Clifton v. Patrick et al
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Clifton
Defendant: Bettye Patrick, Charlotte Richey, James Beard, Charles M. Traughber and Jeff Barnett
Case Number: 1:2017cv01035
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Jackson Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: S. Thomas Anderson
Presiding Judge: Edward G. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 JUDGMENT. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/29/2018. (mbb)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DISMISSING JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 3/12/18. (mbm)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT BETTYE PATRICK 42 . Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/5/17. (skc)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 30 MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANT PATRICK. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 6/27/17. (Anderson, S. Thomas)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clifton v. Patrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Lee Clifton
Represented By: Joy Boyd Longnecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettye Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Traughber
Represented By: Pamela S. Lorch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?