Shaw v. Memphis Souvenirs, LLC.
Plaintiff: Rachel Shaw
Defendant: Memphis Souvenirs, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02618
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Attachment filed by Memphis Souvenirs, LLC. has been filed. For future reference, please note proposed orders should be emailed to the presiding judges chambers. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (agj)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTACHMENT Proposed Scheduling Order to #9 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Memphis Souvenirs, LLC... (Fletcher, Heather)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Fletcher, Heather)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (mlk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Memphis Souvenirs, LLC..(Fletcher, Heather)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Memphis Souvenirs, LLC.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Memphis Souvenirs, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3167174), filed by Rachel Shaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Winfrey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Memphis Souvenirs, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Shaw
Represented By: Brian Christopher Winfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memphis Souvenirs, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?