National Labor Relations Board v. Kellogg Company

Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Case Number: 2:2014cv02272
Filed: April 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Office: Memphis Office
County: Shelby
Presiding Judge: Diane K. Vescovo
Presiding Judge: Samuel H. Mays
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 08/22/2014. (Mays, Samuel)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 7/30/2014.
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 6/23/2014.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Labor Relations Board v. Kellogg Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Labor Relations Board
Represented By: William Thomas Hearne
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Company
Represented By: Nolan M. Johnson
Represented By: George T. Lewis, III
Represented By: Nathan D. Plantinga
Represented By: Keith E. Eastland
Represented By: David M. Buday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?