Johnson et al v Shchepler et al
Plaintiff: Surgee Rae Johnson and Deborah Susan Herrington
Defendant: Carla Shchepler, Robert Even and Lance Russell
Case Number: 5:2022cv05044
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 14 Mail sent to Deborah Susan Herrington was returned as undeliverable. #11 Judgment of Dismissal and Appeal Packet was returned. (DLC)
July 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension by Surgee Rae Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SKK) Modified on 7/7/2022 (VMM).
June 21, 2022 Filing 12 Mail sent to Deborah Susan Herrington was returned as undeliverable. #10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, was returned. (DLC)
June 16, 2022 Filing 11 JUDGMENT of Dismissal. Sent to Surgee Johnson via Email with Appeal Packet and to Deborah Herrington via USPS with Appeal Packet. (SKK)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The case is dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief could be granted. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on June 13, 2022. (Sent to Deborah Susan Herrington via US Postal Service) (DLC)
May 23, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Surgee Rae Johnson re #1 Complaint. (DLC)
May 16, 2022 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Surgee Rae Johnson re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (DLC)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs on behalf of Mr. Johnson. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet and blank IFP Motion sent to plaintiff Deborah Sue Harrington. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Modified to add language re sending IPF motion to Plaintiff Harrington on 5/9/2022 (DJP).
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet mailed to Deborah Harrington (DJP) Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Modified on 5/9/2022 (DJP). Modified on 5/9/2022 (DJP).
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Surgee Rae Johnson. Pro se party Surgee Rae Johnson will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP).
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Surgee Rae Johnson. (DJP) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP). (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP).
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Surgee Rae Johnson. (DJP) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP).
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Thank you note) (DJP) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/9/2022) (DJP).
May 9, 2022 NOTICE of Filing Error (wrong case number) 6 New Case Letter - Nonprisoner Case was filed in error and should be disregarded. (DJP)
May 9, 2022 Remark: This case was inadvertently assigned the wrong case number (22-4060). The case number has been corrected to 22-5044 and this case number should be used on all further pleadings. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v Shchepler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surgee Rae Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Susan Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Shchepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Even
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?