Graciani-Febus v. Bureau of Prisons

Petitioner: Mike Graciani-Febus
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons and Warden of FCI-Williamsburg
Case Number: 9:2019cv00659
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Mike Graciani-Febus placed in U.S. Mail to Mike Graciani-Febus 39804-069 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590. #12 Order with petition placed in U.S. Mail to U.S. Attorney General (certified receipt #7005 3110 0002 5128 5882). (egra, )
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. It is recommended that the Petition in this action be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 5/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 04/30/2019. (egra, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REFERENCE #12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 04/30/2019. (egra, )
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 04/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (egra, )
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Mike Graciani-Febus. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)Motions referred to Bristow Marchant. (egra, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, and required documents placed in U.S. Mail to Mike Graciani-Febus 39804-069 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590. (egra, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 4/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 03/13/2019. (egra, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (egra, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus, filed by Mike Graciani-Febus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (egra, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/4/2019: #2 Habeas Petition re Proper Form Order, #3 Envelope) (egra, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graciani-Febus v. Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of FCI-Williamsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mike Graciani-Febus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?