Dourdoumis v. Dobbs
Petitioner: Vasilios Dourdoumis
Respondent: Bryan K Dobbs
Case Number: 8:2020cv02303
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Proper Form Order, 2241 Habeas Petition, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to asilios Dourdoumis 51058-083 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590 (gpre, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/20/2020. (gpre, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SCX600008631 (gpre, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO240, 2241 Petition form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Vasilios Dourdoumis 51058-083 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590 (gpre, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 to edit text (gpre, ).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing the petitioner to notify the court of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 7/13/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/22/2020. (gpre, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (gpre, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Vasilios Dourdoumis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dourdoumis v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vasilios Dourdoumis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bryan K Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?