Trahan v. Walgreen Co., et al.
Plaintiff: Cherri K. Trahan
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. and Walgreen Co.
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Case Number: 2:2018cv02688
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Samuel H Mays
Referring Judge: Diane K Vescovo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The following deadlines/schedules have been established: initial disclosures ddl 12/05/18; joining parties ddl 01/15/19; amended pleadings ddl 02/15/19; expert disclosures due 04/08/19 for pltf, 05/06/19 for defts; document production, interrogatories & requests for admissions ddl 07/01/19; all discovery ddl 07/01/19; mediation ddl 02/15/19; dispositive motions ddl 08/12/19; Jury Trial set Monday, 01/06/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 12/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr on 11/16/2018. (Mays, Samuel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 01/06/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/13/2019. (zsf)
November 16, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTES: Scheduling Conference held on 11/16/2018 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Jeffrey Land appeared on behalf of the pltf; Atty Audrey Calkins appeared on behalf of the defts; proposed scheduling order was adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: initial disclosures ddl 12/05/18; joining parties ddl 01/15/19; amended pleadings ddl 02/15/19; expert disclosures due 04/08/19 for pltf, 05/06/19 for defts; document production, interrogatories & requests for admissions ddl 07/01/19; all discovery ddl 07/01/19; mediation ddl 02/15/19; dispositive motions ddl 08/12/19; Jury Trial set Monday, 01/06/2020 at 9:30 a.m. (3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 12/20/2019 at 9:30 a.m.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 12/13/2019. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (zsf)
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey M. Calkins on behalf of Walgreen Co., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Calkins, Audrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set Friday, 11/16/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 7 - Memphis before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. (jl)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - First Amended by Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc..(Rusie, Jennifer)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - First Amended Complaint by Walgreen Co..(Rusie, Jennifer)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Walgreen Co. has been filed. For future reference, please note You listed Jefferson County Court when it looks as if it should be Shelby County Circuit Court.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jld)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreen Co. from Jefferson Co. Circuit Court, case number CT-003966-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2894639), filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint - state court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet - CCS - Trahan v. Walgreen, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Rusie, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trahan v. Walgreen Co., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Jimmy Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Smith Rusie
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Smith Rusie
Represented By: Audrey M. Calkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherri K. Trahan
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?