Caskey v. South Dakota State Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: Cody Ray Caskey
Defendant: South Dakota State Penitentiary, Dooley and Adams
Case Number: 4:2017cv04070
Filed: May 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
County: Minnehaha
Presiding Judge: Karen E. Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting 57 Report and Recommendation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/20/18. (DJP)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 14 and 36 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 3/20/2018. (CG)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing service in part and dismissing complaint in part; granting 9 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/9/2017. (JLS)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Leave to Amend re 1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983), filed by Cody Ray Caskey. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 7/27/2017. (JLS)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $18.15 is due by 7/7/2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/8/17. (DJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caskey v. South Dakota State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Ray Caskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dakota State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?