Friends of Georges, Inc. v. Steven J. Mulroy, in his official and individual capacity
Plaintiff: Friends of Georges, Inc.
Defendant: Bill Lee, Jonathan Skrmetti and District Attorney Steven J. Mulroy
Intervenor Defendant: State of Tennessee
Amicus Curiae: Actor's Equity Association
Case Number: 2:2023cv02163
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Thomas L Parker
Referring Judge: Tu M Pham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2023 Filing 83 Letter from concerned citizens (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 letter, #3 letter) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 24, 2023 Filing 82 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 23, 2023 before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Court Reporter Catherine J. Phillips, Telephone number 901-495-1535. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 5/30/2023. Redaction Request due 6/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2023. (cjp)
May 24, 2023 Filing 81 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 22, 2023 before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Court Reporter Catherine J. Phillips, Telephone number 901-495-1535. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 5/30/2023. Redaction Request due 6/14/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2023. (cjp)
May 23, 2023 Filing 80 EXHIBIT & WITNESS LIST. (smm)
May 23, 2023 Filing 79 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Bench Trial/Preliminary Injunction Hearing (DAY 2) was held on 5/23/2023. Brice Timmons, Melissa Stewart, Jacob W. Brown and Sara K. McKinney appeared for the plaintiff(s). James R. Newsom, III, J. Matthew Rice, Robert W. Wilson, Jessica L. Indingaro and Alicia Gilbert appeared for the defense. The court heard oral argument. The parties shall submit their Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law by Friday, May 26, 2023. At the conclusion of the hearing, the court took the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (Court Reporter Catherine Phillips.) (smm)
May 22, 2023 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Bench Trial/Preliminary Injunction Hearing (DAY 1) was held on 5/22/2023. Brice Timmons, Melissa Stewart, Jacob W. Brown and Sara K. McKinney appeared for the plaintiff(s). James R. Newsom, III, J. Matthew Rice, Robert W. Wilson, Jessica L. Indingaro and Alicia Gilbert appeared for the defense. The parties made a joint oral motion for the court to call for Rule 615. The court granted the motion and ordered all witnesses excluded from court until called. Plaintiff's exhibits 1 and 2 marked and admitted to the court. Opening statements given by counsel for all parties. Plaintiff's proof/sworn witnesses: Vanessa Rodley; Clayton Klutts. Plaintiff rests. Defense Rests. Oral argument heard in part. Bench Trial/Preliminary Injunction Hearing to resume tomorrow, Tuesday, May 23, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (smm)
May 22, 2023 Filing 77 Letters from concerned citizens (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 letter, #3 letter, #4 letter, #5 letter, #6 letter, #7 letter, #8 letter, #9 letter) (jae)
May 19, 2023 Filing 76 Letters from concerned citizens (Attachments: #1 letter, #2 letter, #3 letter, #4 letter, #5 letter, #6 letter, #7 letter, #8 letter, #9 letter, #10 letter, #11 letter, #12 letter, #13 letter, #14 letter, #15 letter) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 19, 2023 Filing 75 Letter from Jane Ziesmer Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 19, 2023 Filing 74 Letter from Mary Singer (Attachments: #1 envelope) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 18, 2023 Filing 73 Letter from Lu Ann Adler (Attachments: #1 envelope) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 18, 2023 Filing 72 Letter from Jo Ann Barone (Attachments: #1 envelope) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 SCHEDULING ORDER AND EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/16/2023. (jdgc)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/16/2023. (jdgc)
May 15, 2023 Filing 71 Letter from concerned citizen, Luann Nicosia (Attachments: #1 envelope) Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jae)
May 15, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Katherine McKinney on behalf of Friends of Georges, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(McKinney, Sara)
May 12, 2023 Filing 67 JUDGMENT AS TO THE STATE OF TENNESSEE ONLY. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/12/2023. (jdgc)
May 12, 2023 Filing 66 JUDGMENT AS TO BILL LEE, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AS GOVERNOR OF TENNESSEE, JONATHAN SKRMETTI, IN HIS OFFICIAL AND INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY AS ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TENNESSEE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/12/2023. (jdgc)
May 12, 2023 Filing 65 TRIAL BRIEF Surreply of Steven J. Mulroy in His Official Capacity by Steven J. Mulroy. (Newsom, James)
May 12, 2023 Filing 64 RESPONSE in Support re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss of Steven J. Mulroy in His Official Capacity) filed by Steven J. Mulroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James R. Newsom III in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss of Steven J. Mulroy in His Official Capacity, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of James R. Newsom III (Excerpts from Plaintiff's Responses to Requests for Admissions), #3 Exhibit C to Declaration of James R. Newsom III (Excerpts from Transcript of Plaintiff's Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) Deposition))(Newsom, James)
May 12, 2023 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Pretrial Conference was held on 5/12/2023. Brice Timmons, Jacob W. Brown, Melissa Stewart and Sarah McKinney appeared for the plaintiff(s). James Newsom, III, James M. Rice, Robert Wilson, and Jessica Indingaro appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. The court extended the Temporary Restraining Order to June 2, 2023. Defendants Moton to Be Excused from Attendance at Trial #44 was granted. Written Order to be entered. The Motion to Dismiss #41 was taken under advisement. The parties shall submit their Findings of Fact and Conclusion of Law Brief by Friday, May 26, 2023. Bench Trial/Preliminary Injunction Hearing will go forward as scheduled on Monday, May 22, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
May 5, 2023 Filing 62 NOTICE by Friends of Georges, Inc. re #58 Trial Brief, Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Trial Brief (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix to Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Trial Brief)(Timmons, Brice)
May 5, 2023 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Timmons, Brice)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS PARTIES. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 5/2/2023. (jdgc)
May 2, 2023 Filing 59 OOPS document not attached, order refiled under ECF No. 60 with document attached. Modified on 5/2/2023 (jdgc).
April 28, 2023 Filing 58 TRIAL BRIEF of Steven J. Mulroy in His Official Capacity by Steven J. Mulroy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James R. Newsom III in Support of Brief of Steven J. Mulroy in His Official Capacity, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James R. Newsom III in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Newsom, James)
April 28, 2023 Filing 57 TRIAL BRIEF in Support of Preliminary Injunction by Steven J. Mulroy. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Indingaro, Jessica)
April 25, 2023 Filing 56 NOTICE by Friends of Georges, Inc. re (45 in 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Brown, Jacob)
April 25, 2023 Filing 55 SETTING LETTER: A Pretrial Conference has been set for Friday, 5/12/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 5:00 PM on 5/5/2023. (jrs)
April 25, 2023 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Status Conference held via Microsoft Teams video conferencing on 4/25/2023. Brice Timmons, Jacob Webster Brown, Melissa Stewart, and Samuel Morris (Amicus) appeared for the plaintiff. James Newsom, III, Matthew Rice, Steven James Griffin, and Jessica Indingaro appeared for the defendants. The Court discussed the important distinctions between Rule 21 and Rule 41 in the light of plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #45 #46 . Discussion ensued as to the ramifications of individual/official capacities and a procedural path forward. Plaintiff granted additional time to refine stipulations as they relate to Steven Mulroy in both individual and official capacities. The Court granted a phased discovery to allow for parties schedules. The Court set a Pretrial Conference on Friday, May 12, 2023 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 2 (11th floor). A Proposed Joint Pretrial Order will be due by 5:00 PM on Friday, May 5, 2023. Plaintiff's supplemental response to #41 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction will be due by 5:00 PM on Friday, May 5, 2023. (Court Reporter: Catherine Phillips) (jrs)
April 21, 2023 Filing 53 Notice of Correction to (26 in 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp) Notice of Appearance . Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Brown, Jacob)
April 21, 2023 Filing 52 SETTING LETTER: Status Conference set for Tuesday, 4/25/2023 at 3:30 PM before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts.gov for any questions. (jam)
April 21, 2023 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Webster Brown on behalf of Friends of Georges, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Brown, Jacob)
April 20, 2023 Filing 50 Defendant DA Steven J. Mulroy's ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint (responsive to Dkt No 32-1 on Consolidated Case) by Steven J. Mulroy.(Indingaro, Jessica)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/20/2023. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(jdgc)
April 20, 2023 Filing 48 Consent MOTION to Intervene (proposed order submitted) by State of Tennessee. (Newsom, James)
April 19, 2023 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Motion re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Proposed Order Submitted filed by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Stewart, Melissa)
April 19, 2023 Filing 46 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Friends of Georges, Inc. (Timmons, Brice)
April 19, 2023 Filing 45 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Friends of Georges, Inc. (Timmons, Brice)
April 19, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION Motion to Be Excused from Attendance at Trial proposed order submitted by Steven J. Mulroy. (Indingaro, Jessica)
April 19, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lyn Indingaro on behalf of Steven J. Mulroy Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Indingaro, Jessica)
April 18, 2023 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order Submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4124790) by Actor's Equity Association. (Shaw, Megan)
April 18, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bill Lee, Steven J. Mulroy, Jonathan Skrmetti, State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant State of Tennessee, Governor Bill Lee in his Official and Individual Capacities, Jonathan Skrmetti Tennessee Attorney General in his Official and Individual Capacities, and District Attorney Steven J. Mulroy in his Official Capacity, #2 Affidavit Declaration of James R. Newsom III in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of James R. Newsom III in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Newsom, James)
April 18, 2023 Filing 40 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4123514) filed by Friends of Georges, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the attorney seeking pro hac vice admission is required to file motion seeking admission pro hac vice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
April 17, 2023 Filing 39 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Samuel Morris on behalf of Actor's Equity Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation of Samuel Morris, #2 Exhibit BRIEF, #3 Memorandum Memorandum in Support)(Morris, Samuel)
April 17, 2023 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-4123514) by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing SDNY, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NYSCAppellate)(Morris, Samuel)
April 17, 2023 Filing 37 PLEASE SEE DE #39 FOR CORRECTED DOCUMENT. Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Samuel Morris on behalf of Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief, #2 Memorandum Memorandum in support)(Morris, Samuel) Modified docket text on 4/17/2023 (cdi).
April 17, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by James Matthew Rice on behalf of Bill Lee, Steven J. Mulroy, Jonathan Skrmetti, State of Tennessee (Rice, James)
April 14, 2023 Filing 35 TRIAL BRIEF by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Legislative Transcript, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of Mystie-Elizabeth Watson, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of Vanessa Rodley, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Declaration of Clayton Klutts)(Stewart, Melissa)
April 12, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3-30-23 before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Court Reporter Candace S. Covey, Telephone number 901-495-1216. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in this matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript, and twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Request for Redaction. Redaction is the responsibility of the attorneys and pro se litigants who attended the hearing to which the transcription applies. Each party is responsible for reviewing and requesting redaction of testimony of witnesses that were called for the party and for that party's own statements. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal.. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/17/2023. Redaction Request due 5/3/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2023. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-02163-TLP-tmp, 2:23-cv-02176-TLP-tmp(Covey, Candace) (Main Document 34 replaced on 4/12/2023) (cbs).
April 7, 2023 Filing 33 Letter(s) from concerned citizens (Attachments: #1 envelope, #2 2nd letter, #3 2nd envelope) (jae)
April 6, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE of filing documents from case 23-2176 (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 Exhibit to complaint, #3 Notice of summons and civil cover sheet, #4 Summons, #5 civil cover sheet, #6 Motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order, #7 Summons issued, #8 notice of appearance, #9 Notices of declarations, #10 declaration of Melissa Stewart, #11 declaration of Mystie-Elizabthe Watson, #12 declaration of Vanessa Rodley, #13 Notice of amended declaration, #14 declaration of Melissa Stewart, #15 declaration of Mystie-Elizabeth Watson, #16 declaration of Vanessa Rodley, #17 summons returned executed as to Steven Mulroy, #18 Order granting temporary restraining order, #19 Notice of appearance by James R. Newsom, III, #20 Notice of appearance of Robert Wilson, #21 Notice of Appearance by Steven Griffin, #22 Notice of setting, #23 Scheduling Order, #24 Order extending temporary restraining order and consolidating cases)(jae)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/6/2023. (Parker, Thomas)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 4/6/2023. (jdgc)
April 5, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE SETTING TRIAL/HEARING ON PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: A Trial/Preliminary Injunction Hearing has been set for Monday, May 22, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
April 5, 2023 Filing 28 A Status Conference, to discuss scheduling, was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 4/5/2023. Brice M. Timmons, Melissa Stewart and Craig A. Edington appeared for the plaintiff(s). James R. Newsom, III, Steven J. Griffin and Robert W. Wilson appeared for defendant(s). Counsel for defendant(s) consents to extending the Temporary Restraining Order to Friday, May 26, 2023. Plaintiff to submit their brief by close of business on Friday, April 14, 2023. Defendant(s) to file their response by close of business on Friday, April 28, 2023. Plaintiff to file their sur-reply by close of business on Friday, May 5, 2023. Defendant(s) to file their sur-reply by close of business on Friday, May 12, 2023. Initial brief(s) shall not exceed 35 pages, replies and sur-replies shall not exceed 10 pages. Discovery cut-off/deadline is Friday, April 28, 2023. The court set a Preliminary Injunction Hearing/Trial for Monday, May 22, 2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. Written Order to be entered. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
April 3, 2023 Filing 27 TEXT NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): A Status Conference, to discuss scheduling, has been set for Wednesday, April 5, 2023 at 2:30 PM. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions. (smm)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 3/31/2023. (jdgc)
March 30, 2023 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: Oral Argument on the Motion(s) for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #7 and #11 was heard on 3/30/2023. Brice M. Timmons, Craig A. Edington and Melissa Stewart appeared for the plaintiff(s). James R. Newsom, III, Steven J. Griffin and Robert W. Wilson appeared for defendant(s). After hearing argument from all parties, the court took the matter under advisement and will enter a written order upon ruling. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
March 30, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by Friends of Georges, Inc. re #23 Notice (Other), Amended Notice of Declarations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEclaration of Melissa J. Stewart, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Mystie-Elizabthe Watson, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Vanessa Rodley)(Stewart, Melissa)
March 30, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Friends of Georges, Inc. Plaintiff's Notice of Declarations (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Melissa J. Stewart, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Mystie-Elizabthe Watson, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Vanessa Rodley)(Stewart, Melissa)
March 30, 2023 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to Jonathan Skrmetti. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
March 30, 2023 Filing 21 Summons Issued as to Bill Lee. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (agj)
March 30, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Stewart, Melissa)
March 29, 2023 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction as to Bill Lee and Jonathan Skrmetti, #7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Governor Bill Lee, Jonathan Skrmetti, State of Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Robert)
March 29, 2023 Filing 18 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #10 Amended Complaint filed by Friends of Georges, Inc. has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the new defendants listed on the amended complaint were not added to the case when you filed the pleading. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (agj)
March 29, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven James Griffin on behalf of State of Tennessee (Griffin, Steven)
March 29, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Wilson on behalf of State of Tennessee (Wilson, Robert)
March 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Newsom, III on behalf of All Defendants (Newsom, James)
March 29, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SETTING ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): The Court will hear oral argument on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction #11 on Thursday, March 30, 2023 at 3:30 P.M. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (smm)
March 29, 2023 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas L. Parker: A Status Conference was held via Microsoft Teams Video Conference on 3/24/2023. Craig A. Edington, Melissa Stewart and Brice M. Timmons appeared for the plaintiff(s). Jim Newsom, Robert W. Wilson and Steven J. Griffin appeared for the defendant(s). The court discussed the status of the case with the parties. Counsel for defendant(s) to file their brief by 5:30 PM on Wednesday, March 29, 2023. Counsel for plaintiff(s) to file their brief by noon on Thursday, March 30, 2023. The court will hear oral argument on Thursday, March 30, 2023 at 3:30 P.M. in Courtroom 2 - Memphis before Judge Thomas L. Parker. (Court Reporter: Candace Covey) (smm)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: (TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY): A Status Conference has been set for Tuesday, March 28, 2023 at 5:30 PM. via Microsoft Teams Video Conference before Judge Thomas L. Parker. The proceeding will be done via Microsoft Teams video conference. The Court will email the parties an invitation for the video conference prior to the proceeding.Counsel should submit any exhibits to be offered to the Judge's ECF mailbox prior to the proceeding.The public may also access the video proceeding. If the public and/or media wish to attend in the video proceeding, please click on the following link to request access information: #https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/videohearings The access information will be delivered via email to the email address from which the request originated.Parties should consult the instructions for #Joining a Meeting in Teams or #Joining a Meeting Without a Teams Account. Please email Sandra McClain at sandra_mcclain@tnwd.uscourts for any questions. (smm)
March 28, 2023 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction as to Bill Lee and Jonathan Skrmetti by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Stewart, Melissa)
March 28, 2023 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State of Tennessee, filed by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rep Todd Complaint, #2 Summons Governor Bill Lee, #3 Summons Attorney General Jonathan Skrmetti) (Stewart, Melissa)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig A Edgington on behalf of Friends of Georges, Inc. (Edgington, Craig)
March 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Stewart on behalf of Friends of Georges, Inc. (Stewart, Melissa)
March 27, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Timmons, Brice)
March 27, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to State of Tennessee. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae)
March 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae)
March 27, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae)
March 27, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae)
March 27, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Chief Magistrate Judge Tu M. Pham added. (jae)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Tennessee (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BTNWDC-4107170), filed by Friends of Georges, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rep Todd Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons State of Tennessee)(Timmons, Brice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friends of Georges, Inc. v. Steven J. Mulroy, in his official and individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Georges, Inc.
Represented By: Brice Moffatt Timmons
Represented By: Jacob Webster Brown
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Represented By: Craig A Edgington
Represented By: Melissa Stewart
Represented By: Sara Katherine McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: State of Tennessee
Represented By: James R. Newsom, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Lee
Represented By: James Matthew Rice
Represented By: James R. Newsom, III
Represented By: Robert W. Wilson
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Skrmetti
Represented By: James R. Newsom, III
Represented By: James Matthew Rice
Represented By: Robert W. Wilson
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Steven J. Mulroy
Represented By: Steven James Griffin
Represented By: Jessica Lyn Indingaro
Represented By: James R. Newsom, III
Represented By: Robert W. Wilson
Represented By: James Matthew Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Actor's Equity Association
Represented By: Megan Stater Shaw
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?