In the matter of Rose H. Vernon v. Shelby County Probate Court Clerk et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Dingler and In the matter of Rose H. Vernon
Defendant: Shelby County Probate Court Clerk, Sam Powers, Shelby County Probate Court and Bill Morrison
Case Number: 2:2020cv02436
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: John T Fowlkes
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2020 Filing 30 Memorandums of Law to Support Issuing Habeas by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (Documents submitted via intake email)(btg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Underlying Cause of Action - Official State Actions Frustrating Probate Litigation by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (Attachments: #1 email, #2 email, #3 email, #4 email, #5 email, #6 document, #7 living trust, #8 irrevocable trust, #9 attachment to letter, #10 amendment, #11 letter, #12 email, #13 email, #14 email, #15 email, #16 email, #17 email, #18 email, #19 email, #20 email, #21 email, #22 email) (Documents submitted via intake email.(btg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 28 PRO-SE MOTION to Amend Original Petition by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (btg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon re #26 Order Email received through Intake Email Box. (vlg)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER authorizing plaintiff to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/10/2020. (nph)
July 9, 2020 Filing 25 Email from Joseph Dingler (jld)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham on 7/9/2020. (jrs)
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (agj) Modified on 7/9/2020 (vlg). DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE in re: Email to Mr. Powers by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (agj) Modified on 7/9/2020 (vlg). DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE in re: Notice of Hearing in Probate Court by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (agj) Modified on 7/9/2020 (vlg).DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE in re; Emergency Probate Filing email by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (agj) Modified on 7/9/2020 (vlg).DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE in re: Affidavit of Indigency by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon (agj) Modified on 7/9/2020 (vlg). DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR.
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #17 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 7/7/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
July 7, 2020 Pursuant to Administrative Order 2013-05, this case has been assigned to the United States magistrate judge for management of all pretrial matters, including screening of the complaint to determine whether or not summons shall be issued by the Clerk pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and Local Rule 4.1(b)(2) (csf)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 PRO SE MOTION for Reconsideration re #16 Order on Motion for TRO by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(jae)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #12 Motion for TRO signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 6/26/2020. (Fowlkes, J.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 ATTACHMENT to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (agj)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 ATTACHMENT to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon.. (agj)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 PRO SE MOTION to be allowed to file electronically by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (jae)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by In the matter of Rose H. Vernon. (jae)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shelby County Probate Court Clerk, Bill Morrison, Sam Powers, Shelby County Probate Court, filed by Joseph Dingler.(jae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Joseph Dingler.. (jae)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT (Sam Powers email) to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Joseph Dingler. (Attachments: #1 Email notice)(jae)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Joseph Dingler.. (Attachments: #1 Amendment to living trust, #2 attachment to letter, #3 Irrevocable trust, #4 RTL signed, #5 settlement agreement, #6 settlement agreement, #7 statute attachment to letter, #8 Will)(jae)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTACHMENT (street view of house) to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Joseph Dingler. (jae)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT to #1 Pro Se Complaint by Joseph Dingler.. (Attachments: #1 2/13/19 email IRT problems, #2 3/11/19 email Trust Assets, #3 3/28/19 email trust acceptance, #4 4/3/20 email KGaines CC, #5 4/6/20 Email Gaines, Thornton, #6 5/8/19 email seeking counsel, #7 5/10/19 email Preson Wilson, #8 Exhibit to Preston Wilson email, #9 Exhibit to Preston Wilson email, #10 Exhibit to Preston Wilson emal, #11 Exhibit to Preston Wilson email, #12 Exhibit to Preston Wilson email, #13 Exhibit to Preston Wilson email, #14 5/18/19Email to Preston Wilson, #15 6/16/19 Email demands, #16 6/16/19 email Trust Asset Rejection, #17 6/30/15 email benefit letter, #18 6/30/15 email benefit letter attachment, #19 Checkout IHF LLC, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit)(jae)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Dingler. (jae)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Shelby County Probate Court Clerk, filed by Joseph Dingler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of Rose H. Vernon v. Shelby County Probate Court Clerk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Probate Court Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Probate Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Dingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the matter of Rose H. Vernon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?