Walker v. Fayette County Schools et al
Plaintiff: Tametrius Walker
Defendant: Diane Watkins, Jane Doe, James Teague, John Doe, Fayette County Schools and Ben Gilliam
Not Yet Classified: Ed Pulliam
Case Number: 2:2019cv02562
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Fayette County Schools, Diane Watkins.(Hayden, Christopher)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Ben Gilliam.(Tilly, Nathan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER - Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT as to Defendant James Teague only. Party James Teague terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 09/23/2019. (kah)
September 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tametrius Walker (Bruce, William)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bruce, William)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand to Amended Complaint by Fayette County Schools, Diane Watkins.(Hayden, Christopher)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 [**TEXT ORDER ONLY--NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file Responsive Pleading by 09/23/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 08/27/2019. (kah)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint - proposed order submitted by Ben Gilliam. (Tilly, Nathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Hayden on behalf of Fayette County Schools, Diane Watkins (Hayden, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Tilly on behalf of Ben Gilliam (Tilly, Nathan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Diane Watkins, Fayette County Schools, Ben Gilliam, James Teague from Circuit Court of Fayette County, Tennessee, case number 15-CV-70 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3147300), filed by Diane Watkins, Fayette County Schools, Ben Gilliam, James Teague. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mauldin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Fayette County Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Watkins
Represented By: Christopher C. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Teague
Represented By: Christopher C. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayette County Schools
Represented By: Christopher C. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gilliam
Represented By: William B. Mauldin
Represented By: Nathan Daniel Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tametrius Walker
Represented By: William R. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Ed Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?