Rotatable Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Rotatable Technologies LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc., Callvine, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Target Corporation and Whole Foods Market, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00292
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 183
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/30/2012. (ch, )
October 29, 2012 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO COMPLY WITH P.R. 3-3 AND 3-4 (INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS) by Apple Inc., Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brucculeri, Louis)
October 5, 2012 Filing 67 NOTICE by Apple Inc. APPLE INC.S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPH 1 OF THE DISCOVERY ORDER (Rutherford, Keith)
August 31, 2012 Filing 66 ANSWER to 56 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Target Corporation by Rotatable Technologies LLC.(ch, )
August 31, 2012 Filing 65 ANSWER to 54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Netflix, Inc. by Rotatable Technologies LLC.(ch, )
August 31, 2012 Filing 64 ANSWER to 53 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Electronic Arts, Inc. by Rotatable Technologies LLC.(Moore, Stevenson)
August 31, 2012 Filing 63 ANSWER to 49 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by Rotatable Technologies LLC.(Moore, Stevenson)
August 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation of Dismissal. Rotatables claims against Whole Foods are hereby dismissed with prejudice Rotatable and Whole Foods shall each bear their own attorney fees and costs incurred in connection with this action. This Court retains jurisdiction over the parties and the settlement agreement for purposes of resolving any dispute that may arise under it. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/20/2012. (ch, )
August 17, 2012 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Whole Foods Market, Inc. by Rotatable Technologies LLC, Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER - to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the first-filed action, Cause No. 2:12-cv-265. All parties are instructed to file any future motions (except relating to venue) in the first-filed case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer following the upcoming August 29, 2012 scheduling conference to discuss the entry of uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the Court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/17/2012. (ch, )
August 17, 2012 ***All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating venue) in Lead Case 2:12-cv265** (ch, )
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply. Rotatable Technologies LLC deadline is 9/5/2012 to comply with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2. Dfts deadline is 11/21/2012 to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/16/2012. (ch, )
August 15, 2012 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notices of Compliance with P.R. 3-1, 3-2, 3-3, and 3-4 by Apple Inc., Callvine, Inc., Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Quickoffice, Inc., Rotatable Technologies LLC, Target Corporation, Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Stevenson)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Whole Foods Market Inc deadline is 8/17/2012. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/13/2012. (ch, )
August 13, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Whole Foods Market, Inc. to 8/17/2012. (ch, )
August 10, 2012 Filing 56 TARGET CORPORATION ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Rotatable Technologies LLC by Target Corporation.(DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 54 NETFLIX, INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Rotatable Technologies LLC by Netflix, Inc..(DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC ARTS, INC.'S ANSWER to 1 Complaint AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Rotatable Technologies LLC by Electronic Arts Inc..(DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netflix, Inc. (DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts Inc. (DeMarchi, Virginia)
August 10, 2012 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Rutherford, Keith)
August 10, 2012 Filing 49 DEFENDANT APPLE INC.S ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Rotatable Technologies LLC by Apple Inc..(Rutherford, Keith)
August 10, 2012 Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yates, John)
August 10, 2012 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Quickoffice, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Google Inc. for Quickoffice, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
August 10, 2012 Filing 46 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Quickoffice, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
August 2, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keana Theresa Taylor on behalf of Apple Inc. (Taylor, Keana)
August 2, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan K Knoll on behalf of Apple Inc. (Knoll, Susan)
August 2, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Louis Brucculeri on behalf of Apple Inc. (Brucculeri, Louis)
August 2, 2012 Filing 42 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cathleen G Garrigan for Quickoffice, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 41 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel C Callaway for Quickoffice, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 40 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene Y Mar for Quickoffice, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 2, 2012 Filing 39 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Roderick M Thompson for Quickoffice, Inc.. (pkb, )
August 1, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Callvine, Inc. to 9/5/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
July 31, 2012 Filing 38 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Callvine, Inc..( Yates, John)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard S Zembek terminated as counsel for deft Target Corp. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/31/12. (ehs, )
July 30, 2012 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zembek, Richard)
July 27, 2012 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rotatable Technologies LLC. Callvine, Inc. served on 7/16/2012, answer due 8/6/2012. (ehs, )
July 24, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J David Hadden on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Target Corporation (Hadden, J)
July 23, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Yates, John)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED) Attorney Charles Craig Tadlock terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on July 23, 2012. (jrg1, ) Modified on 7/23/2012 (sm, ).
July 20, 2012 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Craig Tadlock) by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
July 19, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
July 19, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
July 19, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan J Marton on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Target Corporation (Marton, Ryan)
July 17, 2012 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren E Donnelly on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Target Corporation (Donnelly, Darren)
July 17, 2012 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Tiewei Wang on behalf of Rotatable Technologies LLC (Wang, Timothy)
July 17, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Craig Saunders, II on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Target Corporation (Saunders, Michael)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 8/29/2012 09:45 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/12. (mrm, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Apple Inc deadline is extended to 8/10/2012. No further extensions of time shall be granted without showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/11/2012. (ch, )
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix Inc., and Target Corporation deadline is etended to 8/10/2012. No further extensions will be granted without showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/11/2012. (ch, )
July 12, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Electronic Arts Inc. to 8/10/2012; Netflix, Inc. to 8/10/2012; Target Corporation to 8/10/2012. (ch, )
July 12, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc. to 8/10/2012. (ch, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Original Complaint by Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albright, Alan)
July 10, 2012 Filing 20 SUMMONS Issued as to Callvine, Inc.. (ch, )
July 6, 2012 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Electronic Arts Inc., Netflix, Inc., Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeMarchi, Virginia)
July 6, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virginia K DeMarchi on behalf of Target Corporation (DeMarchi, Virginia)
July 6, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virginia K DeMarchi on behalf of Electronic Arts Inc. (DeMarchi, Virginia)
July 6, 2012 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rutherford, Keith)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Quickoffice, Inc., has until August 10, 2012, to answer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/5/12. (ehs, )
July 5, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Quickoffice, Inc. to 8/10/2012. (ehs, )
July 3, 2012 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Quickoffice, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
June 13, 2012 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Target Corporation.( Zembek, Richard)
June 13, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Target Corporation to 7/9/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
June 12, 2012 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Whole Foods Market, Inc..( Hempfling, John)
June 12, 2012 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Moore, Stevenson)
June 12, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 7/11/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 12, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Whole Foods Market, Inc. to 7/11/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 5, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Netflix, Inc. to 7/11/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 4, 2012 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Netflix, Inc..( DeMarchi, Virginia)
June 4, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Virginia K DeMarchi on behalf of Netflix, Inc. (DeMarchi, Virginia)
May 31, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rotatable Technologies LLC. Apple Inc. served on 5/18/2012, answer due 6/8/2012; Electronic Arts Inc. served on 5/21/2012, answer due 6/11/2012; Netflix, Inc. served on 5/21/2012, answer due 6/11/2012; Quickoffice, Inc. served on 5/21/2012, answer due 6/11/2012; Target Corporation served on 5/18/2012, answer due 6/8/2012; Whole Foods Market, Inc. served on 5/18/2012, answer due 6/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Whole Foods Market Inc, # 2 Target Corp, # 3 Electronic Arts Inc, # 4 Quickoffice Inc, # 5 Netflix Inc)(ehs, )
May 31, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Quickoffice, Inc. to 7/11/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
May 30, 2012 Filing 7 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Quickoffice, Inc..( Tadlock, Charles)
May 30, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Craig Tadlock on behalf of Quickoffice, Inc. (Tadlock, Charles)
May 21, 2012 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
May 21, 2012 Case assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
May 17, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc., (Attachments: # 1 Electronics Arts Inc, # 2 Netflix Inc, # 3 Quickoffice Inc, # 4 Target Corporation, # 5 Whole Foods Market Inc)(ch, )
May 15, 2012 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Moore, Stevenson)
May 15, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3589680.), filed by Rotatable Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotatable Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rotatable Technologies LLC
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callvine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netflix, Inc.
Represented By: Virginia K DeMarchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quickoffice, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Craig Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Richard S Zembek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market, Inc.
Represented By: John Henry Hempfling, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?