Bianco MD vs Globus Medical Inc
Plaintiff: Sabatino Bianco MD
Defendant: Globus Medical Inc
Case Number: 2:2012cv00147
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 9/6/2017. (ch, )
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 10/27/2014. (ch, )
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 7/14/2014. (ch, )
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 7/1/2014. (ch, )
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 5/12/2014. (ch, )
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 3/17/2014. (ch, )
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON EQUITABLE CLAIMS. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 3/6/2014. (ch, )
January 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/11/14. (mrm, )
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 186 Motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge William C. Bryson on 1/6/14. (bas, )
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY FILED IN ERROR BY CLERK PLEASE IGNORE***MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/14/12. (ehs, ) Modified on 11/15/2012 (ehs, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bianco MD vs Globus Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabatino Bianco MD
Represented By: Iftikhar Ahmed
Represented By: Charles Everingham, IV
Represented By: Michael Simons
Represented By: David M Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globus Medical Inc
Represented By: Russell Brandon Bundren
Represented By: Thomas W Sankey
Represented By: Jennifer Brown Trillsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?