BetaNet, LLC v. Adobe Systems, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff BetaNet LLC alleges that Defendants infringed U.S. Patent No. 5,222,134 and 5,103,476, both entitled "Secure System for Activating Personal Computer Software at Remote Locations."

Plaintiff: BetaNet, LLC
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, Autodesk, Inc.,, CARBONITE, INC., Corel Corp., Eastman Kodak Co., International Business Machines Corp., Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Oracle Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Siemens Corp., Sony Creative Software, Inc. and Online Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv00384
Filed: December 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Charles Everingham
Referring Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, Eastman Kodak Co. terminated., granting #211 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/7/10. (mrm, )
September 2, 2010 Filing 211 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER, granting #209 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., Rosetta Stone, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/1/10. (mrm, )
August 27, 2010 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting #207 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., Siemens Corp. terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/2/10. (mrm, )
July 30, 2010 Filing 207 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice)(Stevens, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2010: #2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting #205 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff BetaNet, LLC shall have until and including July 30, 2010, to comply with the following obligations: Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3- 1 contentions and P.R. 3-2 disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/19/10. (ehs, )
July 16, 2010 Filing 205 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #203 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 7/6/2010. (ch, )
July 2, 2010 Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2)(Stevens, Scott)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/25/2010. (ch, )
June 24, 2010 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2)(Stevens, Scott)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #199 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2. Deadline is 6/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/2010. (ch, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 199 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, PR 3-1 and PR 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Unoppsed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, PR 3-1 and PR 3-2)(Stevens, Scott)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER, granting #196 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., Sony Creative Software, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, )
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER, granting #192 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., SAP America, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/9/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Filing 196 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER, granting #189 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Autodesk, Inc. filed by BetaNet, LLC.; Autodesk, Inc., terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER, granting #188 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Adobe Systems Incorporated filed by BetaNet, LLC.; Adobe Systems, Inc terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, granting #187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC.; International Business Machines Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/7/10. (mrm, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 192 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Todd Y Brandt terminated as counsel for BetaNet LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/4/2010. (ch, )
June 3, 2010 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brandt, Todd)
June 3, 2010 Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Autodesk, Inc. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 3, 2010 Filing 188 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as to Adobe Systems Incorporated by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
June 3, 2010 Filing 187 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/28/2010. (ch, )
May 27, 2010 Filing 185 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory)
May 27, 2010 Filing 184 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY. PLEASE IGNORE.***Agreed MOTION to Stay Between Plaintiff and Defendant Siemens Corp. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory) Modified on 5/27/2010 (ch, ).
May 27, 2010 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY - ATTORNEY WILL REFILE Document # 184, Agreed Motion to Stay. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER, granting #180 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., Microsoft Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/10. (mrm, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER, granting #178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., Apple, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/10. (mrm, )
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER, granting #177 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by BetaNet, LLC., McAfee, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/10. (mrm, )
May 18, 2010 Filing 180 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
May 18, 2010 Filing 178 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
May 18, 2010 Filing 177 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Extension of Time to enlarge the time within which to comply with the following obligations: Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 contentions and P.R. 3-2 disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/14/10. (ehs, )
May 12, 2010 Filing 175 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Disclosures, Protective Order, P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2)(Stevens, Scott)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Plaintiff BetaNet, LLC shall have until and including May 15, 2010, to comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/11/2010. (ch, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/7/2010. (ch, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing set for 12/2/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2011. Final Pretrial Conference 10/3/2011 before Judge David Folsom. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/7/2010. (ch, )
May 7, 2010 Filing 171 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order On Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Comply with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2)(Stevens, Scott)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER, granting #169 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines Between Plaintiff and Defendants Adobe Systems, Inc., Apple, Inc. Autodesk, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Microsoft Corp., McAffe, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Ltd., SAP America, Inc., Eastman Kodak Co., and Sony Creative filed by BetaNet, LLC. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/6/10. (mrm, )
May 5, 2010 Filing 169 Agreed MOTION to Stay Between Plaintiff and Defendants Adobe Systems, Inc., Apple, Inc. Autodesk, Inc., International Business Machines Corp., Microsoft Corp., McAffe, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Ltd., SAP America, Inc., Eastman Kodak Co., and Sony Creative Software, Inc. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevens, Scott)
May 5, 2010 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Y Brandt on behalf of BetaNet, LLC (Brandt, Todd)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER, granting #163 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as Stipulated as to Carbonite, Inc. filed by BetaNet, LLC., CARBONITE, INC. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #162 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by BetaNet, LLC, Online Holdings, LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, )
April 28, 2010 Filing 179 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 4/28/2010. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml)
April 27, 2010 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Sony Creative Software, Inc. (Gunter, Debra)
April 27, 2010 Filing 164 NOTICE of Settlement by International Business Machines Corp. (Albritton, Eric)
April 27, 2010 Filing 163 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice as Stipulated as to Carbonite, Inc. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
April 27, 2010 Filing 162 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BetaNet, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
April 26, 2010 Filing 161 AMENDED REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Stevens, Scott) Modified on 4/27/2010 (sm, ).
April 26, 2010 Filing 160 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Docket Control Order, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Stevens, Scott)
April 15, 2010 Filing 159 NOTICE by Corel Corp. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gillam, Harry)
April 15, 2010 Filing 158 Betanet, LLC's Answer to IBM Corporation's Counterclaims ANSWER to #139 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Love, Gregory)
April 8, 2010 Filing 157 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Carbonite, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #135 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Love, Gregory)
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/6/10. (mrm, )
April 5, 2010 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Rockwell Automation, Inc. by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion to dismiss Rockwell Automation, Inc.)(Hintz, John)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO COREL CORPORATION; re #153 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Corel Corp; Corel Corp. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/2/10. (mrm, )
April 1, 2010 Filing 153 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Corel Corp. by Corel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barkan, David)
March 26, 2010 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J. Heverin on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Heverin, Timothy)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Notice of Scheduling Conference, Proposed Deadlines for Docket Control Order, and Discovery Order. Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2010 11:25 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/25/2010. (ch, )
March 25, 2010 Filing 150 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 4/28/2010 11:25 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #143 Motion to Dismiss dft Oracle Corporation with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/2010. (sm, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER re #142 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by BetaNet, LLC, dismissing dft Arial Software with prejudice, Arial Software LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/2010. (sm, )
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Dismiss dft Intuit with prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/2010. (sm, )
March 24, 2010 Filing 146 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corp. (Colgan, John)
March 24, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Robert Colgan on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Colgan, John)
March 24, 2010 Filing 144 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Intuit, Inc. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Intuit, Inc. terminated per order of dismissal.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/24/2010. (sm, )
March 23, 2010 Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss Oracle Corporation by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
March 23, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BetaNet, LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2010: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 23, 2010 Filing 141 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Intuit, Inc. by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
March 22, 2010 Filing 140 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel F. Perez)(Love, Gregory)
March 22, 2010 Filing 139 IBM Corporation ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint IBM Corporation Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by International Business Machines Corp..(Albritton, Eric)
March 19, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Oracle Corp. (Gardner, Allen)
March 16, 2010 Filing 137 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CARBONITE, INC. (Smith, Melissa)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #134 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern Distrist of California Responses due by 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/16/2010. (ch, )
March 15, 2010 Filing 135 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by CARBONITE, INC..(Smith, Melissa)
March 12, 2010 Filing 134 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 Response in Support of Motion, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue to Northern District of California by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Love, Gregory)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages to Reply in Support of the Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corp deadline is extended to 3/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 3/11/2010. (ch, )
March 11, 2010 Filing 131 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Rosetta Stone, Ltd.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #104 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 11, 2010 Filing 130 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Eastman Kodak Company's Counterclaims ANSWER to #101 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 11, 2010 Filing 129 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Oracle Corp.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #98 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 9, 2010 Filing 128 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CARBONITE, INC..( Smith, Melissa)
March 9, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CARBONITE, INC. to 3/15/2010. 53 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 9, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CARBONITE, INC. to 3/15/2010. 53 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 8, 2010 Filing 127 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
March 8, 2010 Filing 126 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Hunsaker, Kelly)
March 8, 2010 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly C Hunsaker on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
March 8, 2010 Filing 124 NOTICE by International Business Machines Corp. re #121 Response in Support of Motion, IBM'S Notice of Joinder of Defendants Reply Brief in Support of their Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Albritton, Eric)
March 8, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #121 Response in Support of Motion. Clerk has modified this entry to reflect that it is a reply to response to motion. Since there were filings from other parties linking to this document, the clerk modified entry instead of having party refile. (sm, )
March 8, 2010 NOTICE FROM CLERK re 121 Response in Support of Motion. Clerk has modified this entry to reflect that it is a reply to response to motion. Since there were filings from other parties linking to this document, the clerk modified entry instead of having party refile. (sm, )
March 5, 2010 Filing 123 NOTICE by Rockwell Automation, Inc., Siemens Corp., Sony Creative Software, Inc. re #121 Response in Support of Motion, Notice of Joinder in Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Smith, Melissa)
March 5, 2010 Filing 122 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California and Reply Brief in Support of the Joint Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Corel Corp., Autodesk, Inc.,, Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, CARBONITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Cordell, Ruffin)
March 5, 2010 Filing 121 REPLY in support TO RESPONSE re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Corel Corp., Autodesk, Inc.,, Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, CARBONITE, INC.. (Cordell, Ruffin) Modified on 3/8/2010 (sm, ).
March 5, 2010 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of The Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Corel Corp., Autodesk, Inc.,, Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, CARBONITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cordell, Ruffin)
March 5, 2010 Filing 119 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Microsoft Corporation's Counterclaims ANSWER to #84 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 118 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Intuit Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #76 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 117 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Corel Corp.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #78 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 116 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Autodesk, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #91 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 115 Betanet, LLC's Answer to Adobe Systems, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #94 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 114 Betanet, LLC's to SAP America, Inc.'s Counterclaims ANSWER to #80 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by BetaNet, LLC.(Stevens, Scott)
March 5, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE by Eastman Kodak Co. re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Statement of Non-Opposition) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
March 5, 2010 Filing 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by International Business Machines Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 3, 2010 Filing 111 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Autodesk, Inc., identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Associates, Inc. for Autodesk, Inc.,. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 26, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of BetaNet, LLC (Dotson, Darrell)
February 26, 2010 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of BetaNet, LLC (Nelson, Kyle)
February 26, 2010 Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of BetaNet, LLC (Stevens, Scott)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #100 Response in Opposition Responses due by 3/5/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/26/2010. (ch, )
February 25, 2010 Filing 106 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #100 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Transfer Venue by International Business Machines Corp., Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Siemens Corp., Sony Creative Software, Inc., Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, Autodesk, Inc.,, CARBONITE, INC., Corel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 24, 2010 Filing 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rosetta Stone, Inc. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 24, 2010 Filing 104 Rosetta Stone Ltd.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Rosetta Stone, Inc..(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 24, 2010 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly C Hunsaker on behalf of Rosetta Stone, Inc. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 23, 2010 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Eastman Kodak Co. identifying Corporate Parent None for Eastman Kodak Co.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 23, 2010 Filing 101 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Eastman Kodak Co..(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 18, 2010 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Daniel F. Perez, #2 Exhibit 1 to Perez Declaration)(Love, Gregory)
February 18, 2010 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Oracle Corp. identifying Corporate Parent None for Oracle Corp.. (Jones, Michael)
February 18, 2010 Filing 98 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Oracle Corp..(Jones, Michael)
February 17, 2010 Filing 97 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Phillip Love on behalf of BetaNet, LLC (Love, Gregory)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Responses due by 2/18/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 2/11/2010. (ch, )
February 10, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE of Disclosure by Adobe Systems, Inc (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 94 Adobe Systtems Incorporated's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint Affirmative defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Adobe Systems, Inc.(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly C Hunsaker on behalf of Adobe Systems, Inc (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE of Disclosure by Autodesk, Inc., (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 91 Autodesk, Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Autodesk, Inc.,.(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly C Hunsaker on behalf of Autodesk, Inc., (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 10, 2010 Filing 89 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Creative Software, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sony Corporation, Corporate Parent Sony Corporation of America for Sony Creative Software, Inc.. (Lavenue, Lionel)
February 10, 2010 Filing 88 Sony Creative Software Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of BetaNet LLC by Sony Creative Software, Inc..(Lavenue, Lionel)
February 9, 2010 Filing 87 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Polaphat Veravanich for Corel Corp.(APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5187. (ch, )
February 9, 2010 Filing 86 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brett J Williamson for Corel Corp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5187. (ch, )
February 9, 2010 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corp. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 9, 2010 Filing 84 Microsoft Corporation's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of BetaNet LLC, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Microsoft Corp..(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 9, 2010 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly C Hunsaker on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 9, 2010 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Killough on behalf of Microsoft Corp. (Killough, David)
February 9, 2010 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SAP America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SAP AG for SAP America, Inc.. (Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 9, 2010 Filing 80 SAP America, Inc's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of BetaNet LLC, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by SAP America, Inc..(Hunsaker, Kelly)
February 9, 2010 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corel Corp. identifying Corporate Parent None for Corel Corp.. (Gillam, Harry)
February 9, 2010 Filing 78 Defendant Corel Corp.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of BetaNet LLC, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against BetaNet, LLC by Corel Corp..(Gillam, Harry)
February 9, 2010 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intuit, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Intuit, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2010 Filing 76 Defendant Intuit Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM S against BetaNet, LLC by Intuit, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 9, 2010 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
February 8, 2010 Filing 74 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Siemens Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Siemens AG, Corporate Parent Siemens USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Siemens Beteiligungen USA GmbH for Siemens Corp.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 73 Defendant Siemens Corporation's ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff BetaNet, LLC by Siemens Corp..(Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Siemens Corp. (Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 71 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. CARBONITE, INC. served on 12/31/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/21/2010. (ehs, )
February 8, 2010 Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 69 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Corel Corp. served on 1/12/2010 by CM RRR, answer due 2/9/2010. (ehs, )
February 8, 2010 Filing 68 Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint of Plaintiff BetaNet, LLC by Rockwell Automation, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 8, 2010 Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 5, 2010 Filing 66 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Bauer for Oracle Corp.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-20997) (ehs, )
February 5, 2010 Filing 65 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ellen M Padilla for Oracle Corp.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-20997) (ehs, )
February 5, 2010 Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Nelson for Oracle Corp.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-20997)(ehs, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M Hintz for Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5175) (ehs, )
February 2, 2010 Filing 62 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J McCormack for Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5174) (ehs, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 61 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Eastman Kodak Co..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
February 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Eastman Kodak Co. to 2/23/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
February 1, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Eastman Kodak Co. to 2/23/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Arial Software, LLC to 3/8/2010. 60 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 29, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Arial Software, LLC to 3/8/2010. 60 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 60 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Arial Software, LLC.( Mercado, Teresita)
January 28, 2010 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ronald L Sigworth for Eastman Kodak Co.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5170) (ehs, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey D Sanok for Eastman Kodak Co.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5170) (ehs, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 57 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey D Ahdoot for Eastman Kodak Co.. 9APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5170) (ehs, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 56 NOTICE OF JOINDER by International Business Machines Corp. re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 1/27/2010 (sm, ).
January 26, 2010 Filing 55 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Teresita T Mercado for Arial Software, LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5161 (ch, )
January 26, 2010 Filing 54 NOTICE by Rockwell Automation, Inc., Siemens Corp., Sony Creative Software, Inc. re #53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California Notice of Joinder in Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Smith, Melissa)
January 26, 2010 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Change Venue Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California by Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, Autodesk, Inc.,, CARBONITE, INC., Corel Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Ruffin B. Cordell, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Cordell, Ruffin)
January 26, 2010 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B Cordell on behalf of Intuit, Inc., Microsoft Corp., McAfee, Inc., Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Adobe Systems, Inc, Apple, Inc., Arial Software, LLC, Autodesk, Inc.,, CARBONITE, INC., Corel Corp. (Cordell, Ruffin)
January 25, 2010 Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelly C Hunsaker for SAP America, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-1-20822) (ehs, )
January 13, 2010 Filing 50 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Denise L McKenzie for Intuit, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5134) (ehs, )
January 13, 2010 Filing 49 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael C Lee for Intuit, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1-5134) (ehs, )
January 13, 2010 Filing 48 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Spencer W Ririe for Intuit, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5134. (ch, )
January 13, 2010 Filing 47 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward G Poplawski for Intuit, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-1-5134. (ch, )
January 12, 2010 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lionel Marks Lavenue on behalf of Sony Creative Software, Inc. (Lavenue, Lionel)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Sony deadline is extended to 2/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/11/2010. (ch, )
January 11, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Creative Software, Inc. to 2/10/2010. (ch, )
January 8, 2010 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Intuit, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
January 8, 2010 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by Sony Creative Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
January 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Oracle Corp. to 2/18/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 8, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Oracle Corp. to 2/18/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 7, 2010 Filing 42 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Oracle Corp..( Jones, Michael)
January 7, 2010 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intuit, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
January 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intuit, Inc. to 2/9/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 7, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intuit, Inc. to 2/9/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Eastman Kodak Co..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 6, 2010 Filing 39 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Autodesk, Inc.,.( Healey, David)
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corp. to 2/9/2010; SAP America, Inc. to 2/9/2010; Corel Corp. to 2/9/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Eastman Kodak Co. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Microsoft Corp. to 2/9/2010; SAP America, Inc. to 2/9/2010; Corel Corp. to 2/9/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rockwell Automation, Inc. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rockwell Automation, Inc. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Eastman Kodak Co. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Autodesk, Inc., to 2/10/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 6, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Autodesk, Inc., to 2/10/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 5, 2010 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corp..( Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2010 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Corel Corp..( Healey, David)
January 5, 2010 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re SAP America, Inc..( Healey, David)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Apple Inc. deadline is extended to 3/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 1/5/2010. (ch, )
January 5, 2010 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rockwell Automation, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2010 Filing 33 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rosetta Stone, Inc..( Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2010 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Adobe Systems, Inc.(Healey, David)
January 5, 2010 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Siemens Corp..( Smith, Melissa)
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Siemens Corp. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adobe Systems, Inc to 2/10/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Adobe Systems, Inc to 2/10/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rosetta Stone, Inc. to 2/24/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rosetta Stone, Inc. to 2/24/2010. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
January 5, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple, Inc. to 3/8/2010. (ch, )
January 5, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Siemens Corp. to 2/8/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Sony Creative Software, Inc. served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Siemens Corp. served on 12/18/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/8/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. SAP America, Inc. served on 12/18/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/8/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Rosetta Stone, Inc. served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Rockwell Automation, Inc. served on 12/18/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/8/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Microsoft Corp. served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Adobe Systems, Inc served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Autodesk, Inc., served on 12/21/2009 byCM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Arial Software, LLC served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Apple, Inc. served on 12/18/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/8/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Intuit, Inc. served on 12/21/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 1/11/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. International Business Machines Corp. served on 12/18/2009 by CM RRR, answer due 3/8/2010. (ehs, )
January 4, 2010 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by BetaNet, LLC. Eastman Kodak Co. served on 12/18/2009 by Cm RRR, answer due 1/8/2010. (ehs, )
December 30, 2009 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 30, 2009 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
December 28, 2009 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Corel Corp.. (ehs, )
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International Business Machines Corp deadline is extended to 3/8/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 12/28/09. (ch, )
December 28, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for International Business Machines Corp. to 3/8/2010. (ch, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answser or Otherwise Respond by International Business Machines Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 22, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Albritton, Eric)
December 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/18/09. (ch, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Online Holdings, LLC, Oracle Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Rosetta Stone, Inc., SAP America, Inc., Siemens Corp., Sony Creative Software, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Oracle Corp, #2 Rockwell Automation, #3 Rosetta Stone, #4 SAP America Inc, #5 Siemens Corp, #6 Sony Creative Software Inc)(ehs, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Corel Corp., (Attachments: #1 Eastman Kodak Co, #2 International Business Machines Corp, #3 Intuit Inc, #4 McAfee Inc, #5 Microsoft Corp)(ch, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Adobe Systems, Inc, (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc, #2 Arial Software LLC, #3 Autodesk Inc, #4 Carbonite Inc)(ch, )
December 15, 2009 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 14, 2009 Filing 6 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
December 14, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corp., (Attachments: #1 Online Holdings LLC, #2 Oracle Corp, #3 Rockwell Automation Inc, #4 Rosetta Stone Inc, #5 SAP America Inc, #6 Siemens Corp, #7 Sony Creative Software Inc)(ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Adobe Systems, Inc, (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc, #2 Arial Software LLC, #3 Autodesk Inc, #4 Carbonite Inc., #5 Corel Corp, #6 Eastman Kodak Co, #7 International Business Machines Corp., #8 Intuit Inc, #9 McAfee Inc)(ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to BetaNet, LLC (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 12/14/09. (ch, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002278185.), filed by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 14, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002278185.), filed by BetaNet, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)
December 14, 2009 Case Assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BetaNet, LLC v. Adobe Systems, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BetaNet, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Phillip Love
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Darrell Glyn Dotson
Represented By: Kyle Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Represented By: Todd Y Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc
Represented By: Danielle J Healey
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arial Software, LLC
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Teresita T Mercado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autodesk, Inc.,
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARBONITE, INC.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corel Corp.
Represented By: Brett J Williamson
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Polaphat Veravanich
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Kodak Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Jeffrey Ahdoot
Represented By: Jeffrey D Sanok
Represented By: Ronald Lee Sigworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Heverin
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: John Robert Colgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intuit, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Lee
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Represented By: Spencer W Ririe
Represented By: Denise L McKenzie
Represented By: Edward G Poplawski
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corp.
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: David E Killough
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McAfee, Inc.
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oracle Corp.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: David Aaron Nelson
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Ellen M Padilla
Represented By: Jennifer A Bauer
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Represented By: John M Hintz
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Thomas J McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosetta Stone, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAP America, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly C Hunsaker
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siemens Corp.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Creative Software, Inc.
Represented By: Lionel Marks Lavenue
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Online Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ruffin B Cordell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?