Enrique Montes d/b/a Enrique Montes Distributor v. Blackboard Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Montes doing business as Enrique Montes Distributor
Defendant: Blackboard Insurance Company, Paul Serafin and Kevin Johnson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00037
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marcia A Crone
Referring Judge: Christine L Stetson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2022 Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the #20 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Kevin Johnson and Paul Serafin be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 3/29/22. (kcv, )
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER setting various deadlines. Final Status Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. The case will be set for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial at the Final Status Conference. The parties should be prepared to try the case by this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 3/29/22. (kcv, )
March 29, 2022 Minute Entry for scheduling conference held in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 3/29/2022. Court will enter a report and recommendation on the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Kevin Johnson and Paul Serafin (Doc.#20) Court will enter a scheduling order in the case. (Courtroom Deputy S. White) (saw, )
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond)
March 25, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Blackboard Insurance Company of Election of Responsibility Under Section 542A.006 of the Texas Insurance Code (Gregory, Raymond)
March 7, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gregory, Raymond)
March 4, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Enrique Montes Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Parsons, John) Modified title on 3/7/2022 (kcv, ).
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the #14 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw the #5 Motion to Dismiss Fraud Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/23/22. (kcv, )
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing the parties to conduct a Rule 26(f) Attorney Conference by March 15, 2022. Rule 16 Case Management/Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2022 at 10:15 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 2/22/22. (kcv, )
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Blackboard Insurance Company, Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond)
February 21, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 13, Notice of Withdrawal was incorrectly filed as a motion. Counsel has been notified. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
February 21, 2022 Filing 13 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.*** Notice of Withdrawal #5 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Blackboard Insurance Company, Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin. (Gregory, Raymond) Modified title on 2/22/2022 (kcv, ).
February 16, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Enrique Montes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Parsons, John) Modified exhibit titles on 2/16/2022 (kcv, ).
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Fraud Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b) filed by Enrique Montes. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Parsons, John)
February 15, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 10, Amended Complaint contains exhibits as part of the main document and not as separate pdf attachments as required by Local Rules. Counsel has been notified. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (kcv, )
February 15, 2022 Filing 10 ***FILED IN ERROR. Please ignore.***AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Enrique Montes.(Parsons, John) Modified on 2/16/2022 (kcv, ).
February 11, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blackboard Insurance Company, Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackboard U.S. Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company for Blackboard Insurance Company. (Gregory, Raymond)
February 11, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Johnson.(Gregory, Raymond)
February 11, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Paul Serafin.(Gregory, Raymond)
February 11, 2022 Filing 6 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company.(Gregory, Raymond)
February 11, 2022 Filing 5 ***Motion terminated/withdrawn pursuant to #16 Order***MOTION to Dismiss Fraud Claims Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and 9(b) by Blackboard Insurance Company, Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2022: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (bjc, ). Modified on 2/24/2022 (kcv, ).
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE referring this case to Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 2/7/22. (kcv, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal to #2 Complaint by Blackboard Insurance Company.(kcv, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 2 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Notice of Removal against Blackboard Insurance Company, Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin, filed by Enrique Montes.(kcv, )
February 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin, Blackboard Insurance Company from 58th District Court of Jefferson County, Texas, case number A-0209075. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8775223), filed by Kevin Johnson, Paul Serafin, Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1 - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Tab 2 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Tab 3 - Pleadings on file, #4 Exhibit Tab 4 - Executed Process, #5 Exhibit Tab 6 - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Tab 7 - List of Counsel of Record)(Gregory, Raymond) (Attachment 2 replaced with flattened image on 2/4/2022) (kcv, ).
February 4, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv, )
February 4, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv, )
February 4, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff. (kcv, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enrique Montes d/b/a Enrique Montes Distributor v. Blackboard Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Montes doing business as Enrique Montes Distributor
Represented By: John Pat Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackboard Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Serafin
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Johnson
Represented By: Raymond L Gregory, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?