Lee v. Craft et al
Plaintiff: Wendolyn Lee
Defendant: Chris Craft, Amy Weirich and James Jones
Case Number: 2:2020cv02424
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Charmiane G Claxton
Referring Judge: James D Todd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ASSESSING $350 FILING FEE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PLRA #5 . Signed by Judge James D. Todd on 6/17/20. (skc)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-01 case reassigned to Judge James D. Todd. Judge Sheryl H. Lipman no longer assigned to case. (agj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Judicial Cards) (csf).
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-01529. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Western Division. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that determination of pauper status is DEFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Tennessee, Western Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/15/2020.(ajn) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wendolyn Lee. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient IFP Motion)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Chris Craft, James Jones, Amy Weirich filed by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Original Deficient Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 6/17/2020. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wendolyn Lee. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against Chris Craft, James Jones, Amy Weirich filed by Wendolyn Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 6/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Craft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Weirich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendolyn Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?