Inman et al v. Target Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Angela Milan Inman and Richard Ray Inman
Defendant: Buffalo Construction, Inc, Target Corporation and Stanley AccessTechnologies
Not Classified By Court: Kathy Blount
Case Number: 1:2020cv01176
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Daniel Breen
Referring Judge: Jon A York
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE by Target Corporation of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Stanley Access Technologies (Carson, Dawn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE by Target Corporation of Service of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs (Carson, Dawn)
October 12, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order PROPOSED ORDER SUBMITTED by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Carson, Dawn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Angela Milan Inman, Richard Ray Inman Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Barnett, Sara)
October 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE by Target Corporation of Service of Initial Disclosures (Carson, Dawn)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for 10/25/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jackson Courtroom 2 before Judge J. Daniel Breen. Motions in Limine, Proposed Jury Instructions and Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/13/2021. (ejc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR deadline is 12/23/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 11/23/2020. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 6/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 9/22/2020. (ars)
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/22/2020. Present were attys Barnett, Carson, Gorman, and Jakes. Order to be entered. (ars)
September 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Angela and Richard Inman by Target Corporation.(Carson, Dawn)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stanley AccessTechnologies identifying Corporate Parent Stanley Black and Decker, Inc. for Stanley AccessTechnologies.. (Jakes, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Taylor Gorman on behalf of Buffalo Construction, Inc (Gorman, Nathaniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Buffalo Construction, Inc. (Braun, Karl)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation.(Carson, Dawn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 SETTING LETTER:TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, September 22, 2020, 10 A.M. CT before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please email the proposed joint scheduling order in the original Word format to ECF_Judge_York@tnwd.uscourts.gov one week prior to the scheduling conference. Parties shall dial into our telephonic conference service at: (877) 411-9748. The Access Code is 828 9188. If you are unable to appear at this time, or if you need to make alternative arrangements, please contact the Judge's Case Manager at 731-421-9275 so we may reschedule. Please agree on a date and time with the opposing counsel before calling to facilitate the new date. ** REMINDER: FRCP 26(f) requires a 26(f) meeting to be held at least 21 days before a scheduling conference and the Rule 26(f) report to be filed with the court at least fourteen days before the scheduling conference. This case has been assigned to the Standard track. Please use the Standard Track Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order at # http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LR162_Standard.docCounsel should review the Court's new ADR plan, file a Stipulation, and be prepared to report the name of a mediator to the Court during the Scheduling Conference. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator one will be appointed by the Court after the scheduling conference.PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys who wish to participate in the Scheduling Conference MUST have filed a Notice of Appearance with the Court PRIOR to the date of the Conference and have full knowledge of the case. Note: Text only (ars)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Target Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal with Consent of all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Carson, Dawn)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation. (Carson, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Buffalo Construction, Inc Consent to Removal (Braun, Karl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by Buffalo Construction, Inc.(Braun, Karl)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Target Corporation.(Carson, Dawn)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal S. Spragins, Jr on behalf of Target Corporation (Spragins, Hal)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Stanley AccessTechnologies re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (Jakes, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Judge J. Daniel Breen and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Madison County, TN Circuit Court, case number C-20-195 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3413997), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Carson, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inman et al v. Target Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Milan Inman
Represented By: Sara Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ray Inman
Represented By: Sara Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kathy Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Construction, Inc
Represented By: Karl M. Braun
Represented By: Nathaniel Taylor Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Dawn Davis Carson
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley AccessTechnologies
Represented By: William B. Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?