; Planned Administrators Inc answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter Granting Extension)(Willard, Theodore)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER South Carolina School Board Association, The answer due 11/23/2020. (Turner, Charles)
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER ICW Group Holdings Inc answer due 11/18/2020. (Sheldon, Wilson)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER SC State Accident Fund answer due 11/18/2020. (Prickett, F)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Accident Fund Holdings Inc answer due 11/18/2020. (Prickett, F)
October 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to PHP Agency, Inc. (Landis, Paul)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MedARC LLC as to Builders Mutual Insurance Company (Landis, Paul)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd answer due 11/23/2020. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/19/2020.(abuc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, Unopposed by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd. Response to Motion due by 10/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Correll, Boyd)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Federated Mutual Insurance Company answer due 11/20/2020. (Quattlebaum, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Absolute Total Care, Accident Fund Holdings Inc, American Mining Insurance Company, Ariel Third Party Administrators, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, CNA Financial Corporation, Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC, Carefirst of Maryland, Claims Management Inc, EMC Insurance Companies, Esis Inc, Federated Mutual Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, Golden Rule Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The, Health Net Federal Services LLC, Hewitt Coleman & Associates LLC, ICW Group Holdings Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, NALC Health Benefit Plan, New Jersey Property-Liability Insurance Guaranty Association, PHP Agency Inc, Planned Administrators Inc, Rancho Santa Fe Insurance and Financial Services, SC State Accident Fund, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd, Select Health of South Carolina, South Carolina School Board Association, The, Southern Benefit Administrators, Summit Consulting LLC, TC&C Medical Management Company LLC, UPMC, United Life Insurance Company. (abuc) (Main Document 4 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/5/2020) (abuc).
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by MedARC LLC.(abuc)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Absolute Total Care, Accident Fund Holdings Inc, American Mining Insurance Company, Ariel Third Party Administrators, Builders Mutual Insurance Company, CNA Financial Corporation, Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC, Carefirst of Maryland, Claims Management Inc, EMC Insurance Companies, Esis Inc, Federated Mutual Insurance Company, Gallagher Bassett Services Inc, Golden Rule Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The, Health Net Federal Services LLC, Hewitt Coleman & Associates LLC, ICW Group Holdings Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, NALC Health Benefit Plan, New Jersey Property-Liability Insurance Guaranty Association, PHP Agency Inc, Planned Administrators Inc, Rancho Santa Fe Insurance and Financial Services, SC State Accident Fund, Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd, Select Health of South Carolina, South Carolina School Board Association, The, Southern Benefit Administrators, Summit Consulting LLC, TC&C Medical Management Company LLC, UPMC, United Life Insurance Company, Vanliner Insurance Company, WellCare of South Carolina (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9368061.), filed by MedARC LLC. Service due by 12/29/2020(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MedARC LLC v. Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewitt Coleman & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planned Administrators Inc
Represented By: Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mining Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group Inc, The
Represented By: Cheryl D Shoun
Represented By: R Bruce Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Consulting LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carefirst of Maryland
Represented By: Brian K Norman
Represented By: Jeffrey Blair Norris
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariel Third Party Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: James Derrick Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanliner Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Care Improvement Plus Group Management LLC
Represented By: Anthony E Rebollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Net Federal Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TC&C Medical Management Company LLC
Represented By: Theodore Dubose Willard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services Ltd
Represented By: Boyd Alexander Correll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC State Accident Fund
Represented By: F Lee Prickett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NALC Health Benefit Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony E Rebollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina School Board Association, The
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Total Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Benefit Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellCare of South Carolina
Represented By: Jonathan Edward Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accident Fund Holdings Inc
Represented By: F Lee Prickett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICW Group Holdings Inc
Represented By: Wilson S Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancho Santa Fe Insurance and Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Health of South Carolina
Represented By: Brian Quisenberry
Represented By: Thantus Douglas Concannon
Represented By: Michael A Molony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Jersey Property-Liability Insurance Guaranty Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPMC
Represented By: Cashida Okeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHP Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claims Management Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MedARC LLC
Represented By: Austin Fletcher Watts
Represented By: Paul Swain Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?