MOSAID Technologies Incorporated v. Dell, Inc. et al Featured Case

MOSAID Technologies, a Canadian company claiming to hold 6 wireless technology-related (a/k/a 'WiFi') patents, is suing dozens of technology defendants, claiming that their use, manufacturing and sale of their hardware is patent infringement.

Plaintiff: MOSAID Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Dell, Inc., Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., Datalogic S.p.A., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Venture Research, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Sychip, Inc., Wistron Corporation, Wistron LLC, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron NeWeb Corporation, ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Digi International Inc., Intel Corporation, Atheros Communications, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Realtek Semiconductor, Ralink Technology Corporation and CSR plc
Case Number: 2:2011cv00179
Filed: March 16, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2013 Filing 618 FINAL JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice all claims between third party defendants Wasp and Unitech, last remaining parties. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/5/2013. (sm, )
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER granting 616 Agreed Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/5/2013. (sm, )
November 1, 2013 Filing 616 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Unitech America Inc, Unitech America, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.. Responses due by 11/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER granting 613 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Extension of Mediation Deadline filed by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Unitech America, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. The new deadline for mediation is NOVEMBER 1, 2013 and for dispositive motions is NOVEMBER 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/18/13. (bas, )
October 17, 2013 Filing 614 NOTICE by Intel Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gillam, Harry)
October 17, 2013 Filing 613 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Extension of Mediation Deadline by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Unitech America, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burg, Bryan)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER granting 611 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. is terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/11/13. (bas, )
October 8, 2013 Filing 611 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER granting 609 Motion to Stay. The new deadline for the stay between Mosaid and Marvell is OCTOBER 4, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/23/13. (bas, )
September 20, 2013 Filing 609 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings with Marvell by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER granting 607 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The new deadline for mediation is OCTOBER 18, 2013, and the new deaadline for dispositive motions is OCTOBER 31, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/19/13. (bas, )
September 19, 2013 Filing 607 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions and Extension of Mediation Deadline by Unitech America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burg, Bryan)
September 10, 2013 Filing 606 NOTICE by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Unitech America Inc, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. of Mediator Selection (Burg, Bryan)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting 583 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/22/13. (bas, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER granting 573 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) filed by Atheros Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/21/13. (bas, )
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting 602 Motion to Stay. The stay is in effect until SEPTEMBER 20, 2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/21/13. (bas, )
August 20, 2013 Filing 602 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF MOSAID TECHNOLOGIES INC. AND DEFENDANT MARVELL SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 13, 2013 Filing 601 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. in Compliance with P.R. 3-7 (Tindel, Andy)
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 600 ORDER granting 599 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend the Scheduling and Discovery Order regarding deadline to disclose willfulness opinions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/9/13. (bas, )
August 9, 2013 Filing 599 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting 584 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Ralink Technology Corporation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/7/13. (bas, )
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER granting 596 Motion to Amend. The new deadline is SEPTEMBER 6, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/7/13. (bas, )
August 6, 2013 Filing 596 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting 592 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Attorney David Henry Dolkas; Daniel R Foster; Nitin Gambhir; Harry Lee Gillam, Jr; Matthew Gryzlo; J Thad Heartfield; M. Dru Montgomery; Fay E Morisseau; Darryl John Ong; Seungtaik Michael Song; Joshua Reed Thane; Cary Chien and Jennifer Haltom Doan terminated., Atheros Communications, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc. and Atheros Communications, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/2/13. (bas, )
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting 593 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Attorney Harry Lee Gillam, Jr and Bryan Haynes terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/2/13. (bas, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 593 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 31, 2013 Filing 592 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 29, 2013 Filing 591 NOTICE by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. Notice of Compliance (Johnson, Kevin)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 590 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/29/13. (bas, )
July 26, 2013 Filing 589 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE OF EXPERT REPORTS (Stevenson, Theodore)
July 22, 2013 Filing 588 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 573 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEAL filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 587 ORDER granting 586 Motion to Stay (Defendant Atheros Communications, Inc.). Stayed up to and included AUGUST 16, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/22/13. (bas, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 586 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS AS BETWEEN PLAINTIFF MOSAID TECHNOLOGIES INC. AND DEFENDANT ATHEROS COMMUNICATIONS, INC. by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 12, 2013 Filing 585 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated re 584 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 12, 2013 Filing 584 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 12, 2013 Filing 583 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 582 ORDER granting 576 Motion to Dismiss Canon Inc. and Canon U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/10/13. (bas, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting 577 Motion to Dismiss Lexmark International, Inc.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/10/13. (bas, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 580 RESPONSE to 573 Motion to Withdraw,,,, 574 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT MARVELL SEMICONDUCTOR, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO ATHEROS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANT ATHEROS' SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO PRODUCE INVENTORS/CONSULTANTS FOR DEPOSITION by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Theodore Stevenson, III, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting 575 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, dismissing Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., and Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/9/13. (bas, )
July 8, 2013 Filing 578 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 547 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Lynch Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Tindel, Andy)
July 8, 2013 Filing 577 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 8, 2013 Filing 576 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 5, 2013 Filing 575 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 5, 2013 Filing 574 RESPONSE in Opposition re 573 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALUnopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEAL filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Kevin)
July 3, 2013 Filing 573 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
July 2, 2013 Filing 572 NOTICE by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. re 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) (Notice of Joinder) (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Baily)(Tindel, Andy)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting 569 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/28/13. (bas, )
June 28, 2013 Filing 570 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 547 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 27, 2013 Filing 569 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 25, 2013 Filing 568 SEALED MOTION (Atheros' Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Inventors/Consultants for Deposition; Alternatively, for a Jury Instruction Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Produce Relevant Evidence) by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Ong Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Ong Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Ong Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Ong Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Ong Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 5 to Ong Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 6 Ong Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 7 to Ong Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 8 to Ong Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 9 to Ong Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 10 to Ong Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 11 to Ong Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 12 to Ong Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 13 to Ong Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 14 to Ong Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 15 to Ong Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 16 to Ong Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 17 to Ong Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 18 to Ong Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 19 to Ong Declaration)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER granting 562 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/24/13. (bas, )
June 21, 2013 Filing 566 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alice Jean Suh on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Suh, Alice)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER granting 564 Sealed Patent Motion for issuance of letters of request for international judicial assistance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/20/2013. (sm, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 564 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF LETTERS OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM GERMANY AND ISRAEL by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumaker, John)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER granting 561 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/20/2013. (sm, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 562 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by Intel Corporation, MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert)
June 19, 2013 Filing 561 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 17, 2013 Filing 560 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 547 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS (Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Amended and Supplemental Infringement Contentions) filed by Atheros Communications, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 17, 2013 Filing 559 NOTICE by Atheros Communications, Inc., Dell, Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. (Notice of Disclosure of First Amended Invalidity Contentions) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting 557 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend invalidity contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/17/2013. (sm, )
June 13, 2013 Filing 557 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Amended Invalidity Contentions) by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
June 7, 2013 Filing 556 NOTICE by Atheros Communications, Inc. (Notice of Compliance) (Doan, Jennifer)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER granting 554 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 546 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion to Sever the Claims Relating to Intel Products Responses due by 7/1/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/5/2013. (sm, )
June 4, 2013 Filing 554 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 546 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion to Sever the Claims Relating to Intel Products by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER granting 551 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Robert Tannenbaum terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/3/2013. (sm, )
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 539 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/3/2013. (sm, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 551 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Robert Tannenbaum by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 31, 2013 Filing 550 REPLY to Response to Motion re 539 MOTION for Reconsideration re 512 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER MOTION for Reconsideration re 512 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER granting 545 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling & Discovery Order rearding number of testifying experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/30/2013. (sm, )
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 5/28/2013. (ch, )
May 28, 2013 Filing 547 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Shumaker, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 24, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush: Hotline Conference held on 5/24/2013. Attys Jennifer Trillsch & John Shumaker for plaintiff, Eric Huang for dft Ralink Technology, Court directed deposition to go forward by video, depo limited to 3 hours. Hotline Order to follow (Court Reporter No recording or court reporter.) (ttm, )
May 24, 2013 Filing 546 SEALED PATENT MOTION Renewed Motion to Sever the Claims Relating to Intel Products by Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 23, 2013 Filing 545 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling and Discovery Order Regarding the Number of Testifying Experts by Atheros Communications, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 22, 2013 Filing 544 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Cook, Jason)
May 20, 2013 Filing 543 RESPONSE in Opposition re 539 MOTION for Reconsideration re 512 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER MOTION for Reconsideration re 512 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER filed by Atheros Communications Inc, CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting 541 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/20/13. (bas, )
May 17, 2013 Filing 541 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR THE ISSUNCE OF A LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM CANADA by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tannenbaum Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1-Tannenbaum, # 3 Exhibit 2-Tannenbaum, # 4 Exhibit 3-Tannenbaum, # 5 Exhibit 4-Tannenbaum, # 6 Exhibit 5-Tannenbaum, # 7 Exhibit 6-Tannenbaum, # 8 Exhibit 7-Tannenbaum, # 9 Exhibit 8-Tannenbaum, # 10 Exhibit 9-Tannenbaum, # 11 Exhibit 10-Tannenbaum, # 12 Exhibit 11-Tannenbaum, # 13 Exhibit 12-Tannenbaum, # 14 Exhibit 13-Tannenbaum, # 15 Exhibit 14-Tannenbaum, # 16 Exhibit A-Letter of Request, # 17 Exhibit Attachment A-Docs-Peleato, # 18 Exhibit Attachment B-Topics-Peleato, # 19 Exhibit Attachment C-Docs-Donnelly, # 20 Exhibit Attachment D-Topics-Donnelly, # 21 Exhibit Attachment E-Docs-Ukrintz, # 22 Exhibit Attachment F-Topics-Ukrintz, # 23 Exhibit Attachment G-Protective Order, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 13, 2013 Filing 540 STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation regarding Damages) by Atheros Communications, Inc., MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Doan, Jennifer)
May 9, 2013 Filing 539 MOTION for Reconsideration re 512 Memorandum & Opinion OBJECTIONS TO, AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF, MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 8, 2013 Filing 538 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua T Morris on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4129546. (Morris, Joshua) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2013: # 1 Sealed Document) (bsw, ).
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER granting 535 Motion to Stay as to Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA Inc.; Huawei Technologies USA Inc.; and Futurewei Technologies, Inc. up to and including JUNE 14, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/8/13. (bas, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 535 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Williams, Robert)
May 6, 2013 Filing 534 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 513 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT ATHEROS RELATING TO ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit I, # 2 Exhibit J, # 3 Exhibit K, # 4 Exhibit L)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 6, 2013 Filing 533 RESPONSE to Motion re 515 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION For the Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970 filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
May 3, 2013 Filing 532 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 513 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT ATHEROS RELATING TO ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15, # 5 Exhibit 16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18, # 8 Exhibit 19, # 9 Exhibit 20)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 2, 2013 Filing 530 Unopposed SEALED MOTION FOR THE ISSUANCE OF A LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE FROM CANADA by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Letter Request, # 3 Exhibit B to Letter Request, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Chen, # 5 Exhibit 1-Chen Decl., # 6 Exhibit 2-Chen Decl., # 7 Exhibit 3-Chen Decl., # 8 Exhibit 4-Chen Decl., # 9 Exhibit 5-Chen Decl., # 10 Exhibit 6-Chen Decl., # 11 Exhibit 7-Chen Decl., # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 2, 2013 Filing 529 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT to Main Document: 528 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document, 519 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, 521 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 2, 2013 Filing 528 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 519 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Doan, Jennifer)
May 2, 2013 Filing 527 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Esther Chen on behalf of Intel Corporation (Chen, Jennifer)
May 2, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE TO LINK TO PROPER DOCUMENTS. Document # 523, Sealed Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 2, 2013 NOTICE FROM CLERK re Notice of Deficiency re 520 Sealed Patent Document. This notice is MODIFIED to reflect that 520 was filed in error due to using the wrong event, as well as not including cert of service or authorization to seal. (Atty will be refiling 520 and filing an additional attachment to add the cert of service and certificate of authority re: #519 Response and all the attachments. (sm, )
May 2, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE TO INCLUDE PROPER LINKS. Document # 523, Sealed Additional attachment. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting 518 Motion to issue commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/2/13. (bas, )
May 2, 2013 Filing 524 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 515 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION For the Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE)(Gillam, Harry)
May 2, 2013 Filing 523 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 520 Sealed Patent Document, 521 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document,,,. (Dolkas, David) Modified on 5/2/2013 (sm, ).
May 2, 2013 Filing 522 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ivan Wang on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Wang, Ivan)
May 2, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 520 submitted . Filed using the Wrong Event and no certificate of authority to seal and cert of service. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, ) Modified on 5/2/2013 (sm, ).
May 2, 2013 Filing 521 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 519 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, (Exhibit H-Part 1 included in main document). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H-Part 2 (Exh. A), # 2 Exhibit H-Part 3 (Exh. B1), # 3 Exhibit H-Part 4 (Exh. B2), # 4 Exhibit H-Part 5 (Exh. C1), # 5 Exhibit H-Part 6 (Exh. C2), # 6 Exhibit H-Part 7 (Exh. D1), # 7 Exhibit H-Part 8 (Exh. D2), # 8 Exhibit H-Part 9 (Exh. E1), # 9 Exhibit H-Part 10 (Exh. E2 Part 1), # 10 Exhibit H-Part 11 (Exh. E2 Part 2), # 11 Exhibit H-Part 12 (Exh. F1), # 12 Exhibit I-Part 13 (Exh. F2), # 13 Exhibit H-Part 14 (Exh. G1), # 14 Exhibit H-Part 15 (Exh. G2), # 15 Exhibit H-Part 16 (Exh. H1), # 16 Exhibit H-Part 17 (Exh. H2), # 17 Exhibit I-Part 18 (Exh. I1), # 18 Exhibit I-Part 19 (Exh. I2))(Dolkas, David) Modified on 5/2/2013 (sm, ).
May 1, 2013 Filing 520 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G)(Dolkas, David) Modified on 5/2/2013 (ch, ).
May 1, 2013 Filing 519 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 513 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT ATHEROS RELATING TO ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dolkas, David)
May 1, 2013 Filing 518 Unopposed MOTION TO ISSUE A COMMISSION FOR UNITED STATES CONSULAR OFFICERS TO TAKE CORPORATE AND INDIVIDUAL DEPOSITIONS IN JAPAN PURSUANT TO ARTICLE 17 OF THE UNITED STATES - JAPAN CONSULAR CONVENTION by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 30, 2013 Filing 517 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 516 Sealed Patent Additional Attachments to Main Document, 515 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION For the Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 24-Decl., # 2 Exhibit 25-Decl., # 3 Exhibit 26-Decl., # 4 Exhibit 27-Decl., # 5 Exhibit 28-Decl., # 6 Exhibit 29-Decl., # 7 Exhibit 30-Decl., # 8 Exhibit 31-Decl., # 9 Exhibit 32-Decl., # 10 Exhibit 33-Decl., # 11 Exhibit 34-Decl., # 12 Exhibit 35-Decl., # 13 Exhibit 36-Decl., # 14 Exhibit 37-Decl., # 15 Exhibit 38-Decl., # 16 Exhibit 39-Decl., # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 30, 2013 Filing 516 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 515 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION For the Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 23-Decl.)(Gillam, Harry)
April 30, 2013 Filing 515 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION For the Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to the Hague Convention of March 18, 1970 by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Affidavit Tannenbaum Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 1-Decl., # 9 Exhibit 2-Decl., # 10 Exhibit 3-Decl., # 11 Exhibit 4-Decl., # 12 Exhibit 5-ecl., # 13 Exhibit 6-Decl., # 14 Exhibit 7-Decl., # 15 Exhibit 8-Decl., # 16 Exhibit 9-Decl., # 17 Exhibit 10-Decl., # 18 Exhibit 11-Decl., # 19 Exhibit 12-Decl., # 20 Exhibit 13-Decl., # 21 Exhibit 14-Decl., # 22 Exhibit 15-Decl., # 23 Exhibit 16-Decl., # 24 Exhibit 17-Decl., # 25 Exhibit 18-Decl., # 26 Exhibit 19-Decl., # 27 Exhibit 20-Decl., # 28 Exhibit 21-Decl., # 29 Exhibit 22-Decl.)(Gillam, Harry)
April 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 514 ORDER directing filing of response and reply to Motion 513 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/24/13. (bas, )
April 23, 2013 Filing 513 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM DEFENDANT ATHEROS RELATING TO ACCUSED PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumaker, John)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 512 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/22/13. (bas, )
April 16, 2013 Filing 511 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Tutorial and Markman Hearing held on 4/16/2013. (Court Reporter Monique McAllister.) (lfs, )
April 15, 2013 Filing 510 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
April 15, 2013 Filing 509 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hsu on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Hsu, Sean)
April 11, 2013 Filing 508 NOTICE by Atheros Communications, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC re 390 Order (Notice of Compliance) (Doan, Jennifer)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER REGARDING HEARING signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/11/13. (bas, )
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting 498 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/11/13. (bas, )
April 10, 2013 Filing 505 RESPONSE in Opposition re 498 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
April 10, 2013 Filing 504 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Stevenson, Theodore)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting 502 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arianna Evers terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/10/13. (bas, )
April 9, 2013 Filing 502 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Arianna Evers) by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 9, 2013 Filing 501 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mateo Z Fowler on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Fowler, Mateo)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting 499 Motion to Amend Scheduling and Discovery Order. The new deadline is APRIL 11, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/8/13. (bas, )
April 5, 2013 Filing 499 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, (Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling and Discovery Order) by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
April 5, 2013 Filing 498 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief by Atheros Communications, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER Of DIsmissal GRANTING 496 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated., ASUSteK Computer Inc and Asus Computer International, Inc., terminated.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/5/2013. (sm, )
April 3, 2013 Filing 496 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER, granting 494 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Venture Research, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/28/13. (mrm, )
March 27, 2013 Filing 494 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 27, 2013 Filing 493 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-5(C) (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 26, 2013 Filing 492 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nitin Gambhir on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Gambhir, Nitin)
March 26, 2013 Filing 491 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 25, 2013 Filing 490 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Thane, Joshua)
March 25, 2013 Filing 489 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
March 21, 2013 Filing 488 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darryl John Ong on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Ong, Darryl)
March 14, 2013 Filing 487 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard Anthony Lopez on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4044172. (Lopez, Richard)
March 13, 2013 Filing 486 RESPONSE Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief to 459 Claim Construction Brief, filed by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Gillam, Harry)
March 13, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE***. Document # 485, Reply to Claim Construction Brief. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 12, 2013 Filing 485 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***REPLY to 459 Claim Construction Brief, filed by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Datalogic S.p.A., Dell, Inc., Digi International Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Sychip, Inc., Venture Research, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC, Wistron NeWeb Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 3/13/2013 (sm, ).
March 8, 2013 Filing 484 NOTICE by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF LEAD COUNSEL (Chen, Lei)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting 482 Motion to Modify the Scheduling and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/8/13. (bas, )
March 7, 2013 Filing 482 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 4, 2013 Filing 481 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. Supplemental Initial Disclosures (McBrayer, Ryan)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting 478 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 2/27/13. (bas, )
February 22, 2013 Filing 479 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ada Elene Brown on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Brown, Ada)
February 22, 2013 Filing 478 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Informatics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan)
February 21, 2013 Filing 477 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Mireille Edelstein on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Edelstein, Sara)
February 19, 2013 Filing 476 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Brown Trillsch on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Trillsch, Jennifer)
February 15, 2013 Filing 475 ANSWER to 452 Answer to Counterclaim, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 474 ANSWER to 449 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 473 ANSWER to 447 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 472 ANSWER to 446 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 471 ANSWER to 443 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 470 ANSWER to 442 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 469 ANSWER to 441 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 468 ANSWER to 440 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 467 ANSWER to 439 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Filing 466 ANSWER to 448 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER granting 464 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is FEBRUARY 22, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/15/13. (bas, )
February 14, 2013 Filing 464 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUEThird Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE by Informatics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting 462 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stacey Garrett White terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/12/13. (bas, )
February 11, 2013 Filing 462 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Stacey White by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Stacey)
February 11, 2013 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 461 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day. MOTION IS TERMINATED. (ch, )
February 8, 2013 Filing 461 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Stacey White by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Stacey) Modified on 2/11/2013 (ch, ).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER granting 458 Motion to Amend/Correct scheduling and discovery order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/6/2013. (sm, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 459 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 5, 2013 Filing 458 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 417 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by Intel Corporation, MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting 456 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/4/13. (bas, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 456 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER granting 453 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is FEBRUARY 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/1/13. (bas, )
January 31, 2013 Filing 453 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUEThird Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan)
January 28, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 451, First Amended Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 25, 2013 Filing 452 First Amended ANSWER to 451 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Dell, Inc..(McBrayer, Ryan) Modified on 1/28/2013 (ch, ).
January 25, 2013 Filing 451 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY PLEASE IGNORE.*** First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Dell, Inc. by Dell, Inc..(McBrayer, Ryan) Modified on 1/28/2013 (ch, ).
January 25, 2013 Filing 450 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.. (Haynes, Bryan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 449 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT, First COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Informatics Holdings, Inc.. (Haynes, Bryan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 448 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Asus Computer International, Inc..(Albright, Alan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 447 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by ASUSteK Computer Inc..(Albright, Alan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 446 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation.(Warriner, James)
January 25, 2013 Filing 445 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Canon Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
January 25, 2013 Filing 444 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Canon U.S.A., Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
January 25, 2013 Filing 443 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Lexmark International, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
January 25, 2013 Filing 442 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
January 25, 2013 Filing 441 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Ralink Technology Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
January 25, 2013 Filing 440 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Intel Corporation. (Gillam, Harry)
January 25, 2013 Filing 439 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
January 22, 2013 Filing 438 STIPULATION by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting 436 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The new deadline is FEBRUARY 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/22/13. (bas, )
January 18, 2013 Filing 436 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUEThird Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE by Informatics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2013: # 2 REVISED ORDER - DATE AND SIGNATURE LINE REMOVED) (ch, ).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER GRANTING 432 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, CSR plc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/18/2013. (sm, )
January 18, 2013 Filing 434 First Amended ANSWER to 352 Third Party Complaint, by Unitech America, Inc..(Burg, Bryan)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER GRANTING 430 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order,( Amended Pleadings now due by 1/25/2013.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/18/2013. (sm, )
January 17, 2013 Filing 432 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by CSR plc, MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Responses due by 2/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss)(Huang, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/18/2013: # 2 REVISED - REMOVED PROPOSED OFF ORDER) (ch, ).
January 17, 2013 Filing 431 Sealed Document - INTEL CORPORATION's RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF's NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY RELATING TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS (Gillam, Harry)
January 17, 2013 Filing 430 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER granting 427 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/17/13. (bas, )
January 16, 2013 Filing 427 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling and Discovery Order by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Song, Seungtaik)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER, granting 420 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Realtek Semiconductor terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/15/13. (mrm, )
January 15, 2013 Filing 425 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nina Susan Tallon on behalf of Intel Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3954432. (Tallon, Nina)
January 14, 2013 Filing 424 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT PURSUANT TO PATENT LOCAL RULE 4-3 filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER granting 421 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/14/13. (bas, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting 419 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/14/13. (bas, )
January 11, 2013 Filing 421 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 324 Order,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 11, 2013 Filing 420 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 9, 2013 Filing 419 Agreed MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS AS TO DEFENDANT REALTEK SEMICONDUCTOR by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 8, 2013 Filing 418 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel E Durrance on behalf of Dell, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3944324. (Durrance, Nathaniel)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting 416 Motion to Modify the Scheduling and Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 1/8/13. (bas, )
January 7, 2013 NOTICE - clerk modified docket text in # 416, per attorney (ch, )
January 7, 2013 Filing 416 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER - EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RAISE PRIVILEGE LOG DISPUTE by Intel Corporation, MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 1/7/2013 (ch, ).
January 7, 2013 Filing 415 NOTICE by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC OF DISCLOSURE (Gillam, Harry)
January 7, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 409, 410, Aff1davit. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTORNEY HAS REFILED AS ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENS AT # 413)(ch, )
January 7, 2013 Filing 414 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUEThird Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE.. (Anderson, Bryan)
January 7, 2013 Filing 413 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE.. (Anderson, Bryan)
January 7, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. ORDERS ARE NOT FILED SEPARATELY ON THE DOCKET Document # 411, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 412 THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to 352 Third Party Complaint, by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc..(Anderson, Bryan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 411 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. re 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE PROPOSED ORDER (Anderson, Bryan) Modified on 1/7/2013 (ch, ).
January 4, 2013 Filing 410 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***AFFIDAVIT in Support re 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE DECLARATION OF EZEKIEL RAUSCHER filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Anderson, Bryan) Modified on 1/7/2013 (ch, ).
January 4, 2013 Filing 409 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***AFFIDAVIT in Support re 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE OF BENJAMIN MOORE filed by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Bryan) Modified on 1/7/2013 (ch, ).
January 4, 2013 Filing 408 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b) OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR SEVERANCE AND TRANSFER OF VENUE by Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. (Anderson, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 4, 2013 Filing 407 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan K Anderson on behalf of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3937996. (Anderson, Bryan)
January 4, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 406, Notice of Appearance - Pro Hac Vice for Bryan Anderson. PLEASE IGNORE, ATTY USED UNASSIGNED CM/ECF LOGIN AND WILL REFILE.*** (pkb, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 406 **PLEASE IGNORE. ATTY ANDERSON USED UNASSIGNED CM/ECF CREDENTIALS AND WILL REFILE. NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ezekiel Lee Rauscher on behalf of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3937829. (Rauscher, Ezekiel) Modified on 1/4/2013 (pkb, ).
January 4, 2013 Filing 405 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ezekiel Lee Rauscher on behalf of Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3937736. (Rauscher, Ezekiel)
January 2, 2013 Filing 404 NOTICE by Atheros Communications, Inc. Notice of Change of Attorney Information (Morisseau, Fay)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting 402 Motion for Extension of Time to Object and Respond to Third-Party Plaintiffs Informatics and WASPs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/27/12. (mrm, )
December 26, 2012 Filing 402 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Unitech America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burg, Bryan)
December 26, 2012 Filing 401 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER granting 399 Motion to Withdraw Counsel. Attorney George T. Scott is hereby withdrawn as counsel for MOSAID. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/19/12. (bas)
December 17, 2012 Filing 399 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Counsel by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 11, 2012 Filing 398 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Atheros Communications, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
December 11, 2012 Filing 397 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Wayne Hejny on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Hejny, Scott)
December 11, 2012 Filing 396 AFFIDAVIT OF ENGAGEMENT (Filed per Judge Craven) by Michael T McLemore. (sm, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 395 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC (Warriner, James)
December 10, 2012 Filing 394 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. (McBrayer, Ryan)
December 10, 2012 Filing 393 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PRIVILEGE LOG (Shumaker, John)
December 10, 2012 Filing 392 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. (Haynes, Bryan)
December 10, 2012 Filing 391 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intel Corporation Regarding Privilege Log (Gillam, Harry)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 390 AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/10/12. (bas)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/10/12. (bas)
December 10, 2012 Filing 388 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Shumaker, John)
December 7, 2012 Filing 387 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Privilege Log and Damages Disclosure) (Haslam, Robert)
December 7, 2012 Filing 386 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. (Privilege Log and Damages Disclosure) (Haslam, Robert)
December 7, 2012 Filing 385 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Device USA Inc. (Privilege Log and Damages Disclosure) (Haslam, Robert)
December 7, 2012 Filing 384 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Futurewei Technologies, Inc. (Privilege Log and Damages Disclosure) (Haslam, Robert)
December 7, 2012 Filing 383 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc. Privilege Log (Albright, Alan)
December 7, 2012 Filing 382 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Realtek Semiconductor (Privilege Log and Damages Disclosure) (Smith, Michael)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER GRANTING 379 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated., Research In Motion Corporation, terminated and all claims and counterclaims by defendant RIM are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/7/2012. (sm, )
December 7, 2012 Filing 380 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation With Deadline to Exchange Privilege Logs (Tindel, Andy)
December 5, 2012 Filing 379 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER proposing Michael T. McLemore as technical advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/28/12. (bas)
November 27, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. to 1/7/2013. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 27, 2012 Filing 377 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubiquiti Networks, Inc..( Cotropia, Charles)
November 26, 2012 Filing 376 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Sorensen Hansen on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Hansen, Eric)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER granting 374 Motion to Modify. The new deadline is DECEMBER 7, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/20/12. (bas)
November 19, 2012 Filing 374 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER re 372 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 351 Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Motions,,,,,, by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 7, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Ubiquiti Networks, Inc. to 12/7/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 7, 2012 Filing 373 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubiquiti Networks, Inc..( Cotropia, Charles)
October 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER granting 371 Motion to Amend. The new deadline is NOVEMBER 19, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 10/18/12. (bas)
October 17, 2012 Filing 371 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY THE SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
September 26, 2012 Filing 370 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Hillary Burg on behalf of Unitech America, Inc. (Burg, Bryan)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER granting 368 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Woodard Cook; Steven D Hemminger; Yitai Hu; Rohan Kale; Jennifer Liu; Jane Bu and Tsai-yu (April) Chen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/31/12. (bas)
August 30, 2012 Filing 368 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Unopposed Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel by Realtek Semiconductor. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hemminger, Steven)
August 21, 2012 Filing 367 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Realtek Semiconductor (Smith, Michael)
August 20, 2012 Filing 366 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Unitech America Inc (Siebman, Clyde)
August 13, 2012 Filing 365 ANSWER to 352 Third Party Complaint, by Unitech America, Inc..(Siebman, Clyde)
August 6, 2012 Filing 364 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel R Foster on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Foster, Daniel)
August 6, 2012 Filing 363 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fay E Morisseau on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Morisseau, Fay)
July 30, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Unitech America Inc to 8/13/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 362 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Unitech America Inc.( Siebman, Clyde)
July 12, 2012 Filing 361 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Attachment 1, # 3 Attachment 2, # 4 Attachment 3, # 5 Attachment 4, # 6 Attachment 5, # 7 Attachment 6, # 8 Attachment 7, # 9 Attachment 8, # 10 Attachment 9, # 11 Attachment 10, # 12 Attachment 11, # 13 Attachment 12, # 14 Attachment 13)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 11, 2012 Filing 360 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven S Baik on behalf of Realtek Semiconductor (Baik, Steven)
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER granting 358 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue SurReplies due by 7/12/2012.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 7/6/2012. (sm, )
July 5, 2012 Filing 358 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 28, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Unitech America Inc to 7/30/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 28, 2012 Filing 357 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Unitech America, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde)
June 22, 2012 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to Motion re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor. (Tindel, Andy)
June 15, 2012 Filing 355 NOTICE by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC of Compliance With P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (Gillam, Harry)
June 12, 2012 Filing 354 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Attachment 1, # 3 Attachment 2, # 4 Attachment 3, # 5 Attachment 4, # 6 Attachment 5, # 7 Attachment 6, # 8 Attachment 7, # 9 Attachment 8, # 10 Attachment 9, # 11 Attachment 10, # 12 Attachment 11, # 13 Attachment 12, # 14 Attachment 13, # 15 Attachment 14, # 16 Attachment 15, # 17 Attachment 16, # 18 Attachment 17, # 19 Attachment 18, # 20 Attachment 19, # 21 Attachment 20, # 22 Attachment 21, # 23 Attachment 22, # 24 Exhibit B, # 25 Exhibit C, # 26 Exhibit D, # 27 Exhibit E, # 28 Exhibit F, # 29 Exhibit G, # 30 Exhibit H, # 31 Exhibit I, # 32 Exhibit J, # 33 Exhibit K, # 34 Exhibit L, # 35 Exhibit M, # 36 Exhibit N, # 37 Exhibit O, # 38 Exhibit P, # 39 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 5, 2012 Filing 353 SUMMONS Issued as to Unitech America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ubiquiti Networks Inc)(ch, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 352 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Unitech America, Inc., Ubiquiti Networks, Inc., filed by Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Informatics Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons(es) Unitech America, Inc., # 3 Summons(es) Ubiquiti Networks, Inc.)(Haynes, Bryan)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2014 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2013. Discovery due by 6/20/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2012. Mediation Completion due by 10/1/2013. Markman Hearing set for 4/16/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Motion terminated: 338 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/4/12. (bas)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting 348 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/4/12. (bas)
June 1, 2012 Filing 349 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kate Saxton for Intel Corporation.(pkb, )
June 1, 2012 Filing 348 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Haynes, Bryan)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting 346 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kai Zhu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/31/12. (bas)
May 31, 2012 Filing 346 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kai Zhu by Realtek Semiconductor. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liu, Jennifer)
May 31, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 345 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day. THIS MOTION HAS BEEN TERMINATED. (ch, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 345 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE THIS DOCUMENT.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kai Zhu by Realtek Semiconductor. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liu, Jennifer) Modified on 5/31/2012 (ch, ).
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER, granting 342 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Sychip, Inc., and Murata Electronics North America, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/29/12. (mrm, )
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting 341 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Responses due by 6/12/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/25/2012. (sm, )
May 25, 2012 Filing 342 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
May 24, 2012 Filing 341 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
May 17, 2012 Filing 340 RESPONSE to 339 Notice (Other) by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Callahan, Steven)
May 10, 2012 Filing 339 NOTICE by Intel Corporation OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gillam, Harry) Modified on 5/11/2012 (ch, ).
May 10, 2012 Filing 338 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
May 10, 2012 Filing 337 NOTICE by CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation of Change of Firm Name (Tindel, Andy)
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting 335 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Responses due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/10/2012. (sm, )
May 10, 2012 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 334 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
May 9, 2012 Filing 335 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
May 8, 2012 Filing 334 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven) Modified on 5/10/2012 (ch, ).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting 332 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed scheduling and discovery order until May 8, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/1/2012. (sm, )
April 30, 2012 Filing 332 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shumaker, John)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 330 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Responses due by 5/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/26/2012. (sm, )
April 25, 2012 Filing 330 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
April 25, 2012 Filing 329 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Thor Bovenkamp on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Bovenkamp, Christopher)
April 20, 2012 Filing 328 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan S Banks for Dell, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID, 2-1052)(ehs, )
April 18, 2012 Filing 327 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer Liu for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1044) (ehs, )
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting 325 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David Allen Foley terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/16/2012. (sm, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Termination of Electronic Notices by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatcher, Michael)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 323 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 323 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaUnopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) to the Northern District of California Responses due by 4/30/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/12/2012. (sm, )
April 11, 2012 Set Hearings:( Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2014 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.) (rml, )
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER that parties meet and confer regarding Judge Schneider's sample scheduling and discovery order attached as Ex A and submit an agreed proposed scheduling order within 20 days from the date of entry of this order; Court hereby schedules a technology tutorial on April 16, 2013 @ 9:00 AM Texas Fourth Floor courtroom with claim const hearing to begin after tutorial;pretrial conference scheduled for 1/8/2014 @ 10:00 AM in Texarkana. 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on April 11, 2012. (rml, )
April 11, 2012 Filing 323 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. §1404(a) to the Northern District of California by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Callahan, Steven)
April 3, 2012 Filing 322 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rohan Kale on behalf of Realtek Semiconductor (Kale, Rohan)
April 3, 2012 Filing 321 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mikal J Condon for SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corp, Wistron LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1027) (ehs, )
April 2, 2012 Filing 320 ANSWER to 313 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 28, 2012 Filing 319 Joint SEALED MOTION to Transfer Venue by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bramhall Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Bramhall Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Bramhall Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Bramhall Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Bramhall Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Bramhall Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Bramhall Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Bramhall Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Bramhall Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Bramhall Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Bramhall Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Bramhall Declaratilon, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Bramhall Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Bramhall Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Bramhall Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 15 to Bramhall Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 16 to Bramhall Declaration, # 18 Exhibit 17 to Bramhall Declaration, # 19 Exhibit 18 to Bramhall Declaration, # 20 Exhibit 19 to Bramhall Declaration, # 21 Exhibit 20 to Bramhall Declaration, # 22 Exhibit 21 to Bramhall Declaration, # 23 Exhibit 22 to Bramhall Declaration, # 24 Exhibit 23 to Bramhall Declaration, # 25 Exhibit 24 to Bramhall Declaration, # 26 Exhibit 25 to Bramhall Declaration, # 27 Exhibit 26 to Bramhall Declaration, # 28 Affidavit Asus Declaration, # 29 Affidavit Atheros Declaration, # 30 Affidavit Canon Declaration, # 31 Affidavit CSR Declaration, # 32 Affidavit Dell Declaration, # 33 Affidavit Intel Declaration, # 34 Affidavit Lexmark Declaration, # 35 Affidavit Marvell Declaration, # 36 Affidavit Ralink Declaration, # 37 Affidavit Realtek Declaration, # 38 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
March 20, 2012 Filing 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan J McBrayer on behalf of Dell, Inc. (McBrayer, Ryan)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 316 PROTECTIVE ORDER, GRANTING 315 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/20/2012. (sm, )
March 19, 2012 Filing 315 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 318 MISC 12-1 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider and Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on March 16, 2012. (rml, ) (rml, ).
March 13, 2012 Filing 314 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seungtaik Michael Song on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Song, Seungtaik)
March 7, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
March 7, 2012 Filing 313 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation.(Warriner, James)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/12. (ehs, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER - VACATES the 304 Order Regarding E-Discovery. The Court will contemporaneously enter an Order Regarding EDiscovery in Patent Cases (new Order) that is based on this districts Model Order Regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases. If the parties wish to modify the new Order, they may submit any proposed changes to the Court. The parties should submit any proposed modification to the new Order within THIRTY (30) DAYS of this order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/12. (ehs, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER - The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint proposed amended protective order in accordance with the Courts comments above within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of this order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/12. (ehs, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting 306 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/2012. (ch, )
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER granting 305 Motion to Seal Sur-Reply to Motion of Dft's Intel Corporation, Dell Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., and ASUS Computer International Inc to Sever and Transfer the Claims Relating to Intel Products. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/2012. (ch, )
March 2, 2012 Filing 307 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of George T. Scott, # 2 Exhibit A - Attachment 1, # 3 Exhibit A - Attachment 2, # 4 Exhibit A - Attachment 3)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 2, 2012 Filing 306 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages IN SURREPLY TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC. AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
March 2, 2012 Filing 305 Unopposed MOTION to Seal SURREPLY TO MOTION FOR DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL, INC. ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC. AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY; granting 302 Joint MOTION for Protective Order AND ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/27/12. (mrm, )
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 303 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/27/12. (mrm, )
February 24, 2012 Filing 302 Joint MOTION for Protective Order AND ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting 300 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sureply re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS Surreplies due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/12. (mrm, )
February 22, 2012 Filing 300 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER denying 106 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/12. (mrm, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting 297 Motion to Modify the Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/21/12. (mrm, )
February 17, 2012 Filing 297 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Dell, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., MOSAID Technologies Incorporated, Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Sychip, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting 294 Motion for Leave to File MOVANTS REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS IN EXCESS OF FIVE PAGES. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/12. (mrm, )
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting 292 Motion for Leave to File UNDER SEAL DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS AND ACCOMPANYING DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/12. (mrm, )
February 15, 2012 Filing 294 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File, MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Sever and Transfer (Dkt. 235) by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 15, 2012 Filing 293 SEALED REPLY to Response in Support of Motion re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS filed by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Gillam, Harry)
February 15, 2012 Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting 289 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 284 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion to Sever and Transfer. Replies due by 2/15/2012.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/13/12. (mrm, )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER granting 288 Motion to Modify the Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/13/12. (mrm, )
February 9, 2012 Filing 289 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 284 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2012: # 2 CORRECTED ORDER) (ch, ).
February 9, 2012 Filing 288 Fourth MOTION TO MODIFY THE PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
February 3, 2012 Filing 287 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deron R Dacus (Dacus, Deron)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting 283 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation, Dell Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., and ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Sever and Transfer the Claims Relating to Intel Products in Excess of Fifteen Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/12. (mrm, )
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting 282 Motion for Leave to File Response to Motion of Defendants Intel Corporation, Dell Inc., ASUSTeK Computer Inc., and ASUS Computer International, Inc. to Sever and Transfer the Claims Relating to Intel Products Under Seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/12. (mrm, )
January 31, 2012 Filing 284 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 31, 2012 Filing 283 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 31, 2012 Filing 282 Unopposed MOTION to Seal MOSAID'S RESPONSE TO MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS UNDER SEAL by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting 280 Motion to Modify the Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/26/12. (mrm, )
January 25, 2012 Filing 280 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY THE PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 24, 2012 Filing 279 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Ralink Technology Corporation Initial Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
January 24, 2012 Filing 278 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
January 24, 2012 Filing 277 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lexmark International, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
January 24, 2012 Filing 276 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by CSR plc Initial Disclosures (Tindel, Andy)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting 274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Palani P Rathinasamy terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2012. (sm, )
January 18, 2012 Filing 274 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Realtek Semiconductor. (Rathinasamy, Palani) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
January 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 272 Motion to Modify the Proposed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/17/12. (mrm, )
January 13, 2012 Filing 272 Joint MOTION TO MODIFY THE PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER re 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
January 4, 2012 The previous case assigned to Judge Davis is hereby reassigned to Judge Folsom per Local Rule CV 63-B(ch, )
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/3/2012. (ch, )
January 3, 2012 Filing 270 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George T Scott on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Scott, George)
December 20, 2011 Filing 269 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ralink Technology Corporation (Tindel, Andy)
December 20, 2011 Filing 268 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 20, 2011 Filing 267 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Cox, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2011 Filing 266 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. (Cox, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2011 Filing 265 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Huawei Device USA Inc. (Cox, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2011 Filing 264 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Futurewei Technologies, Inc. (Cox, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2011 Filing 263 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael M Markman on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Markman, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
December 19, 2011 Filing 262 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intel Corporation Notice of Compliance Regarding Initial Disclosures (Gillam, Harry)
December 19, 2011 Filing 261 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Atheros Communications, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Heartfield, J)
December 19, 2011 Filing 260 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. : Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Hatcher, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 259 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Newton, Michael)
December 19, 2011 Filing 258 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC Initial Disclosures (Warriner, James)
December 18, 2011 Filing 257 NOTICE by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Albright, Alan)
December 16, 2011 Filing 256 NOTICE by Realtek Semiconductor of Service for Its Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Hemminger, Steven)
December 16, 2011 Filing 255 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Sychip, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Harrison, Guy)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting 253 Motion for Extension of Time to File. December 21, 2011 Defendants to answer MOSAIDs first set of interrogatories. December 23, 2011 Deadline for Defendants to produce their venue related documents. December 27, 2011 Deadline for MOSAID to notify Dell and Asus regarding whether 30(b)(6) depositions will be necessary January 17, 2012 Deadline for MOSAID to take Defendants venue related 30(b)(6) depositions. January 31, 2012 Deadline for MOSAID to file response to Intels Motion.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/11. (ehs, )
December 14, 2011 Filing 253 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER granting 247 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERS that the deadline for the parties to submit a draft protective order and draft proposals addressing the format of document production and the production of e-mail be extended until 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, )
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting 248 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that MOSAID has leave to file its Response to Notice of Joinder of Defendants Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc., Huawei Device USA, Inc., and Futurewei Technologies Inc. in Intels Supplement to Proposed Discovery Deadlines under seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, )
December 9, 2011 Filing 249 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated to 241 Sealed Document, filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
December 9, 2011 Filing 248 Unopposed MOTION to Seal RESPONSE TO HUAWEI'S NOTICE OF JOINDER by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 9, 2011 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
December 8, 2011 Filing 246 NOTICE by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. re 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS (Haslam, Robert)
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Intel, Dell, and ASUS Motion To Sever And Transfer The Claims Relating to Intel Products. Responses due by 12/15/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/6/11. (ehs, )
November 28, 2011 Filing 244 NOTICE by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 3-1 AND P.R. 3-2 (Stevenson, Theodore)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting 240 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Joinder Under Seal. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/28/2011. (ch, )
November 28, 2011 Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
November 22, 2011 Filing 241 SEALED DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD., HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES USA INC., HUAWEI DEVICE USA INC., AND FUTUREWEI TECHNOLOGIES INC. IN INTEL'S SUPPLEMENT TO PROPOSED DISCOVERY DEADLINES [DKT. NO. 208] (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 11/23/2011 (ch, ).
November 22, 2011 Filing 240 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Joinder in Intel's Supplement to Proposed Discovery Deadlines Under Seal by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Haslam, Robert)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting 234 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David Folsom on November 17, 2011. (jml, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting 236 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on November 17, 2011. (jml, )
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting 230 Motion to Seal Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/14/2011. (ch, )
November 14, 2011 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding MOTION OF DEFENDANTS' TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS Filed under Seal by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 14, 2011 Filing 235 Opposed SEALED MOTION MOTION OF DEFENDANTS INTEL CORPORATION, DELL INC., ASUSTEK COMPUTER INC., AND ASUS COMPUTER INTERNATIONAL, INC. TO SEVER AND TRANSFER THE CLAIMS RELATING TO INTEL PRODUCTS by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Exhibit 1, # 7 Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12, # 18 Exhibit 13, # 19 Exhibit 14, # 20 Exhibit 15, # 21 Exhibit 16, # 22 Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit 18, # 24 Exhibit 19, # 25 Exhibit 20, # 26 Exhibit 21, # 27 Exhibit 22, # 28 Exhibit 23, # 29 Exhibit 24, # 30 Exhibit 25, # 31 Exhibit 26, # 32 Exhibit 27, # 33 Exhibit 28, # 34 Exhibit 29, # 35 Exhibit 30, # 36 Exhibit 31, # 37 Exhibit 32, # 38 Exhibit 33, # 39 Exhibit 34, # 40 Exhibit 35, # 41 Exhibit 36, # 42 Exhibit 37, # 43 Exhibit 38, # 44 Exhibit 39, # 45 Exhibit 40, # 46 Exhibit 41, # 47 Exhibit 42, # 48 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 14, 2011 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Motion to Sever and Transfer Under SEAL by ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Dell, Inc., Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
November 14, 2011 Filing 233 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Joseph Cox on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Cox, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2011 Filing 231 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Stevenson, Theodore)
November 8, 2011 Filing 230 Unopposed MOTION to Seal SUR-REPLY UNDER SEAL by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
November 4, 2011 Filing 232 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Donald R Steinberg for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-799(ch, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 229 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen M Muller for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-179) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 228 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amanda L Major for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 227 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arianna Evers for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 226 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Arthur W Coviello for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 225 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William F Lee for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 224 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney S Dennis Wang for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 223 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Evelyn C Mak for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 222 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Felicia H Ellsworth for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 221 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James M Dowd for Intel Corporation.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 220 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James L Quarles, III for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790)(ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 219 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert Tannenbaum for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 218 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathryn Zalewski for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 217 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kathryn McEvoy for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 216 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark C Fleming for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 215 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Summersgill for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 214 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Heyison for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 Filing 213 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Silena Paik for Intel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-790)(ehs, )
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting 210 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of its Supplement to the Joint Notice of Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders Under Seal.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/2/2011. (ch, )
October 31, 2011 Filing 211 Sealed Document - INTEL'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS SUPPLEMENT TO THE JOINT NOTICE OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Gillam, Harry)
October 31, 2011 Filing 210 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Its Reply In Support of Its Supplement to the Joint Notice of Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
October 25, 2011 Filing 209 RESPONSE to 208 Notice (Other) by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
October 21, 2011 Filing 208 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS INTEL'S SUPPLEMENT TO THE JOINT MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS (Bunt, Robert)
October 21, 2011 Filing 207 Joint MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Docket Control Order, # 2 Proposed Discovery Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 205 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Order. ORDERS that the deadline for the parties to submit their proposed docket control orders and discovery orders be extended until October 21, 2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/18/2011. (ch, )
October 14, 2011 Filing 205 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDERS by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
October 6, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James George Warriner on behalf of SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC (Warriner, James)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 201 Motion to Dismiss. Digi International INc is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/6/2011. (ch, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
October 3, 2011 Filing 201 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting 199 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel John Galligan terminated as counsel for Research in Motion Corporation. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/19/2011. (ch, )
September 16, 2011 Filing 199 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney : Unopposed Amended Motion to Withdraw as Counsel and for Termination of Electronic Notices by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hatcher, Michael)
September 16, 2011 Filing 198 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Hatcher on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Hatcher, Michael)
September 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER - Due to the undersigneds pending retirement and the fact that there is currently uncertainty regarding who will take over as Magistrate Judge in the Marshall Division, the Court finds it is unnecessary to hold a status conference. This case is now set for jury selection on August 4, 2014 and for a claim construction on February 18, 2014. The parties shall submit their proposed docket control and discovery orders to the court on October 14, 2011. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local rules, the court deems October 31, 2011 to be the date of the initial case management conference. As a result, the Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is due on October 21,2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 9/15/2011. (ch, )
September 12, 2011 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 196 submitted by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
September 9, 2011 Filing 196 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galligan, Daniel) Modified on 9/12/2011 (ch, ).
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting 194 Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED that MOSAIDs claims against Datalogic S.p.A. are hereby dismissed without prejudice to re-filing of the same. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/15/2011. (ch, )
August 12, 2011 Filing 194 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT DATALOGIC S.p.A. by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 12, 2011 Filing 193 ANSWER to 174 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 8, 2011 Filing 192 ANSWER to 169 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting 189 Motion to Dismiss. Wistron NeWeb Corporation is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 8/5/2011. (ch, )
August 4, 2011 Filing 190 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSR plc (Tindel, Andy)
August 4, 2011 Filing 189 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT WISTRON NEWEB CORPORATION by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 4, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Datalogic S.p.A. to 8/17/2011. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
August 3, 2011 Filing 188 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Datalogic S.p.A..( Haynes, Bryan)
August 1, 2011 Filing 187 ANSWER to 156 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 1, 2011 Filing 186 ANSWER to 160 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
August 1, 2011 Filing 185 ANSWER to 158 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 27, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Henry Dolkas on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Dolkas, David)
July 22, 2011 Filing 183 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kai Zhu for Realtek Semiconductor,Kai Zhu for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 182 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tsai-yu (April) Chen for Realtek Semiconductor,Tsai-yu (April) Chen for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 181 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jane Bu for Realtek Semiconductor,Jane Bu for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 180 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven D Hemminger for Realtek Semiconductor,Steven D Hemminger for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 179 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Yitai Hu for Ralink Technology Corporation,Yitai Hu for Ralink Technology Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 22, 2011 Filing 178 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Palani P Rathinasamy for Realtek Semiconductor,Palani P Rathinasamy for Realtek Semiconductor. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-633) (ehs, )
July 21, 2011 Filing 177 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
July 20, 2011 Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne Cuthbert Norton on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Norton, Dwayne)
July 19, 2011 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Realtek Semiconductor (Cook, Jason)
July 19, 2011 Filing 174 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Realtek Semiconductor.(Cook, Jason)
July 18, 2011 Filing 173 ANSWER to 147 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 166 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Responses due by 7/21/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/18/2011. (ch, )
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Marcus Benavides and Gregory W Carr terminated as counsel for Venture Research Inc. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/18/2011. (ch, )
July 14, 2011 Filing 170 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ASUSteK Computer Inc. (Albright, Alan)
July 14, 2011 Filing 169 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by ASUSteK Computer Inc..(Albright, Alan)
July 13, 2011 Filing 168 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacey Garrett White on behalf of Dell, Inc. (White, Stacey)
July 12, 2011 Filing 167 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Marcus Benavides and Gregory Carr by Venture Research, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benavides, Marcus) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2011: # 2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
July 12, 2011 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 11, 2011 Filing 165 ANSWER to 133 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 8, 2011 Filing 164 ANSWER to 120 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 8, 2011 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Realtek Semiconductor (Cook, Jason)
July 7, 2011 Filing 162 REPLY to Response to Motion re 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Davis, Harold)
July 5, 2011 Filing 161 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ralink Technology Corporation (Tindel, Andy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 160 Ralink Technology Corporation ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Ralink Technology Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 159 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CSR plc (Tindel, Andy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 158 CSR plc's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by CSR plc.(Tindel, Andy)
July 5, 2011 Filing 157 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Research In Motion Limited for Research In Motion Corporation. (Chen, Li)
July 5, 2011 Filing 156 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd..(Chen, Li)
July 5, 2011 Filing 155 ANSWER to 116 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
July 5, 2011 Filing 154 RESPONSE to 112 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
July 5, 2011 NOTICE - clerk modified # 153 to link to #111 instead of 112 (ch, )
July 5, 2011 Filing 153 ANSWER to 111 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore) Modified on 7/5/2011 (ch, ).
July 5, 2011 Filing 152 ANSWER to 114 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 29, 2011 Filing 151 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa J Baily for CSR plc,Melissa J Baily for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.,Melissa J Baily for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.,Melissa J Baily for Ralink Technology Corporation.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-597) (ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 24, 2011 Filing 149 ANSWER to 95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Stevenson, Theodore)
June 24, 2011 Filing 148 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Digi International Inc. (Samuel, Mathias)
June 24, 2011 Filing 147 Defendant Digi International, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Digi International Inc..(Samuel, Mathias)
June 23, 2011 Filing 146 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew J Bramhall for CSR plc,Andrew J Bramhall for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.,Andrew J Bramhall for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.,Andrew J Bramhall for Ralink Technology Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-591) (ehs, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 145 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric Huang for Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-586 (ch, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 144 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P B Johnson for CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Ralink Technology Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-588 (ch, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 143 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew Gryzlo for Atheros Communications, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 1-1697. received in Marshall on 6/21/2011 (ch, )
June 21, 2011 Filing 142 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cary Chien for Atheros Communications, Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 1-1697. (received in Marshall on 6/17/2011) (ch, ) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ch, ).
June 21, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG ATTORNEY ADDED Document # 135, Application for Pro Hac Vice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 20, 2011 Filing 141 ANSWER to 78 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Shumaker, John)
June 20, 2011 Filing 140 ANSWER to 81 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Shumaker, John)
June 20, 2011 Filing 139 ANSWER to 82 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated.(Shumaker, John)
June 17, 2011 Filing 138 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Datalogic S.p.A.. (ehs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 137 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Carrie Anne Beyer for Murata Electronics North America, Inc.,Carrie Anne Beyer for Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.,Carrie Anne Beyer for Sychip, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-571) (ehs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 136 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J Kelleher for Murata Electronics North America, Inc.,Patrick J Kelleher for Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.,Patrick J Kelleher for Sychip, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-570) (ehs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 135 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen Chia Chi Chien for Atheros Communications, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 1-1697) (ehs, ) Modified on 6/21/2011 (ch, ).
June 16, 2011 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International, Inc. (Albright, Alan)
June 16, 2011 Filing 133 ASUS Computer International, Inc.' s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Asus Computer International, Inc..(Albright, Alan)
June 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Research In Motion Corporation to 7/5/2011; Research in Motion, Ltd. to 7/5/2011. (ehs, )
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. RIM Defendants shall have to and including July 5, 20ll to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/15/11. (ehs, )
June 14, 2011 Filing 131 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
June 14, 2011 Filing 130 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses by Canon Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
June 14, 2011 Filing 129 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Canon Inc. for Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
June 14, 2011 Filing 128 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses by Canon U.S.A., Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
June 14, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Pritikin on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Pritikin, David)
June 14, 2011 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Ralph Nester on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Nester, Brian)
June 14, 2011 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel John Galligan on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Galligan, Daniel)
June 14, 2011 Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Allen Foley on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Foley, David)
June 14, 2011 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Li Chen on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Chen, Li)
June 14, 2011 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Philip W Woo on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Woo, Philip)
June 13, 2011 Filing 121 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Sychip, Inc. (Harrison, Guy)
June 13, 2011 Filing 120 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Sychip, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Wireless Solutions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Harrison, Guy)
June 13, 2011 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Chase Callahan on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Callahan, Steven)
June 13, 2011 Filing 118 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
June 10, 2011 Filing 117 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lexmark International, Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
June 10, 2011 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Lexmark International, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
June 9, 2011 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Marvell Semiconductor Israel Ltd, Corporate Parent Marvell Technology, Inc. for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Tindel, Andy)
June 9, 2011 Filing 114 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc..(Tindel, Andy)
June 9, 2011 Filing 113 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Cooperative U.A. for Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Haslam, Robert)
June 9, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. INFORMATION NOT SAME Document # 110, Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 112 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Huawei Technologies USA Inc..(Haslam, Robert)
June 8, 2011 Filing 111 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Huawei Device USA Inc..(Haslam, Robert)
June 8, 2011 Filing 110 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Cooperative U.A. for Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Haslam, Robert) Modified on 6/9/2011 (ch, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 109 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Device USA Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
June 8, 2011 Filing 108 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6).. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeff Lin)(Davis, Harold)
June 8, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONG EVENT - ATTORNEY MUST REFILE Document # 107, Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 107 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.*** MOTION to Dismiss Declaration of Jeff Lin In Support of Wistron Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Davis, Harold) Modified on 6/8/2011 (ch, ).
June 7, 2011 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Harold Davis ISO Wistron Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Davis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Davis Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Davis, Harold)
June 7, 2011 Filing 105 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. (Haynes, Bryan)
June 7, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT - NEED TO REFILE UNDER CORPORATE DECLOSURE STATEMENT Document # 104, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 6, 2011 Filing 104 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Informatics Holdings, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. of Corporate Disclosures (Haynes, Bryan) Modified on 6/7/2011 (ch, ).
June 1, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Canon U.S.A., Inc. to 6/14/2011. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Canon USA Inc deadline is extended to 6/14/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Canon Inc. to 6/14/2011. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Canon Inc deadline is extended to 6/14/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Lexmark International, Inc. to 6/10/2011. (ch, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Lexmark International Inc deadline is extended to 6/10/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. to 6/9/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Marvell Semiconductor Inc deadline is extended to 6/9/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 99 Dell Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Dell, Inc..(Newton, Michael)
May 31, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Huawei Device USA Inc. to 6/8/2011; Huawei Technologies USA Inc. to 6/8/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Huawei Technologies USA Inc and Huawei Device USA inc deadline is extended to 6/8/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 97 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Atheros Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Qualcomm Incorporated for Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
May 31, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SMS Infocomm Corporation to 6/7/2011; Wistron Corporation to 6/7/2011; Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation to 6/7/2011; Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation to 6/7/2011; Wistron LLC to 6/7/2011. (ch, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell, Inc. (Newton, Michael)
May 31, 2011 Filing 95 Atheros Communications, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Atheros Communications, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Wistron Corporation, Wistron LLC, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, and Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation deadline is extended to 6/7/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/31/2011. (ch, )
May 26, 2011 Filing 93 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Intel Corporation (Gorham, Andrew)
May 26, 2011 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of Intel Corporation (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 26, 2011 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of Intel Corporation (Bunt, Robert)
May 26, 2011 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of Intel Corporation (Parker, Robert)
May 26, 2011 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Canon U.S.A.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
May 26, 2011 Filing 88 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Canon Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Canon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
May 26, 2011 Filing 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Lexmark's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
May 26, 2011 Filing 86 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, Marvell's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
May 26, 2011 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Sochia on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Sochia, David)
May 25, 2011 Filing 84 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Shenzhen Huawei Investment & Holding Co., Ltd. for Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. (Haslam, Robert)
May 25, 2011 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Huawei Cooperative U.A. for Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. (Haslam, Robert)
May 25, 2011 Filing 82 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd..(Haslam, Robert)
May 25, 2011 Filing 81 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Futurewei Technologies, Inc..(Haslam, Robert)
May 25, 2011 Filing 80 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Haslam, Robert)
May 25, 2011 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intel Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Intel Corporation. (Gillam, Harry)
May 25, 2011 Filing 78 Defendant Intel Corporation's ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against MOSAID Technologies Incorporated by Intel Corporation.(Gillam, Harry)
May 24, 2011 Filing 77 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, Lei)
May 24, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Digi International Inc. to 6/27/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 24, 2011 Filing 76 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Digi International Inc..( Kodish, Thad)
May 23, 2011 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mathias W Samuel for Digi International Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-535) (ehs, )
May 18, 2011 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Ralink Technology Corporation (Tindel, Andy)
May 18, 2011 Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of CSR plc (Tindel, Andy)
May 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asus Computer International, Inc. to 6/16/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 17, 2011 Filing 72 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asus Computer International, Inc..( Nash, Brian)
May 16, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Intel Corporation to 5/25/2011. (ch, )
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Intel Corporation deadline is extended to 5/25/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/16/2011. (ch, )
May 13, 2011 Filing 70 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd..(Haynes, Bryan)
May 13, 2011 Filing 69 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Informatics Holdings, Inc..(Haynes, Bryan)
May 12, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell, Inc. to 5/30/2011. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 11, 2011 Filing 68 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Hassett, Shaun)
May 5, 2011 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gillam, Harry)
May 4, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Research In Motion Corporation to 6/14/2011; Research in Motion, Ltd. to 6/14/2011. (ch, )
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension and Time to Answer. Dfts Research in Motion Corporation and Research in Motion Ltd's deadline is extended to 6/14/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/4/2011. (ch, )
May 4, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Ralink Technology Corporation to 7/5/2011. (ch, )
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Ralink Technology Corporation deadline is extended to 7/5/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 5/4/2011. (ch, )
May 3, 2011 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, by Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd.. (Richardson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 27, 2011 Filing 63 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Ralink Technology Corporation waiver sent on 3/31/2011, answer due 5/31/2011. (ehs, )
April 21, 2011 Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Wistron Corporation waiver sent on 3/25/2011, answer due 5/25/2011. (ehs, )
April 19, 2011 Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.. Huawei Technologies USA Inc. waiver sent on 4/2/2011, answer due 6/1/2011. (ehs, )
April 19, 2011 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Ralink Technology Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, James)
April 19, 2011 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J Williams for Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.,Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-464. (ch, )
April 18, 2011 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. ASUSteK Computer Inc. waiver sent on 4/15/2011, answer due 6/14/2011. (ehs, )
April 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asus Computer International, Inc. to 5/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 15, 2011 Filing 57 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asus Computer International, Inc..( Nash, Brian)
April 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Lexmark International, Inc. to 5/27/2011. (ch, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File answer. Lexmark International Inc deadline is extended to 5/27/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/15/2011. (ch, )
April 15, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for SMS Infocomm Corporation to 5/25/2011; Wistron Corporation to 5/25/2011; Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation to 5/25/2011; Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation to 5/25/2011; Wistron LLC to 5/25/2011. (ch, )
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. ORDERED, that Defendants Wistron Corporation, Wistron LLC, SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, and Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation deadline is extended to 5/25/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/15/2011. (ch, )
April 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. to 5/13/2011. 25 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 15, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Informatics Holdings, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 25 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 15, 2011 Filing 54 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd..( Haynes, Bryan)
April 15, 2011 Filing 53 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Informatics Holdings, Inc..( Haynes, Bryan)
April 14, 2011 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
April 14, 2011 Filing 51 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Ralink Technology Corporation personally served on 3/31/2011 Dennis Lo, Agent for service, designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of deft, answer due 4/21/2011. (ehs, )
April 14, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Atheros Communications, Inc. to 5/31/2011. (ch, )
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Atheros Communications Inc deadline is extended to 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/14/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Futurewei Technologies, Inc. to 5/25/2011; Huawei Device USA Inc. to 5/25/2011; Huawei Technologies USA Inc. to 5/25/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Technologies USA, Inc. and Huawei Device USA, Inc. deadline is extended to 5/25/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Canon Inc. to 5/31/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Canon Inc deadline is extended to 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. to 5/26/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Marvell Semiconductor Inc deadline is extended to 5/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Canon U.S.A., Inc. to 5/31/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Dft Canon USA Inc deadline is extended to 5/31/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/13/2011. (ch, )
April 13, 2011 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Atheros Communications, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
April 13, 2011 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,,, or Otherwise Respond, by Atheros Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
April 12, 2011 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Chen, Lei) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/13/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 12, 2011 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lei Howard Chen on behalf of SMS Infocomm Corporation, Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC (Chen, Lei)
April 11, 2011 Filing 41 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA Inc.. (Haslam, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2011: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
April 11, 2011 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Thomas Haslam, III on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
April 11, 2011 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Canon Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Canon Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Murata Electronics North America, Inc. to 6/13/2011; Sychip, Inc. to 6/13/2011. (ch, )
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Murata Electronics North America Inc and Sychip Inc deadline is extended to 6/13/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 4/11/2011. (ch, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Lexmark International, Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andy Tindel on behalf of Canon U.S.A., Inc. (Tindel, Andy)
April 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. to 4/18/2011. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Informatics Holdings, Inc. to 4/18/2011. 5 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 11, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Digi International Inc. to 5/26/2011. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 11, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILE UNDER WRONG EVENT Document # 25, Unopposed First Application. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ATTY REFILED SEE # 28)(ch, )
April 11, 2011 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd..( Haynes, Bryan)
April 11, 2011 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Informatics Holdings, Inc..( Haynes, Bryan)
April 11, 2011 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Digi International Inc.(Kodish, Thad)
April 8, 2011 Filing 27 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Sychip, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy)
April 8, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Guy N Harrison on behalf of Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Sychip, Inc. (Harrison, Guy)
April 8, 2011 Filing 25 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Digi International Inc.. (Kodish, Thad) Modified on 4/11/2011 (ch, ).
April 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell, Inc. to 5/13/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 8, 2011 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dell, Inc..( Hassett, Shaun)
April 7, 2011 Filing 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Wistron LLC served on 3/23/2011 to the Texas Secretary of State by delivering to her designated Agent, Elizabeth Garcia, answer due 4/13/2011. (ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Murata Electronics North America, Inc. served on 3/23/2011, answer due 4/13/2011; Sychip, Inc. served on 3/23/2011, answer due 4/13/2011; Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation served on 3/23/2011, answer due 4/13/2011 all served on Sue Vertress designated by law to accept service of process of each deft. (Attachments: # 1 Sychip, # 2 Wistron Infocomm Tech)(ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Informatics Holdings, Inc. served on 3/23/2011 on Registered Agent, Capital Corporate Service, Toni Ozen, answer due 4/13/2011. (ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Dell, Inc. served on 3/23/2011 on Sue Vertress designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 4/13/2011. (ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Canon U.S.A., Inc. served on 3/23/2011 on Sue Vertress designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 4/13/2011. (ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Atheros Communications, Inc. served on 3/23/2011 on Sue Vertress designated by law to accept service of process, answer due 4/13/2011. (ehs, )
April 7, 2011 Filing 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Asus Computer International, Inc. personally served on 3/25/2011 on Godwin Yan designated by law to accept service of process on behalf of deft, answer due 4/15/2011. (ehs, )
April 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Intel Corporation to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
April 6, 2011 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Intel Corporation.( Gillam, Harry)
April 1, 2011 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory W Carr on behalf of Venture Research, Inc. (Carr, Gregory)
April 1, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, ATTY WANTING TO APPEAR DID NOT FILE SO MUST REFILE USING LOGIN OF APPEARING ATTY. Document # 14, Notice of Atty Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 1, 2011 Filing 14 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marcus Benavides on behalf of Venture Research, Inc. (Benavides, Marcus) Modified on 4/1/2011 (sm, ).
April 1, 2011 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated as to Wistron LLC.. Returned by CT Corporation stating deft is not listed in their records or on the records of the State of Texas (ehs, )
March 30, 2011 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Venture Research, Inc. (Benavides, Marcus)
March 30, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, by Venture Research, Inc..(Benavides, Marcus)
March 25, 2011 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Research In Motion Corporation served on 3/21/2011, answer due 5/11/2011; SMS Infocomm Corporation served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Venture Research, Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 SMS Infocomm, # 2 Wasp, # 3 Wistron, # 4 Venture)(ehs, )
March 25, 2011 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. Digi International Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Futurewei Technologies, Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Huawei Device USA Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Intel Corporation served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Lexmark International, Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011; Marvell Semiconductor, Inc. served on 3/21/2011, answer due 4/11/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Futurewei, # 2 Huawai, # 3 Intel, # 4 Lexmark, # 5 Marvell)(ehs, )
March 22, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Shumaker on behalf of MOSAID Technologies Incorporated (Shumaker, John)
March 22, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joe W Redden, Jr on behalf of Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd. (Redden, Joe)
March 22, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research in Motion, Ltd. to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 22, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Research In Motion Corporation to 5/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
March 22, 2011 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research in Motion, Ltd..( Richardson, Michael)
March 22, 2011 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Research In Motion Corporation.( Richardson, Michael)
March 17, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ehs, )
March 17, 2011 Judge T. John Ward added. (ehs, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Sychip, Inc., Venture Research, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Marvell, # 2 Murata Electronic, # 3 Murata Mfg, # 4 Ralink Tech, # 5 Realtek, # 6 RIM Corp, # 7 RIM Ktd, # 8 SMS Infocomm, # 9 Sychip, # 10 Venture Research, # 11 Wasp Barcode, # 12 Wistron Corp, # 13 Wistron Infocomm Tech, # 14 Wistron Infocomm, # 15 Winstron LLC)(ehs, )
March 17, 2011 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Datalogic S.p.A., Dell, Inc., Digi International Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Wistron NeWeb Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 ASUSTeK, # 2 Atgeris Communications, # 3 CSR, # 4 Canon Inc, # 5 Canon USA, # 6 Datalogic, # 7 Dell, # 8 Dugu, # 9 Futurewei, # 10 Huawai (China), # 11 Huawai Device, # 12 Huawai Tech, # 13 Informatic Holding, # 14 Intel Corp, # 15 Wistron NeWeb)(ehs, )
March 16, 2011 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent None for MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Stevenson, Theodore)
March 16, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against ASUSteK Computer Inc., Asus Computer International, Inc., Atheros Communications, Inc., CSR plc, Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Datalogic S.p.A., Dell, Inc., Digi International Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc., Informatics Holdings, Inc., Intel Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Marvell Semiconductor, Inc., Murata Electronics North America, Inc., Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd., Murata Wireless Solutions, Ralink Technology Corporation, Realtek Semiconductor, Research In Motion Corporation, Research in Motion, Ltd., SMS Infocomm Corporation, Sychip, Inc., Venture Research, Inc., Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd., Wistron Corporation, Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation, Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation, Wistron LLC, Wistron NeWeb Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-2937845.), filed by MOSAID Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stevenson, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOSAID Technologies Incorporated v. Dell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSAID Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: John Michael Shumaker
Represented By: Theodore Stevenson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research In Motion Corporation
Represented By: Joe W Redden, Jr
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion, Ltd.
Represented By: Joe W Redden, Jr
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Datalogic S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Informatics Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wasp Barcode Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: Bryan Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Research, Inc.
Represented By: Marcus Benavides
Represented By: Gregory W Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Robert J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies USA Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Haslam, III
Represented By: Robert J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Device USA Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Haslam, III
Represented By: Robert J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futurewei Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Haslam, III
Represented By: Robert J Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Electronics North America, Inc.
Represented By: Guy N Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Guy N Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murata Wireless Solutions
Represented By: Guy N Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sychip, Inc.
Represented By: Guy N Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron Corporation
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron LLC
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Infocomm Corporation
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron Infocomm (Texas) Corporation
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron Infocomm Technology (America) Corporation
Represented By: Lei Howard Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wistron NeWeb Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUSteK Computer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digi International Inc.
Represented By: Thad C Kodish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atheros Communications, Inc.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvell Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realtek Semiconductor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralink Technology Corporation
Represented By: James H Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSR plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?