Givens v. Bonner
Petitioner: Phennix LLH Givens
Respondent: Floyd Bonner, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02564
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Mark S Norris
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Se MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Floyd Bonner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jld)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/17/2020. (Norris, Mark)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241, DENYING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, CERTIFYING THAT AN APPEAL WOULD NOT BE TAKEN IN GOOD FAITH, AND DENYING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/17/2020. (Norris, Mark)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 9/15/2020. (Norris, Mark)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phennix LLH Givens. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Balance History, #2 Envelope)(jld)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AN IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT AND TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT OR PAY THE $5.00 HABEAS CORPUS FILING FEE. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 8/6/2020. (Norris, Mark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Pro Se Prisoner track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 filed by Phennix LLH Givens against Floyd Bonner, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(csf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2020: #2 Judicial Cards) (csf).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Floyd Bonner, Jr.
Represented By: 2241 AUSA - Memphis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phennix LLH Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?