Watkins et al v. Kajima International Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Michael W. Watkins and Michael D. Watkins
Defendant: Richard A. Belotti, California, State of, John Vega, Sharon Belotti, Sandy Parker, Paul Hogan, Ronald M. George, Steven Sands, James F. Ahern, Peter Norell, Michael Markel, David Proulx, George Lasko, Barrington A. S. Daltrey, Cynthia Ludvigsen, Kajima International Incorporated, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Bill Lockyer, David Cohn, Anne Hunter, Tom Cavallo, N. L. Hanover, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Art McKinster, Julie Linden, Pablo Castro, Betty Richli, Hiroaki Hoshino, David Williams, Virginia L. Watkins, Sherry A. Thompson, Joseph F. Borie, Peter Vail and Jeff King
Case Number: 3:2007cv00423
Filed: April 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2008 Filing 134 Docket entry number 133 is hereby entered on the docket in compliance with Rule 58 and/or Rule 79(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on 3/19/08 by DT. (dt)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the Report & Recommendation #111 is Accepted and Approved. Plaintiffs' Objections to the R&R #119 , #121 , #122 are Overruled. The Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendants #18 , #34 , #39 , #43 , #69 , #72 , #88 , #94 & #104 are Granted. This case is hereby Dismissed without prejudice as to all Defendants. Entry of this Order on the docket shall constitute entry of a final judgment in accordance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on 58 and 79(a). Signed by Judge Robert Echols on 3/1/908. (dt)
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #83 is Granted nunc pro tunc. The motion to dismiss the first amended complaint #88 filed on behalf of defendants Belotti, Borrie and Daltrey adopts by reference a motion to dismiss the original complaint #34 previously filed on behalf of thesesame defendants. This earlier motion to dismiss and, by reference, these defendants motion to dismiss the first amended complaint are included in the report and recommendation #111 previously filed by the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 3/19/08. (dt)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: In light of the foregoing filings, the Clerk is hereby directed to Terminate these two Motion for Extension of Time to File #82 and #108 as moot. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 3/14/08. (dt)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed their Notice proposing a settlement conference #124 . Upon consideration of the present posture of this case, and of the defendants' expressed opposition to a settlement conference, the undersigned Magistrate Judge finds that the prospect for a compromise settlement of this case do not justify conducting such a conference at this time, and that, more than likely, a settlement conference now would be a waste of time and resources. Therefore, the undersigned Magistrate Judge liberally interprets the plaintiffs Notice as a motion seeking a settlement conference, which motion is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 3/14/08. (dt)
November 27, 2007 Filing 129 RESPONSE filed by Kajima International Incorporated In Opposition to #124 Proposed Settlement Conference filed by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (Cashion, Gregory) Modified Text on 11/28/2007 (dt).
November 27, 2007 Filing 128 RESPONSE filed by Kajima International Incorporated re #119 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (Cashion, Gregory)
November 26, 2007 Filing 127 Certified Mail Returned as Unclaimed; #111 Report and Recommendation mailed to Michael W. Watkins. (gi)
November 26, 2007 Filing 126 Certified Mail Returned as Unclaimed; #111 Report and Recommendation addressed to Michael D. Watkins. (gi)
November 16, 2007 Filing 125 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION filed by Betty Richli, Jeff King, Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster of #124 Notice filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (Bates, William) Modified Text on 11/19/2007 (dt).
November 14, 2007 Filing 124 NOTICE of Proposed Settlement Conference by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins (dt)
November 13, 2007 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE of Service for the Declarations of Michael W. Watkins and Michael D. Watkins filed by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
November 13, 2007 Filing 122 DECLARATION of Michael D. Watkins filed by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
November 13, 2007 Filing 121 DECLARATION of Michael W. Watkins filed by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
November 13, 2007 Filing 120 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 114, signed by Nene Admas on 11/8/07. (dt)
November 9, 2007 Filing 119 OBJECTION to #111 Report and Recommendations by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
November 7, 2007 Filing 118 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 114, signed by Matthew Watkins on 11/6/07. (dt)
November 7, 2007 Filing 117 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 114, signed by Matthew Watkins on 11/6/07. (dt)
November 5, 2007 Filing 116 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #111 Report and Recommendation. Mail sent to Michael C.P. Clark, envelope marked Forward Time Exp Return to Sender. (This pleading was already resent to Mr. Clark, see entry DE# 112)(dt)
November 5, 2007 Filing 115 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 111, signed by Thompson on 10/31/07. (dt)
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER: The Court is unaware of any settlement conference presently scheduled in this case, and plaintiffs' motion fails to state or otherwise contain any evidence that a settlement conference is scheduled. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion to Stay #110 is Denied. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 11/5/07. (cc: pltfs and deft Thompson by reg. & cert. mail) (dt) Modified Text on 11/5/2007 (dt).
November 1, 2007 Filing 113 Letter from Clerk to Attorney Michael C.P. Clark re Compliance with Local Rule 83.01. (dt)
October 29, 2007 Filing 112 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #109 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Mail sent to Michael C. P. Clark, envelope marked forward time expired return to sender. (xc: af) (Resent DE# 109 and 111) (dt)
October 29, 2007 Filing 111 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the motions to dismiss #18 , #34 , #39 , #43 , #69 , #72 , #94 & #104 be Granted and that the complaint, as amended be Dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction over the defendants and for improper venue. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 10/29/07. (cc: pltfs and deft Thompson by reg. & cert. mail) (dt) Modified Text on 10/29/2007 (dt).
October 24, 2007 Filing 110 MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Pending the Outcome of the Settlement Conference by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying pltfs' #107 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Echols on 10/16/07. (gi)
October 9, 2007 Filing 108 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
October 5, 2007 Filing 107 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Temporary Restraining Order)(dt)
October 5, 2007 Filing 106 NOTICE of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
September 25, 2007 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Support of #104 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Pablo Castro. (dt)
September 25, 2007 Filing 104 MOTION to Dismiss by Pablo Castro. (dt)
September 14, 2007 Filing 103 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 101, signed by Matthew Watkins on 9/12/07. (dt)
September 14, 2007 Filing 102 Docket Annotation: Green card returned this date as to DE No. 101, signed by Matthew Watkins on 9/12/07. (dt)
September 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #94 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to these defendants' motion to dismiss shall be filed by 10/9/07. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 9/10/07. (dt) (cc: pltfs by cert. mail) Modified Text on 9/11/2007 (dt).
September 7, 2007 Filing 100 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #94 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael W. Watkins and Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Martha A. Warriner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 9/6/07. (jb)
August 31, 2007 Filing 98 RECEIPT #116224 in the amount of $75.00 posted by Crocker & Niarhos for Martha Warriner, atty for N. L. Hanover, re #68 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt)
August 27, 2007 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING for Martha A. Warriner from the USDC/CDCA filed by N. L. Hanover. (dt)
August 24, 2007 Filing 96 REPLY to Response to #83 MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint filed by Michael W. Watkins & Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
August 21, 2007 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Support of #94 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Case 0197#2 Exhibit B - Memo Case 0197#3 Exhibit C - Complaint - California#4 Exhibit D - Ord. Dismissal - California#5 Exhibit E - Judgment - Ct. App.#6 Exhibit 1 - Kovats v. Hi-Lex#7 Exhibit 2 - Kovats v. Hi-Lex - 2/2002)(Anderson, J.)
August 21, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California. (Anderson, J.)
August 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #91 Motion for Raymond L. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 8/21/07. (dt)
August 16, 2007 Filing 92 RECEIPT #116023 in the amount of $75.00 posted by State of California for Raymond Fitgerald, attorney for Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo & State of California, re #91 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dt)
August 16, 2007 Note to Filer re Docket Entry No. 91: The certificate of good standing should be filed as separate event, not as an attachment to a document. This document does not need to be re-filed unless otherwise directed by the Court. (dt)
August 15, 2007 Filing 91 MOTION for attorney Raymond L. Fitzgerald to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing#2 Proposed Order Allowing Appearance Pro Hac Vice)(Anderson, J.) (PHV FEE PAID on 8/16/07) Modified Text on 8/16/2007 (dt).
August 15, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Christopher Anderson on behalf of Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California (Anderson, J.)
August 15, 2007 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #83 MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint filed by Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino. (Cashion, Gregory)
August 14, 2007 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Richard A. Belotti, Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey. (Lowe, Darryl)
August 13, 2007 Filing 87 RESPONSE to Motion re #83 MOTION for Leave to Amended Complaint filed by Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (Bates, William)
August 9, 2007 Filing 86 NOTICE of Change of Address by William N. Bates (Bates, William)
August 2, 2007 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (dt)
August 2, 2007 Filing 84 RESPONSE to #72 MOTION to Dismiss against Michael Markel and Sany Parker filed by Michael W. Watkins and Michael D. Watkins. (dt) Modified Text on 8/2/2007 (dt).
August 2, 2007 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(dt) Modified Text on 8/22/2007 (dt).
August 1, 2007 Filing 82 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California. (dt)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses through 8/14/07 to motions to dismiss #69 & #72 . Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 7/30/07. (gi, )
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #73 Motion of defts Hunter, Ahern, Sands, Cavallo, Vail and State of California for Extension of Time through 8/1/07 to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 7/23/07. (gi, )
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #45 Motion to File Supplemental Certificate of Service. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 7/23/07. (gi, )
July 19, 2007 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to 8/14/07 File Responses to Motions to Dismiss #69 & #72 by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (gi, )
July 18, 2007 Filing 77 NOTICE OF OBSTRUCTION OF JUSTICE by Michael D. Watkins (gi, )
July 12, 2007 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #43 MOTION to Dismiss pltf's complaint against judicial officiers filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (km, )
July 12, 2007 Filing 75 RESPONSE to #39 MOTION to Dismiss pltf's complaint against Sherry A. Thompson filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (km, )
July 12, 2007 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #34 First MOTION to Dismiss pltf's complaint against Sharon Belotti, etc. filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (km, )
July 11, 2007 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time of time until 8/1/07 to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, State of California. (km, )
July 3, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Markel, Sandy Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Related Case)(Johnson, David)
July 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Atty William E. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge John S. Bryant on 7/3/07. (gi, )
June 29, 2007 Filing 70 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Grounds filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (gi, )
June 29, 2007 Note to Filer re DE #68 & #69: Pursuant to Clerk's Office procedure, Certificates of Service must include the names and full addresses for all persons served, whether served electronically or by other means. Affidavits should be filed as separate events, not as attachments to other pleadings. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Per Local Rule 83.01, certification of good standing shall be made by filing a certificate of good standing from a United States District Court. A certificate of good standing for Atty Warriner from a USDC will need to be filed. (gi, )
June 28, 2007 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by N. L. Hanover. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affidavit of N.L. Hanover#2 Supplement Affidavit of Maria Jaramillo)(Crocker, Samuel)
June 28, 2007 Filing 68 MOTION for attorney Martha A. Warriner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by N. L. Hanover. (PHV Fee Paid on 8/31/07) (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate In Good Standing#2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Crocker, Samuel) Modified on 7/5/2007 (gi). Modified Text on 8/31/2007 (dt).
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting various defts' motions for extension of time #11 #14 #16 #20 & #23 to 7/11/07 to file a responsive pleading. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Bryant for consideration of all pretrial matters. Dispositive motions shall be considered by the Magistrate Judge who shall submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for disposition. Signed by Judge Robert Echols on 6/25/07. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 65 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Sherry A. Thompson served on 5/31/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 64 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. George Lasko served on 5/31/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 63 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. David Proulx served on 5/31/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 62 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Virginia L. Watkins served on 5/31/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 61 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Julie Linden served on 5/31/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 60 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Sandy Parker served on 6/4/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 59 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Peter Norell served on 6/5/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 58 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Pablo Castro served on 6/7/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 57 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. John Vega served on 6/7/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 56 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Tom Cavallo served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 55 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Michael Markel served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 54 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Betty Richli served on 5/29/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 53 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Art McKinster served on 5/29/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 52 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (f/n/u) Ramirez served on 5/29/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 51 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. N. L. Hanover served on 5/29/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 50 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Jeff King served on 5/29/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 49 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. David Cohn served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 48 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. David Williams served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 47 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Cynthia Ludvigsen served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 46 RECEIPT #115299 in the amount of $75.00 re #21 Motion for Atty William E. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (gi, )
June 22, 2007 Filing 45 MOTION to Supplement #44 Memorandum in Support,,, #43 MOTION to Dismiss on Certificate of Service by Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (Bates, William)
June 22, 2007 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support of #43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Kovats v. Hi-Lex 2001 U.S. Dist. Lexis 23068#2 Exhibit Kovats v. Hi-:ex Corp. 2002 U.S. Dist. Lexis 2432#3 Exhibit A - Order from U.S.D.C. Midd. Dist. TN 3:06-0197#4 Exhibit B - Memo in U.S. Dist. Midd. TN 3:06-0197#5 Exhibit C - Complaint in U.S.D.C. Central CA 5-01036#6 Exhibit D - Order in U.S.D.C. Central CA 5-1036)(Bates, William)
June 22, 2007 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (Bates, William)
June 21, 2007 Filing 38 DECLARATION of Barrington A. S. Daltrey filed by Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey re: #34 First MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 37 DECLARATION of Joseph L. Borrie filed by Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey re: #34 First MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit)(Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Sharon Belotti filed by Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey re: #34 First MOTION to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #2 Exhibit)(Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 First MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey. (Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 34 First MOTION to Dismiss by Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey. (Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl G. Lowe on behalf of Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey (Lowe, Darryl)
June 21, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl G. Lowe on behalf of Sharon Belotti (Lowe, Darryl)
June 20, 2007 Filing 67 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Donald Alverez served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 42 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Sherry A. Thompson re #39 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order of dismissal in ED CV 05-402 PA(PJWx); #2 Exhibit B, Order of Dismissal in CV 05-6914 PA(AJWx); #3 Exhibit C, Order in case VCVVS040182; #4 Exhibit D, Notice of Ruling in case VCVVS040182; #5 Exhibit E, Vexatious Litigation Order; #6 Exhibit F, Order of dismissal in case ED CV 05-1036 PA(PJWx); #7 Exhibit G, Order of dismissal in case 3:06-0197; #8 Exhibit H, Complaint in 3:07-0423)(gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Sherry A. Thompson filed by Sherry A. Thompson re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of #39 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sherry A. Thompson. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss by Sherry A. Thompson. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 33 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Richard A. Belotti served on 6/1/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 32 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Sharon Belotti served on 6/1/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 31 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Barrington A. S. Daltrey served on 6/1/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 30 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Kajima International Incorporated served on 5/23/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 29 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Anne Hunter served on 5/23/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 28 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Joseph F. Borie served on 6/1/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 27 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. James F. Ahern served on 5/23/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Filing 26 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Robert Fowler served on 5/30/2007. (gi, )
June 20, 2007 Note to Filer re DE #21: The Certificate of Good Standing should be filed as a separate event rather than as an attachment. The event is found under "Other Filings", "Other Documents". It is not necessary to re-file this document. (gi, )
June 19, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Peter Vail & Tom Cavallo. (gi, )
June 19, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Peter Vail & Tom Cavallo (gi, )
June 19, 2007 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney William E. Dorris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino. (PHV Fee Paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing for William Dorris)(Cashion, Gregory) Modified on 6/25/2007 (gi, ).
June 14, 2007 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Markel, Sandy Parker. (Johnson, David)
June 13, 2007 Note to Filer re DE #17-#19: The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/". It is not necessary to re-file these documents. (gi, )
June 12, 2007 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Grounds filed by Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion from Case No. 3:06-0197#2 Exhibit Unpublished opinion from Gombert v. Shosid)(Cashion, Gregory)
June 12, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Grounds by Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino. (Cashion, Gregory)
June 12, 2007 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kajima International Incorporated. (Cashion, Gregory)
June 12, 2007 Note to Filer re DE #13 & #14: The filer's name should be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear preceded by the symbol "s/". It is not necessary to re-file these documents. (gi, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands and State of California. (gi, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Anne Hunter, James F. Ahern, Steven Sands and State of California (gi, )
June 11, 2007 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleadings by Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino. (Cashion, Gregory)
June 11, 2007 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Lee Cashion on behalf of Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino (Cashion, Gregory)
June 11, 2007 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Johnson on behalf of Michael Markel, Sandy Parker (Johnson, David)
June 5, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (Bates, William)
June 5, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by William N. Bates on behalf of Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster (Bates, William)
May 30, 2007 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Ronald M. George served on 5/21/2007. (gi, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. State of California served on 5/22/2007. (gi, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Bill Lockyer served on 5/22/2007. (gi, )
May 30, 2007 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. Steven Sands served on 5/22/2007. (gi, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 filed by pltfs. (gi, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE re #3 to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court the Following Cases: #BBC00433; #VCVVS 040182; VFLVS 032196; S 2000-93 by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (gi, )
May 17, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal of State Cases #BBC00433; #VCVVS 040182; VFLVS 032196; S 2000-93 by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins (gi, )
April 18, 2007 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Anne Hunter, Paul Hogan, James F. Ahern, Bill Lockyer, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, N. L. Hanover, Steven Sands, Michael Markel, Sandy Parker, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, George Lasko, Sherry A. Thompson, Pablo Castro, Julie Linden, John Vega, Virginia L. Watkins, Richard A. Belotti, Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey, State of California, Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster. (gi, )
April 16, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Betty Richli, Jeff King, (f/n/u) Ramirez, Peter Norell, Anne Hunter, Paul Hogan, James F. Ahern, Bill Lockyer, Donald Alverez, Robert Fowler, Cynthia Ludvigsen, David Proulx, David Williams, David Cohn, N. L. Hanover, Steven Sands, Michael Markel, Sandy Parker, Peter Vail, Tom Cavallo, George Lasko, Sherry A. Thompson, Pablo Castro, Julie Linden, John Vega, Virginia L. Watkins, Richard A. Belotti, Sharon Belotti, Joseph F. Borie, Barrington A. S. Daltrey, State of California, Kajima International Incorporated, Hiroaki Hoshino, Ronald M. George, Art McKinster , filed by Michael W. Watkins, Michael D. Watkins. (filing fee paid $350.00) NO summons issued at this time.(rm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins et al v. Kajima International Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Belotti
Represented By: Darryl G. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California, State of
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Belotti
Represented By: Darryl G. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Parker
Represented By: David L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald M. George
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Sands
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Ahern
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Norell
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Markel
Represented By: David L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Proulx
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Lasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington A. S. Daltrey
Represented By: Darryl G. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Ludvigsen
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kajima International Incorporated
Represented By: William E. Dorris
Represented By: Gregory Lee Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (f/n/u) Ramirez
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lockyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cohn
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Hunter
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Cavallo
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. L. Hanover
Represented By: Martha A. Warriner
Represented By: Timothy G. Niarhos
Represented By: Samuel Kenneth Crocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Alverez
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fowler
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art McKinster
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Castro
Represented By: Michael C.P. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Richli
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroaki Hoshino
Represented By: William E. Dorris
Represented By: Gregory Lee Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Williams
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia L. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry A. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph F. Borie
Represented By: Darryl G. Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Vail
Represented By: Raymond L. Fitzgerald
Represented By: J. Christopher Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff King
Represented By: Heather C. Stewart
Represented By: William N. Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?