TQP Development LLC vs v. 1-800-Flowers.com Inc et al
Plaintiff: TQP Development, LLC
Defendant: Verizon Data Services LLC, 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., Micro Electronics, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, Alticor, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company, HSN, Inc., Verizon Communications, Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc. and Newegg Inc
Consolidated Defendant: Orbitz, LLC, CHS, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Fareportal, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Humana Inc., Deere & Company, McAfee Inc, The Medical Protective Company, Hotwire, Inc., The Boeing Company, Alaska Airlines, Inc., Suntrust Banks, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Expedia, Inc, Horizon Air Industries, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc., Disney Online, Jefferies & Company, Inc. and Aflac Incorporated
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: Radware, Inc.
Consolidated 3Rd Party Plaintiff: Branch Bank and Trust Company
Not Classified By Court: Robert W Faulkner and David Keyzer
Not Yet Classified: TQP Development LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00248
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Filing 488 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nkl, )
April 13, 2017 Filing 487 MANDATE of USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT in accordance with the judgment of this Court, entered February 27, 2017, as to #470 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by TQP Development, LLC (dlc, )
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 03/30/2017. (nkl, )
February 27, 2017 Filing 485 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT JUDGMENT affirming the judgment or decision that was appealed as to #470 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by TQP Development, LLC. The mandate will be issued in due course. Circuit Judges: Newman, Moore, and O'Malley. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Entry of Judgment, #2 Rehearing Info Sheet, #3 Supreme Court Info Sheet)(dlc, )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 ORDER granting #483 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Herbert A Yarbrough, III terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/25/2016. (nkl, )
January 22, 2016 Filing 483 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #480 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/11/2016. (nkl, )
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #479 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James A Fussell, III terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/11/2016. (nkl, )
January 8, 2016 Filing 480 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
January 8, 2016 Filing 479 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James Fussell by TQP Development LLC, TQP Development, LLC, TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fussell, James)
December 9, 2015 Filing 478 BILL OF COSTS by Newegg Inc, TQP Development, LLC. Costs Taxed in the amount of $108,762.75. (nkl, )
December 9, 2015 Filing 477 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Cross Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #473 Cross Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Newegg Inc. USCA Case Number 16-1297 (dlc, )
December 7, 2015 Filing 476 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT on 12/7/15 as to #473 Notice of Cross Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, Orders and Docket Sheet. (tkd, )
December 4, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email re #473 Notice of Cross Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (tkd, )
December 4, 2015 Filing 475 NOTICE by Newegg Inc Regarding 10/05/15 Court Entry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Circuit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - PACER Docket Sheet)(Baldauf, Kent)
December 4, 2015 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Notice submitted document #474 does not contain a Certificate of Service. Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
December 3, 2015 Filing 474 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT NOTICE by Newegg Inc - Letter re 10/05/15 Court Entry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Federal Circuit's docket sheet), #2 Exhibit B (PACER docket sheet))(Baldauf, Kent) Modified on 12/4/2015 (nkl, ).
December 3, 2015 Filing 473 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #469 Memorandum & Opinion, #464 Memorandum & Opinion, #387 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, #389 Order on Sealed Motion, #382 Order, Terminate Motions by Newegg Inc. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5510923. (Brean, Daniel)
November 25, 2015 Filing 472 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #470 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by TQP Development, LLC. USCA Case Number 16-1262 (dlc, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 471 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT on 11/24/15, by USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #461 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, #468 Order on Motion for Bill of Costs, #470 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT, and certified copy of docket sheet. (dlc, )
November 24, 2015 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, #468 Order, #461 Order, and Certified copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email. re #470 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT (dlc, )
November 24, 2015 Filing 470 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #461 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, by TQP Development, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-5498557. (Fenster, Marc)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/03/2015. (nkl, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting #465 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/22/2015. (nkl, )
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting #466 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alexander Chester Giza terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/26/2015. (nkl, )
August 24, 2015 Filing 466 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giza, Alexander) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/25/2015: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
August 17, 2015 Filing 465 Agreed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Itemization, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit C to Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit D to Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit E to Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit F to Exhibit 2, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/17/2015. (nkl, )
July 29, 2015 Filing 463 Opposed MOTION for Bill of Costs by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit 2 - Itemization, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit C to Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit D to Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit E to Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit F to Exhibit 2, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
July 17, 2015 Filing 462 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER granting Newegg Inc.'s motion to withdraw the petition for writ of mandamus.(dlc, )
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #436 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; The Court hereby VACATES the Jurys verdicts of direct and induced infringement as to Claims 1, 6, 8, and 9 of the 730 Patent and enters a verdict of NO DIRECT INFRINGEMENT and NO INDUCED INFRINGEMENT as a matter of law as to those claims. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/15/15. (mrm, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 460 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER: TQP Development LLC is directed to respond to the petition for a writ of mandamus within seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply must be filed within three days from the date of filing of the response. Before Chief Judge Prost. Signed on 7/6/15. (dlc, )
July 6, 2015 Filing 459 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE OF DOCKETING: A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT CASE No. 15-142 (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus)(dlc, )
November 13, 2014 Filing 458 NOTICE by Newegg Inc of Renewed Request for Hearing on Post-Trial Motions (Baldauf, Kent)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER re #454 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/12/2014. (nkl, )
August 11, 2014 Filing 456 NOTICE by Newegg Inc re #455 Order re Joint Notice Regarding Redaction of Laches Order (Brean, Daniel)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER re #454 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/08/2014. (nkl, )
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/07/2014. (nkl, ) Modified on 8/13/2014 (nkl, ).
July 25, 2014 Filing 453 NOTICE by Newegg Inc re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) re Second Notice of Subsequent Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brean, Daniel)
July 18, 2014 Filing 452 RESPONSE to #450 Notice (Other), #447 Notice (Other), Plaintiff TQP Development, LLC's Response to Defendant NewEgg, Inc.'s Notices of Supplemental Authorities filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kroeger, Paul)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER - The Court hereby ORDERS, sua sponte, that TQP shall file a single response to the arguments raised in Neweggs two Notices of Supplemental Authority within ten (10) days of this date. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/08/2014. (nkl, )
June 30, 2014 Filing 450 NOTICE by Newegg Inc re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) re Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Memorandum Opinion and Order))(Brooks, Anthony)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/16/2014. (ch, )
June 13, 2014 Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by Newegg Inc, Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 4, 2014 Filing 447 NOTICE by Newegg Inc re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial, #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) re NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Slip Opinion))(Brooks, Anthony)
April 16, 2014 Filing 446 NOTICE by Newegg Inc of Request for Hearing on Post-Trial Motions (Brean, Daniel)
April 14, 2014 Filing 445 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Fenster, Marc)
April 14, 2014 Filing 444 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
April 3, 2014 Filing 443 REPLY to Response to Motion re #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Stubblebine Report)(Brean, Daniel)
April 3, 2014 Filing 442 REPLY to Response to Motion re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Stubblebine Report)(Brean, Daniel)
March 18, 2014 Filing 441 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
March 18, 2014 Filing 440 RESPONSE in Opposition re #436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER, BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, terming #438 Joint Motion to Amend the Schedule. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/14. (mrm, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 438 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 17, 2014 Filing 437 SEALED MOTION - Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Report of Dr. Jaeger), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brean, Daniel)
February 17, 2014 Filing 436 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Rule 50(b) by Newegg Inc. Responses due by 3/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Trial Demonstratives), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Brean, Daniel)
February 10, 2014 Filing 435 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #432 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment on Laches filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
February 3, 2014 Filing 434 REPLY to Response to Motion re #432 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment on Laches filed by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brean, Daniel)
January 23, 2014 Filing 433 Plaintiff TQP Development, LLC's Opposition SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #432 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment on Laches filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Affidavit Spangenberg Declaration)(Fenster, Marc)
January 6, 2014 ***DISREGARD THIS FILED IN ERROR, WAS DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE******FILED IN ERROR. NOT A PRETRIAL ORDER Document # 47, Pretrial Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) Modified on 1/6/2014 (ch, ).
January 6, 2014 Filing 432 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment on Laches by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Brean, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/6/2014: #9 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER regarding briefing schedule on Newegg's equitable defenses of laches and equitable estoppel. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/20/13. (bas, )
December 14, 2013 Filing 430 Joint Submission of Proposals and Schedules Regarding Equitable Defenses by Newegg Inc. and TQP Development, LLC pursuant to Court Order [Dkt. 429]. (Brean, Daniel)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER; the Court hereby ORDERS that the parties meet and confer regarding a proposed schedule suggesting how to proceed with Newegg's equitable defenses of equitable estoppel and laches. The parties are instructed to jointly submit such a proposal to the Court within ten (10) days of this date. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/5/13. (mrm, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 422 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/25/13 Trial Transcript (Notes/Verdict) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 421 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/25/13 Trial Transcript (Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 420 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/25/13 Trial Transcript (Morning Transcript) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 419 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/22/13 Trial Transcript (Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 418 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/22/13 Trial Transcript (Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 417 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/21/13 Trial Transcript (Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 416 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/21/13 Trial Transcript (Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 415 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/13 Trial Transcript (Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 414 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/20/13 Trial Transcript (Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 413 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/13 Trial Transcript (Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 27, 2013 Filing 412 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/19/13 Trial Transcript (Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, ) Modified on 11/27/2013 (ch, ).
November 27, 2013 Filing 411 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/18/13 (Jury Selection) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/28/2014. (sholmes, )
November 25, 2013 Filing 428 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial completed on 11/25/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 25, 2013 Filing 410 Newegg Final Exhibit List. (jml)
November 25, 2013 Filing 409 TQP Final Exhibit List. (jml)
November 25, 2013 Filing 408 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
November 25, 2013 Filing 407 *VACATED IN PART PER ORDER #461 * JURY VERDICT. (jml) Modified on 7/15/2015 (mrm, ).
November 25, 2013 Filing 406 TRIAL BRIEF re Opposition to Closing Demonstrative by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 405 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Invalidity by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 404 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law re Damages by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 403 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Non-infringement by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 25, 2013 Filing 402 Opposed MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
November 25, 2013 Filing 401 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC AMENDED PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND VERDICT FORM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Revised Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B Redline Revised Proposed Jury Instructions, #3 Exhibit C TQP's Amended Proposed Verdict Form)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 22, 2013 Filing 427 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/22/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER denying #295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award filed by Newegg, Inc. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the expenses and, if the matter is not resolved beforehand, Plaintiff shall file a motion to fix expenses within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/22/13. (mrm, )
November 21, 2013 Filing 426 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/21/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 21, 2013 Filing 399 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of Newegg Inc (Gorham, Andrew)
November 21, 2013 Filing 398 TRIAL BRIEF re Claim Construction Issue by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Preliminary Claim Constructions)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 20, 2013 Filing 425 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/20/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 19, 2013 Filing 424 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 11/19/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 18, 2013 Filing 423 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection held on 11/18/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
November 18, 2013 Filing 397 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC REVISED FINAL JOINT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Fenster, Marc)
November 18, 2013 Filing 396 RESPONSE to Motion re #393 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #390 Order filed by Newegg Inc. (Brooks, Anthony)
November 18, 2013 Filing 395 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC (Second Supplemental) OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INVALIDITY THEORIES AND PRIOR ART REFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenster, Marc)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 394 ORDERS that if Dft chooses to file a Response to Plaintiffs Motion #393 Motion for Reconsideration, shall do so by or before 7:00 pm today 11/18/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/18/2013. (ch, )
November 17, 2013 Filing 393 Emergency MOTION for Reconsideration re #390 Order by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
November 15, 2013 Filing 392 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC re #348 Proposed Pretrial Order, AMENDED EXHIBIT 3-A Fifth Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-A)(Kroeger, Paul)
November 15, 2013 Filing 391 Proposed Jury Instructions by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wang, Benjamin)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER that TQP is hereby precluded from re-litigating these two issues at trial in the instant case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/15/13. (ehs, )
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #381 Sealed Motion GRANTED--evidence and argument regarding the terms of the two recent Alaska Airlines settlement agreements are excluded from trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/15/13. (ehs, )
November 14, 2013 Filing 388 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC JOINT FINAL DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Fenster, Marc)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #342 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part #343 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/14/13. (ehs, )
November 14, 2013 Filing 386 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Anthony W Brooks re #377 Transcript,,,. (Brooks, Anthony)
November 13, 2013 Filing 385 Newegg's SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to TQP's SEALED PATENT MOTION re #381 Emergency SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Settlement with Expedia, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., and Orbitz, LLC filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brean, Daniel)
November 13, 2013 Filing 384 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Reines on behalf of Newegg Inc (Reines, Edward)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER - Defendant Newegg, Inc. shall file its response to TQPs motion by the end the day, Wednesday, November 13, 2013. Neweggs response should focus its discussion on the prejudice TQP alleges will result from showing jurors licenses with provisions that are contingent, in part, on their verdict. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/12/13. (ehs, )
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER denying #304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. filed by Newegg, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/12/13. (ehs, )
November 11, 2013 Filing 381 Emergency SEALED MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence and Argument Regarding Settlement with Expedia, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., and Orbitz, LLC by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
November 11, 2013 Filing 380 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC (AMENDED) OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INVALIDITY THEORIES AND PRIOR ART REFERENCE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Fenster, Marc)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting #358 Sealed Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/7/2013. (ch, )
November 6, 2013 Filing 378 REPORT of Mediation by Robert Faulkner. Mediation result: matter did not settle(Faulkner, Robert)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #334 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/5/2013. (rsp3)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #330 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/5/13. (rsp2)
November 5, 2013 Filing 377 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/29/13 (Pre-trial Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carla A. Sims, CSR RPR,Telephone number: (903) 646-2374. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/29/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2014. (sholmes, )
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #359 Sealed Motion- Neweggs License and Patent Exhaustion defenses are stricken #31 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/4/13. (ehs, )
November 4, 2013 Filing 375 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/21/2013 before Judge Roy S. Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carla A. Sims, CSR, RPR,Telephone number: 903-646-2374. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2014. (ch, )
November 1, 2013 Filing 374 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC NOTICE OF ASSERTED CLAIMS AND INVALIDITY THEORIES AND PRIOR ART REFERENCES (Fenster, Marc)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER Granting and Denying in Part #299 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases FOR TRIAL filed by TQP Development, LLC ORDERING that Consenting Defendants will be joined for trial and that Newegg and Consenting Defendants will Not be joined for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/30/2013. (sm, )
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/13. (bas, )
October 30, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Judith Lynn Meadow on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Meadow, Judith)
October 29, 2013 Filing 373 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/29/2013. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (bga, )
October 29, 2013 Filing 369 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC re #348 Proposed Pretrial Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-A TQPs Fourth Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Kroeger, Paul)
October 29, 2013 Filing 368 NOTICE by Newegg Inc re #352 Proposed Pretrial Order re Third Amended Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Anthony)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER Regarding Priority for Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/28/2013. (rsp2)
October 25, 2013 Filing 366 RESPONSE to #363 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(McNabnay, Neil)
October 25, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 365, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 24, 2013 Filing 365 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC re #363 Notice (Other) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(McNabnay, Neil) Modified on 10/25/2013 (sm, ).
October 23, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2013 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
October 22, 2013 Filing 363 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Consolidate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Boardman, Michael)
October 22, 2013 Filing 362 Defendant Newegg's SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to Plaintiff TQP's SEALED PATENT MOTION re #358 MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL TO THE JURY filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
October 22, 2013 Filing 361 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #376 Defendant Newegg Inc.'s SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to Plaintiff TQP's SEALED PATENT MOTION re #359 TO STRIKE NEWEGG, INC.S LICENSE AND PATENT EXHAUSTION DEFENSES filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony) Modified on 11/4/2013 (ehs, ).
October 22, 2013 Filing 360 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/16/13 before Judge Roy S Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carla A Sims,Telephone number: 903-646-2374. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/15/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2014. (ehs, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 364 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/21/2013. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (bga, )
October 21, 2013 Filing 359 SEALED MOTION TO STRIKE NEWEGG, INC.S LICENSE AND PATENT EXHAUSTION DEFENSES by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Fenster, Marc)
October 21, 2013 Filing 358 SEALED MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL TO THE JURY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1)(Fenster, Marc)
October 21, 2013 Filing 357 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan D Albright on behalf of Newegg, Inc. (Albright, Alan)
October 21, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #354, #355, #356 Motions and additional attachment submitted by TQP Development, LLC. No certificate of conference were included in the motion in limine or motion to strike and exhibits were not properly identified per local rules. #355 was attachment to 354 which can be attached when refiled. Corrections should be made by 1 business day and motions refiled. These Documents are now TERMINATED. (sm, )
October 18, 2013 Filing 356 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Strike NEWEGG, INC.S LICENSE AND PATENT EXHAUSTION DEFENSES by TQP Development, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2013 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 10/21/2013 (sm, ).
October 18, 2013 Filing 355 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Additional Attachments to Main Document: #354 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL TO THE JURY.. (Fenster, Marc) Modified on 10/21/2013 (sm, ).
October 18, 2013 Filing 354 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATING TO PROSECUTION HISTORY ESTOPPEL TO THE JURY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fenster, Marc) Modified on 10/21/2013 (sm, ).
October 16, 2013 Filing 353 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/16/2013. (Court Reporter Carla Sims.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (bga, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 352 Proposed Pretrial Order AMENDMENT to Joint Final Pretrial Order by Newegg, Inc., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 3-A, #2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 3-B)(Kroeger, Paul)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/11/2013. (ch, )
October 11, 2013 Filing 350 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC OF AGREEMENTS REACHED DURING MEET AND CONFER REGARDING OUTSTANDING OBJECTIONS AND MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Kroeger, Paul)
October 8, 2013 Filing 349 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE Newegg's Opposition to TQP's SEALED PATENT MOTIONS IN LIMINE re #342 filed by Newegg Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Brean, Daniel)
October 8, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY IS REFILING. Document # 346, Sealed Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 8, 2013 Filing 348 Proposed Pretrial Order JOINT PROPOSED PRETRIAL ORDER by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A, #2 Exhibit 1-B, #3 Exhibit 2-A, #4 Exhibit 2-B, #5 Exhibit 3-A, #6 Exhibit 3-B, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5-A, #9 Exhibit 5-B)(Kroeger, Paul)
October 7, 2013 Filing 347 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #343 SEALED PATENT MOTION OPPOSED MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Kroeger, Paul)
October 7, 2013 Filing 346 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED PATENT RESPONSE NEWEGG' OPPOSITION TO TQP'S SEALED PATENT MOTIONS IN LIMINE re #342 filed by Newegg, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Brean, Daniel) Modified on 10/8/2013 (sm, ).
October 3, 2013 Filing 345 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Boardman on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Boardman, Michael)
October 2, 2013 Filing 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin T Wang on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Wang, Benjamin)
September 30, 2013 Filing 343 SEALED PATENT MOTION OPPOSED MOTIONS IN LIMINE by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Brean, Daniel)
September 30, 2013 Filing 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION MOTIONS IN LIMINE by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 30, 2013 Filing 341 NOTICE by Newegg Inc of Request for Daily Transcript and Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings (Brooks, Anthony)
September 30, 2013 Filing 340 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Marc A Fenster on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
September 30, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Hoffman, Adam)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER; striking #335 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/26/13. (mrm, )
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER denying #248 Letter Brief filed by Expedia, Inc, denying #252 Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company, denying #253 Letter Brief filed by CHS, Inc., Expedia, Inc, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc., Branch Bank and Trust Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Orbitz, LLC, denying #306 Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company,denying #250 Letter Brief filed by Orbitz, LLC,denying #249 Letter Brief filed by Hotwire, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/26/13. (mrm, )
September 27, 2013 Filing 336 NOTICE TO PARTIES RE JURY SELECTION - Jury Selection set for 11/12/2013 and 11/18/2013 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/27/2013. (ch, )
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 **STRUCK PER ORDER #338 ** ORDER on Letter Briefs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/25/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 9/27/2013 (mrm, ).
September 25, 2013 Filing 334 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct FURTHER AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER RE JURY SELECTION DATE IN LIGHT OF RECENTLY SET CONFLICT SCHEDULE by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER AMENDING DEADLINES, ( Motions in Limine due by 9/30/2013., Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2013., Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/24/13. (ehs, )
September 23, 2013 Filing 332 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Hoffman, #2 Exhibit 10)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 23, 2013 Filing 331 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #307 SEALED MOTION filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Adam Hoffman, #2 Exhibit 6)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 23, 2013 Filing 330 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
September 19, 2013 Filing 329 SEALED Sur-Reply In Opposition to Motion re #299 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases FOR TRIAL filed by Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Newegg Inc, Orbitz, LLC. (Qureshi, Wasif)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER REOPENING CASE - Newegg Inc reinstated, other aspects of the Courts Order Vacating the Consolidation Order (Dkt. No. 314, filed August 30, 2013) remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/19/13. (ehs, )
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ***ORDER cancelling Motion Hearing of 9/18/13*** -- GRANTING Motion #326 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Its Motion to Compel a further Session of Deposition of Defendants' Invalidity Expert Dr. Whitfield Diffie and for Monetary Sanctions filed by TQP Development, LLC, #320 Emergency SEALED MOTION Motion to compel a further session of Deposition of Defendants Invalidity Expert Dr. Whitfield Diffie and for Monetary Sanctions filed by TQP Development, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 9/17/13. (ehs, ) Modified on 9/18/2013 (ehs, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 326 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate ITS MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER SESSION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS' INVALIDITY EXPERT DR. WHITFIELD DIFFIE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
September 16, 2013 Filing 325 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #307 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Lein, Paul)
September 16, 2013 Filing 324 SEALED DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE to TQP's Motion re #320 Emergency SEALED MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER SESSION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS INVALIDITY EXPERT DR. WHITFIELD DIFFIE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company, Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Newegg Inc, Orbitz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James J. Bosco with Exhibits A, B, and C, #2 Affidavit of Joseph A. Unis, Jr. with Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit of Whitfield Diffie, Ph.D. with Exhibit A)(Brooks, Anthony)
September 13, 2013 Filing 323 SEALED DEFENDANTS' REPLY to Response to Motion re #304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. filed by Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Newegg Inc, Orbitz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brean, Daniel)
September 10, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #320 Emergency SEALED MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER SESSION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS INVALIDITY EXPERT DR. WHITFIELD DIFFIE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS : Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2013 02:00 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Any response to the motion is due by 9/16/13.(bga, )
September 9, 2013 Filing 322 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #307 SEALED MOTION filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 9, 2013 Filing 321 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Adam Hoffman, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 9, 2013 Filing 320 ***VACATED per Order #327 *** Emergency SEALED MOTION MOTION TO COMPEL A FURTHER SESSION OF DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS INVALIDITY EXPERT DR. WHITFIELD DIFFIE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Paul Kroeger, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Kroeger, Paul) Modified on 9/18/2013 (ehs, ).
September 9, 2013 Filing 319 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC Of Compliance (Hoffman, Adam)
September 9, 2013 Filing 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re #299 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases FOR TRIAL filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
September 6, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE by Newegg Inc of Compliance pursuant to the Agreed Proposed Docket Control Order re Service of Pretrial Disclosures (Brooks, Anthony)
August 30, 2013 Filing 316 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #211 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lein, Paul)
August 30, 2013 Filing 315 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #211 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by Newegg, Inc., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2013: #2 Revised Order (no signature lines)) (sm, ).
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER VACATING #168 Order to consolidate with respect to the following cases: TQP Development, LLC v. Alaska Air Group, Inc., et al., Case No. 2:11-CV- 398 and TQP Development, LLC v. Branch Banking and Trust Co., Case No. 2:12-CV-55. All orders entered in the lead case prior to this order will continue to be in effect in each member case. As no other member case is currently pending, the Clerk is directed to close the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/13. (ehs, )
August 29, 2013 Filing 313 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #299 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases FOR TRIAL filed by Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Qureshi, Wasif)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER denying #298 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/29/2013. (rsp1)
August 27, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. The parties are instructed to meet and confer and submit a proposed amended docket control order by no later than August 30, 2013.(bga, )
August 26, 2013 Filing 311 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #306 Notice of Compliance - Supplemental Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Kroeger, Paul)
August 26, 2013 Filing 310 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
August 22, 2013 Filing 309 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by Branch Bank and Trust Company re #307 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of TQP Expert Becker (Lein, Paul)
August 22, 2013 Filing 308 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Judith Lynn Meadow on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Meadow, Judith)
August 22, 2013 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D.. This text entry was modified, Per Atty, to add 3 other dfts as filer (Expedia, Hotwire and Orbitz). Text entry previously had just Newegg. (sm, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 307 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the opinions of expert Becker by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lein, Paul)
August 21, 2013 Filing 306 Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lein, Paul)
August 21, 2013 Filing 305 REPLY to Response to Motion re #295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award filed by Newegg, Inc.. (Brean, Daniel)
August 21, 2013 Filing 304 SEALED MOTION Daubert to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of TQP's Damages Expert Stephen L. Becker, Ph.D. by Newegg, Inc., Expedia Inc., Hotwire Inc and Orbitz LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E)(Brean, Daniel) Modified on 8/22/2013 (sm, ).
August 21, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 303, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 21, 2013 Filing 303 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re #295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award filed by Newegg, Inc.. (Brean, Daniel) Modified on 8/21/2013 (sm, ).
August 15, 2013 Filing 302 RESPONSE in Opposition re #295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Kroeger, Paul)
August 13, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notice (Drake, Kirby)
August 13, 2013 Filing 300 NOTICE by Alaska Airlines, Inc. Reuqest for Termination of Electronic Notice (Klemchuk, Darin)
August 9, 2013 Filing 299 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases FOR TRIAL by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
August 8, 2013 Filing 298 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #211 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (DOCKET CONTROL ORDER) by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
August 5, 2013 Filing 297 ANSWER to #291 Supplemental Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Newegg, Inc..(Brooks, Anthony) Modified on 8/6/2013 (sm, ).
August 5, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE by Farmers Group, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Bahler, David)
August 5, 2013 Filing 295 Opposed MOTION to Vacate Expenses Award by Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2013: #2 REVISED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ).
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #292 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff TQP Development, LLC and defendant Farmers Group, Inc.. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/24/13. (ehs, )
July 23, 2013 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICIAL COURT REPORTER AND INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING DAILY TRANSCRIPTS : Effective August 1, 2013, Shelly Holmes will become the Official Court Reporter for this Court due to the retirement of Susan Simmons as Official Court Reporter. To the extent the current Docket Control Order in this case directs contact with Ms. Simmons to arrange for daily transcripts, you should (on and after August 1, 2013) contact Shelly Holmes at: Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov in lieu of contacting Ms. Simmons, in this regard. (jml)
July 23, 2013 Filing 292 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT FARMERS GROUP, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
July 22, 2013 Filing 291 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., filed by TQP Development, LLC.(Hoffman, Adam) Modified on 7/23/2013 (sm, ).
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying motion #174 to compel. The parties are directed to meet and confer on the expenses and, if the matter is not resolved beforehand, Plaintiff shall file a motion to fix expenses within 21 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/19/13. (ehs, )
July 19, 2013 Filing 294 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 7/19/2013 re #174 MOTION to Compel filed by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (bga, )
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/19/2013. (rsp1)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER granting #286 Motion to Withdraw Attorney of Record, Kevin P. Burke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/18/13. (mrm, )
July 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying #285 Motion to Stay all Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/17/2013. (ch, )
July 17, 2013 Filing 286 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fenster, Marc)
July 16, 2013 Filing 285 Joint MOTION to Stay All Pending Deadlines (for 30 days) by Farmers Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahler, David)
July 11, 2013 Filing 284 NOTICE by Newegg, Inc. of Partial Withdrawal of #174 Motion to Compel (Brean, Daniel)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting #281 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order. July 30, 2013 Serve Disclosures for Rebuttal Expert Witnesses. August 14, 2013 Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery. August 21, 2013 File Dispositive Motions or Motions to Strike Expert Testimony (including Daubert Motions). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/10/13. (ehs, )
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting #279 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric Brinn Hall terminated as counsel for Defendant Hotwire, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/10/13. (ehs, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 281 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct FURTHER, THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting #278 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff TQP Development, LLC and defendant HSN, Inc.. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/9/13. (ehs, )
July 9, 2013 Filing 279 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hotwire, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Eric)
July 8, 2013 Filing 278 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HSN, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
July 8, 2013 Filing 277 Notice of Reply Letter Brief re #252 filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Unis, Joseph) Modified on 7/9/2013 (sm, ).
July 8, 2013 Filing 276 Letter Brief filed by Newegg, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Anthony)
July 8, 2013 Filing 275 Letter Brief filed by Orbitz, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
July 8, 2013 Filing 274 Letter Brief filed by Hotwire, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
July 8, 2013 Filing 273 Letter Brief filed by Expedia, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
July 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #247 Motion to Amend the Docket Control Order as it related to Defendants Expedia and Farmers Group. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/5/2013. (rsp1)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting #241 Motion to Dismiss - for Dismissal With Prejudice of all claims asserted by plaintiff TQP Development, LLC against defendant Disney Online in the lead consolidated case, TQP Development, LLC v. 1-800 Flowers.com, Inc., Case No. 2:11-cv-248, and TQP Development, LLC v. DirecTv, Inc., Case No. 2:11-cv-399, and all counterclaims by Disney Online against TQP dismissed as moot. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/3/13. (ehs, )
July 3, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint, #174 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2013 09:30 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (bga, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #215 Motion to Compel; denying #227 Motion for Protective Order (See hearing minutes, Dkt. No. 237). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/22/2013. (rsp1)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #176 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/3/2013. (rsp1, )
July 2, 2013 Filing 270 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #252 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 1, 2013 Filing 269 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #250 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Orbitz, LLC Filed by TQP Development, LLC filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 1, 2013 Filing 268 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #249 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Hotwire, Inc. Filed by TQP Development, LLC filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 1, 2013 Filing 267 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #248 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Expedia, Inc Filed by TQP Development, LLC filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Hoffman, Adam)
July 1, 2013 Filing 266 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #253 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by CHS, Inc., Expedia, Inc, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc., Branch Bank and Trust Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Orbitz, LLC filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Letter Brief)(Kroeger, Paul)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #261 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice of all claims and counterclaims asserted between TQP Development, LLC and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/1/13. (ehs, )
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #262 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice of all claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff TQP Development, LLC and defendant Rite Aid Corporation. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/1/13. (ehs, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER - The Court has received Mr. Keyzers invoice for services through March 14, 2013 payment to be promptly made Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/27/13. (ehs, )
June 27, 2013 Filing 262 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT RITE AID CORPORATION by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 26, 2013 Filing 261 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #257 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended to complete Fact Discovery and file Motions to Compel related to AT&T reset to 7/22/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/25/13. (ehs, )
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting #258 Motion to Dismiss all claims and counterclaims asserted between TQP Development, LLC and CHS, Inc., all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/25/13. (ehs, )
June 24, 2013 Filing 258 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CHS, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 24, 2013 Filing 257 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DKT. NO. 211) by HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Muffo, Patrick)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #255 Motion to Amend docket control order. Deadline extended to 7/20/13 to complete mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/20/13. (ehs, )
June 19, 2013 Filing 255 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 18, 2013 Filing 254 SEALED Letter Brief filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenton, Truman)
June 18, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #251 Sealed Letter Brief submitted by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No certificate of authority to seal statement was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
June 18, 2013 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #253 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief. THis entry was modified to reflect that the letter brief is only filed by Newegg instead of all parties previously entered. (sm, )
June 17, 2013 Filing 253 Letter Brief filed by Newegg, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Brief))(Brooks, Anthony) Modified on 6/18/2013 (sm, ).
June 17, 2013 Filing 252 Letter Brief filed by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Phipps, Charles)
June 17, 2013 Filing 251 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED Letter Brief filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fenton, Truman) Modified on 6/18/2013 (sm, ).
June 17, 2013 Filing 250 Letter Brief filed by Orbitz, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
June 17, 2013 Filing 249 Letter Brief filed by Hotwire, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
June 17, 2013 Filing 248 Letter Brief filed by Expedia, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Qureshi, Wasif)
June 14, 2013 Filing 247 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct FURTHER AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #245 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Aflac Incorporated is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/13/2013. (ch, )
June 12, 2013 Filing 245 Agreed MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT AFLAC INCORPORATED by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER amending docket control order #211 (Complete Fact Discovery and file Motions to Compel Discovery due by 8/5/2013., To serve Disclosures for Expert Witness List due by 6/24/2013.), Deadline to Exchange Privilege Logs due 6/11/13. Motions terminated: #243 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DKT. NO. 211) filed by TQP Development, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/11/13. (ehs, )
June 10, 2013 Filing 243 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (DKT. NO. 211) by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 10, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. CLERK FILED IN WRONG CASE PLEASE DISREGARD Document # 242, Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG CASE. PLEASE IGNORE.***ORDER granting #176 Motion to Stay. All deadlines are hereby stayed until July 23, 2013 or further order by the Court. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/7/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ch, ).
June 7, 2013 Filing 241 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT DISNEY ONLINE by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting #239 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Fareportal Inc is hereby dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 6/3/2013. (ch, )
May 31, 2013 Filing 239 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT FAREPORTAL, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 28, 2013 Filing 238 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Branch Bank and Trust Company. (Phipps, Charles)
May 22, 2013 Filing 237 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2013 re #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes.) (bga, )
May 21, 2013 Filing 236 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #231 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 21, 2013 Filing 235 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #234 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 21, 2013 Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #217 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Provide Infringement Contentions filed by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 21, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #232 Sealed Additional Attachment submitted by Expedia, Inc. No certificate of authority to seal and exhibits not separately attached. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
May 21, 2013 NOTICE FROM CLERK re #231 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion. This entry has been modified to reflect that it is Only a Surreply to #215 Emergency Motion since a response to #227 has not been filed yet so a reply canot be filed at this time. (sm, )
May 21, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the 230, Sealed Additional Attachment, submitted by Expedia, Inc., due to not include a cert of authority to seal, exhibits not attached separately and linked to a filed in error document. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
May 21, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 229, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
May 20, 2013 Filing 233 RESPONSE in Opposition re #227 Cross MOTION for Protective Order filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 20, 2013 Filing 232 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #231 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,. (Qureshi, Wasif) Modified on 5/21/2013 (sm, ).
May 20, 2013 Filing 231 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION filed by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Qureshi, Wasif) Modified on 5/21/2013 (sm, ).
May 20, 2013 Filing 230 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #229 Response in Support of Motion. Exhibit B (Qureshi, Wasif) Modified on 5/21/2013 (sm, ). Modified on 5/21/2013 (sm, ).
May 20, 2013 Filing 229 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Support re #217 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Provide Infringement Contentions filed by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Qureshi, Wasif) Modified on 5/21/2013 (sm, ).
May 20, 2013 Filing 228 NOTICE by Branch Bank and Trust Company for Issuance of Subpoena to F5 Networks, Inc., Subpoena (Phipps, Charles)
May 20, 2013 Filing 227 Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 226 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/20/2013. (ch, )
May 17, 2013 Filing 225 REPLY to Response to Motion re #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION (AND OPPOSITION TO CROSS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 17, 2013 Filing 224 RESPONSE to Motion re #217 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Provide Infringement Contentions filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 15, 2013 Filing 223 RESPONSE in Opposition re #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION filed by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/15/2013. (ch, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #219 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Emergency Motion to Compel. Hearing in Open Court on 5/22/2013 @ 10:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/15/2013. (ch, )
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/15/2013. (ch, )
May 14, 2013 Filing 220 Unopposed MOTION to Amend the Parties' Protective Order by Aflac Incorporated, Branch Bank and Trust Company, CHS, Inc., Expedia, Inc, Farmers Group, Inc., HSN, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., McAfee Inc, Newegg, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: #2 REVISED ORDER) (ch, ).
May 13, 2013 Filing 219 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITIONEmergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION Defendant Expedia, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Amend Deadlines for Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #216 Motion to Dismiss. The Medical Protective Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/9/2013. (ch, )
May 8, 2013 Filing 217 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Provide Infringement Contentions by Expedia, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Qureshi, Wasif)
May 7, 2013 Filing 216 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT THE MEDICAL PROTECTIVE COMPANY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2013: #2 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
May 6, 2013 Filing 215 Emergency MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT EXPEDIA, INC. TO RESPOND TO FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND TO PRODUCE WITNESS(ES) FOR 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B to Motion to Compel, #3 Affidavit of Paul A. Kroeger In Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff TQP Development, LLC and defendant Human, Inc. in TQP Development, LLC v. Aflac Incorporated, C.A. No. 11-CV-397, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/1/2013. (ch, )
April 30, 2013 Filing 213 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT HUMANA, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
April 17, 2013 Filing 212 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/12/13 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Roy Payne. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR,Telephone number: (903) 663-5082 (shellyholmes@skynetcountry.com).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/13/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2013. (sholmes, )

April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Motions due by 9/23/2013., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/7/2013., Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/8/2013. (ch, )
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #209 Motion to Dismiss. All claims for relief asserted between BB&T and Radware herein are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 4/8/2013. (ch, )
March 25, 2013 Filing 209 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Branch Bank and Trust Company, Radware, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
March 22, 2013 Filing 208 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #174 MOTION to Compel filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER granting #206 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in TQP Development, LLC v. Alaska Air Group, Inc., C.A. 11-CV-398, between plaintiff TQP Development, LLC and defendants Alaska Airlines, Inc. and Horizon Air Industries, Inc. are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/18/13. (ehs, )
March 15, 2013 Filing 206 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS ALASKA AIRLINES, INC. AND HORIZON AIR INDUSTRIES, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
March 12, 2013 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne: Markman Hearing held on 3/12/2013. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-in Sheet) (jml)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER re #201 Notice of Settlement filed by TQP Development, LLC, Horizon Air Industries, Inc., and Alaska Airlines, Inc. The parties are ORDERED to file dismissal papers within 30 days. Defendants' request to be excused from the claim construction hearing is DENIED. Defendants may choose to not attend the hearing, but they will be bound by the outcome of the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/12/2013. (rsp1)
March 11, 2013 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re #174 MOTION to Compel filed by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H)(Muffo, Patrick)
March 11, 2013 Filing 202 NOTICE by McAfee Inc JOINT SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED CLAIM TERMS AND ORDER FOR ARGUMENT AT MARKMAN HEARING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parker, Robert)
March 11, 2013 Filing 201 NOTICE of Settlement and Motion to Stay by Alaska Airlines, Inc., Horizon Air Industries, Inc., TQP Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Drake, Kirby)
March 8, 2013 Filing 200 NOTICE by McAfee Inc OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS' TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL (Parker, Robert)
March 8, 2013 Filing 199 SUBMISSION OF JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A(Hoffman, Adam)
March 8, 2013 Filing 198 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC OF SUBMISSION OF TECHNICAL TUTORIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Adam)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #197 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Hao Ni terminated. (No PDF Document Attached). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on March 7, 2013. (jml)
March 6, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED. Document # 195, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 6, 2013 Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
March 6, 2013 Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Nicholas Patariu on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation (Patariu, David)
March 5, 2013 Filing 195 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Attorney Withdrawal (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao) Modified on 3/6/2013 (sm, ).
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with prejudice of all claims and counterclaims between pltf and deft Jefferies & Company Inc. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Motions terminated: #181 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JEFFERIES & COMPANY, INC. filed by TQP Development, LLC.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/4/13. (ehs, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 193 RESPONSE in Opposition re #174 MOTION to Compel filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Affidavit OF ERICH SPANGENBERG, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
March 4, 2013 Filing 192 REPLY to #178 Claim Construction Brief filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between TQP and Valero Energy Corp and Valero Marketing & Supply Co in case 2:11cv399 with prejudice, all attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 3/3/13. (ehs, )
February 28, 2013 Filing 190 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS VALERO ENERGY CORPORATION AND VALERO MARKETING AND SUPPLY COMPANY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jane J Du terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/28/2013. (ch, )
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER appointing David Keyzer as the courts technical advisor.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/28/2013. (ch, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CHS, Inc., Deere & Company, Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Du, Jane)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #177 Motion to Dismiss. Dft Deere & Company are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2013. (ch, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER The Court sua sponte VACATES the Consolidation Order with respect to member case No. 2:11-CV-396. All orders entered in the lead case prior to this Order shall continue to apply in the former member case. The Court intends to keep the former member case on the same schedule as the consolidated action, and to hold joint settings (e.g,. Markman hearing) when appropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2013. (ch, )
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER - The Court sua sponte VACATES the Consolidation Order with respect to member case No. 2:12-CV-59. All orders entered in the lead case prior to this Order shall continue to apply in the former member case. The Court intends to keep the former member case on the same schedule as the consolidated action, and to hold joint settings (e.g,. Markman hearing) whenappropriate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/27/2013. (ch, )
February 27, 2013 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wasif H Qureshi on behalf of CHS, Inc., Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC (Qureshi, Wasif)
February 27, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of CHS, Inc., Deere & Company, Expedia, Inc, Hotwire, Inc., Orbitz, LLC (Bonilla, Ricardo)
February 26, 2013 Filing 181 Joint MOTION to Dismiss JEFFERIES & COMPANY, INC. by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 26, 2013 Filing 180 NOTICE by McAfee Inc re #178 Claim Construction Brief,,, ERRATA TO CORRECT PAGE NUMBERING ON DOCKET 178 - CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF FILED BY DEFENDANTS (Attachments: #1 Errata TO CORRECT PAGE NUMBERING ON DKT. 178)(Parker, Robert)
February 25, 2013 Filing 179 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #178 Claim Construction Brief filed by Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Parker, Robert)
February 25, 2013 Filing 178 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Aflac Incorporated, Alaska Airlines, Inc., Branch Bank and Trust Company, CHS, Inc., Caterpillar Inc., Deere & Company, Disney Online, Expedia, Inc, Fareportal, Inc., Farmers Group, Inc., HSN, Inc., Horizon Air Industries, Inc., Hotwire, Inc., Humana Inc., McAfee Inc, Newegg, Inc., Orbitz, LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, The Boeing Company, The Medical Protective Company, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Errata H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit O, #15 Exhibit P, #16 Exhibit Q, #17 Exhibit R, #18 Exhibit S, #19 Exhibit T, #20 Exhibit U, #21 Exhibit V, #22 Exhibit W, #23 Exhibit X, #24 Exhibit Y, #25 Exhibit Z)(Parker, Robert)
February 25, 2013 Filing 177 Joint MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 20, 2013 Filing 176 Joint MOTION to Stay All Pending Deadlines (for 30 days) by Disney Online, TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Unis, Joseph)
February 15, 2013 Filing 175 Submission of PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kroeger, Paul)
February 15, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 3/12/2013 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (jml)
February 12, 2013 Filing 174 MOTION to Compel by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Muffo, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2013: #8 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER resetting Markman Hearing and briefing deadlines (Markman Hearing set for 3/28/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.),. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/12/13. (ehs, )
February 11, 2013 Filing 173 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING AND HEARING by McAfee Inc.(Parker, Robert) Modified on 2/12/2013 (ehs, ).
February 11, 2013 Filing 172 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting #170 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice allclaims asserted between them in TQP Development, LLC v. Allianz Life Insurance Company of North America, Case No. 2:11-cv-249. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/8/13. (ehs, )
February 7, 2013 Filing 170 Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER, (Markman Hearing set for 3/12/2013 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Jury Selection set for 11/4/2013 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 10/16/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 2/1/2013. (ch, )
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER - consolidating the cases listed in the above-caption for pretrial purposes only. Case No. 2:11-cv-248 is designated as the lead case. ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE UNTIL THIS CONSOLIDATION ORDER IS VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/31/2013. (ch, ) Modified on 1/31/2013 (ch, ).
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order ORDER. In preparation for the March 12, 2013 Markman Hearing, Plaintiff is directed to file its Opening Claim Construction Brief no later than February 11, 2013. Defendants are directed to file their Responsive Brief no later than 14 days later. Plaintiff may file a Reply Brief no later than 7 days after Defendants file their Responsive Brief. The Joint Claim Construction Chart is to be filed no later than March 7, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 1/30/2013. (rsp1)
January 22, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J Bosco, Jr on behalf of Newegg, Inc. (Bosco, James)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and referring this case to United States Magistrate Judge Roy Payne per General Order 13-3. For proposed scheduling order see Appendix E to General Order 13-3. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 7, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Anthony Kroeger on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Kroeger, Paul)
January 4, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 3/12/2013 01:30 PM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Pretrial Conference RESET for 9/30/2013 09:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. (jml)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER REASSIGNING REFERRAL. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne for all pretrial purposes. Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/17/12. (mrm, )
December 17, 2012 Filing 163 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Parties Agreed Upon and Scheduled Mediation (Hoffman, Adam)
December 7, 2012 Filing 162 NOTICE by HSN, Inc. JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT (Muffo, Patrick)
November 26, 2012 Filing 161 NOTICE by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc. JOINT NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH P.R. 4-2 (Muffo, Patrick)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/20/2012. (sm, )
November 19, 2012 Filing 159 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
November 12, 2012 Filing 158 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc.. (Brooks, Anthony)
November 2, 2012 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING #154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by TQP Development, LLC, QVC, Inc. QVC terminated.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/2/2012. (sm, )
November 2, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 155, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 1, 2012 Filing 155 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Support re #150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam) Modified on 11/2/2012 (sm, ).
October 31, 2012 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by QVC, Inc., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER, granting #152 Joint MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alticor, Inc., TQP Development, LLC, Amway Corp. Amway Corp., and Alticor, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/22/12. (mrm, )
October 19, 2012 Filing 152 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
October 19, 2012 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint filed by HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Anthony)
October 2, 2012 Filing 150 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Adam)
September 20, 2012 Filing 149 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc. (Hanasz, Joseph)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER MODIFYING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PROCEDURES granting in part and denying in part #140 Motion to modify claim construction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/20/2012. (sm, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 147 RESPONSE to Motion re #140 MOTION Objection to Order on Claim Construction Briefing and Motion to Modify same filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Hoffman, Adam)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #144 Motion to Coordinate Claim Construction Briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 9/14/12. (bas)
September 12, 2012 Filing 145 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Cert of Conference): #144 Joint MOTION to Coordinate Claim Construction Briefing.. (Brooks, Anthony) Modified on 9/13/2012 (sm, ).
September 12, 2012 Filing 144 Joint MOTION to Coordinate Claim Construction Briefing by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #142 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TQP Development, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Verizon Data Services LLC. Verizon Data Services LLC, and Cellco Partnership terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/10/12. (mrm, )
September 5, 2012 Filing 142 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cellco Partnership, TQP Development, LLC, Verizon Data Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
September 4, 2012 Filing 141 NOTICE by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Verizon Data Services LLC of Designating Lead Defendant (Brooks, Anthony)
August 31, 2012 Filing 140 MOTION for modification of Order on Claim Construction Briefing and objection to orderby Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brooks, Anthony) Modified on 9/4/2012 (sm, ).
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING regarding for efficiency purposes, one Defendant will be designated as Lead Defendant for briefing and arguing claim construction issues and defendants must file a joint notice designating the Lead Defendant 10 days prior to the deadline to exchange proposed terms of contruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/14/2012. (sm, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice re #137 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TQP Development, LLC, Dismissing all claims and counterclaims asserted between plaintiff and Sprint/United Management Company. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/14/2012. (sm, )
July 11, 2012 Filing 137 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Sprint/United Management Company, TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
July 11, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel H Brean on behalf of Newegg, Inc. (Brean, Daniel)
July 2, 2012 Filing 135 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Data Services LLC (Tice, Saritha)
June 19, 2012 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TQP Development, LLC (Hoffman, Adam)
June 13, 2012 Filing 133 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership, Verizon Data Services LLC (Tice, Saritha)
June 13, 2012 Filing 132 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by QVC, Inc. on behalf of all Defendants (Willis, Keith)
June 13, 2012 Filing 131 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Newegg, Inc. (Brooks, Anthony)
June 13, 2012 Filing 130 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sprint/United Management Company in Compliance with Local Rule 3-4(a) (Hargrove, Lindsey)
June 13, 2012 Filing 129 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by QVC, Inc. (Willis, Keith)
June 13, 2012 Filing 128 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp. (Hanasz, Joseph)
June 13, 2012 Filing 127 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HSN, Inc. (Muffo, Patrick)
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Substitute Party. Verizon Communications TERMINATED and Verizon Data Services becomes a dft as to all claims and counterclaims between TQP. Verizon Communications is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on June 8, 2012. (rml, )
June 6, 2012 Filing 125 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
May 30, 2012 Filing 124 STIPULATION for Damages and Discovery for Claims Against Sprint/United Management Company and Related Sprint Entities by Sprint/United Management Company. (Hargrove, Lindsey)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE #86 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/18/2012. (sm, )
May 11, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE to #105 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Verizon Communications, Inc by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
May 11, 2012 Filing 121 RESPONSE to #106 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Cellco Partnership by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
May 11, 2012 Filing 120 RESPONSE to #109 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
May 11, 2012 Filing 119 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Motion Hearing held on 5/11/2012 re #86 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Verizon Communications, Inc., HSN, Inc., Cellco Partnership, Amway Corp., Newegg, Inc., Alticor, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, )
May 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #117 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling and Discovery Order AMENDING to include discovery limitations agreed to in the parties joint case mgt statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/3/2012. (sm, )
May 2, 2012 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #103 Scheduling Order, (Agreed Discovery Limitations) by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company, TQP Development, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
May 1, 2012 Filing 116 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership (Tice, Saritha)
May 1, 2012 Filing 115 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Tice, Saritha)
April 27, 2012 Filing 114 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp. (Hanasz, Joseph)
April 27, 2012 Filing 113 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by QVC, Inc. (Initial Discovery Disclosures served) (Durst, Timothy)
April 27, 2012 Filing 112 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Sprint/United Management Company Initial Disclosures in Compliance with Scheduling Order (Hargrove, Lindsey)
April 27, 2012 Filing 111 NOTICE by Newegg, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Brooks, Anthony)
April 27, 2012 Filing 110 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by HSN, Inc. (Muffo, Patrick)
April 27, 2012 Filing 109 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp.. (Hanasz, Joseph)
April 26, 2012 Filing 108 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sprint/United Management Company.(Hargrove, Lindsey)
April 25, 2012 Filing 107 RESPONSE to #95 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
April 25, 2012 Filing 106 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Cellco Partnership. (Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2012 Filing 105 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 18, 2012 Filing 104 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #86 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
April 17, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #86 Opposed MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 5/11/2012 11:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (lfs, )
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2013 09:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2012. Discovery due by 6/14/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2013.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/16/2012. (sm, )
April 13, 2012 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #86 Opposed MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO STAY filed by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
April 12, 2012 Filing 101 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company, TQP Development, LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Regarding joint Case Management Statement)(Ni, Hao)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant QVC. Attorney Matthew Colagrosso terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on April 11, 2012. (rml, )
April 10, 2012 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 27, 2012, Scheduling Conference before The Honorable Magistrate Judge Caroline M. Craven. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2012. (Crawford, Libby)

April 10, 2012 Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith D Willis on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Willis, Keith)
April 10, 2012 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Matthew Colagrosso) by QVC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling order up to and including April 13, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/9/2012. (sm, )
April 9, 2012 Filing 95 First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by HSN, Inc..(Muffo, Patrick)
April 6, 2012 Filing 94 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Order by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
April 2, 2012 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #86 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Fenster, Marc)
March 28, 2012 Filing 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven: Scheduling Conference held on 3/27/2012. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (lfs, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/27/2012. (sm, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/27/2012. (sm, )
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION PRACTICE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/27/2012. (sm, )
March 26, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of HSN, Inc. (Thames, Earl)
March 23, 2012 Filing 87 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ni, Hao)
March 16, 2012 Filing 86 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint/United Management Company, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 1, 2012 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Fussell, James)
March 1, 2012 Filing 84 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Change of Firm Name (Spangler, Andrew)
February 28, 2012 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick T Muffo for HSN, Inc.,Patrick T Muffo for HSN, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-942) (ehs, )
February 23, 2012 Judge Michael H. Schneider added as presiding judge. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. (sm, )
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER that case is TRANSFERRED to the docket of Honorable Michael Schneider. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (sm, )
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 3/27/2012 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 2/21/2012. (sm, )
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/21/2012. (ch, )
February 16, 2012 Filing 79 NOTICE by TQP Development, LLC of Readiness for a Scheduling Conference (Ni, Hao)
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge Rodney Gilstrap no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/4/2012. (ch, )
December 19, 2011 Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap re: misc order 11-2. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to the case. (rvw, )
November 17, 2011 Filing 77 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Karen L Carroll for Sprint/United Management Company. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-817 (ch, )
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MISC. ORDER 11-1 REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Judge T. John Ward no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10-3-11. (jml, )
August 12, 2011 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Newegg, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
August 1, 2011 Filing 74 ANSWER to #60 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by TQP Development, LLC.(Ni, Hao)
August 1, 2011 Filing 73 ANSWER to #62 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by TQP Development, LLC.(Ni, Hao)
July 25, 2011 Filing 72 RESPONSE to #48 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of QVC, Inc. by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
July 25, 2011 Filing 71 RESPONSE to #54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Newegg Inc. by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
July 25, 2011 Filing 70 RESPONSE to #50 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of HSN, Inc. by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
July 25, 2011 Filing 69 RESPONSE to #53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Amway Corp. and Alticor Inc. by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
July 25, 2011 Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint/United Management Company identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Nextel Corporation for Sprint/United Management Company. (Hargrove, Lindsey)
July 25, 2011 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sprint/United Management Company.(Hargrove, Lindsey)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Substitute Party. Sprint/United Management Company substituted for Sprint Nextel Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/22/11. (ehs, )
July 19, 2011 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by TQP Development, LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2011: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, TQP Development, LLC, and Defendant, Micro Electronics, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of that certain agreement entitled PATENTS IN SUIT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT dated June 8, 2011. It is further ORDERED that all attorneys fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/18/2011. (ch, )
July 14, 2011 Filing 63 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2011 Filing 62 Defendant Verizon Communications Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Verizon Communications, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2011 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc., Corporate Parent Vodafone Group PLC for Cellco Partnership. (Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2011 Filing 60 Defendant Cellco Partnership's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Cellco Partnership.(Smith, Melissa)
July 14, 2011 Filing 59 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E Joffre for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-617) (ehs, )
July 14, 2011 Filing 58 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Saritha K Tice for Verizon Communications, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-617) (ehs, )
July 14, 2011 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice (Stipulated) by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew)
July 11, 2011 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alticor, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Solstice Holdings Inc. for Alticor, Inc.. (Hanasz, Joseph)
July 11, 2011 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amway Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Alticor Corporate Enterprises Inc. for Amway Corp.. (Hanasz, Joseph)
July 11, 2011 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Newegg, Inc..(Yarbrough, Herbert)
July 11, 2011 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp..(Hanasz, Joseph)
July 11, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Micro Electronics, Inc. to 7/26/2011. (ch, )
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Micro Electronics deadline is extended to 7/26/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 7/11/2011. (ch, )
July 11, 2011 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by HSN, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Liberty Media Corporation for HSN, Inc.. (Lanser, Joseph)
July 11, 2011 Filing 50 HSN, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by HSN, Inc..(Lanser, Joseph)
July 11, 2011 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by QVC, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Media Corporation for QVC, Inc.. (Durst, Timothy)
July 11, 2011 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against TQP Development, LLC by QVC, Inc..(Durst, Timothy)
July 11, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Colagrosso on behalf of QVC, Inc. (Colagrosso, Matthew)
July 6, 2011 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Micro Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 6, 2011 Filing 45 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kent E Baldauf, Jr for Newegg, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-6973) (ehs, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 44 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan P Clark for Newegg, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-3973)(ehs, )
July 6, 2011 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony W Brooks for Newegg, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-3973) (ehs, )
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - granting #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft 1-800-Flowers.com Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorney fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/27/2011. (ch, )
June 23, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TQP Development, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
June 23, 2011 Filing 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David E Finkelson for Sprint Nextel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-282) (ehs, )
June 22, 2011 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark L Varboncouer for Sprint Nextel Corporation. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-586) (ehs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 38 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael R Levinson for HSN, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-576) (ehs, )
June 17, 2011 Filing 37 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew A Werber for HSN, Inc..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-575) (ehs, )
June 14, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Micro Electronics, Inc. to 7/11/2011. (ehs, )
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Micro Electronics have up to and including July 11, 2011, to answer. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/13/11. (ehs, )
June 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for HSN, Inc. to 7/11/2011. (ch, )
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HSN Inc deadline is extended to 7/11/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/13/2011. (ch, )
June 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sprint Nextel Corporation to 7/22/2011. (ch, )
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Sprint Nextel Corporation deadline is extended to 7/22/2011. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on 6/13/2011. (ch, )
June 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Alticor, Inc. to 7/11/2011; QVC, Inc. to 7/11/2011; Amway Corp. to 7/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications, Inc. to 7/15/2011; Cellco Partnership to 7/15/2011. 30/33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Alticor, Inc..( Hanasz, Joseph)
June 8, 2011 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amway Corp..( Hanasz, Joseph)
June 8, 2011 Filing 28 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph S Hanasz for Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-553. (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2011: #1 CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION) (ch, ).
June 8, 2011 Filing 27 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura Beth Miller for Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-553. (ch, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re QVC, Inc..( Durst, Timothy)
June 8, 2011 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
June 8, 2011 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership.(Smith, Melissa)
June 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Newegg, Inc. to 7/11/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 8, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of Newegg, Inc. (Gunter, Debra)
June 8, 2011 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Newegg Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 7, 2011 Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Cellco Partnership served CMRR on 5/24/2011. (ch, )
June 7, 2011 Filing 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc. served CMRR on 5/24/2011, answer due 6/14/2011. (ch, )
June 7, 2011 Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Verizon Communications, Inc. served CMRR on 5/20/2011. (ch, )
June 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sprint Nextel Corporation to 7/8/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 7, 2011 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sprint Nextel Corporation.( Hargrove, Lindsey)
June 3, 2011 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Sprint Nextel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hargrove, Lindsey)
June 3, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsey Lauren Hargrove on behalf of Sprint Nextel Corporation (Hargrove, Lindsey)
June 2, 2011 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lanser, Joseph)
June 2, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT (PLEADING DOES NOT MATCH EVENT). Document # 11, Application to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 2, 2011 Filing 17 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***HSN, Inc.'s First Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint.( Lanser, Joseph) Modified on 6/2/2011 (sm, ).
June 1, 2011 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Sprint Nextel Corporation served on 5/18/2011 by CM RRR through registered agent Corporation Servicee Co, answer due 6/8/2011. (ehs, )
June 1, 2011 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Micro Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
May 31, 2011 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. QVC, Inc. served on 5/19/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/9/2011. (ehs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Newegg, Inc. served on 5/19/2011 by CM RRR on Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/9/2011. (ehs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Micro Electronics, Inc. served on 5/19/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Ltd., answer due 6/9/2011. (ehs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. HSN, Inc. served on 5/19/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent Corporation Service Co, answer due 6/9/2011. (ehs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Amway Corp. served on 5/20/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent CT Corporation System, answer due 6/10/2011. (ehs, )
May 31, 2011 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by TQP Development, LLC. Alticor, Inc. served on 5/20/2011 by CM RRR through Registered Agent The Corporation Co, answer due 6/10/2011. (ehs, )
May 20, 2011 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Giza, Alexander)
May 20, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Fenster on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Fenster, Marc)
May 20, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S Hoffman on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Hoffman, Adam)
May 13, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hao Ni on behalf of TQP Development, LLC (Ni, Hao)
May 10, 2011 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Micro Electronics, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Newegg, #2 Nextel, #3 QVC, #4 Verizon)(ehs, )
May 10, 2011 Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Alticor, #2 Amway, #3 Cellco, #4 HSN)(ehs, )
May 9, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available here by clicking on the hyperlink and is also on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
May 9, 2011 Case assigned to Judge T. John Ward. (ch, )
May 6, 2011 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew)
May 6, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringment against 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc., Alticor, Inc., Amway Corp., Cellco Partnership, HSN, Inc., Micro Electronics, Inc., Newegg, Inc., QVC, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Verizon Communications, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3023721.), filed by TQP Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 5,412,730, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TQP Development LLC vs v. 1-800-Flowers.com Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Data Services LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael E Joffre
Represented By: Saritha K Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-800-Flowers.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micro Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amway Corp.
Represented By: Joseph S Hanasz
Represented By: Laura Beth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alticor, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph S Hanasz
Represented By: Laura Beth Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint/United Management Company
Represented By: Karen L Carroll
Represented By: Mark L Varboncouer
Represented By: Lindsey Hargrove Raspino
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSN, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph R Lanser
Represented By: Michael R Levinson
Represented By: Patrick T Muffo
Represented By: Matthew A Werber
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael E Joffre
Represented By: Saritha K Tice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel H Brean
Represented By: Anthony W Brooks
Represented By: Alan D Albright
Represented By: Bryan P Clark
Represented By: Kent E Baldauf, Jr.
Represented By: James J Bosco, Jr
Represented By: Patrick T Muffo
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QVC, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Colagrosso
Represented By: Keith D Willis
Represented By: Timothy S Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newegg Inc
Represented By: Daniel H Brean
Represented By: Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham
Represented By: Anthony W Brooks
Represented By: Edward R Reines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Orbitz, LLC
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: CHS, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Kaaren P Shalom
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Truman Haymaker Fenton
Represented By: R William Beard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Gregory J Commins, Jr
Represented By: William C Bergmann
Represented By: Phong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Fareportal, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Represented By: David James Moraine
Represented By: Gary Lee Hach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Gregory J Commins, Jr
Represented By: William C Bergmann
Represented By: Phong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Humana Inc.
Represented By: F Michael Speed, Jr
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Peter Aaron Kerr
Represented By: Beverly A Marsh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Standley
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Kaaren P Shalom
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Jane J Du
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: McAfee Inc
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Andrew Thompson (Tom) Gorham
Represented By: Robert M Parker
Represented By: Jeffrey Liang
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Adam R Alper
Represented By: Sarah E Piepmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Medical Protective Company
Represented By: Gretchen Porter Miller
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Paul A Gennari
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: John M Caracappa
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Hotwire, Inc.
Represented By: David Brandon Conrad
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Kaaren P Shalom
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Represented By: Jane J Du
Represented By: Eric Brinn Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Gregory J Commins, Jr
Represented By: William C Bergmann
Represented By: Phong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Darin Michael Klemchuk
Represented By: Kirby Blair Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Suntrust Banks, Inc.
Represented By: John P Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Commins, Jr
Represented By: Monica Lateef
Represented By: Robert G Abrams
Represented By: William C Bergmann
Represented By: Phong Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Expedia, Inc
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Represented By: Wasif H Qureshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Horizon Air Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Darin Michael Klemchuk
Represented By: Kirby Blair Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Farmers Group, Inc.
Represented By: Eagle Howard Robinson
Represented By: David Dean Bahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Disney Online
Represented By: Charles Edward Phipps
Represented By: Joseph A Unis, Jr.
Represented By: Anthony Michael Vecchione
Represented By: Roy William Hardin
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Jefferies & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mark John Ziegelbein
Represented By: Daniel Thomas O'Brien
Represented By: Keith Bryan Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Aflac Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan T Pumpian
Represented By: Keith Miles Aurzada
Represented By: John Clay Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TQP Development, LLC
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: Michael T Boardman
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Anthony W Brooks
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: James A Fussell, III
Represented By: Judith Lynn Meadow
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party defendant: Radware, Inc.
Represented By: Fabio Elia Marino
Represented By: Judith Seuk Han Hom
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Mandy H Kim
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party plaintiff: Branch Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Charles Edward Phipps
Represented By: Anthony Michael Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Robert W Faulkner
Represented By: Robert W Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: TQP Development LLC
Represented By: Adam S Hoffman
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: Andrew W. Spangler
Represented By: Marc A Fenster
Represented By: James A Fussell, III
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?