Farr v. Centurion of Tennessee, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas W Farr
Defendant: Centurion of Tennessee, LLC, Corizon, Inc., Crump, C. Singleton, Niner, Dan Walker, Lynndy Houston-Fagan, Rhonda Armes, Shawn Phillips, Stanton Heidle and Kenneth Williams
Case Number: 3:2016cv00387
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Morgan
Presiding Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Niner's motion to dismiss 109 is DENIED. Plaintiffs counsels motion to withdraw 124 is GRANTED and the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove his designation as Plaintiffs counsel from the Cou rt's docket sheet. Defendant Walker's motion for summary judgment 119 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's decision to grant summary judgment to former Defendants Crump, Byrge, Centurion, and Cori zon 130 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel 130 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint 127 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for discovery 126 is DENIED, but Defendant Niner is DIRECTED to treat this f iling as a request for discovery. The Court's scheduling order 98 is AMENDED to the extent that the deadline for completion of discovery in this action will be November 6, 2020, and the deadline for dispositive motions will be November 27, 2020.Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 10/6/20. (c/m Thomas W Farr 339449 Northeast Correctional Complex 13-18P.O. Box 5000 Mountain City, TN 37683 ) (ADA)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; Defendants Centurion, Corizon, Crump, and Byrge's motion for entry of final judgment against them pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 103 is DENIED. Defendant Dr. Niner's motion for an extension of time to file an answer 105 is GRANTED only to the extent that the Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of the most recent summons returned for this Defendant 99 to him and Defendant Dr. Niner shall have up to and including May 15, 2020, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint. If Defendant Dr. Niner still asserts that he was not properly served with process after receiving a copy of the most recent returned summons for him , he SHALL file either (1) a waiver of service of process or (2) a notice setting forth the address at which the U.S. Marshals Service may personally serve him with a copy of the complaint and summons within five (5) days after he receives a copy of this summons. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 4/23/20. (emailed sealed 99 to Daniel Swanson and Charles Sharrett) (ADA)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the Court's docket sheet to name Defendant Byrge, rather than Houston-Fagan. Defendants' pending motions for summary judgment 56 , 68 , 70 , and 73 are G RANTED. All other pending motions and objections 51 , 76 , 82 , 91 , and 92 are DENIED and/or OVERRULED as moot, as only Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Niner and Walker remain herein. Signed by District Judge Thomas A. Varlan on 3/31/20. (ADA)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION: because Plaintiff is a detainee in the Northeast Correctional Complex, he is herewith ASSESSED the civil filing fee of $350.00. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Memorandum to the Warden of Northe ast Correctional Complex to ensure that the custodian of plaintiff's trust account complies with that portion of the Prison Litigation Reform Act relating to payment of the filing fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward a copy of this Memorandum to the Court's financial deputy. Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] will be GRANTED. His request for counsel and complaint [Doc. 2] will be DENIED; the action [E.D. Tenn. Case No. 3:16-cv-387-TAV] will be DISMISSED sua sponte for failure to state a viable claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1983. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on March 23, 2017. c/m (AYB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farr v. Centurion of Tennessee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas W Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Tennessee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynndy Houston-Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Armes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanton Heidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?