RPM Care, LLC et al v. StreetDivvy Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RPM Care, LLC, Ashley Pace and Scott Coleman
Defendant: StreetDivvy Inc. and Joshua Jackson
Case Number: 2:2021cv02538
Filed: August 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Annie T Christoff
Referring Judge: Jon Phipps McCalla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2021 Filing 20 DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/8/21. (rcl)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #16 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/8/21. (rcl)
October 7, 2021 Filing 18 Exhibit and Witness List for Damages Hearing on 10/7/2021. (jrs)
October 7, 2021 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Damages Hearing held on 10/7/2021. Charles Silvestri Higgins appeared for the Plaintiff. Defendant is in Default #13 and therefore was not present. The Court heard statements in re: to #16 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff's proof/sworn witnesses: William Ashley Pace; Exhibit 1. The Court heard statements as to damages. An Order will be entered granting Plaintiff's motion. (Court Reporter: Lashawn Marshall, Alpha Reporting) (jrs)
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Default Judgment and Pre-Hearing Brief (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Will Irvine, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Ashley Pace)(Higgins, Charles)
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Silvestri Higgins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Higgins, Charles)
September 23, 2021 Filing 14 SETTING LETTER: A Damages Hearing has been set for Thursday, 10/7/2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. (jrs)
September 23, 2021 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joshua Jackson. Motion terminated: #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Joshua Jackson filed by Ashley Pace, RPM Care, LLC, Scott Coleman. (jae)
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Joshua Jackson by All Plaintiffs. (Irvine, William)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joshua Jackson, StreetDivvy Inc.. Motion terminated: #10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant StreetDivvy, Inc. filed by Ashley Pace, RPM Care, LLC, Scott Coleman. (jae)
September 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant StreetDivvy, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Irvine, William)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Care, LLC, Scott Coleman, Ashley Pace as to Joshua Jackson. (Halijan, Douglas)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RPM Care, LLC, Scott Coleman, Ashley Pace as to StreetDivvy Inc.. (Halijan, Douglas)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Joshua Jackson, StreetDivvy Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Joshua Jackson)(agj)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William David Irvine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Irvine, William)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 3 Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (agj)
August 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3682364), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Halijan, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RPM Care, LLC et al v. StreetDivvy Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RPM Care, LLC
Represented By: Douglas F. Halijan
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Pace
Represented By: Douglas F. Halijan
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Coleman
Represented By: Douglas F. Halijan
Represented By: Charles Silvestri Higgins
Represented By: William David Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StreetDivvy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?