A.M. et al v. Rutherford County Board of Education
Plaintiff: A. M., D. M. and A.M.
Defendant: Rutherford County Board of Education
Case Number: 3:2019cv00085
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Aleta A Trauger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/25/2019 at 02:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (am)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/25/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(am)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Reset Initial Case Management Conference re #4 Notice of Case Management Conference by Rutherford County Board of Education. (Christiansen, Nicholas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin S. Gilbert (Gilbert, Justin)
February 26, 2019 NOTICE TO FILER re DE# 11 : The incorrect PDF was filed. This document is disregarded. Counsel shall re-file the document. (dt)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 (DISREGARD - ENTERED in ERROR - INCORRECT PDF) NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin S. Gilbert (Gilbert, Justin) Modified on 2/26/2019 (dt).
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Justin S. Gilbert (Gilbert, Justin)
February 20, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Nicholas Clinton Christiansen. (dt)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rutherford County Board of Education answer due 3/21/2019. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/19/19. (gb)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Rutherford County Board of Education. (Christiansen, Nicholas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Clinton Christiansen on behalf of Rutherford County Board of Education (Christiansen, Nicholas)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by D. M., A.M.. Rutherford County Board of Education served on 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-- Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-- Return Mail Receipt)(Gilbert, Justin)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica F. Salonus on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Salonus, Jessica)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 1:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (dt)
January 17, 2019 TN State Bar status verified as active for Justin S. Gilbert and Jessica F. Salonus. (dt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Rutherford County Board of Education. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rutherford County Board of Education (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2834488), filed by A. M. and D. M.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M. et al v. Rutherford County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. M.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.
Represented By: Justin S. Gilbert
Represented By: Jessica F. Salonus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County Board of Education
Represented By: Nicholas Clinton Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?