Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Advance Publications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: Scripps Networks LLC, Village Voice Media Holdings, LLC, Rodale, Inc., Viacom, Inc., Demand Media, Inc., Expedia, Inc., Advance Publications, Inc., ALM Media Properties, LLC, Amazon.Com, Inc., American Media, Inc., Autotrader.com, Inc., and Dell, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Counter_claimant: Demand Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00229
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: T. John Ward
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2014. (ch, )
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 634 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/21/14. (ch, )
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 481 Report and Recommedations. DENYING 387 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/8/2014. (ch, )
January 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER denying 499 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/20/2014. (rsp3)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 497 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION; The Court hereby DISMISSES the issue of patent exhaustion as between Google Inc. and Beneficial Innovations, Inc. in this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/16/14. (mrm, )
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 466 Report and Recommendations, Denying Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness 307 . Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/14/2014. (ch, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 482 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/6/2014. (ch, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beneficial Innovations, Inc. v. Advance Publications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Julien Antonio Adams
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps Networks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village Voice Media Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark Christopher Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodale, Inc.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demand Media, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Cord Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expedia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advance Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Lieberman
Represented By: Sharon L Davis
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALM Media Properties, LLC
Represented By: Steven Lieberman
Represented By: Sharon L Davis
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Media, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autotrader.com, Inc.,
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Demand Media, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Cord Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beneficial Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: David Eric Rosen
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Julien Antonio Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?