Ryans, et al v DSV Road Inc

Plaintiff: Earl Rogers Williams, Jr, Letizia Ryans and Jalissa Branch Compton
Defendant: DSV Road Inc
Intervenor Plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (tkd, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Christopher Williams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Wayne)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by DSV Road Inc.(Klawetter, Robert) Modified on 2/22/2019 (tkd, ).
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Christopher Williams.(Collins, Wayne)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letizia Ryans. DSV Road Inc served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (Arbuckle, Richard)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to DSV Road Inc. and emailed to plaintiffs' atty for service (aam, )
January 4, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (aam, )
January 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jalissa Branch Compton, Letizia Ryans, Earl Rogers Williams, Jr. (aam, )
January 4, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (aam, )
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DSV Road INC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7083579.), filed by Earl Rogers Williams, Jr, Letizia Ryans, Jalissa Branch Compton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Arbuckle, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryans, et al v DSV Road Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Rogers Williams, Jr
Represented By: Richard Kurt Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letizia Ryans
Represented By: Richard Kurt Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalissa Branch Compton
Represented By: Richard Kurt Arbuckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSV Road Inc
Represented By: Robert L Klawetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Christopher Williams
Represented By: Wayne Donald Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?