Higgins v. Catalyst Exhibits Inc et al
Plaintiff: Douglas W Higgins
Defendant: Catalyst Exhibits Inc, Tru Services Group Inc, David Larsen and Timothy Roberts
Case Number: 9:2020cv03424
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Defendants Catalyst Exhibits, Inc., Tru Services Group, Inc., Timothy Roberts, and David Larsen's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 11/25/2020. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/13/2020.(vdru, )
November 11, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Catalyst Exhibits Inc, David Larsen, Timothy Roberts, Tru Services Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: November 11, 2020 Email Between Counsel)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Adams, Julie)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint Response filed by Douglas W Higgins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/13/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mr. Higgins Declaration)(Mullaney, Marybeth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint by Catalyst Exhibits Inc, David Larsen, Timothy Roberts, Tru Services Group Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, To Transfer Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A: Declaration of Timothy Roberts, #3 Exhibit B: Declaration of David Larsen, #4 Appendix Unpublished Opinions)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Adams, Julie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Between Counsel)(Adams, Julie)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by David Larsen.(vdru, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Timothy Roberts.(vdru, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tru Services Group Inc.(vdru, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Catalyst Exhibits Inc.(vdru, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Beaufort County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-07-1612. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9367960), filed by Catalyst Exhibits Inc, Timothy Roberts, David Larsen, Tru Services Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: All Pleadings Filed in Beaufort County Case, #2 Exhibit 2: Declaration of Timothy Roberts, #3 Exhibit 3: Declaration of David Larsen, #4 Exhibit 4: Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Supporting Documents Unpublished Opinion).(vdru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Catalyst Exhibits Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Exhibits Inc
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Represented By: Julie Kerr Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru Services Group Inc
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Represented By: Julie Kerr Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Larsen
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Represented By: Julie Kerr Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Roberts
Represented By: Julie K. Adams
Represented By: Julie Kerr Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas W Higgins
Represented By: Marybeth E Mullaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?