Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. FedEx Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Defendant: FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.
In Re: Wm Stephen Boyd
Not Classified By Court: David Folsom and Scott Woloson
Case Number: 2:2016cv00980
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Marshall Office
County: Harrison
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 601 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/29/2019. (nkl, )
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/29/2019. (nkl, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER denying #569 Sealed Motion, FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/28/2019. (nkl, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 598 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 PLAINTIFF INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING 35 U.S.C. 101 (Kellman, Alan)
March 14, 2019 Filing 597 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 ; DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING THE INELIGIBILITY OF THE PATENTS-IN-SUIT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER - the Court hereby ORDERS that each party separately submit proposedfindings of fact and conclusions of law addressing the same within seven (7) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/6/2019. (nkl, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 595 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Defendants' Notice Of Relevant Determinations From Related Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Office Action in Reexamination of '581 patent)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting #593 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lauren Michelle Nowierski terminated. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/10/2018. (nkl, )
December 7, 2018 Filing 593 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Unopposed Motion to Allow Lauren M. Nowierski to Withdraw as Counsel by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Adam)
November 30, 2018 Filing 592 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Defendants' Notice Of Relevant Determinations From Related Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Office Action in Reexamination of '356 patent, #2 Exhibit B, Office Action in Reexamination of '715 patent)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 591 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #590 Response to Non-Motion,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DTX-406 (Replacement)(R-AEO)[FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2018 Filing 590 RESPONSE to #589 Brief,,,,,,, Defendants' Response to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Defendants' Invalidity Contentions (March 14, 2017), #2 Exhibit 2, D10 - '581 Invalidity Contentions Claim Chart - Stephenson, #3 Exhibit 3, D12 - '581 Invalidity Contentions Claim Chart - FedEx Systems, #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (May 2, 2018), #5 Exhibit DTX-092, #6 Exhibit DTX-100, #7 Exhibit DTX-101, #8 Exhibit DTX-224, #9 Exhibit DTX-226, #10 Exhibit DTX-299, #11 Exhibit DTX-376, #12 Exhibit DTX-379)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2018 Filing 589 BRIEF filed Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59 (Dkt. 561) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - IPR Petition 581 Patent, #2 Exhibit 15 - IPR Petition 356 Patent, #3 Exhibit 16 - IPR Petition 715 Patent, #4 Exhibit 17 - IPR Petition 586 Patent, #5 Exhibit 18 - IPR Institution Decision 581 Patent, #6 Exhibit 19 - IPR Institution Decision 356 Patent, #7 Exhibit 20 - IPR Institution Decision 715 Patent, #8 Exhibit 21 - IPR Institution Decision 586 Patent, #9 Exhibit 22 - IPR Final Written Decision 581 Patent, #10 Exhibit 23 - IPR Final Written Decision 586 Patent, #11 Exhibit 24A - IPR Order on Conduct of Proceedings 581 Patent, #12 Exhibit 24B - IPR Order on Conduct of Proceedings 586 Patent, #13 Exhibit 25 - Follow-On IPR Petition 581 Patent, #14 Exhibit 26 - Follow-On IPR Petition 586 Patent, #15 Exhibit 27 - Follow-On IPR Institution Decision 581 Patent, #16 Exhibit 28 - Follow-On IPR Institution Decision 586 Patent, #17 Exhibit 29 - Reexam Request 581 Patent, #18 Exhibit 30 - IPR Conference Call Transcript 5-7-18, #19 Exhibit 31 - 154 Cong. Rec. 22625, #20 Exhibit 32 - 157 Cong. Rec. 2710, #21 Exhibit 33 - 157 Cong. Rec. 13187, #22 Exhibit 34 - Williams Demonstratives, #23 Exhibit 35 - Excerpt of TT-3A regarding third limitation, #24 Exhibit 36 - Excerpt of TT-3P regarding fifth limitation, #25 Exhibit 37 - Biscotti Inc v Microsoft Corp, #26 Exhibit 38 - Biscotti-Dkt260, #27 Exhibit 39 - Biscotti-Dkt238, #28 Exhibit 40 - Bailey Testimony, #29 Exhibit 41 - Bailey Demonstratives)(Nowierski, Lauren)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER granting #587 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59 (Re: Dkt. 561). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/30/2018. (nkl, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 587 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing on Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and Motion for a New Trial Under Rule 59 (Re: Dkt. 561) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
August 27, 2018 Filing 586 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 - Plaintiff's NOTICE Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order of Final Written Decisions in Inter Partes Review Proceedings (Re: Dkt. 561) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Final Written Decision in Case IPR2017-0729, #2 Attachment 2 - Final Written Decision in Case IPR2017-0787, #3 Attachment 3 - Final Written Decision in Case IPR2017-0859)(Davis, William)
August 1, 2018 Filing 585 REDACTION to #584 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50 - FedEx Production Document, #2 Exhibit 51 - FedEx Production Document, #3 Exhibit 52 - UNDER SEAL-REDACTED IN FULL, #4 Exhibit 53 - Excerpt 2018-04-11 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit 54 - UNDER SEAL-REDACTED IN FULL, #6 Exhibit 55 - UNDER SEAL-REDACTED IN FULL, #7 Exhibit 56 - UNDER SEAL-REDACTED IN FULL)(Kellman, Alan)
July 31, 2018 Filing 584 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #569 Opposed SEALED MOTION , FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 50 - FedEx Production Document, #2 Exhibit 51 - FedEx Production Document, #3 Exhibit 52 - Excerpt - Ost Dep Tr (R-AEO), #4 Exhibit 53 - Excerpt 2018-04-11 Hearing Transcript, #5 Exhibit 54 - Excerpt - Melissa Wagner Dep Tr (R-AEO), #6 Exhibit 55 - Excerpt - Mulanax Dep Tr (R-AEO), #7 Exhibit 56 - Excerpt - Engels Opn Exp Rpt (R-AEO))(Kellman, Alan)
July 24, 2018 Filing 583 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 - Case IPR2017-00729, Paper No. 41, #2 Exhibit 24 - Excerpt of Trial Transcript Day 5 AM, #3 Exhibit 25 - IPR2017-00787, Paper No. 37)(Nowierski, Lauren)
July 24, 2018 Filing 582 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #581 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - Excerpts of Melissa Wagner's Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 37 - IV's '586 Infringement Cont. (Ex. E) (Jan. 17, 2017) [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 581 REPLY to Response to Motion re #569 Opposed SEALED MOTION , FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET, #2 Exhibit 35 - IV's First 30(b)(6) Notice of Dep (Sept. 20, 2017), #3 Exhibit 36 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (Dec. 19, 2017), #4 Exhibit 37 - UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2018 Filing 580 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Rhyne demonstrative (slide 62), #2 Exhibit 2 - Screen Capture from DTX-299, #3 Exhibit 3 - DTX 379)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2018 Filing 579 REDACTION to #576 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,, Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response in Opposition to Motion re #569 Opposed SEALED MOTION, FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - REDACTED IN FULL, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from February 16, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - March 31, 2017 Email, #4 Exhibit 3 - March 29, 2017 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 - April 3, 2017 Email, #6 Exhibit 5 - REDACTED IN FULL, #7 Exhibit 6 - April 1, 2017 Email, #8 Exhibit 7 - REDACTED IN FULL, #9 Exhibit 8 - REDACTED IN FULL, #10 Exhibit 9 - REDACTED IN FULL, #11 Exhibit 10 - REDACTED IN FULL, #12 Exhibit 11 - June 21, 2017 Email, #13 Exhibit 12 - June 23, 2017 Email, #14 Exhibit 13 - REDACTED IN FULL, #15 Exhibit 14 - REDACTED IN FULL, #16 Exhibit 15 - REDACTED IN FULL, #17 Exhibit 16 - REDACTED IN FULL, #18 Exhibit 17 - REDACTED IN FULL, #19 Exhibit 18 - REDACTED IN FULL, #20 Exhibit 19 - REDACTED IN FULL, #21 Exhibit 20 - REDACTED IN FULL, #22 Exhibit 21 - Excerpt from December 19, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #23 Exhibit 22 - REDACTED IN FULL, #24 Exhibit 23 - REDACTED IN FULL, #25 Exhibit 24 - REDACTED IN FULL, #26 Exhibit 25 - Excerpt from FedExs February 21, 2017 Initial Disclosures, #27 Exhibit 26 - REDACTED IN FULL, #28 Exhibit 27 - Excerpt from FedExs October 6, 2017 Second Amended Initial Disclosures, #29 Exhibit 28 - REDACTED IN FULL, #30 Exhibit 29 - REDACTED IN FULL, #31 Exhibit 30 - REDACTED IN FULL, #32 Exhibit 31 - REDACTED IN FULL, #33 Exhibit 32 - January 16, 2018 Email, #34 Exhibit 33 - January 24-26, 2018 Email Chain, #35 Exhibit 34 - May 31, 2017 Email, #36 Exhibit 35 - REDACTED IN FULL, #37 Exhibit 36 - Excerpt from April 16, 2018 Hearing Transcript, #38 Exhibit 37 - December 17, 2017 Email, #39 Exhibit 38 - REDACTED IN FULL, #40 Exhibit 39 - April 23, 2018 Email, #41 Exhibit 40 - May 6, 2018 Email, #42 Exhibit 41 - May 8, 2018 Email, #43 Exhibit 42 - April 30, 2018 Email, #44 Exhibit 43 - May 6, 2018 Email, #45 Exhibit 44 - May 7, 2018 Email, #46 Exhibit 45 - May 12, 2018 Email, #47 Exhibit 46 - November 30, 2016 Letter, #48 Exhibit 47 - December 19, 2016 Letter, #49 Exhibit 48 - Excerpt from May 17, 2018 a.m. Trial Transcript, #50 Exhibit 49 - Excerpt from March 21, 2018 Hearing Transcript, #51 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
July 17, 2018 Filing 578 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #577 Reply to Response to Motion re #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt from Engels, Daniel - IV Direct Demonstratives, #2 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt from PTX-0499)(Nowierski, Lauren)
July 17, 2018 Filing 577 REPLY to Response to Motion re #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Nowierski, Lauren)
July 17, 2018 Filing 576 SEALED Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response in Opposition to Motion re #569 Opposed SEALED MOTION , FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - FedEx Deposition Witnesses, #2 Exhibit 1 Excerpt from February 16, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 March 31, 2017 Email, #4 Exhibit 3 March 29, 2017 Email, #5 Exhibit 4 April 3, 2017 Email, #6 Exhibit 5 September 19, 2017 Letter, #7 Exhibit 6 April 1, 2017 Email, #8 Exhibit 7 Excerpt from February 3, 2018 Deposition of V. Thomas Rhyne, Ph.D., #9 Exhibit 8 April 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Exhibit 9 April 28, 2017 Email, #11 Exhibit 10 June 19, 2017 Email, #12 Exhibit 11 June 21, 2017 Email, #13 Exhibit 12 June 23, 2017 Email, #14 Exhibit 13 July 17, 2017 Letter, #15 Exhibit 14 July 27, 2017 Letter, #16 Exhibit 15 July 31, 2017 Letter, #17 Exhibit 16 Excerpt from IVs July 27, 2017 Second Set of Interrogatories, #18 Exhibit 17 August 2, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit 18 Excerpt from December 6, 2017 Deposition of Hari Thapa, #20 Exhibit 19 December 6, 2017 Email, #21 Exhibit 20 December 7, 2017 Email, #22 Exhibit 21 Excerpt from December 19, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #23 Exhibit 22 Excerpt from December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D., #24 Exhibit 23 Excerpt from December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Omid Kia, #25 Exhibit 24 Excerpt from December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Jacob Sharony, Ph.D., #26 Exhibit 25 Excerpt from FedExs February 21, 2017 Initial Disclosures, #27 Exhibit 26 IVs September 20, 2017 First 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition, #28 Exhibit 27 Excerpt from FedExs October 6, 2017 Second Amended Initial Disclosures, #29 Exhibit 28 March 21, 2017 Email, #30 Exhibit 29 October 24, 2017 Email, #31 Exhibit 30 November 2, 2017 Email, #32 Exhibit 31 October 20, 2017 Email, #33 Exhibit 32 January 16, 2018 Email, #34 Exhibit 33 January 24-26, 2018 Email Chain, #35 Exhibit 34 May 31, 2017 Email, #36 Exhibit 35 August 2-7, 2017 Email Chain, #37 Exhibit 36 Excerpt from April 16, 2018 Hearing Transcript, #38 Exhibit 37 December 17, 2017 Email, #39 Exhibit 38 Excerpt from February 12, 2018 Deposition of Daniel Engels, Ph.D., #40 Exhibit 39 April 23, 2018 Email, #41 Exhibit 40 May 6, 2018 Email, #42 Exhibit 41 May 8, 2018 Email, #43 Exhibit 42 April 30, 2018 Email, #44 Exhibit 43 May 6, 2018 Email, #45 Exhibit 44 May 7, 2018 Email, #46 Exhibit 45 May 12, 2018 Email, #47 Exhibit 46 November 30, 2016 Letter, #48 Exhibit 47 December 19, 2016 Letter, #49 Exhibit 48 Excerpt from May 17, 2018 a.m. Trial Transcript, #50 Exhibit 49 Excerpt from March 21, 2018 Hearing Transcript, #51 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
July 17, 2018 Filing 575 REPLY to Response to Motion re #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 14, 2018 PM), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 17, 2018 AM), #3 Exhibit 3 - Fed. Prac. & Proc. Civ. 2578, Preparation of Findings, #4 Exhibit 4 - Final Written Decision, IPR2017-00787 ('715 patent), #5 Exhibit 5 - Decision Granting Ex Parte Reexamination, Control No. 90014,097 (715 patent), #6 Exhibit 6 - Decision Granting Ex Parte Reexamination, Control No. 90014,096 (356 patent))(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2018 Filing 574 REDACTION to #569 Opposed SEALED MOTION , FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. A) [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. B) [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. C) [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. D) [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. E) [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6 - IV's 5th Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 1st ROGs [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit 7 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of D. Williams [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit 8 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit 9 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of C. Hohberger [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit 10 - Defs' Expert Rebuttal Rpt. of Dr. Stiroh [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit 11 - IV's Expert Rpt. of M. Wagner [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit 12 - IV's Expert Rpt. of Dr. Engels [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit 13 - IV's Expert Rpt. of Dr. Sharony [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 14, 2018 PM), #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt of Dr. Engels' Demonstratives [REDACTED IN FULL], #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 15, 2018 PM), #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (Dec. 19, 2017), #18 Exhibit 18 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (April 11, 2018), #19 Exhibit 19 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (April 16, 2018), #20 Exhibit 20 - Ltr. dated Dec. 3, 2016 from J. Berkowitz to L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #21 Exhibit 21 - Ltr. dated July 27, 2017 from E. Cook to L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #22 Exhibit 22 - Ltr. dated Aug. 2, 2017 from E. Cook to L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #23 Exhibit 23 - IV's Fifth Amended Exhibit List [REDACTED IN FULL], #24 Exhibit 24 - Email dated Dec. 17, 2017 from L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #25 Exhibit 25 - Email dated Aug. 7, 2017 from K. Petrie [REDACTED IN FULL], #26 Exhibit 26 - Email dated May 6, 2018 from K. Petrie [REDACTED IN FULL], #27 Exhibit 27 - Email dated May 5, 2018 from D. Tucker [REDACTED IN FULL], #28 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts of Dr. Engels' Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #29 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts of Dr. Engels, Dep. Vol. II [REDACTED IN FULL], #30 Exhibit 30 - Defs' 1st Suppl. Resp. to IV's ROGs (Nos. 2, 7-9, 15) [REDACTED IN FULL], #31 Exhibit 31 - Excerpts of T. Kennedy's Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpts of Melissa Wagner's Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #33 Exhibit 33 - Memo. Opinion & Order - Elbit Sys. v. Hughes, 2-15-cv-37, #34 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2018 Filing 573 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #572 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DTX-012 (Replacement)(R-AEO)[FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit DTX-406 (Replacement)(R-AEO)[FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit DTX-408 (Replacement)(R-AEO)[FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit PTX-0213 (RESTRICTED-ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY)[FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit PTX-0499 (RESTRICTED-ATTORNEYS' EYES ONLY)[FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2018 Filing 572 RESPONSE in Opposition re #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trial Tr. (Day1 AM), #2 Exhibit 2 - Trial Tr. (Day1 PM), #3 Exhibit 3 - Trial Tr. (Day2 AM), #4 Exhibit 4 - Trial Tr. (Day2 PM), #5 Exhibit 5 - Trial Tr. (Day3 AM), #6 Exhibit 6 - Trial Tr. (Day3 PM), #7 Exhibit 7 - Trial Tr. (Day4 AM), #8 Exhibit 8 - Trial Tr. (Day4 PM), #9 Exhibit 9 - Trial Tr. (Day5 AM), #10 Exhibit 10 - Trial Tr. (Day5 PM), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of FedEx Closing Demonstratives, #12 Exhibit 12 - Memo Opinion and Order - Realtime Data v Actian Corp. (EDTX 6-15-cv-00463-491), #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts of Dr. Sharony Direct Demonstrative, #14 Exhibit 14 - Trial Tr. (Charge Conf.), #15 Exhibit DTX-036, #16 Exhibit DTX-100, #17 Exhibit DTX-101, #18 Exhibit DTX-214, #19 Exhibit DTX-219, #20 Exhibit DTX-299, #21 Exhibit DTX-519, #22 Exhibit DTX-523, #23 Exhibit DTX-615, #24 Exhibit PTX-0004, #25 Exhibit PTX-0219, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2018 Filing 571 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #570 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Opposition To FedEx's Rule 52 Motion Of Invalidity Of The Asserted Patents Under 35 U.S.C. 101. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18 - PTX-0195 (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 19 - PTX-0201 (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 20 - PTX-0286 (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 21 - PTX-0194 (Under Seal))(Nowierski, Lauren)
July 10, 2018 Filing 570 RESPONSE in Opposition re #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 8,494,581, #2 Exhibit 2 - US Patent 9,047,586, #3 Exhibit 3 - US Patent 7,199,715, #4 Exhibit 4 - US Patent 6,909,356, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-04-16 Pretrial Hearing Day 2 Transcript (Excerpted), #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018-05-02 Pretrial Hearing Day 3 Transcript (Excerpted), #7 Exhibit 7 - 2018-05-15 Trial Transcript Day 2 - AM (Excerpted), #8 Exhibit 8 - 2018-05-15 Trial Transcript Day 2 - PM (Excerpted), #9 Exhibit 9 - 2018-05-16 Trial Transcript Day 3 - AM (Excerpted), #10 Exhibit 10 - 2018-05-16 Trial Transcript Day 3 - PM (Excerpted), #11 Exhibit 11 - 2018-05-17 Trial Transcript 4 - AM (Excerpted), #12 Exhibit 12 - 2018-05-17 Trial Transcript Day 4 - PM (Excerpted), #13 Exhibit 13 - 2018-06-11 Email from D. Tucker, #14 Exhibit 14 - DTX 100, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2017-00750 - Paper 007 - 2017-07-12 - Institution Decision, #16 Exhibit 16 - 2017-02028 - Paper 009 - 2018-02-21 - Institution Decision, #17 Exhibit 17 - DTX 523, #18 Exhibit 18 - UNDER SEAL Slip Sheet, #19 Exhibit 19 - UNDER SEAL Slip Sheet, #20 Exhibit 20 - UNDER SEAL Slip Sheet, #21 Exhibit 21 - UNDER SEAL Slip Sheet, #22 Exhibit 22 - PTX-0220 (Excerpted), #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
July 2, 2018 Filing 569 Opposed SEALED MOTION , FedEx Defendants Motion For An Award Of Attorneys' Fees Under 35 U.S.C. 285 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. A) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. B) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. C) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. D) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5 - IV's Fifth Amended Contentions (Ex. E) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6 - IV's 5th Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 1st ROGs [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit 7 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of D. Williams [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit 8 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit 9 - Defs' Expert Rpt. of C. Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit 10 - Defs' Expert Rebuttal Rpt. of Dr. Stiroh [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit 11 - IV's Expert Rpt. of M. Wagner [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit 12 - IV's Expert Rpt. of Dr. Engels [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit 13 - IV's Expert Rpt. of Dr. Sharony [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 14, 2018 PM) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt of Dr. Engels' Demonstratives [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts of Trial Tr. (May 15, 2018 PM) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (Dec. 19, 2017) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #18 Exhibit 18 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (April 11, 2018) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #19 Exhibit 19 - Excerpts of Hearing Tr. (April 16, 2018) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #20 Exhibit 20 - Ltr. dated Dec. 3, 2016 from J. Berkowitz to L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #21 Exhibit 21 - Ltr. dated July 27, 2017 from E. Cook to L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #22 Exhibit 22 - Ltr. dated Aug. 2, 2017 from E. Cook to L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #23 Exhibit 23 - IV's Fifth Amended Exhibit List [FILED UNDER SEAL], #24 Exhibit 24 - Email dated Dec. 17, 2017 from L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #25 Exhibit 25 - Email dated Aug. 7, 2017 from K. Petrie [FILED UNDER SEAL], #26 Exhibit 26 - Email dated May 6, 2018 from K. Petrie [FILED UNDER SEAL], #27 Exhibit 27 - Email dated May 5, 2018 from D. Tucker [FILED UNDER SEAL], #28 Exhibit 28 - Excerpts of Dr. Engels' Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #29 Exhibit 29 - Excerpts of Dr. Engels' Dep. Vol. II [FILED UNDER SEAL], #30 Exhibit 30 - Defs' 1st Suppl. Resp. to IV's ROGs (Nos. 2, 7-9, 15) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #31 Exhibit 31 - Excerpts of T. Kennedy's Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #32 Exhibit 32 - Excerpts of Melissa Wagner's Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #33 Exhibit 33 - Memo. Opinion & Order - Elbit Sys. v. Hughes, 2-15-cv-37 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #34 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER granting #566 Motion to Amend the Post-Verdict Docket Control Order and to Extend Time to File Briefing on FedExs Rule 52 Motion. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/21/2018. (nkl, )
June 20, 2018 Filing 567 REDACTION to #560 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Redacted in Full, #2 Exhibit 15 - Redacted in Full)(Findlay, Eric)
June 20, 2018 Filing 566 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #555 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and to Extend Time to File Briefing on FedEx's Rule 52 Motion (Re: Dkt. 559) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER granting #563 Joint MOTION Regarding Costs and Judgments. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/19/2018. (ch, )
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER granting #558 Motion for Leave to File Exceed pages. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/19/2018. (ch, )
June 18, 2018 Filing 563 Joint MOTION Regarding Costs and Judgments by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
June 18, 2018 Filing 562 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - DTX-406 (UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit - PTX-0088 (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit - PTX-0089 (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit - PTX-0090 (UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit - PTX-0099 (UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit - PTX-0117 (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit - PTX-0119 (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit - PTX-0161 (Part 1 of 2) (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit - PTX-0161 (Part 2 of 2) (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit - PTX-0162 (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit - PTX-0166 (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit - PTX-0201 (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit - PTX-0213 (UNDER SEAL), #14 Exhibit - PTX-0341 (UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit - PTX-0342 (UNDER SEAL), #16 Exhibit - PTX-0425 (UNDER SEAL), #17 Exhibit - PTX-0467 (UNDER SEAL), #18 Exhibit - PTX-0499 (UNDER SEAL), #19 Exhibit - PTX-0625 (UNDER SEAL))(Kellman, Alan)
June 18, 2018 Filing 561 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) ( Responses due by 7/3/2018), MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-05-14 Trial Tr. DAY 1 - PM, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-05-15 Trial Tr. DAY 2 - AM, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2018-05-15 Trial Tr. DAY 2 - PM, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018-05-16 Trial Tr. DAY 3 - AM, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-05-16 Trial Tr. DAY 3 - PM, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018-05-17 Trial Tr. DAY 4 - AM, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2018-05-17 Trial Tr. DAY 4 - PM, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2018-05-18 Trial Tr. DAY 5 - AM, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2018-04-11 Hearing Transcript, #10 Exhibit 10 - FedEx Opening Slide 16, #11 Exhibit 11 - Fluke Direct Slide 4, #12 Exhibit - DTX 100, #13 Exhibit - DTX 101, #14 Exhibit - PTX-0001, #15 Exhibit - PTX-0002, #16 Exhibit - PTX-0003, #17 Exhibit - PTX-0004, #18 Exhibit - PTX-0082, #19 Exhibit - PTX-0220, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
June 18, 2018 Filing 560 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 - Deposition of Dr. Engels, #2 Exhibit 15 - PTX-0090)(Findlay, Eric)
June 18, 2018 Filing 559 Opposed MOTION DEFENDANTS' RULE 52 MOTION OF INVALIDITY OF THE ASSERTED PATENTS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - PTX-0003 ('581), #3 Exhibit 2 - PTX-0004 ('586), #4 Exhibit 3 - PTX-0002 ('715), #5 Exhibit 4 - PTX-0001 ('356), #6 Exhibit 5 - 5.14.18 Afternoon Session Excerpts, #7 Exhibit 6 - 5.15.18 Morning Session Excerpts, #8 Exhibit 7 - 5.15.18 Afternoon Session Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 8 - 5.16.18 Morning Session Excerpts, #10 Exhibit 9 - 5.16.18 Afternoon Session, #11 Exhibit 10 - 581 File History, #12 Exhibit 11 - LeVander US6216108, #13 Exhibit 12 - DTX 219, #14 Exhibit 13 - Cover Sheet Only - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Engels, #16 Exhibit 15 - Cover Sheet Only - Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 16 - Multicode, #18 Exhibit 17 - interNetShip)(Findlay, Eric)
June 18, 2018 Filing 558 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motions Under Rule 50 and Rule 59 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
June 18, 2018 Filing 557 PROPOSED BILL OF COSTS filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elliot C. Cook in Support of FedEx Defendants' Unopposed Bill of Costs, #2 Exhibit A - Fees for Deposition Transcripts and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit B - Fees for Hearing Transcripts, #4 Exhibit C - Fees for Witnesses, #5 Exhibit D - Fees for Exemplification and Copying, #6 Exhibit E - Fees for Court-Appointed Experts)(Findlay, Eric)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER re #538 Judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/15/2018. (nkl, )
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #554 Motion to Amend/Correct the Post-Verdict Docket Control Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/4/2018. (nkl, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 554 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #539 Order, Scheduling Order - Joint Motion to Amend the Post-Verdict Docket Control Order by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2018: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
May 22, 2018 Filing 553 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/18/18 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/18/18 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 551 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/18 (Charge Conference) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 550 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 549 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/18 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 548 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/17/18 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 547 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/16/18 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 546 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/16/18 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 545 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 544 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/18 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 543 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 542 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/18 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 541 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/14/18 (Trial Transcript - Afternoon Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 540 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/14/18 (Trial Transcript - Morning Session) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2018. (sholmes, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 539 POST-VERDICT DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/21/2018. (ch, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 538 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/21/2018. (ch, )
May 18, 2018 Filing 537 SEALED Jury Notes. (jml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 536 SEALED DOCUMENT UNREDACTED JURY VERDICT (jml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 535 JURY VERDICT. (jml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 534 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held and completed on 5/18/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 533 Defendants' Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
May 18, 2018 Filing 532 Plaintiff's Final Trial Exhibit List. (jml)
May 17, 2018 Filing 531 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 5/17/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 16, 2018 Filing 530 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 5/16/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 15, 2018 Filing 529 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Trial held on 5/15/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 14, 2018 Filing 528 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Jury Selection and Trial held on 5/14/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER finding as moot #184 Motion to Strike Over-Length Opposition Briefs (. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/11/2018. (nkl, )
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER denying #136 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying #137 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying #139 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying #140 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on May 10, 2018. (jml)
May 8, 2018 Filing 525 REDACTION to #523 Sealed Patent Document by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER granting #522 Motion to Redact re #479 Transcript,,,,. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/7/2018. (ch, )
May 7, 2018 Filing 523 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's ANSWER to (Dkt. 491) Defendants' Amended Counterclaims (Re: Dkts. 491 and 115) (Davis, William)
May 4, 2018 Filing 522 Unopposed MOTION to Redact #479 Transcript,,,, - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to REDACT Portions of the April 11, 2018 Pretrial Hearing Transcript (Re: Dkts. 479 and 490) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 4, 2018 Filing 520 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Przybylski on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6765427. (Przybylski, Jennifer)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS FROM MAY 2, 2018 PRETRIAL HEARING re #514 Opposed MOTION re #506 Order, Terminate Motions, #504 Order on Sealed Motion, - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion for Clarification of Dkts. 504 and 506 and Request for Oral Argument at May 2, 2018 Hearing filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #483 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc., #481 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #482 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/3/2018. (nkl, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 518 Sealed Transcript. (sholmes, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 517 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/2/18 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/24/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2018. (sholmes, )

May 3, 2018 Filing 516 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on May 2, 2018 - Final Pretrial Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
May 2, 2018 Filing 521 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Final Pretrial Conference held on 5/2/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER TO PURCHASE JURY MEALS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/01/2018. (klc, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 514 Opposed MOTION re #506 Order,,,,, Terminate Motions,,,, #504 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion for Clarification of Dkts. 504 and 506 and Request for Oral Argument at May 2, 2018 Hearing (Re: Dkts. 504 and 506) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 1, 2018 Filing 513 REDACTION to #511 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts of H. Thapa Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts of R. Fluke Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
May 1, 2018 Filing 512 REDACTION to #510 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2018 Filing 511 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #481 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26 - Excerpts of H. Thapa Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 27 - Excerpts of R. Fluke Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2018 Filing 510 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #482 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2018 Filing 509 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to SEALED Reply #501 to SEALED Response (492) to SEALED Motion #483 to Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Davis, William)
April 27, 2018 Filing 508 REDACTION to #502 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - FedEx 1D Barcode Specification (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 7 - Second Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D concerning U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
April 27, 2018 Filing 507 REDACTION to #500 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Excerpt from Clive Hohberger, Ph.D's Deposition Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS FROM MARCH 21, 2018 PRETRIAL HEARING re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc., #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/27/2018. (nkl, )
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2018. (ch, )
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER MEMORIALIZING RULINGS FROM THE APRIL 11, 2018AND APRIL 16, 2018 PRETRIAL HEARINGS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/26/2018. (ch, )
April 26, 2018 Filing 503 REDACTION to #501 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M - Excerpts of D. Engels' Opening Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit N - Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit O - Excerpts of C. Hohberger's Expert Rebuttal Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2018 Filing 502 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Sealed Response #493 to and in Support of Sealed Motion #482 to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - FedEx 1D Barcode Specification, #2 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D, #3 Exhibit 7 - Second Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D concerning U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586) (Davis, William)
April 25, 2018 Filing 501 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #483 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M - Excerpts of D. Engels' Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit N - Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit O - Excerpts of C. Hohberger's Expert Rebuttal Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 25, 2018 Filing 500 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Sealed Response #494 and in support to Sealed Motion #481 to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Excerpt from Clive Hohberger, Ph.D's Deposition Transcript) (Davis, William)
April 25, 2018 Filing 499 REDACTION to #492 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Supplemental Report of Daniel W. Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Opening Expert Report of S. Ackley (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Hohberger Deposition Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of IV's Infringement Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Opening Report of Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Rebuttal Report of Clive Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Ackley Deposition Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Curriculum Vitae of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of Engels' Deposition Transcript (Volume 2) (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
April 24, 2018 Filing 498 REDACTION to #494 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Portions of Dr. Hohberger's Rebuttal Report to be Stricken [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of R. Fluke's Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of H. Thapa Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger's Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5 - D. Engels' Opening Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6 - Peterson Dep. Exhibit 10 [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit 7 - H. Thapa Dep. Exhibit 13 [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit 8 - A. Madhavan Dep. Exhibit 15 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. Vol III [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit 10 - Hohberger's Opening Expert Rpt [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit 11 - D. Engels' Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit 12 - Ackley's Opening Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit 13 - Appendix E09 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit 14 - Appendix E11 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE + interNetShip [REDACTED IN FULL], #15 Exhibit 15 - Appendix E12 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE + FedEx Ship [REDACTED IN FULL], #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts of Engels' Dep. Vol. II [REDACTED IN FULL], #17 Exhibit 17 - FDXIV00020775, Decl. Mark Reboulet, #18 Exhibit 18 - FDXIV00020838, ANSI 1991, #19 Exhibit 19 - D. Engels' 2nd Suppl Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #20 Exhibit 20 - T. Bailey Dep. Exhibit 2 [REDACTED IN FULL], #21 Exhibit 21 - Excerpts of W. Peterson Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #22 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts of S. Ackley Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #23 Exhibit 23 - FedEx Bar Code Layout and Spec, Exhibit 37 [REDACTED IN FULL], #24 Exhibit 24 - Label from David Grus (2d), Exhibit 36 [REDACTED IN FULL], #25 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts of C. Hohberger's Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2018 Filing 497 REDACTION to #493 Sealed Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US 9,047,586, #2 Exhibit 2 - Engels Inf. Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3 - 2d Supp. Engels Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger Noninf. Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5 - Ackley Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6 - Ackley Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER - The Court issues this Order sua sponte. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/2018. (nkl, )
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER ON JURY SELECTION AND PRESENTATION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/23/2018. (nkl, )
April 23, 2018 Filing 494 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #481 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Portions of Dr. Hohberger's Rebuttal Report to be Stricken [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of R. Fluke's Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of H. Thapa Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger's Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5 - D. Engels' Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6 - Peterson Dep. Exhibit 10 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit 7 - H. Thapa Dep. Exhibit 13 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit 8 - A. Madhavan Dep. Exhibit 15 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. Vol III [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit 10 - Hohberger's Opening Expert Rpt [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit 11 - D. Engels' Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit 12 - Ackley's Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit 13 - Appendix E09 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit 14 - Appendix E11 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE + interNetShip [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit 15 - Appendix E12 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE + FedEx Ship [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts of Engels' Dep. Vol. II [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit 17 - FDXIV00020775, Decl. Mark Reboulet [FILED UNDER SEAL], #18 Exhibit 18 - FDXIV00020838, ANSI 1991 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #19 Exhibit 19 - D. Engels' 2nd Suppl Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #20 Exhibit 20 - T. Bailey Dep. Exhibit 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #21 Exhibit 21 - Excerpts of W. Peterson Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #22 Exhibit 22 - Excerpts of S. Ackley Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #23 Exhibit 23 - FedEx Bar Code Layout and Spec, Exhibit 37 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #24 Exhibit 24 - Label from David Grus (2d), Exhibit 36 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #25 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts of C. Hohberger's Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2018 Filing 493 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #482 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US 9,047,586 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2 - Engels Inf. Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3 - 2d Supp. Engels Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger Noninf. Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5 - Ackley Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6 - Ackley Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2018 Filing 492 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #483 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Second Supplemental Report of Daniel W. Engels, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opening Expert Report of S. Ackley, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Hohberger Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of IV's Infringement Contentions, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Opening Report of Daniel Engels, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Rebuttal Report of Clive Hohberger, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Ackley Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 8 - Curriculum Vitae of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of Engels' Deposition Transcript (Volume 2), #10 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
April 23, 2018 Filing 491 RESPONSE to #115 Sealed Patent Document, "FedEx Defendants' Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2018 Filing 490 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by William Ellsworth Davis, III re #479 Transcript,,,,. (Davis, William)
April 19, 2018 Filing 489 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pretrial Hearing Proceedings held on 4/16/18 before Judge Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tammy Goolsby, Telephone number: 903/445-5355. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/14/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/24/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2018. (dlc, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 488 REDACTION to #483 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opening Expert Report of S. Ackley [AEO] [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B - Second Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels re '586 [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger on Non-Infringement ('586) [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D - Materials Considered - Engels Opening Rpt. (Ex. E) [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E - Materials Considered - Engels Rebuttal Rpt. (Ex. E) [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F - Opening Expert Report of Clive Hohberger [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G - US Patent 9,047,586, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Engels [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I - Exhibit E to IV's Fifth Amended Contentions [AEO] [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J - Versata v. SAP, #11 Exhibit K - FDXIV00022025 [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Dep. of Dr. Daniel Engels (Vol. 2) [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 18, 2018 Filing 487 REDACTION to #482 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-02-08 Ackley Expert Report (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Ackley, Sprague - 2018-04-12 Depo Tr - Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger, Clive - 2018-01-19 Depo Tr - Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Text of Proposed Order - (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
April 18, 2018 Filing 486 REDACTION to #481 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-02-08 Ackley Opening Expert Report (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-03-21 Hearing Transcript, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Madhavan, Ajay Depo Tr - 2017-11-02, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Fluke, Robin Depo Tr - 2017-11-08, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Peterson, William Depo Tr - 2017-11-29, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Thapa, Hari Depo Tr - 2017-12-06, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017-12-19 Expert Report Dr. Engels, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - Hohberger, Clive Depo Tr - 2018-01-19, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Ackley Depo Ex 03 (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit 11 - Ackley, Sprague Depo Tr - 2018-04-12, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - Thapa, Hari Depo Tr - 2017-12-13, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - 2018.04.13 Defs' 282 Prior Art Notice, Excerpted (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Exhibit 14 - Ackley Expert Report Exhibit C - ASTRA 30 Spec-ref (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit 15 - 2018-0-11 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Engels, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Text of Proposed Order - (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
April 18, 2018 Filing 485 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on April 16, 2018 - Interim Pretrial Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
April 16, 2018 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/2018. (Court Reporter Tammy Goolsby.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
April 16, 2018 Filing 483 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Strike And Exclude Certain Opinions Of Dr. Daniel W. Engels' Second Supplemental Report by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opening Expert Report of S. Ackley [AEO] [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B - Second Supplemental Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels re '586 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C - Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger on Non-Infringement ('586) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D - Materials Considered - Engels Opening Rpt. (Ex. E) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E - Materials Considered - Engels Rebuttal Rpt. (Ex. E) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F - Opening Expert Report of Clive Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G - US Patent 9,047,586 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H - Excerpts of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Engels [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I - Exhibit E to IV's Fifth Amended Contentions [AEO] [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J - Versata v. SAP [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K - FDXIV00022025 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L - Excerpts of Dep. of Dr. Daniel Engels (Vol. 2) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2018 Filing 482 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-02-08 Ackley Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Ackley, Sprague - 2018-04-12 Depo Tr - Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 3 - U.S. Patent 9,047,586, #4 Exhibit 4 - Hohberger, Clive - 2018-01-19 Depo Tr - Excerpted, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 16, 2018 Filing 481 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2018-02-08 Ackley Opening Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2018-03-21 Hearing Transcript, Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Madhavan, Ajay Depo Tr - 2017-11-02, Excerpted, #4 Exhibit 4 - Fluke, Robin Depo Tr - 2017-11-08, Excerpted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Peterson, William Depo Tr - 2017-11-29, Excerpted, #6 Exhibit 6 - Thapa, Hari Depo Tr - 2017-12-06, Excerpted, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017-12-19 Expert Report Dr. Engels, Excerpted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, Excerpted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Hohberger, Clive Depo Tr - 2018-01-19, Excerpted, #10 Exhibit 10 - Ackley Depo Ex 03, #11 Exhibit 11 - Ackley, Sprague Depo Tr - 2018-04-12, Excerpted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Thapa, Hari Depo Tr - 2017-12-13, Excerpted, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2018.04.13 Defs' 282 Prior Art Notice, Excerpted, #14 Exhibit 14 - Ackley Expert Report Exhibit C - ASTRA 30 Spec-ref, #15 Exhibit 15 - 2018-0-11 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Engels, Excerpted, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 16, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
April 13, 2018 Filing 480 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #273 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 13, 2018 Filing 479 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/11/18 (Pretrial Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2018. (sholmes, )

April 13, 2018 Filing 478 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/5/18 (Telephone Conference) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2018. (sholmes, )

April 12, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Interim Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/16/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***Please note that only the TIME for the hearing has changed.***(jml)
April 12, 2018 Filing 476 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine, #447 SEALED MOTION , "Defendants' Motions In Limine" - Parties' Joint NOTICE OF LETTER to the Honorable Chief Judge Rodney Gilstrap (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to the Honorable Chief Judge Rodney Gilstrap)(Davis, William)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/11/2018. (nkl, )
April 11, 2018 Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/11/2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
April 11, 2018 Filing 474 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #430 Order - Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding Payment to Special Liaison (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2018 Filing 473 REDACTION to #468 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,, Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Dr. Engels' Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 19, 2017 Dr. Sharony Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 3 - FedEx Services About FedEx Website, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dkt. 681 Realtime v. T-Mobile Hearing Transcript, Excerpted, #5 Exhibit 5 - September 8, 2017 IV 2nd Amended Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit 6 - December 6, 2017 IV Discovery Responses, Excerpted, #7 Exhibit 7 - December 19, 2017 Wagner Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #8 Exhibit 8 - January 11, 2018 Stiroh Rebuttal Expert Report, Excerpted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Swearingen Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #10 Exhibit 10 - FedEx Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Excerpted, #11 Exhibit 11 - Model Patent Jury Instructions, Excerpted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Stiroh Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #13 Exhibit 13 - July 31, 2017 Email from Nowierski to Cook, #14 Exhibit 14 - October 20, 2017 Defendants' Discovery Responses, Excerpted, #15 Exhibit 15 - March 14, 2018 Email from Nowierski to Cook, #16 Exhibit 16 - March 16, 2018 Email from Cook to Nowierski, #17 Exhibit 17 - Petrosky Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #18 Exhibit 18 - February 16, 2017 Motion Hearing Transcript, Excerpted, #19 Exhibit 19 - PTX-0681, #20 Exhibit 20 - PTX-0682, #21 Exhibit 21 - Defendants' Witness List, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Malz, Jordan)
April 10, 2018 Filing 472 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on April 5, 2018 - Telephonic Status Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER denying #330 Motion for Separate Trials. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/10/2018. (nkl, )
April 9, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES RE JURY QUESTIONNAIRES: The Court permits the parties to submit proposed Juror Questionnaires to the Court to be sent to potential jurors with the Jury Summons. If the parties wish to have a Juror Questionnaire sent to potential jurors, the parties must meet and confer and submit a JOINT Proposed Juror Questionnaire to Peter Hillegas, Peter_Hillegas@txed.uscourts.gov, by 10:00 a.m., April 20, 2018. The Questionnaire should not exceed two single-sided pages in length and should be submitted as both a PDF file and Word document. (jml)
April 6, 2018 Filing 470 Proposed Jury Instructions by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Davis, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 469 Proposed Pretrial Order - JOINT PRETRIAL ORDER by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Witness List, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Witness List, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Non-Final Deposition Designations, Defendants' Non-Final Objections and Counter-Designations, and Plaintiff's Non-Final Objections to Defendants' Counter-Designations and Counter-Counter-Designations, #4 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Non-Final Deposition Designations, Plaintiff's Non-Final Objections and Counter-Designations, and Defendants' Non-Final Objections to Plaintiff's Counter-Designations, #5 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Third Amended Trial Exhibit List with Defendants' Objections, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Updated Trial Exhibit List with Plaintiff's Objections)(Davis, William)
April 6, 2018 Filing 468 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #447 Defendants' Motions In Limine filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Dr. Engels' Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #2 Exhibit 2 - December 19, 2017 Dr. Sharony Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 3 - FedEx Services About FedEx Website, #4 Exhibit 4 - Dkt. 681 Realtime v. T-Mobile Hearing Transcript, Excerpted, #5 Exhibit 5 - September 8, 2017 IV 2nd Amended Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit 6 - December 6, 2017 IV Discovery Responses, Excerpted, #7 Exhibit 7 - December 19, 2017 Wagner Opening Expert Report, Excerpted, #8 Exhibit 8 - January 11, 2018 Stiroh Rebuttal Expert Report, Excerpted, #9 Exhibit 9 - Swearingen Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #10 Exhibit 10 - FedEx Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Excerpted, #11 Exhibit 11 - Model Patent Jury Instructions, Excerpted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Stiroh Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #13 Exhibit 13 - July 31, 2017 Email from Nowierski to Cook, #14 Exhibit 14 - October 20, 2017 Defendants' Discovery Responses, Excerpted, #15 Exhibit 15 - March 14, 2018 Email from Nowierski to Cook, #16 Exhibit 16 - March 16, 2018 Email from Cook to Nowierski, #17 Exhibit 17 - Petrosky Deposition Transcript, Excerpted, #18 Exhibit 18 - February 16, 2017 Motion Hearing Transcript, Excerpted, #19 Exhibit 19 - PTX-0681, #20 Exhibit 20 - PTX-0682, #21 Exhibit 21 - Defendants' Witness List, #22 Text of Proposed Order) (Malz, Jordan)
April 6, 2018 Filing 467 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MIL 2 - Excerpt Williams Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B - MIL 2 - Excerpt Williams Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C - MIL 2 - Excerpt Rhyne Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D - MIL 2 - Excerpt Rhyne Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E - MIL 2 - Excerpt Hohberger Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F - MIL 2 - Excerpt Hohberger Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G - MIL 4 - Volume Contribution [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H - MIL 5 - PerdiumCo v. Industrack [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I - MIL 6 - Excerpt Hari Thapa Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J - MIL 6 - Excerpt Robin Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K - MIL 8 - Realtime Data v. T-Mobile [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L - MIL 9 - March 2017 e-mail [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M - MIL 9 - Excerpt Defs' Supp. Responses to IVs ROGs (21) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N - MIL 11B - Excerpt Invalidity Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O - MIL 11B - Excerpt Invalidity Appendix D12 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit P - MIL 12 - Mobile Telecomms [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit Q - MIL 14, 15, 17, 19 - Excerpt Stiroh Rebuttal Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2018 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Interim Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
April 6, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/11/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER re 366 Sealed Order, #459 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Take Full Seven-Hour Deposition of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/5/2018. (nkl, )
April 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 4/5/2018. The Court held the conference regarding #459 Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Deposition Hours for Mr. Sprague Ackley. Counsel present on the call were Messrs. Davis, Kellman, Findlay, Ivey and Berkowitz. The Court modified its prior Order granting the Parties four (4) additional deposition hours to conduct depositions related to Mr. Ackley's expert report and Plaintiff's rebuttal report to permit the Parties five and a half (5.5) hours to conduct such depositions. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
April 5, 2018 Filing 465 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #459 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Take Full Seven-Hour Deposition of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Emails between counsel [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/3/18 (Telephonic Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR, TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (sholmes, )
April 4, 2018 Filing 463 REDACTION to #447 SEALED MOTION , "Defendants' Motions In Limine" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Order [Dkt. 301] E.D. Tex. (6-16-cv-00961), #2 Exhibit B, Order [Dkt. 379] E.D. Tex. (1-14-cv-00104), #3 Exhibit C, Order on MIL [Dkt. 261] E.D. Tex. (2-15-cv-01047), #4 Exhibit D, Order [Dkt. 599] E.D. Tex. (6-10-cv-00493), #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of IV's 2nd Suppl Resps to 3rd Set of Rogs (Nos. 16, 19, 21, 22) [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of Thomas Choi Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Order [Dkt. 254] E.D. Tex. (2-15-cv-01470), #8 Exhibit H, Order [Dkt. 177] E.D. Tex. (4-16-cv-00105), #9 Exhibit I, Order [Dkt. 599] E.D. Tex. (6-10-cv-00493), #10 Exhibit J, Order on MIL [Dkt. 440] E.D. Tex. (2-16-cv-00052), #11 Exhibit K, Order on MIL [Dkt. 253] - E.D. Tex. (6-16-cv-00080), #12 Exhibit L, Email from L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit M, Order [Dkt. 458] - D. Del. (1-10-cv-00004), #14 Exhibit N, Order [Dkt. 953] - D. Nev. (2-04-cv-01676), #15 Exhibit O, Order on MIL [Dkt. 490] - E.D. Tex. (2-16-cv-00437), #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER re #459 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Take Full Seven-Hour Deposition of Mr. Sprague Ackley filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/5/2018 01:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/4/2018. (nkl, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 461 REDACTION to #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
April 3, 2018 Filing 460 REDACTION to #459 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Take Full Seven-Hour Deposition of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
April 3, 2018 Filing 459 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Take Full Seven-Hour Deposition of Mr. Sprague Ackley by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
April 3, 2018 Filing 458 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on April 3, 2018 - Telephonic Status Conference before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
April 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 4/3/2018. Counsel on the call were Messrs. Davis, Kellman, Findlay, Ivey and Berkowitz. The Court held the conference to discuss #436 Plaintiff's Notice of Conflict. The Court Ordered Plaintiff's counsel to meet and confer with its expert witness regarding trial availability. Additionally, the Court indicated the trial would proceed, as scheduled, on May 14, 2018. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (jml)
April 3, 2018 Filing 457 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Conference)(Davis, William)
April 2, 2018 Filing 456 RESPONSE to #115 Sealed Patent Document, "FedEx Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2018 Filing 455 RESPONSE to #414 Notice (Other), #437 Response to Non-Motion "FedEx Defendants' Reply In Support Of Notice Of Compliance In Connection With Joint Status Report [Dkt. 256]" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Mark A. Petrosky)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2018 Filing 454 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Re: Dkt. 329) (Davis, William)
April 2, 2018 Filing 453 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Compliance of Service Regarding Objections to Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2018 Filing 452 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance of Service Regarding Objections to Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 329) (Davis, William)
April 2, 2018 Filing 451 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT AND REAL TIME REPORTING (Findlay, Eric)
April 2, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 448 submitted NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE. Correction should be made by one business day (ch, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 450 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 - Kinetic Concepts - Order, #2 Exhibit 32 - ContentGuard - Hearing Tr, Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 33 - Mobile Tele - Hearing Tr, Excerpted, #4 Exhibit 34 - 2017-10-10 E-mail from Cook to Nowierski, #5 Exhibit 35 - 2017-12-19 Email from Berkowitz to Kellman, #6 Exhibit 36 - DTX 129, Excerpted, #7 Exhibit 37 - DTX 167_Part1, #8 Exhibit 37 - DTX 167_Part2, #9 Exhibit 38 - DTX 168, #10 Exhibit 39 - DTX 169, #11 Exhibit 40 - DTX 170, #12 Exhibit 41 - DTX 228, #13 Exhibit 42 - DTX 229, #14 Exhibit 43 - DTX 447, #15 Exhibit 44 - DTX 504, #16 Exhibit 45 - DTX 505, #17 Exhibit 46 - DTX 506, #18 Exhibit 47 - DTX 507, #19 Exhibit 48 - DTX 508, #20 Exhibit 49 - DTX 509, #21 Exhibit 50 - DTX 510, #22 Exhibit 51 - DTX 511, #23 Exhibit 52 - DTX 512, #24 Exhibit 53 - DTX 513, #25 Exhibit 54 - DTX 514, #26 Exhibit 55 - Gross Tr, Excerpted, #27 Exhibit 56 - 2017-11-03 E-mail from Nowierski to Counsel, #28 Exhibit 57 - 2017-12-04 E-mail from Nowierski to Counsel, #29 Exhibit 58 - 2017-09-20 IV Notice of 30(b)(1) Deposition - Mulanax, #30 Exhibit 59 - 2017-09-20 IV Notice of 30(b)(1) Deposition - Patton, #31 Exhibit 60 - 2018-02-08 Opening Expert Report of S. Ackley, Excerpted, #32 Exhibit 61 - Bailey Tr, Excerpted)(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 30, 2018 Filing 449 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - IV-FEDEX00024665, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2017-05-24 FedEx Proposed Claim Terms for Construction (PR 4-1), #3 Exhibit 3 - 2017-10-06 Defs Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2018-03-05 FedEx Deposition Designations, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2018-03-05 FedEx Witness List, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2018-03-28 FedEx Updated Trial Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017-08-28 Rog Resp - Excerpted, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2017-10-20-Response to ROGs 3, 4, 7-13, 21, 24 - Excerpted, #9 Exhibit 9 - 2017-12-08 Rog Resp - Excerpted, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2017-12-19 Hearing Transcript, #11 Exhibit 11 - Fluke Tr, Excerpted, #12 Exhibit 12 - Grus Tr, Excerpted, #13 Exhibit 13 - 2018-03-21 Hearing Transcript, #14 Exhibit 14 - Paschke Tr, Excerpted, #15 Exhibit 15 - Stiroh Tr, Excerpted, #16 Exhibit 16 - Thapa Tr Vols I and II, Excerpted, #17 Exhibit 17 - Weisfeld Tr, Excerpted, #18 Exhibit 18 - FDXIV00033519, #19 Exhibit 19 - FDXIV00033779, #20 Exhibit 20 - FDXIV00138807, Excerpted, #21 Exhibit 21 - 2018-02-13 E-mail from Nowierski to Counsel, #22 Exhibit 22 - 2018-03-05 E-mail from Rosenberger to Counsel, #23 Exhibit 23 - 2018-03-16 E-mail from Cook to Nowierski, #24 Exhibit 24 - Hohberger Rpt, Excerpted, #25 Exhibit 25 - Williams Rpt, Excerpted, #26 Exhibit 26 - Sharony Rebuttal Rpt, Excerpted, #27 Exhibit 27 - Stiroh Rebuttal Rpt, #28 Exhibit 28 - 2018-01-29 Williams Suppl Rebuttal Rpt, #29 Exhibit 29 - 2018-02-12 Stiroh Suppl Rebuttal Rpt, #30 Exhibit 30 - DDR Holdings - Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 30, 2018 Filing 448 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motions in Limine by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren) Modified on 4/2/2018 (ch, ).
March 30, 2018 Filing 447 SEALED MOTION , "Defendants' Motions In Limine" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Order [Dkt. 301] E.D. Tex. (6-16-cv-00961) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Order [Dkt. 379] E.D. Tex. (1-14-cv-00104) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Order on MIL [Dkt. 261] E.D. Tex. (2-15-cv-01047) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Order [Dkt. 599] E.D. Tex. (6-10-cv-00493) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of IV's 2nd Suppl Resps to 3rd Set of Rogs (Nos. 16, 19, 21, 22) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of Thomas Choi Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Order [Dkt. 254] E.D. Tex. (2-15-cv-01470) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Order [Dkt. 177] E.D. Tex. (4-16-cv-00105) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Order [Dkt. 599] E.D. Tex. (6-10-cv-00493) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, Order on MIL [Dkt. 440] E.D. Tex. (2-16-cv-00052) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, Order on MIL [Dkt. 253] - E.D. Tex. (6-16-cv-00080) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L, Email from L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M, Order [Dkt. 458] - D. Del. (1-10-cv-00004) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N, Order [Dkt. 953] - D. Nev. (2-04-cv-01676) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O, Order on MIL [Dkt. 490] - E.D. Tex. (2-16-cv-00437) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 4/3/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.***(jml)
March 28, 2018 Filing 446 REDACTION to #441 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 58 - FedEx Services Website (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 59 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 11 (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 60 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 5 (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 61 - Excerpted Moore Exhibit 3 (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit 62 - Excerpted Moore Exhibit 11 (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 63 - Excerpted David Grus Deposition Transcript (2018-01-30) (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 64 - Excerpted Grus Exhibit 9 (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 65 - Excerpted Robin Fluke Deposition Transcript (2017-11-08) (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 28, 2018 Filing 445 REDACTION to #440 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40 - U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 41 - Declaration of Dr. Engels - Dated March 9, 2018 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 28, 2018 Filing 444 REDACTION to #439 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X - Excerpt of Mr. Williams' Deposition Transcript (2018-01-30))(Davis, William)
March 28, 2018 Filing 443 REDACTION to #438 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 7,267,279 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 16 - U.S. Patent No. 8,157,173 (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit 17 - U.S. Patent No. 7,070,103 (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit 18 - Excerpt of Exhibit E to 5th Amended Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 28, 2018 Filing 442 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #430 Order - Plaintiff's NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Payment to Special Liaison (Re: Dkt. 430) (Davis, William)
March 27, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONIC Status Conference re #436 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC - Plaintiff's Notice of Conflict set for 3/29/2018 08:15 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. ***The Court's telephone number is (903) 938-8452. The parties are to contact the Court AFTER all parties have joined the call. Participants should use a landline phone connection. Cell phones are not to be used unless prior leave is granted by the Court, which leave will only be granted in exceptional circumstances.***(jml)
March 26, 2018 Filing 441 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #404 to Response #353 to Defendants' Motion #275 for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,047,586, 6,909,356, 7,199,715, and 8,494,581 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 58 - FedEx Services Website, #2 Exhibit 59 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 60 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 61 - Excerpted Moore Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 62 - Excerpted Moore Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 63 - Excerpted David Grus Deposition Transcript (2018-01-30), #7 Exhibit 64 - Excerpted Grus Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 65 - Excerpted Robin Fluke Deposition Transcript (2017-11-08) (Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 440 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #405 to Response #354 to Defendants' Motion #277 for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,909,356 and Patent No. 7,199,715 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 40 - U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356, #2 Exhibit 41 - Declaration of Dr. Engels - Dated March 9, 2018)(Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 439 Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #402 to Response #352 to Defendants' #276 Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit X - Excerpt of Mr. Williams' Deposition Transcript (2018-01-30) (Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 438 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #406 to Response #356 to Defendants' Motion #274 for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 - U.S. Patent No. 7,267,279, #2 Exhibit 16 - U.S. Patent No. 8,157,173, #3 Exhibit 17 - U.S. Patent No. 7,070,103, #4 Exhibit 18 - Excerpt of Exhibit E to 5th Amended Infringement Contentions) (Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 437 RESPONSE to #414 Notice (Other), - Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Compliance (Dkt. 414) in Connection with Joint Status Report (Dkt. 256) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 436 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC - Plaintiff's Notice of Conflict (Re: Dkt. 329) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Case Management Order Confirming the May 14-18, 2018 Trial Date for Apple v. Samsung and Mr. Wagner's Appearance as an Expert Witness)(Davis, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 435 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #270 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2018 Filing 434 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/21/18 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/27/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (sholmes, )

March 23, 2018 Filing 433 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on March 21, 2018 - Motion Hearing (Re: Dkt. 425) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
March 23, 2018 Filing 432 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Enforceability of the Patents-in-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2018 Filing 431 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 430 ORDER TO PAY SPECIAL LIASION. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/23/2018. (nkl, )
March 22, 2018 Filing 429 REDACTION to #406 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, Excerpts of Engels Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit K, Excerpts of Engels Rebuttal Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit L, US 8,157,173, #4 Exhibit M, US 7,267,279, #5 Exhibit N, US 9,047,586)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2018 Filing 428 REDACTION to #405 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit M, Excerpts of T. Mulanax Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit N, Excerpts of Melissa Wagner Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2018 Filing 427 REDACTION to #404 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, Fluke Dep. Exhibit 7 [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit J, Excerpt of Madhavan Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit K, Excerpt of Peterson Dep. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2018 Filing 426 REDACTION to #402 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 21, 2018 Filing 425 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2018 re #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use, #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
March 21, 2018 Filing 424 REDACTION to #411 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Invalidity Contentions - Dated 03-14-2017 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 6,952,645 (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Supplemental Interrogatory Responses - Dated 05-12-2017 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 423 REDACTION to #410 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 422 REDACTION to #409 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - Defendants' Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures - Dated 10-06-2017 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 421 REDACTION to #408 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 - Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report and Exhibits of Lauren J. Stiroh, Ph.D - Dated 02-12-2018 (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 20 - FedEx Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 7-13, 15, 18, 21, 23-27) (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 21 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D Concerning the Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,909,356, 7,199,715 and 9,047,586 (Excerpted) (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 420 REDACTION to #407 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Wolfe Exhibit #08 (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit H - Excerpt of Mr. Stanley Deposition Transcript - Dated 11-02-2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit I - Wolfe Exhibit #07 (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit J - Excerpt - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit K - FedEx Discovery Doc - FDXIV00622078 (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit L - Excerpt of Opening Report of Mr. Williams (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 419 REDACTION to #403 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 418 REDACTION to #400 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 417 REDACTION to #397 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 21, 2018 Filing 416 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian J Hurt on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Hurt, Christian)
March 20, 2018 Filing 415 REDACTION to #394 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 7,593,751 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Deposition of Bobby Nations Dated November 8, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Intellectual's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 7-13, 15, 18, 21, 23-27 (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit H - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 7,267,279 (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, Ph.D. (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 20, 2018 Filing 414 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #256 Status Report (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2018 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives, #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art, #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use, #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger, #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger : Motions Hearing set for 3/21/2018 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 20, 2018 Filing 413 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Service of Rebuttal Pretrial Disclosures and Objections to Pretrial Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 329) (Davis, William)
March 20, 2018 Filing 412 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Service of Rebuttal Pre-Trial Disclosures [Dkt. 329] (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 411 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #365 to Response #328 to Defendants' SEALED Motion #263 to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 - Defendants' Invalidity Contentions - Dated 03-14-2017, #2 Exhibit 7 - U.S. Patent No. 6,952,645, #3 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Supplemental Interrogatory Responses - Dated 05-12-2017) (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 410 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #363 to Response #321 to Defendants' SEALED Motion #266 to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 409 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #361 to Response #323 to FedEx Defendants' Motion #259 To Strike The Opinions And Expert Report Of Michael Wagner filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 34 - Defendants' Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures - Dated 10-06-2017) (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 408 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #362 to Response #324 to FedEx Defendants' Motion #260 To Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Wagner filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19 - Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report and Exhibits of Lauren J. Stiroh, Ph.D - Dated 02-12-2018, #2 Exhibit 20 - FedEx Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 7-13, 15, 18, 21, 23-27), #3 Exhibit 21 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D Concerning the Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,909,356, 7,199,715 and 9,047,586 (Excerpted)(Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 407 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #359 to Response #320 to Defendants' SEALED Motion #262 to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jacob Sharony filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Wolfe Exhibit #08, #2 Exhibit H - Excerpt of Mr. Stanley Deposition Transcript - Dated 11-02-2017, #3 Exhibit I - Wolfe Exhibit #07, #4 Exhibit J - Excerpt - Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #5 Exhibit K - FedEx Discovery Doc - FDXIV00622078, #6 Exhibit L - Excerpt of Opening Report of Mr. Williams) (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 406 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #274 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, Excerpts of Engels Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit K, Excerpts of Engels Rebuttal Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit L, US 8,157,173 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit M, US 7,267,279 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit N, US 9,047,586 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 405 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #277 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,909,356 and Patent No. 7,199,715 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L, Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit M, Excerpts of T. Mulanax Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit N, Excerpts of Melissa Wagner Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 404 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #275 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,047,586, 6,909,356, 7,199,715, and 8,494,581 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, Fluke Dep. Exhibit 7 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit J, Excerpt of Madhavan Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit K, Excerpt of Peterson Dep. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 403 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #358 to Response #319 to Defendants' SEALED Motion #261 To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Accused Instrumentalities filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 402 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #276 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 401 REDACTION to #391 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q, Excerpts of Williams Rebuttal Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit R, Excerpts of Stiroh Rebuttal Report On Damages [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit S, Stiroh Dep. Ex. 2 Errata [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 400 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #364 to Response #325 to Defendants' SEALED Motion #271 to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Filing 399 REDACTION to #390 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 398 REDACTION to #389 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, Exhibit B to IV's Fourth Amended Cont (2017.11.27) [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 6, Exhibit B to IV's Fifth Amended Cont (2017.12.29) [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 7, Exhibit C to IV's Fourth Amended Cont (2017.11.27) [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 8, Exhibit C to IV's Fifth Amended Cont (2017.12.29) [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2018 Filing 397 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply #360 to Response #322 to FedEx Defendants' SEALED Motion #273 to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories Filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER granting #114 Sealed Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/19/2018. (nkl, )
March 16, 2018 Filing 395 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #330 Opposed MOTION to Sever , Motion for Separate Trials (Re: Dkts. 330, 367, 368, and 384) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - About FedEx - Corporate Fact Sheet, #2 Exhibit 6 - FedEx - Overview of Company)(Davis, William)
March 16, 2018 Filing 394 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to #346 Response and in Support of #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Enforceability of the Patents-in-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 7,593,751, #2 Exhibit F - Excerpt of Deposition of Bobby Nations Dated November 8, 2017, #3 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Intellectual's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 3, 4, 7-13, 15, 18, 21, 23-27, #4 Exhibit H - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 7,267,279, #5 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, Ph.D.) (Davis, William)
March 16, 2018 Filing 393 REPLY to Response to Motion re #270 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 (Re: Dkts. 270 and 350) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EdgeCo Inc. v. FastCap)(Davis, William)
March 16, 2018 Filing 392 REPLY to Response to Motion re #265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) (Re: Dkts. 265 and 348) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
March 16, 2018 Filing 391 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Mr. David Williams' and Dr. Lauren Stiroh's Supplemental Expert Reports Relating to Undisclosed Non-InFringement Theories and Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Q, Excerpts of Williams Rebuttal Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit R, Excerpts of Stiroh Rebuttal Report On Damages [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit S, Stiroh Dep. Ex. 2 Errata [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2018 Filing 390 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2018 Filing 389 Defendants' SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #267 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, Exhibit B to IV's Fourth Amended Cont (2017.11.27) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 6, Exhibit B to IV's Fifth Amended Cont (2017.12.29) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 7, Exhibit C to IV's Fourth Amended Cont (2017.11.27) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 8, Exhibit C to IV's Fifth Amended Cont (2017.12.29) [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2018 Filing 388 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N, Rembrandt Wireless Technologies LP v Samsung Electronics Co Ltd, #2 Exhibit O, Fenner v. HP, #3 Exhibit P, DataTreasury v. Wells Fargo)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 16, 2018 Filing 387 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, IV's 2nd Suppl Resps to 2nd Set of Rogs (Nos. 14-15))(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2018 Filing 386 REDACTION to #348 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpts of Paschke's Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2, Emails between FedEx and IV [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3, Letter from C. Ebertin dated Aug. 30, 2016, #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of Defs' Rog Resp)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2018 Filing 385 REDACTION to #346 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpt of FH 6,961,586_09-955543, #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpt of FH 8,494,581_12-547363, #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpt of FH 6,764,009_10-158718, #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpt of FH 9,047,586_13-417128, #5 Exhibit 5, Petrosky Deposition Notes [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6, Excerpt of Report of Dr. Hohberger [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 384 REPLY to Response to Motion re #330 Opposed MOTION to Sever , Motion for Separate Trials filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 383 REDACTION to #365 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W, Comparison of 4th Amended Cont & 5th Amended Cont [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 382 REDACTION to #364 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Dr. Hohberger [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 381 REDACTION to #362 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, Excerpts of L. Stiroh's Expert Rebuttal Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 8, FDXIV00014715 [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 9, FDXIV00112457 [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 10, D. Engels' Expert Rpt. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 380 REDACTION to #361 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 379 REDACTION to #360 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, Madhavan Dep. Exhibit 17 [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 378 REDACTION to #358 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U, Email from E. Cook dated Oct. 19, 2017)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2018 Filing 377 REDACTION to #350 Sealed Response to Motion,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Hohberger Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2, Engels Rebuttal Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3, Email from L. Nowierski [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4, ANSI MH10.8.3M-1996, #5 Exhibit 5, UPS [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6, Brown Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 13, 2018 Filing 376 REDACTION to #356 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpted 2017-12-19 Plaintiff IV Dr. Engels Report (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Peterson Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Madhavan Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Koffler Exhibit 03 (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Fluke Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 11 (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Thapa 1 Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Moore Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - US Patent 9,047,586 (PUBLIC VERSION), #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt of '586 Patent File History (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Exhibit 11 - FedEx PR 4-1 Disclosures (PUBLIC VERSION), #12 Exhibit 12 - FedEx PR 4-2 Disclosures (PUBLIC VERSION), #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt of Engels Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Dr. Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Kellman, Alan)
March 13, 2018 Filing 375 REDACTION to #354 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 12, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - February 5, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - January 10, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition Transcript of Chris Swearingen (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Transcript of Daniel Ost (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Deposition Transcript of Tricia Mulanax (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - Deposition Transcript of Melissa Wagner (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Deposition Transcript of Saravanan Rajadinakaran (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit 11 - Deposition Transcript of Greg Isley (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - Deposition Transcript of Thomas Kennedy (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Deposition Transcript of Douglas Braund (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit 14 - Deposition Transcript of John Jamison (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit 15 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 1 (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit 16 - IV's Disclosure of Fifth Amended Infringement Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #17 Exhibit 17 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 17 (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit 18 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 35 (REDACTED IN FULL), #19 Exhibit 19 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 3 (REDACTED IN FULL), #20 Exhibit 20 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 4 (REDACTED IN FULL), #21 Exhibit 21 - Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 2 (REDACTED IN FULL), #22 Exhibit 22 - Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 3 (REDACTED IN FULL), #23 Exhibit 23 - Kennedy Dep. Ex. 8 (REDACTED IN FULL), #24 Exhibit 24 - Kennedy Dep. Ex. 9 (REDACTED IN FULL), #25 Exhibit 25 - Dep. Ex. 2 (REDACTED IN FULL), #26 Exhibit 26 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 3 (REDACTED IN FULL), #27 Exhibit 27 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 4 (REDACTED IN FULL), #28 Exhibit 28 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 5 (REDACTED IN FULL), #29 Exhibit 29 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 6 (REDACTED IN FULL), #30 Exhibit 30 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 25 (REDACTED IN FULL), #31 Exhibit 31 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 26 (REDACTED IN FULL), #32 Exhibit 32 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 28 (REDACTED IN FULL), #33 Exhibit 33 - Notice Letter (REDACTED IN FULL), #34 Exhibit 34 - Discovery Response (REDACTED IN FULL), #35 Exhibit 35 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 33 (REDACTED IN FULL), #36 Exhibit 36 - Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #37 Exhibit 37 - Braund Dep. Ex. 9 (REDACTED IN FULL), #38 Exhibit 38 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 10 (REDACTED IN FULL), #39 Exhibit 39 - Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #40 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 374 REDACTION to #353 Sealed Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 13, 2018 Filing 373 REDACTION to #352 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpted Mr. Williams Rebuttal Report (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - 11-02-2017 Excerpted Stanley Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit C - 11-28-2017 Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - 11-10-2017 Excerpted Saavedra Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit E - 11-16-2017 Excerpted Smith Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit F - 11-08-2017 Excerpted Nations Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit G - 11-09-2017 Excerpted Rangan Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit H - 11-09-2017 Excerpted Pracht Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit I - Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Ex. 05 (REDACTED IN FULL, #10 Exhibit J - Annotated Wolfe Dep. Ex. 07 (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit K - Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Ex. 08 (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit L - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00391200) (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit M - Smith Dep. Ex. 10 (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit N - Excerpted Fadeley Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit O - Discovery document (FDXIV00622078) (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit P - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00491413) (REDACTED IN FULL), #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00491424) (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit R - Discovery document (FDXIV00491239) (REDACTED IN FULL), #19 Exhibit S - 01-26-2018 Excerpted Sharony Dep. Tr. (REDACTED IN FULL), #20 Exhibit T - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00614817) (REDACTED IN FULL), #21 Exhibit U - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,851 (PUBLIC VERSION), #22 Exhibit V - 05-04-2017 FedExs proposed terms for construction (PUBLIC VERSION), #23 Exhibit W - Dr. Sharony Declaration (with Exs. 1 and 2) (REDACTED IN FULL), #24 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 372 REDACTION to #347 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 1 - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs. (July 12, 2016) (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit 2 - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs. (Sept. 8, 2016) (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 371 REDACTION to #345 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Hearing Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit F - Kroy IP Holdings v. AutoZone (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 370 REDACTION to #351 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18 - October 6, 2017 Defendants' 2nd Amended Joint Initial Disclosures (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 Filing 369 REDACTION to #349 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's 2nd Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 11 - Defendants' Objs to 2nd Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 12 - December 14, 2017 E-mail from Cook to Steinmetz (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 13 - October 6, 2017 Defendants' 2nd Amended Joint Initial Disclosures (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
March 13, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives, #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art, #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger, #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger, #273 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories : Motions Hearing RESET for 3/21/2018 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 13, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/9/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 12, 2018 Filing 368 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #367 Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Motion re #330 Defendants' Opposed MOTION to Sever. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Feb. 16, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Mark Petrosky Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Expert Report of Michael Wagner, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Tracy Baily Deposition Transcript)(Kellman, Alan)
March 12, 2018 Filing 367 RESPONSE in Opposition re #330 Opposed MOTION to Sever , Motion for Separate Trials filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of Feb. 16, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Mark Petrosky Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Expert Report of Michael Wagner, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Tracy Baily Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit A - Eidos v. Chi Mei, #6 Exhibit B - CEATS v. Continental, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
March 12, 2018 Filing 365 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #263 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit W, Comparison of 4th Amended Cont & 5th Amended Cont [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 364 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #271 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Excerpts of Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Dr. Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 363 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, Federal Housing Finance Agency v Nomura Holding America, Inc. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit E, Excerpt of Hohberger's Opening Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 362 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #260 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Wagner filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, Excerpts of L. Stiroh's Expert Rebuttal Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 8, FDXIV00014715 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 9, FDXIV00112457 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 10, D. Engels' Expert Rpt. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 361 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #259 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Strike The Opinions And Expert Report Of Michael Wagner filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 360 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #273 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P, Madhavan Dep. Exhibit 17 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 359 REPLY to Response to Motion re #262 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jacob Sharony filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2018 Filing 358 Defendants' SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #261 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Accused Instrumentalities filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U, Email from E. Cook dated Oct. 19, 2017)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 357 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #353 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, Exhibit 12 - deposition of R. Fluke Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #2 Exhibit 32, Exhibit 13 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #3 Exhibit 33, Exhibit 14 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #4 Exhibit 34, Exhibit 7 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #5 Exhibit 35, Exhibit 8 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #6 Exhibit 36, Exhibit 9 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #7 Exhibit 37, Exhibit 10 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #8 Exhibit 38, Exhibit 11 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #9 Exhibit 39, Exhibit 12 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017)) (excerpted), #10 Exhibit 40, Exhibit 13 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #11 Exhibit 41, Exhibit 14 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #12 Exhibit 42, Exhibit 15 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017) (excerpted), #13 Exhibit 43, Production Document, #14 Exhibit 44, Production Document, #15 Exhibit 45, Exhibit 5 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017), #16 Exhibit 46, Excerpt of Expert Report of Dr. Omid Kia, #17 Exhibit 47 Exhibit 19 - deposition of W. Peterson (Nov. 29, 2017), #18 Exhibit 48 Part 1, Production Document Part 1 of 2, #19 Exhibit 48 Part 2, Production Document Part 2 of 2, #20 Exhibit 49, Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Richard Wolfe (Nov. 28, 2017), #21 Exhibit 50, Exhibit 10 - deposition of R. Wolfe (Nov. 28, 2017), #22 Exhibit 51, Exhibit 11 - deposition of R. Wolfe (Nov. 28, 2017), #23 Exhibit 52, Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Bobby Nations (Nov. 8, 2017), #24 Exhibit 53, Exhibit 6 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #25 Exhibit 54, Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Chris Swearingen (Nov. 3, 2017), #26 Exhibit 55, Declaration of Dr. Daniel W. Engels, Ph. D, #27 Exhibit 56, Declaration of Dr. Jacob Sharony, Ph. D, MBA, #28 Exhibit 57, Exhibit 3 deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017))(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 9, 2018 Filing 356 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #274 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpted 2017-12-19 Plaintiff IV Dr. Engels Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of Peterson Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of Madhavan Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit 4 - Koffler Exhibit 03, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Fluke Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Fluke Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Thapa 1 Dep. Tr, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Moore Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit 9 - US Patent 9,047,586, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt of '586 Patent File History, #11 Exhibit 11 - FedEx PR 4-1 Disclosures, #12 Exhibit 12 - FedEx PR 4-2 Disclosures, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt of Engels Dep. Tr., #14 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of Dr. Daniel Engels, #15 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
March 9, 2018 Filing 355 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #353 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of IVs Fifth Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Dec. 29, 2017), #2 Exhibit Email from L. Nowierski to E. Cook (Feb. 13, 2018), #3 Exhibit Excerpt of Opening Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #4 Exhibit Excerpt of Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #5 Exhibit Excerpt of Opening Report of Dr. Daniel Engels, #6 Exhibit Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels, #7 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Dr. Jacob Sharony (Jan. 26, 2018), #8 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Dr. Daniel Engels (Feb. 6, 2018), #9 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Dr. Daniel Engels (Feb. 12, 2018), #10 Exhibit Email from M. Young to L. Nowierski (Jan. 22, 2018), #11 Exhibit Excerpt of Rebuttal Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, #12 Exhibit Excerpt of Rebuttal Expert Report of David H. Williams, #13 Exhibit Excerpt of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger, #14 Exhibit Excerpt of Defendants Responses to Plaintiff First Set of Requests for Admissions to Defendants (December 8, 2017), #15 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Melissa Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #16 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition Transcript of Tricia Mulanax (Jan. 18, 2018), #17 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to the deposition of Tricia Mulanax (Jan. 18, 2018), #18 Exhibit Production Document, #19 Exhibit Production Document, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #21 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #22 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #23 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #24 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #25 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - deposition of M. Wagner (Nov. 9, 2017), #26 Exhibit Excerpt of Exhibit 7 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017), #27 Exhibit Excerpt of Exhibit 8 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #28 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #29 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted), #30 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - deposition of R. Fluke (Nov. 8, 2017) (excerpted))(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 9, 2018 Filing 354 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to #277 Defendants' SEALED Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,909,356 and Patent No. 7,199,715 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 12, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels, #2 Exhibit 2 - February 5, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Daniel Engels, #4 Exhibit 4 - January 10, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, #5 Exhibit 5 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Thomas Rhyne, #6 Exhibit 6 - Deposition Transcript of Chris Swearingen, #7 Exhibit 7 - Deposition Transcript of Daniel Ost, #8 Exhibit 8 - Deposition Transcript of Tricia Mulanax, #9 Exhibit 9 - Deposition Transcript of Melissa Wagner, #10 Exhibit 10 - Deposition Transcript of Saravanan Rajadinakaran, #11 Exhibit 11 - Deposition Transcript of Greg Isley, #12 Exhibit 12 - Deposition Transcript of Thomas Kennedy, #13 Exhibit 13 - Deposition Transcript of Douglas Braund, #14 Exhibit 14 - Deposition Transcript of John Jamison, #15 Exhibit 15 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 1, #16 Exhibit 16 - IV's Disclosure of Fifth Amended Infringement Contentions, #17 Exhibit 17 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 17, #18 Exhibit 18 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 35, #19 Exhibit 19 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 3, #20 Exhibit 20 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 4, #21 Exhibit 21 - Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 2, #22 Exhibit 22 - Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 3, #23 Exhibit 23 - Kennedy Dep. Ex. 8, #24 Exhibit 24 - Kennedy Dep. Ex. 9, #25 Exhibit 25 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 2, #26 Exhibit 26 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 3, #27 Exhibit 27 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 4, #28 Exhibit 28 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 5, #29 Exhibit 29 - Mulanax Dep. Ex. 6, #30 Exhibit 30 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 25, #31 Exhibit 31 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 26, #32 Exhibit 32 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 28, #33 Exhibit 33 - Notice Letter, #34 Exhibit 34 - Discovery Response, #35 Exhibit 35 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 33, #36 Exhibit 36 - Production Document, #37 Exhibit 37 - Braund Dep. Ex. 9, #38 Exhibit 38 - Swearingen Dep. Ex. 10, #39 Exhibit 39 - Production Document, #40 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 353 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to #275 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,047,586, 6,909,356, 7,199,715, and 8,494,581 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
March 9, 2018 Filing 352 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to #276 Defendants' SEALED Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpted Mr. Williams Rebuttal Report, #2 Exhibit B - 11-02-2017 Excerpted Stanley Dep. Tr., #3 Exhibit C - 11-28-2017 Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Tr., #4 Exhibit D - 11-10-2017 Excerpted Saavedra Dep. Tr., #5 Exhibit E - 11-16-2017 Excerpted Smith Dep. Tr., #6 Exhibit F - 11-08-2017 Excerpted Nations Dep. Tr., #7 Exhibit G - 11-09-2017 Excerpted Rangan Dep. Tr., #8 Exhibit H - 11-09-2017 Excerpted Pracht Dep. Tr., #9 Exhibit I - Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Ex. 05, #10 Exhibit J - Annotated Wolfe Dep. Ex. 07, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpted Wolfe Dep. Ex. 08, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00391200), #13 Exhibit M - Smith Dep. Ex. 10, #14 Exhibit N - Excerpted Fadeley Dep. Tr., #15 Exhibit O - Discovery document (FDXIV00622078), #16 Exhibit P - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00491413), #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00491424), #18 Exhibit R - Discovery document (FDXIV00491239), #19 Exhibit S - 01-26-2018 Excerpted Sharony Dep. Tr., #20 Exhibit T - Excerpted discovery document (FDXIV00614817), #21 Exhibit U - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,851, #22 Exhibit V - 05-04-2017 FedExs proposed terms for construction, #23 Exhibit W - Dr. Sharony Declaration (with Exs. 1 and 2), #24 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 351 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to #318 Response and in Support of #278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Mr. David Williams' and Dr. Lauren Stiroh's Supplemental Expert Reports Relating to Undisclosed Non-InFringement Theories and Non-Infringing Alternatives fled by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18 - October 6, 2017 Defendants' 2nd Amended Joint Initial Disclosures) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 350 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion re #270 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Hohberger Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Engels Rebuttal Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Email from L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, ANSI MH10.8.3M-1996 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, UPS [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6, Brown Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 349 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to #315 Response and in Support of #279 its Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's 2nd Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #2 Exhibit 11 - Defendants' Objs to 2nd Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #3 Exhibit 12 - December 14, 2017 E-mail from Cook to Steinmetz, #4 Exhibit 13 - October 6, 2017 Defendants' 2nd Amended Joint Initial Disclosures) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 348 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion re #265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpts of Paschke's Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Emails between FedEx and IV [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Letter from C. Ebertin dated Aug. 30, 2016 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of Defs' Rog Resp [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 347 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to #316 Response and in Support of #267 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 and 6,909,356 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel Engels, #2 Exhibit 1 - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs. (July 12, 2016), #3 Exhibit 2 - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs. (Sept. 8, 2016) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 346 Defendants' SEALED RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion re #264 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Enforceability of the Patents-in-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpt of FH 6,961,586_09-955543 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpt of FH 8,494,581_12-547363 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpt of FH 6,764,009_10-158718 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpt of FH 9,047,586_13-417128 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, Petrosky Deposition Notes [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6, Excerpt of Report of Dr. Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2018 Filing 345 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Response #326 and in Support of #272 its Opposed SEALED MOTION Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit F - Kroy IP Holdings v. AutoZone) (Davis, William)
March 9, 2018 Filing 344 REPLY to Response to Motion re #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art (Re: Dkts. 268, 269, and 314) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Plaintiff's December 6, 2017 Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit 1 - Frank's Casing v. Tesco, #3 Exhibit 2 - Freeny v. Murphy Oil Corp., #4 Exhibit 3 - Indus. Print Techs. v. O'Neil Data Sys., #5 Exhibit 4 - Pozen Inc. v. Par Pharm. Inc., #6 Exhibit 5 - VirnetX Inc. v. Cisco Sys.)(Davis, William)
March 8, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives, #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art, #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use, #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger, #266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger : Motions Hearing set for 3/23/2018 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER EXPEDITING BRIEFING. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2018. (nkl, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 342 REDACTION to #315 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Emails between counsel [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of D. Engels' Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of J. Sharony's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Order (2-15-cv-349) dated Feb. 17, 2017, #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of T. Rhyne's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Order (5-15-cv-163) dated Sept. 27, 2016, #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of M. Wagner's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2018 Filing 341 REDACTION to #318 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A,, Excerpts of R. Patton Dep. Tr. dated Jan. 24, 2018 [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Supplemental Expert Rpt. of Dr. Sharony dated Jan. 25, 2018 [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of D. Williams dated Jan. 29, 2018 [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of L. Stiroh dated Feb. 12, 2018 [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of D. Smith Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 16,2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of Defs' Resp. to IV's 2nd Set of ROGs (Nos. 21-33) [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Defs' Resp. to ROG No. 7 [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, Defs' Ad. and Supp. Resp. to ROG No. 7 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, Excerpts of J. Pracht Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 9, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J, Excerpts of J. Saavedra Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 10, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit K, Excerpts of Defs' Resp. to ROG No. 38 [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit L, Beneficial Innovations - Order dated May 26, 2010, #13 Exhibit M, Excerpts of D. Williams Opening Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit N, Excerpts of L. Stiroh Opening Expert Rpt. dated Jan. 11, 2018 [REDACTED IN FULL], #15 Exhibit O, St. Lawrence - Order dated Feb. 21, 2017, #16 Exhibit P, Excerpts of Dr. Sharony's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2018 Filing 340 REDACTION to #328 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 13, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,952,645 (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit 3 - IPR Petition IPR2017-00787 Filed January 27, 2017 (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of February 3, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 339 REDACTION to #325 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of February 6, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of February 12, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Daniel Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit A - Tindall v. H & S Homes (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 338 REDACTION to #324 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Michael J. Wagner (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Lauren Stiroh (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - January 23, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Michael J. Wagner, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - January 11, 2018 Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - FedEx Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - FedEx Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - FedEx Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(1) Notice of Deposition of Rodney Patton, served on September 20, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - E-mail from Nowierski to Berkowitz, dated November 27, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - E-mail from Nowierski to Counsel, dated December 4, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit 11 - E-mail from Nowierski to Berkowitz et al., dated December 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - FedEx Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(1) Notice of Deposition of Tricia Mulanax, served on September 20, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit 14 - E-mail from Young to Nowierski, dated November 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit 15 - FedEx Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit 16 - December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #17 Exhibit 17 - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report Of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit 18 - January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report Of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, Excerpted (REDACTED IN FULL), #19 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 337 REDACTION to #323 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - E-mail from Cook to Kellman, dated January 8, 2018 (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on July 26, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on August 9, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on August 21, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on October 16, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on October 25, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on November 9, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on November 30, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on December 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 8, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, served on October 19, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #17 Exhibit 17 - November 9, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Thomas Choi (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit 18 - November 7, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Robert Joe Kosiara (REDACTED IN FULL), #19 Exhibit 19 - November 21, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Nathan Myhrvold (REDACTED IN FULL), #20 Exhibit 20 - December 5, 2017 Deposition Transcript of John Paschke (REDACTED IN FULL), #21 Exhibit 21 - November 30, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Jim Weisfeld (REDACTED IN FULL), #22 Exhibit 22 - E-mail from Steinmetz to Counsel, dated October 20, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #23 Exhibit 23 - Excerpt of Defendants' Discovery Responses, served on August 28, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #24 Exhibit 24 - Excerpt of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to 30(b)(6), served on November 10, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #25 Exhibit 25 - Letter from Steinmetz to Cook, dated September 19, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #26 Exhibit 26 - Letter from Steinmetz to Cook, dated September 6, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #27 Exhibit 27 - Letter from Petrie to Cook, dated October 13, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #28 Exhibit 28 - Letter from Petrie to Cook, dated October 30, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #29 Exhibit 29 - Letter from Cook to Petrie, dated October 30, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #30 Exhibit 30 - Expert Report of Michael J. Wagner, dated December 19, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #31 Exhibit 31 - Excerpt of December 1, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Mark Petrosky (REDACTED IN FULL), #32 Exhibit 32 - December 1, 2017 Mark Petrosky Deposition Exhibit No. 15 (REDACTED IN FULL), #33 Exhibit 33 - December 1, 2017 Mark Petrosky Deposition Exhibit No. 36 (REDACTED IN FULL), #34 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 336 REDACTION to #322 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit E to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit E-1 to FedEx Invalidity Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Clive Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - January 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Clive Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of November 8, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Robin Fluke (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt of November 2, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Ajay Madhavan (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit A - Biscotti v. Microsoft (PUBLIC VERSION), #12 Exhibit B - EON Corp. IP Holdings v. Sensus (PUBLIC VERSION), #13 Exhibit C - Mobile Telcoms. V. Sprint (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Exhibit D - Secure Access LLC v. HP (PUBLIC VERSION), #15 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 335 REDACTION to #321 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 15, 2018 Hearing Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Steinmetz Declaration (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - January 19, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - January 22, 2018 E-mail from Carrano to Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - January 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Clive Hohberger(REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit A - Great Am. Ins. v. Moye (PUBLIC VERSION), #7 Exhibit B - Ihde v. HME (PUBLIC VERSION), #8 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 334 REDACTION to #320 Sealed Response to Motion,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Dr. Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of David Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit F - Excerpt of January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 1 - Barry v. Medtronic (PUBLIC VERSION), #8 Exhibit 2 - BMC Software Inc. v. Servicenow Inc. (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 3 - Genband US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. (Jan. 7, 2016) - (PUBLIC VERSION), #10 Exhibit 4 - Genband US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. (Jan. 9, 2016) (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 333 REDACTION to #319 Sealed Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - January 17, 2017 Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit C - March 13, 2017 E-mail from Rosenberger to Counsel (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit D - March 17, 2017 E-mail from Rosenberger to Counsel (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit E - April 24, 2017 Plaintiff's 1st Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit F - July 28, 2017 Plaintiff's 2nd Suppl Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit G - October 6, 2017 Plaintiff's 3rd Amended Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit H - November 27, 2017 Plaintiff's 4th Amended Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit J - December 29, 2017 Plaintiff's 5th Amended Infringement Contentions (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit K - January 25, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit L - Excerpt of January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit M - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Exhibit N - Excerpt of November 16, 2017 Deposition Transcript of David Smith (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit O - Excerpt of November 2, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Macklin Stanley (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit P - Excerpt of January 17, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Darrell Fadeley (REDACTED IN FULL), #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpt of November 9, 2017 Deposition Transcript of John Pracht (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit R - Excerpt of November 10, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Joaquin Saavedra (REDACTED IN FULL), #19 Exhibit S - August 14, 2017 Letter from Nowierski to Cook (PUBLIC VERSION), #20 Exhibit T - Excerpt of June 26, 2016 Defendants' Discovery Responses (REDACTED IN FULL), #21 Exhibit U - Excerpt of January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #22 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
March 6, 2018 Filing 332 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Service of Pre-Trial Disclosures [Dkt. 329] (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2018 Filing 331 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Service of Pre-Trial Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 329) (Davis, William)
March 5, 2018 Filing 330 Opposed MOTION to Sever , Motion for Separate Trials by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 329 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #311 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/5/2018. (nkl, )
March 2, 2018 Filing 328 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #263 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 13, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,952,645, #3 Exhibit 3 - IPR Petition IPR2017-00787 Filed January 27, 2017, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Rhyne, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of February 3, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Thomas Rhyne, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 327 Defendants' SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #326 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, Excerpts of Dep. Tr. of D. Engels dated Feb. 12, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit G, Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Engels dated Jan. 11, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 326 RESPONSE in Opposition re #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, FedEx Invalidity Cont. dated Mar. 14, 2017, #2 Exhibit B, Appendix E01 - Claim Chart - ANSI, #3 Exhibit C, Appendix E09 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE, #4 Exhibit D, UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Excerpts of Dep. Tr. of D. Engels dated Feb. 12, 2018, #5 Exhibit E, Appendix E06 - Claim Chart - ANSI + Ett, #6 Exhibit F, Appendix E14 - Claim Chart - RPS MULTICODE + UPS + Ett, #7 Exhibit G, UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Engels dated Jan. 11, 2018, #8 Exhibit H, Emails between counsel dated Oct. 23, 2017, #9 Exhibit I, IVs 1st 30(b)(6) Dep. Notice dated Sept. 20, 2017, #10 Exhibit J, Email from L. Nowierski dated Oct. 27, 2017, #11 Exhibit K, Emails between counsel dated Nov. 27, 2017, #12 Exhibit L, ANSI Style Manual, Ex. 1010 (FDXIV00020838-921), #13 Exhibit M, Reboulet Decl., Ex. 1008 (FDXIV00020775-87) dated Feb. 6, 2017)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 325 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #271 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel Engels, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of February 6, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Daniel Engels, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of February 12, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Daniel Engels, #4 Exhibit A - Tindall v. H & S Homes, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 324 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to #260 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion To Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Wagner filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Michael J. Wagner, #2 Exhibit 2 - January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Lauren Stiroh, Excerpted, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 23, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Michael J. Wagner, Excerpted, #4 Exhibit 4 - January 11, 2018 Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, Excerpted, #5 Exhibit 5 - FedEx Production Document, #6 Exhibit 6 - FedEx Production Document, #7 Exhibit 7 - FedEx Production Document, #8 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(1) Notice of Deposition of Rodney Patton, served on September 20, 2017, #9 Exhibit 9 - E-mail from Nowierski to Berkowitz, dated November 27, 2017, #10 Exhibit 10 - E-mail from Nowierski to Counsel, dated December 4, 2017, #11 Exhibit 11 - E-mail from Nowierski to Berkowitz et al., dated December 6, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12 - FedEx Production Document, #13 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(1) Notice of Deposition of Tricia Mulanax, served on September 20, 2017, #14 Exhibit 14 - E-mail from Young to Nowierski, dated November 6, 2017, #15 Exhibit 15 - FedEx Production Document, #16 Exhibit 16 - December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Daniel W. Engels, #17 Exhibit 17 - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report Of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, Excerpted, #18 Exhibit 18 - January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report Of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, Excerpted, #19 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 323 Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #259 defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion To Strike The Opinions And Expert Report Of Michael Wagner filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Production Document, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Production Document, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Production Document, #4 Exhibit 4 - E-mail from Cook to Kellman, dated January 8, 2018, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on July 26, 2017, #6 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on August 9, 2017, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on August 21, 2017, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on October 16, 2017, #9 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on October 25, 2017, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on November 9, 2017, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on November 30, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 6, 2017, #13 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiff's Discovery Responses, served on December 6, 2017, #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 6, 2017, #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt of Plaintiff's Discovery Responses served on December 8, 2017, #16 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' First Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, served on October 19, 2017, #17 Exhibit 17 - November 9, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Thomas Choi, #18 Exhibit 18 - November 7, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Robert Joe Kosiara, #19 Exhibit 19 - November 21, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Nathan Myhrvold, #20 Exhibit 20 - December 5, 2017 Deposition Transcript of John Paschke, #21 Exhibit 21 - November 30, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Jim Weisfeld, #22 Exhibit 22 - E-mail from Steinmetz to Counsel, dated October 20, 2017, #23 Exhibit 23 - Excerpt of Defendants Discovery Responses, served on August 28, 2017, #24 Exhibit 24 - Excerpt of Defendants' Responses to Plaintiff's Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to 30(b)(6), served on November 10, 2017, #25 Exhibit 25 - Letter from Steinmetz to Cook, dated September 19, 2017, #26 Exhibit 26 - Letter from Steinmetz to Cook, dated September 6, 2017, #27 Exhibit 27 - Letter from Petrie to Cook, dated October 13, 2017, #28 Exhibit 28 - Letter from Petrie to Cook, dated October 30, 2017, #29 Exhibit 29 - Letter from Cook to Petrie, dated October 30, 2017, #30 Exhibit 30 - Expert Report of Michael J. Wagner, dated December 19, 2017, #31 Exhibit 31 - Excerpt of December 1, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Mark Petrosky, #32 Exhibit 32 - December 1, 2017 Mark Petrosky Deposition Exhibit No. 15, #33 Exhibit 33 - December 1, 2017 Mark Petrosky Deposition Exhibit No. 36, #34 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 322 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #273 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit E to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defendants' Production Document, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Engels, #4 Exhibit 4 - Exhibit E-1 to FedEx Invalidity Contentions, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Clive Hohberger, #6 Exhibit 6 - January 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Clive Hohberger, #7 Exhibit 7 - Defendants' Production Document, #8 Exhibit 8 - Defendants' Production Document, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpt of November 8, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Robin Fluke, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt of November 2, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Ajay Madhavan, #11 Exhibit A - Biscotti v. Microsoft, #12 Exhibit B - EON Corp. IP Holdings v. Sensus, #13 Exhibit C - Mobile Telcoms. V. Sprint, #14 Exhibit D - Secure Access LLC v. HP, #15 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 321 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #266 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 15, 2018 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - Steinmetz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - January 19, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - January 22, 2018 E-mail from Carrano to Counsel, #5 Exhibit 5 - January 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Clive Hohberger, #6 Exhibit A - Great Am. Ins. v. Moye, #7 Exhibit B - Ihde v. HME, #8 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 320 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to #262 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jacob Sharony filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Sharony, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Sharony, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Dr. Sharony, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of David Williams, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpt of January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Williams, #7 Exhibit 1 - Barry v. Medtronic, #8 Exhibit 2 - BMC Software Inc. v. Servicenow Inc., #9 Exhibit 3 - Genband US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. (Jan. 7, 2016), #10 Exhibit 4 - Genband US LLC v. Metaswitch Networks Corp. (Jan. 9, 2016), #11 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 319 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #261 Defendants' Opposed SEALED Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Accused Instrumentalities filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Production Document, #2 Exhibit B - January 17, 2017 Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit C - March 13, 2017 E-mail from Rosenberger to Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - March 17, 2017 E-mail from Rosenberger to Counsel, #5 Exhibit E - April 24, 2017 Plaintiff's 1st Amended Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #6 Exhibit F - July 28, 2017 Plaintiff's 2nd Suppl Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #7 Exhibit G - October 6, 2017 Plaintiff's 3rd Amended Infringement Contentions, #8 Exhibit H - November 27, 2017 Plaintiff's 4th Amended Infringement Contentions, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Jacob Sharony, #10 Exhibit J - December 29, 2017 Plaintiff's 5th Amended Infringement Contentions, #11 Exhibit K - January 25, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Jacob Sharony, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpt of January 26, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Jacob Sharony, #13 Exhibit M - Excerpt of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581, #14 Exhibit N - Excerpt of November 16, 2017 Deposition Transcript of David Smith, #15 Exhibit O - Excerpt of November 2, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Macklin Stanley, #16 Exhibit P - Excerpt of January 17, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Darrell Fadeley, #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpt of November 9, 2017 Deposition Transcript of John Pracht, #18 Exhibit R - Excerpt of November 10, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Joaquin Saavedra, #19 Exhibit S - August 14, 2017 Letter from Nowierski to Cook, #20 Exhibit T - Excerpt of June 26, 2016 Defs' Discovery Responses, #21 Exhibit U - Excerpt of January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Williams, #22 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
March 2, 2018 Filing 318 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion re #278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Mr. David Williams' and Dr. Lauren Stiroh's Supplemental Expert Reports Relating to Undisclosed Non-InFringement Theories and Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of R. Patton Dep. Tr. dated Jan. 24, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Supplemental Expert Rpt. of Dr. Sharony dated Jan. 25, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of D. Williams dated Jan. 29, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of L. Stiroh dated Feb. 12, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of D. Smith Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 16,2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of Defs' Resp. to IV's 2nd Set of ROGs (Nos. 21-33) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Defs' Resp. to ROG No. 7 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Defs' Ad. and Supp. Resp. to ROG No. 7 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Excerpts of J. Pracht Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 9, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, Excerpts of J. Saavedra Dep. Tr. dated Nov. 10, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, Excerpts of Defs' Resp. to ROG No. 38 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L, Beneficial Innovations - Order dated May 26, 2010 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M, Excerpts of D. Williams Opening Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N, Excerpts of L. Stiroh Opening Expert Rpt. dated Jan. 11, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O, St. Lawrence - Order dated Feb. 21, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit P, Excerpts of Dr. Sharony's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 317 Defendants' SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #316 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 and 6,909,356. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Opening Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 3, Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Daniel W. Engels dated Jan. 11, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of T. Rhyne's Dep. Tr. dated Feb. 3, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 316 RESPONSE in Opposition re #267 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 and 6,909,356 filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Memo. Opinion and Order (6-15-cv-00463) dated Apr. 3, 2017, #2 Exhibit 2, UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Opening Expert Rpt. of Dr. Rhyne dated Dec. 19, 2017, #3 Exhibit 3, UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Daniel W. Engels dated Jan. 11, 2018, #4 Exhibit 4, UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Excerpts of T. Rhyne's Dep. Tr. dated Feb. 3, 2018)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 315 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion re #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Emails between counsel [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of D. Engels' Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of J. Sharony's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Order (2-15-cv-349) dated Feb. 17, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of T. Rhyne's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Order (5-15-cv-163) dated Sept. 27, 2016 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of M. Wagner's Expert Rpt. dated Dec. 19, 2017 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2018 Filing 314 RESPONSE in Opposition re #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, IV's 5th Ad Infringement Cont dated Dec. 29, 2017, #2 Exhibit B, Decl. of J. Sharony (IPR2017-02030) - Exhibit 2124 dated Dec. 13, 2017, #3 Exhibit C, Opinion dated Feb. 20, 2009)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 313 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended(Folsom, David)
March 1, 2018 Filing 312 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, Excerpts of ZPL II Programming Guide [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 13, Excerpts from Daniel W. Engels' Deposition dated Feb. 12, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 1, 2018 Filing 311 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #237 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Scheduling Order,, - Joint Motion to Amend Docket Control Order (Re: Dkt. 237) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Docket Control Order)(Davis, William)
March 1, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR -was filed using the wrong docket event. Document # 310, SEALED SUR-REPLY FedEx Defendants' Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
February 28, 2018 Filing 310 FILED IN ERROR SEALED SUR-REPLY FedEx Defendants' Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion re #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, Excerpts of ZPL II Programming Guide [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 13, Excerpts from Daniel W. Engels' Deposition dated Feb. 12, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/1/2018 (nkl, ).
February 27, 2018 Filing 309 REDACTION to #307 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, FedEx Defendants' Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion re: #233 Opposed Sealed Motion to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER to carry #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness AND ORDERED that Wm. Stephen Boyd of Dallas, Texas be and he is appointed special liaison for the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/26/2018. (ch, )
February 23, 2018 Filing 307 SEALED SUR-REPLY FedEx Defendants' Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion re #233 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2018 Filing 306 REDACTION to #303 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Deposition Excerpts of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D. - Dated February 12, 2018 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Davis, William)
February 22, 2018 Filing 305 REDACTION to #297 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts from David Grus' Deposition - Dated January 30, 2018 (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from Lauren Stiroh's Deposition - Dated January 26, 2018 (REDACTED IN FULL))(Nowierski, Lauren)
February 22, 2018 Filing 304 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/15/18 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR/TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2018. (sholmes, )
February 21, 2018 Filing 303 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Response [Dkt. 255] to Opposed SEALED MOTION [Dkt. 230] to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F - Deposition Excerpts of Daniel W. Engels, Ph.D. - Dated February 12, 2018) (Davis, William)
February 21, 2018 Filing 302 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Intellectual Ventures II LLC for proceedings held on February 15, 2018 (Motions Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (Davis, William)
February 21, 2018 Filing 301 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Gerald F Ivey on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6668879. (Ivey, Gerald)
February 20, 2018 Filing 300 REDACTION to #279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpted Opening Report Dr. Rhyne (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpted Opening Report Dr. Hohberger (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted Opening Report Mr. Williams (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Dr. Rhyne (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Dr. Hohberger (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Mr. Williams (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript Dr. Rhyne (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted July 27, 2017 FedEx's Interrogatory Responses (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted August 28, 2017 FedEx's Interrogatory Responses (AEO) (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 299 REDACTION to #278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Mr. David Williams' and Dr. Lauren Stiroh's Supplemental Expert Reports Relating to Undisclosed Non-InFringement Theories and Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - January 29, 2018 Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Williams on Non-Infringement (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpted October 20, 2017 FedEx Amended Resps to IV 1st and 2nd Set of Interrogatories (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted December 8, 2017 FedEx Supplemental Interrogatory Response (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted August 28, 2018 Fedex Response to Rog No. 32 (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - October 23, 2017 Plaintiff Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to 30(b)(6) (PUBLIC VERSION), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Patton Deposition Exhibit 10 (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted January 24, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Rodney Patton (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted September 20, 2017 Plaintiff First Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted November 8, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Bobby Nations (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - September 20, 2017 Notice of Deposition of Rodney Patton (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Exhibit 11 - January 25, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - February 12, 2018 Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report of Dr. Stiroh (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpted January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpted January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Williams on Non-Infringement (REDACTED IN FULL), #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpted January 11, 2018 Expert Rebuttal Report Dr. Stiroh on Damages (REDACTED IN FULL), #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpted December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony (REDACTED IN FULL), #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpted May 12, 2017 FedEx Supplemental Discovery Response (REDACTED IN FULL), #18 Exhibit A - Ericsson v. TCL Communication (PUBLIC VERSION), #19 Exhibit B - Flexuspine Inc v. Globus Medical Inc. (PUBLIC VERSION), #20 Exhibit C - Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 v. Broadcom Limited (PUBLIC VERSION), #21 Exhibit D - Green v. Blitz USA Inc. (PUBLIC VERSION), #22 Exhibit E - PerdiemCo LLC v. IndusTrack LLC (PUBLIC VERSION), #23 Exhibit F - Saint Lawrence Comm'ns v. ZTE Corp., No. 15-cv-349, D.I. 442 (PUBLIC VERSION), #24 Exhibit G - Versata Software Inc. v. Sun Microsystems Inc. (PUBLIC VERSION), #25 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 298 REDACTION to #272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Clive Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - March 14, 2017 Defendants' Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted Appendix E01 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted Appendix E09 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpted Appendix E10 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #6 Exhibit 6 - January 18, 2018 Defendants' Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted Appendix E01 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted Appendix E07 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted Appendix E18 from January 8, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpted Appendix E20 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpted January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Grus (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit A - Biscotti Inc. v. Microsoft (PUBLIC VERSION), #13 Exhibit B - Blue Calypso v. Groupon et al - Order (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Exhibit C - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs. (PUBLIC VERSION), #15 Exhibit D - Innovative Display Techs. LLC v. Acer (PUBLIC VERSION), #16 Exhibit E - L.C. Eldridge Sales v. Azen Mfg. (PUBLIC VERSION), #17 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 297 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Response (Dkt. 252) to Motion re [Dkt. 233] Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - Excerpts from David Grus' Deposition - Dated January 30, 2018, #2 Exhibit 17 - Excerpts from Lauren Stiroh's Deposition - Dated January 26, 2018) (Nowierski, Lauren)
February 20, 2018 Filing 296 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Notice of Clive Hohberger's Consent to Independent Medical Evaluation (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 295 REDACTION to #273 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #2 Exhibit B, IV Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit C, IV 1st Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, IV 2d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, IV 3d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, IV 4th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, IV 5th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, Engels Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, FDXIV00083246 [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J, FDXIV00021776 [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00022025 [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit L, FDXIV00022043 [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit M, FDXIV00027586 [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit N, Defs 2d Supp Resps to Plfs 1st ROGs (Nos. 9, 11 & 12) [REDACTED IN FULL], #15 Exhibit O, Ltr to A. Steinmetz encl FDXIV_004 Production, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 294 REDACTION to #270 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 293 REDACTION to #267 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - February 3, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Vernon Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 292 REDACTION to #274 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of D. Engels [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 13, 2018 Email from L. Nowierski, #3 Exhibit C, Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Engels [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts D. Engels' Vol. II Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of R. Jaramillo Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of D. Grus' Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of B. Nations' Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, Jan. 17, 2017 Ex. E, IV's Infringement Cont. [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, Dec. 29, 2017 Ex. E, IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont. [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 291 REDACTION to #265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
February 20, 2018 Filing 290 REDACTION to #277 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,909,356 and Patent No. 7,199,715 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Engels Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of Ost Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of Engels Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Swearingen Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of Braund Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Braund Dep. Ex. 9 [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of Rajadinarkaran Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 2 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, Kennedy Dep. Ex. 10 [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J, Excerpts of Wagner Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00610077-96 [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 289 REDACTION to #276 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Sharony Opening Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 13, 2018 Email from L. Nowierski, #3 Exhibit C, 581 patent, #4 Exhibit D, Ex. D to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts from Wolfe Dep. Ex. 5, FDXIV00015131 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts from Nations Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts from Smith Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 288 REDACTION to #275 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,047,586, 6,909,356, 7,199,715, and 8,494,581 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of D. Engels [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of J. Sharony [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of D. Engels' Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts of J. Sharony Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of M. Wagner Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Dec. 29, 2017 IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont., #8 Exhibit H, Dec. 29, 2017 Ex. D, IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont. [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 287 REDACTION to #262 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jacob Sharony by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of 2018.01.26 J. Sharony Depo Tr., #2 Exhibit B, 2017.12.19 J. Sharony Expert Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, US Patent 8,494,581, #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts of 2017.11.10 J. Saavedra Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, 2018.01.11 J. Sharony Rebuttal Expert Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 286 REDACTION to #261 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Accused Instrumentalities by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions, #2 Exhibit B, Ex. D to IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions, #3 Exhibit C, FDXIV00015918-19 [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, FDXIV00015920-21 [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, FDXIV00040287 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, FDXIV00040288 [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, FDXIV00040298 [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, FDXIV00041057-69 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, FDXIV00041395-482 [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J, FDXIV00610455-65 [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00610466 [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit L, Ex. D to IVs 1st Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit M, Defs' Resps to Plf's 2d ROGs (Nos. 21-33) [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit N, Ex. D to IVs 2d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #15 Exhibit O, Ex. D to IVs 3d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #16 Exhibit P, Ex. D to IVs 4th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #17 Exhibit Q, Dec. 19, 2017 Sharony Expert Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #18 Exhibit R, Ex. D to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #19 Exhibit S, IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions, #20 Exhibit T, Jan. 25, 2018 Sharony Supplement Expert Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 285 REDACTION to #271 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Dec. 19, 2017 D. Engels' Expert Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of M. Wagner Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpts of D. Ost Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. Tr. Vol. I [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5, Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep Tr. Vol. II [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 284 REDACTION to #263 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Ex. C to IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, FDXIV00108135 [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit C, FDXIV00108035 [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, FDXIV00108046 [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, FDXIV00108047 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, FDXIV00108073 [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, FDXIV00108084 [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, FDXIV00108093 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, Ex. C to IVs 1st Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit J, IVs 1st ROGs to Defs (Nos. 1-20) [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit K, IVs 2d ROGs to Defs (Nos. 21-33) [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Exhibit L, IVs 3d ROGs to Defs (Nos. 34-40) [REDACTED IN FULL], #13 Exhibit M, Excerpts from Isley Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #14 Exhibit N, Excerpts from Kennedy Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #15 Exhibit O, Kennedy Ex. 2 [REDACTED IN FULL], #16 Exhibit P, Excerpts from Rajadinakaran Dep. Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #17 Exhibit Q, Ex. C to IVs 2d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #18 Exhibit R, Ex. C to IVs 3d Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #19 Exhibit S, Ex. C to IVs 4th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #20 Exhibit T, Engels Report [REDACTED IN FULL], #21 Exhibit U, Ex. C to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #22 Exhibit V, IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [REDACTED IN FULL], #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 283 REDACTION to #260 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Wagner by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of Jan. 23, 2018 M. Wagner Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpts of Jan. 18, 2018 T. Mulanax Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of Jan. 24, 2018 R. Patton Depo Tr. [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5, FDXIV00138807-09 [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6, Excerpts of Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 282 REDACTION to #259 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Strike The Opinions And Expert Report Of Michael Wagner by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpts of Defs' 3rd ROGs, #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of Pltf's Resp to 3rd ROGs [REDACTED IN FULL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpts of Plft's 2nd Sup Resp 3 ROGs [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit 4, Sept. 15, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit 5, Sept. 19, 2017 Letter from A. Steinmetz [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit 6, Sept. 26, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit 7, Oct. 5, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit 8, Oct. 13, 2017 Letter from K. Petrie [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit 9, Excerpts of 30(b)(6) Depo. Notice [REDACTED IN FULL], #10 Exhibit 10, Excerpts of Pltf's Resp. to 30(b)(6) Depo. Notice [REDACTED IN FULL], #11 Exhibit 11, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner [REDACTED IN FULL], #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2018 Filing 281 REDACTION to #254 Sealed Response to Motion,,,, re 233 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of IV's Resp. to 30(b(6) Depo. Notice [REDACTED IN FULL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of EMC's Brief ISO SJ and Exclude Expert Testimony, #3 Exhibit C, Jan. 23, 2018 Depo. Trans. of Michael J. Wagner [REDACTED IN FULL], #4 Exhibit D, Jan. 26, 2018 Depo. Trans. of Lauren Stiroh [REDACTED IN FULL], #5 Exhibit E, Jan. 30, 2018 Depo. Trans. of David Grus [REDACTED IN FULL], #6 Exhibit F, IV-FEDEX00021730-38 [REDACTED IN FULL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of IV's 4th Suppl. Responses to ROGs (No. 8) [REDACTED IN FULL], #8 Exhibit H, IV-FEDEX00089524; IV-FEDEX00089536 [REDACTED IN FULL], #9 Exhibit I, Nov. 9, 2017 Depo. Trans. of Thomas Choi [REDACTED IN FULL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 280 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motions Hearing held on 2/15/2018 re #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc., #177 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT AND DEPOSITION DISCOVERY filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 15, 2018 Filing 279 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike FedEx's Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpted Opening Report Dr. Rhyne (AEO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpted Opening Report Dr. Hohberger (AEO), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted Opening Report Mr. Williams (AEO), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Dr. Rhyne (AEO), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Dr. Hohberger (AEO), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpted Rebuttal Report Mr. Williams (AEO), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted Deposition Transcript Dr. Rhyne (AEO), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted July 27, 2017 FedEx's Interrogatory Responses, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted August 28, 2017 FedEx's Interrogatory Responses (AEO), #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 278 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of Mr. David Williams' and Dr. Lauren Stiroh's Supplemental Expert Reports Relating to Undisclosed Non-InFringement Theories and Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - January 29, 2018 Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Williams on Non-Infringement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpted October 20, 2017 FedEx Amended Resps to IV 1st and 2nd Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted December 8, 2017 FedEx Supplemental Interrogatory Response, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted August 28, 2018 Fedex Response to Rog No. 32, #5 Exhibit 5 - October 23, 2017 Plaintiff Second Notice of Deposition Pursuant to 30(b)(6), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpt of Patton Deposition Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted January 24, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Rodney Patton, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted September 20, 2017 Plaintiff First Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted November 8, 2017 Deposition Transcript of Bobby Nations, #10 Exhibit 10 - September 20, 2017 Notice of Deposition of Rodney Patton, #11 Exhibit 11 - January 25, 2018 Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #12 Exhibit 12 - February 12, 2018 Supplemental Expert Rebuttal Report of Dr. Stiroh, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpted January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Williams, #14 Exhibit 14 - Excerpted January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Williams on Non-Infringement, #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpted January 11, 2018 Expert Rebuttal Report Dr. Stiroh on Damages, #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpted December 19, 2017 Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #17 Exhibit 17 - Excerpted May 12, 2017 FedEx Supplemental Discovery Response, #18 Exhibit A - Ericsson v TCL Communication, #19 Exhibit B - Flexuspine Inc v. Globus Medical Inc., #20 Exhibit C - Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 v Broadcom Limited, #21 Exhibit D - Green v. Blitz USA Inc., #22 Exhibit E - PerdiemCo LLC v. IndusTrack LLC, #23 Exhibit F - Saint Lawrence Comm'ns v. ZTE Corp., No. 15-cv-349, D.I. 442, #24 Exhibit G - Versata Software Inc. v. Sun Microsystems Inc., #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 277 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of Patent No. 6,909,356 and Patent No. 7,199,715 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Engles Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of Ost Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of Engles Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Swearingen Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of Braund Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Braund Dep. Ex. 9 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of Rajadinarkaran Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Rajadinakaran Dep. Ex. 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Kennedy Dep. Ex. 10 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, Excerpts of Wagner Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00610077-96 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 276 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Sharony Opening Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 13, 2018 Email from L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, 581 patent [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Ex. D to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts from Wolfe Dep. Ex. 5, FDXIV00015131 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts from Nations Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts from Smith Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 275 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment for Non-Infringement of U.S. Patent Nos. 9,047,586, 6,909,356, 7,199,715, and 8,494,581 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of D. Engels [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of J. Sharony [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of D. Engels' Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts of J. Sharony Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of M. Wagner Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Dec. 29, 2017 IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Dec. 29, 207 Ex. D, IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 274 SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Noninfringement of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of D. Engels [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 13, 2018 Email from L. Nowierski [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of D. Engels [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts D. Engels' Vol. II Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Excerpts of R. Jaramillo Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, Excerpts of D. Grus' Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of B. Nations' Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Jan. 17, 2017 Ex. E, IV's Infringement Cont. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Dec. 29, 2017 Ex. E, IV's 5th Ad. Infringement Cont. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 273 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Daniel Engels, Ph.D. that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, IV Infringement Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, IV 1st Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, IV 2d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, IV 3d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, IV 4th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, IV 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, Engels Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, FDXIV00083246 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, FDXIV00021776 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00022025 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L, FDXIV00022043 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M, FDXIV00027586 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N, Defs 2d Supp Resps to Plfs 1st ROGs (Nos. 9, 11 & 12) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O, Ltr to A. Steinmetz encl FDXIV_004 Production [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 272 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Clive Hohberger Relating to an Undisclosed Invalidity Theory Based on Prior Use by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Clive Hohberger, #2 Exhibit 2 - March 14, 2017 Defendants' Invalidity Contentions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpted Appendix E01 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpted Appendix E09 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpted Appendix E10 from March 14, 2017 Invalidity Contentions, #6 Exhibit 6 - January 18, 2018 Defendants' Amended Invalidity Contentions, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpted Appendix E01 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted Appendix E07 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted Appendix E18 from January 8, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpted Appendix E20 from January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpted January 30, 2018 Deposition Transcript of David Grus, #12 Exhibit A - Biscotti Inc. v. Microsoft, #13 Exhibit B - Blue Calypso v. Groupon et al - Order, #14 Exhibit C - Core Wireless v. LG Elecs., #15 Exhibit D - Innovative Display Techs. LLC v. Acer, #16 Exhibit E - L.C. Eldridge Sales v. Azen Mfg., #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 271 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Daniel Engels by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Dec. 19, 2017 D. Engels' Expert Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of M. Wagner Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpts of D. Ost Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep. Tr. Vol. I [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, Excerpts of D. Engels' Dep Tr. Vol. II [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 270 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 269 Plaintiff's SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams, #2 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger) (Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 268 Opposed MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of March 13, 2017 Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02030 Petition for IPR of U.S. 8,494,581, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02043 Petition for IPR of U.S. 9,047,586, #4 Exhibit D - UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams, #5 Exhibit E - UNDER SEAL SLIP SHEET - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #6 Exhibit F - January 18, 2018 Amended Invalidity Contentions, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of December 13, 2017 IV Preliminary Response IPR2017-02030, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of December 26, 2017 IV Preliminary Response IPR2017-02043, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 267 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 102, 103, and 112 of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,199,715 and 6,909,356 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, #2 Exhibit B - February 3, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 266 Opposed SEALED MOTION Motion to Strike and Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Hohberger by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Jan. 30, 2018 Letter from Dr. Guerrero [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Feb. 12, 2018 Letter from Dr. F. Roberto Gil [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Excerpts of C. Hohberger's Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 265 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Production Document, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Production Document, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 264 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Enforceability of the Patents-in-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Dkt. No. 32, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 1, 2017 IV First Set of Interrogatories to FedEx Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 FedEx Responses to IV First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - October 20, 2017 FedEx Amended Interrogatory Responses, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 15, 2018 Filing 263 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Daniel Engels that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Infringement Theories by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Ex. C to IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, FDXIV00108135 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, FDXIV00108035 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, FDXIV00108046 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, FDXIV00108047 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, FDXIV00108073 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, FDXIV00108084 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, FDXIV00108093 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Ex. C to IVs 1st Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, IVs 1st ROGs to Defs (Nos. 1-20) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, IVs 2d ROGs to Defs (Nos. 21-33) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L, IVs 3d ROGs to Defs (Nos. 34-40) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M, Excerpts from Isley Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N, Excerpts from Kennedy Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O, Kennedy Ex. 2 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit P, Excerpts from Rajadinakaran Dep. Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit Q, Ex. C to IVs 2d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #18 Exhibit R, Ex. C to IVs 3d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #19 Exhibit S, Ex. C to IVs 4th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #20 Exhibit T, Engels Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #21 Exhibit U, Ex. C to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #22 Exhibit V, IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #23 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 262 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jacob Sharony by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of 2018.01.26 J. Sharony Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, 2017.12.19 J. Sharony Expert Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, US Patent 8,494,581 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Excerpts of 2017.11.10 J. Saavedra Depo Tr. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, 2018.01.11 J. Sharony Rebuttal Expert Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 261 Opposed SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion To Strike Portions of Plaintiffs Infringement Contentions and Portions of the Opening Expert Report of Dr. Jacob Sharony that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Accused Instrumentalities by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Ex. D to IVs Asserted Claims & Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, FDXIV00015918-19 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, FDXIV00015920-21 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, FDXIV00040287 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, FDXIV00040288 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, FDXIV00040298 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, FDXIV00041057-69 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, FDXIV00041395-482 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit J, FDXIV00610455-65 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit K, FDXIV00610466 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Exhibit L, Ex. D to IVs 1st Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #13 Exhibit M, Defs' Resps to Plf's 2d ROGs (Nos. 21-33) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #14 Exhibit N, Ex. D to IVs 2d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #15 Exhibit O, Ex. D to IVs 3d Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #16 Exhibit P, Ex. D to IVs 4th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #17 Exhibit Q, Dec. 19, 2017 Sharony Expert Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #18 Exhibit R, Ex. D to IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #19 Exhibit S, IVs 5th Am Infring Contentions [FILED UNDER SEAL], #20 Exhibit Ex. T, Jan. 25, 2018 Sharony Supplement Expert Report [FILED UNDER SEAL], #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 260 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Michael Wagner by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, Excerpts of Jan. 23, 2018 M. Wagner Depo Tr., #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, Excerpts of Jan. 18, 2018 T. Mulanax Depo Tr., #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, Excerpts of Jan. 24, 2018 R. Patton Depo Tr., #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, FDXIV00138807-09, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, Excerpts of Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 259 Opposed SEALED MOTION FedEx Defendants' Motion To Strike The Opinions And Expert Report Of Michael Wagner by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Excerpts of Defs' 3rd ROGs [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of Pltf's Resp to 3rd ROGs [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Excerpts of Plft's 2nd Sup Resp 3 ROGs [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Sept. 15, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, Sept. 19, 2017 Letter from A. Steinmetz [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6, Sept. 26, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit 7, Oct. 5, 2017 Letter from E. Cook [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit 8, Oct. 13, 2017 Letter from K. Petrie [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit 9, Excerpts of 30(b)(6) Depo. Notice [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit 10, Excerpts of Pltf's Resp. to 30(b)(6) Depo. Notice [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit 11, Dec. 19, 2017 Expert Report of M. Wagner [FILED UNDER SEAL], #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 15, 2018 Filing 258 SEALED SURREPLY Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Surreply Response in Opposition to Defendants' #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Feb. 8, 2018 Opn Rpt of Sprague Ackley (AEO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpted Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Rpt of Dr. Daniel Engels, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Rpt of Dr. Clive Hohberger (AEO), #4 Exhibit 4 - Jan. 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript (AEO), #5 Exhibit 5 - Feb. 12, 2018 Dr. Gil Letter)(Kellman, Alan)
February 14, 2018 Filing 257 SEALED REPLY In Support Of Their Motion re #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Jan. 30, 2018 Letter from Dr. Guerrero [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Feb. 12, 2018 Letter from Dr. Gil [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Feb. 2, 2018 Email from A. Carrano [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Feb. 9, 2018 Email from A. Steinmetz [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2018 Filing 256 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (Dkt. 177) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Kellman, Alan)
February 13, 2018 Filing 255 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Jan. 30, 2018 Letter from Dr. Guerrero [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Feb. 12, 2018 Letter from Dr. Gil [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, Dr. Hohberger's CV [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, Feb. 9, 2018 E-mail from A. Steinmetz [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, NSA_TIA_2011 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit 6, NINDS (NIH) Hope Through Research [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit 7, Defs' Opening Expert Rpt. of Dr. Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit 8, Rebuttal Expert Rpt. of Dr. Hohberger [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit 9, U.S. Patent No. 8,877,679 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #10 Exhibit 10,Select pgs., of Hari Thapa Depo. Trans. [FILED UNDER SEAL], #11 Exhibit 11,Select pgs., of D. Engels' Depo. Trans. [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 13, 2018 Filing 254 SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re #233 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of IV's Resp. to 30(b(6) Depo. Notice [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit B, Excerpts of EMC's Brief ISO SJ and Exclude Expert Testimony [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit C, Jan. 23, 2018 Depo. Trans. of Michael J. Wagner [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit D, Jan. 26, 2018 Depo. Trans. of Lauren Stiroh [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit E, Jan. 30, 2018 Depo. Trans. of David Grus [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Exhibit F, IV-FEDEX00021730-38 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #7 Exhibit G, Excerpts of IV's 4th Suppl. Responses to ROGs (No. 8) [FILED UNDER SEAL], #8 Exhibit H, IV-FEDEX00089524; IV-FEDEX00089536 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #9 Exhibit I, Nov. 9, 2017 Depo. Trans. of Thomas Choi [FILED UNDER SEAL])(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 9, 2018 Filing 253 REDACTION to #250 Sealed Response to Motion,,, Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response in Opposition to #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jan. 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Jan. 19, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Jan. 22, 2018 E-mail from Carrano to Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Jan. 22, 2018 E-mail chain between Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan. 31, 2018 E-mail chain between Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Dr. Daniel Antoniello (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Feb. 6, 2018 E-mail from Berkowitz to Kellman (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit A - Architettura v. DSGN Assocs. (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit B - Commonwealth Sci. v. Buffalo Tech. (PUBLIC VERSION), #10 Exhibit C - Coursey v. City of Camden (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Exhibit D - EEOC v. Serv. Temps (PUBLIC VERSION), #12 Exhibit E - SEC v. Childrens Internet (PUBLIC VERSION), #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
February 9, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness, #177 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT AND DEPOSITION DISCOVERY : Motions Hearing set for 2/15/2018 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER withdrawing #228 Sealed Motion; withdrawing #229 Sealed Motion; withdrawing #231 Sealed Motion; withdrawing #232 Sealed Motion; withdrawing #234 Sealed Motion; withdrawing #235 Sealed Motion; granting #249 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2018. (nkl, )
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER granting #221 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct To Extend Deadline For Mediation filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.., Mediation Completion due by 2/28/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/9/2018. (nkl, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 250 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jan. 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Clive Hohberger (AEO), #2 Exhibit 2 - Jan. 19, 2018 E-mail from Cook to Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Jan. 22, 2018 E-mail from Carrano to Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4 - Jan. 22, 2018 E-mail chain between Counsel, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jan. 31, 2018 E-mail chain between Counsel, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Dr. Daniel Antoniello, #7 Exhibit 7 - Feb. 6, 2018 E-mail from Berkowitz to Kellman, #8 Exhibit A - Architettura v. DSGN Assocs., #9 Exhibit B - Commonwealth Sci. v. Buffalo Tech., #10 Exhibit C - Coursey v. City of Camden, #11 Exhibit D - EEOC v. Serv. Temps, #12 Exhibit E - SEC v. Childrens Internet, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kellman, Alan)
February 7, 2018 Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #231 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim), #232 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #244 Redacted Document,, #234 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C 103, #228 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Enforceability of the Patents-In-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense), #238 Redacted Document,,, #229 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art, #242 Redacted Document, #239 Redacted Document,,,, #235 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLCs Motion to Strike Fedexs Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives, #241 Redacted Document,, #245 Redacted Document,,,,,,, (Re: Dkts. 228, 229, 231, 232, 234, 235, 238, 239, 241, 242, 244, and 245) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
February 2, 2018 Filing 248 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's STATEMENT of Opposition to Dkt. 247 (Kellman, Alan)
February 2, 2018 Filing 247 SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter dated Jan. 30, 2018 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
February 2, 2018 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness submitted document #246 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by one business day. (nkl, )
February 1, 2018 Filing 246 DEFICIENT DOCUMENT SEALED MOTION To Substitute Expert Witness by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter dated Jan. 30, 2018, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/2/2018 (nkl, ).
February 1, 2018 ***Notice of Docket Correction - After speaking with counsel docket entry #229 has been resealed and #239 has been reopened. Document # 229 and 239, Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art and REDACTION. *** (nkl, )
February 1, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY - after speaking with counsel docket entry #228 #229 have been unsealed. Document # 238 and 239, REDACTION and REDACTION. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
January 31, 2018 Filing 245 REDACTION to #235 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLCs Motion to Strike Fedexs Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of January 11, 2018 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of January 11, 2018 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of January 11, 2018 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Mr. Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of January 11, 2018 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Lauren J. Stiroh (REDACTED IN FULL), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of July 27, 2017 - IV Second Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of August 28, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to IV Second Set of Interrogatories (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of October 23, 2017 - IV Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (PUBLIC VERSION), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of November 10, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to IV Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (PUBLIC VERSION), #12 Exhibit 12 - Email Chain Between Counsel (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts of October 6, 2017 - Defendants' Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Nowierski, Lauren)
January 31, 2018 Filing 244 REDACTION to #234 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C 103 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Rhyne's Table of Cases as of January 2018 (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 243 REDACTION to #233 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 27, 2017 - Intellectual's Second Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of August 28, 2017 - FedEx Responses to Second Interrogatories (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit 3 - October 23, 2017 - Intellectual's Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of November 10, 2017 - FedEx Responses to Intellectual's Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Exhibit 5 - Email Chain Between E. Cook and A. Steinmetz (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit 6 - January 11, 2018 - Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh (REDACTED IN FULL), #7 Exhibit 7 - October 6, 2017 - Defendants' Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures (PUBLIC VERSION), #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted D. Braund Deposition Transcript - December 5, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted T. Kennedy Deposition Transcript - November 21, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpted D. Smith Deposition Transcript - November 16, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpted M. Stanley Deposition Transcript - November 2, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpted T. Choi Deposition Transcript - November 9, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #13 Exhibit 13 - Godo Kaisha v. Broadcom - May 18, 2017 Order (PUBLIC VERSION), #14 Exhibit 14 - Freeny v. Murphy - DI146 - May 29, 2015 Order (PUBLIC VERSION), #15 Exhibit 15 - Saint Lawrence Commns v. ZTE - DI442 - February 21, 2017 Order (PUBLIC VERSION), #16 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 242 REDACTION to #232 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 241 REDACTION to #231 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Production Document (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 240 REDACTION to #230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Dr. Engels (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - January 11, 2018 - Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit C - December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - January 19, 2018 - Deposition Transcript of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of November 8, 2017 - Deposition Transcript of R. Fluke (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William)
January 31, 2018 Filing 239 REDACTION to #229 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of March 13, 2017 - Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02030 - Petition for IPR of US 8,494,581 (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02043 - Petition for IPR of US 9,047,586 (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger (REDACTED IN FULL), #6 Exhibit F - January 18, 2018 - Amended Invalidity Contentions (PUBLIC VERSION), #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of December 13, 2017 - Intellectual's Preliminary Response IPR2017-02030 (PUBLIC VERSION), #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of December 26, 2017 - Intellectual's Preliminary Response IPR2017-02043 (PUBLIC VERSION), #9 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William) Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ). Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ).
January 31, 2018 Filing 238 FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY REDACTION to #228 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment on Enforceability of the Patents-In-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims (PUBLIC VERSION), #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 1, 2017 - Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories to FedEx Defendants (PUBLIC VERSION), #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #4 Exhibit D - October 20, 2017 - Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Intellectual's First and Second Set of Interrogatories (PUBLIC VERSION), #5 Text of Proposed Order (PUBLIC VERSION))(Davis, William) Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ).
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #225 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #135 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, The Docket Control Order filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.., Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions in Limine due by 3/30/2018., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/6/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2018. (nkl, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER finding as moot #138 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting #226 Motion for Entry of Stipulation and Proposed Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/31/2018. (nkl, )
January 29, 2018 Filing 235 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLCs Motion to Strike Fedexs Expert Opinions of Dr. Rhyne, Mr. Williams, and Dr. Hohberger Relating to Undisclosed Non-Infringing Alternatives by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Dec. 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpts of Dec. 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of Dec. 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpts of Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts of Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts of Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Mr. Williams, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Jan. 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of July 27, 2017 IV Second Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts of Aug. 28, 2017 Defendants Responses to IV Second Set of Interrogatories, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Oct. 23, 2017 IV Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpts of Nov. 10, 2017 Defendants Responses to IV Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #12 Exhibit 12 - Email Chain Between Counsel, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts of Oct. 6, 2017 Defendants Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren) Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 234 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Dr. Rhyne's Opinions Failing to Apply the Court's Claim Construction and Motion for Summary Judgment of No Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 Pursuant to 35 U.S.C 103 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 - Opening Expert Report of Vernon Thomas Rhyne, III, #2 Exhibit B - Dr. Rhyne's Table of Cases as of January 2018, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 233 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Reasonable Royalty Opinions of FedEx's Damages Expert Lauren J. Stiroh by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 27, 2017 - Intellectual's Second Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of August 28, 2017 - FedEx Responses to Second Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit 3 - October 23, 2017 - Intellectual's Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Excerpt of November 10, 2017 - FedEx Responses to Intellectual's Second Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email chain Between E. Cook and A. Steinmetz, #6 Exhibit 6 - January 11, 2018 - Expert Rebuttal Report of Lauren J. Stiroh, #7 Exhibit 7 - October 6, 2017 - Defendants' Second Amended Joint Initial Disclosures, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpted D. Braund Deposition Transcript - December 5, 2017, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpted T. Kennedy Deposition Transcript - November 21, 2017, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpted D. Smith Deposition Transcript - November 16, 2017, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpted M. Stanley Deposition Transcript - November 2, 2017, #12 Exhibit 12 - Excerpted T. Choi Deposition Transcript - November 9, 2017, #13 Exhibit 13 - Godo Kaisha v. Broadcom - May 18, 2017 Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Freeny v. Murphy - DI146 - May 29, 2015 Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - Saint Lawrence Commns v. ZTE - DI442 - February 21, 2017 Order, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 29, 2018 Filing 232 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Anticipation of U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 231 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment That Plaintiff Did Not Violate Tennessee Code No. 29-40-102 (FedEx's Eleventh Counterclaim) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Production Document, #4 Exhibit D - Defendants' Production Document, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 230 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Clive Hohberger by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Engels, #2 Exhibit B - January 11, 2018 Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #3 Exhibit C - December 19, 2017 Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #4 Exhibit D - January 19, 2018 Deposition Transcript of Dr. Hohberger, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of November 8, 2017 Deposition Transcript of R. Fluke, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
January 29, 2018 Filing 229 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of FedEx's Amended Invalidity Contentions and Opening Expert Reports that Rely on Untimely Disclosed Prior Art by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of March 13, 2017 - Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02030 - Petition for IPR of US 8,494,581, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of August 31, 2017 IPR2017-02043 - Petition for IPR of US 9,047,586, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Mr. Williams, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Opening Expert Report of Dr. Hohberger, #6 Exhibit F - January 18, 2018 - Amended Invalidity Contentions, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of December 13, 2017 - Intellectual's Preliminary Response IPR2017-02030, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of December 26, 2017 - Intellectual's Preliminary Response IPR2017-02043, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ). Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ). Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 228 WITHDRAWN PER ORDER #252 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Enforceability of the Patents-In-Suit (FedEx's Third Affirmative Defense) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of November 10, 2016 (Dkt. 32) - Defendants' Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of March 1, 2017 - Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories to FedEx Defendants, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of March 31, 2017 - Defendants' Responses to Intellectual's First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - October 20, 2017 - Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Responses to Intellectual's First and Second Set of Interrogatories, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) Modified on 2/1/2018 (nkl, ). Modified on 2/9/2018 (nkl, ).
January 29, 2018 Filing 227 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #225 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #135 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, The Docket Control Order - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Dkt. 225 (Davis, William)
January 26, 2018 Filing 226 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation and Proposed Summary Judgment by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Agreed Stipulation, #2 Proposed Summary Judgment Order)(Davis, William)
January 26, 2018 Filing 225 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #135 Order,, Terminate Motions,, Scheduling Order, The Docket Control Order by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
January 23, 2018 Filing 224 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER denying the petition for writ of mandamus. The motion for a stay is denied as moot. Issued 1/23/18. Chief Judge Prost, Circuit Judges: Lourie and Chen.(dlc, )
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #218 Motion to Amend/Correct To Extend Deadline For Serving Disclosures For Rebuttal Expert Witnesses. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/22/2018. (nkl, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 222 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tom BenGera on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6628332. (BenGera, Tom)
January 19, 2018 Filing 221 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct To Extend Deadline For Mediation by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
January 12, 2018 Filing 220 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Of Compliance Of Service Regarding Rebuttal Expert Reports [Dkt. Nos. 135, 218] (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
January 12, 2018 Filing 219 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance of Service Regarding Rebuttal Expert Reports (Re: Dkts. 135 and 218) (Davis, William)
January 10, 2018 Filing 218 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct To Extend Deadline For Serving Disclosures For Rebuttal Expert Witnesses by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER approving #211 Joint MOTION re #144 Markman Hearing, #147 Transcript,,,, Joint Stipulation Extending the Deadline for the Parties to Participate in Mediation filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC., Mediation Completion due by 1/19/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/4/2018. (nkl, )
January 4, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Of Compliance Regarding Payment To Technical Advisor (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
January 4, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/19/17 (Motion Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR/TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 1/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (sholmes, )
January 3, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Selection RESET for 5/14/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 3, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC re #176 Response in Opposition to Motion - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's NOTICE OF LETTER to Honorable Judge Rodney Gilstrap (Re: Briefing Dkts. 136, 176, 193, and 201) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to the Honorable Judge Rodney Gilstrap, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 - Corrected Page No. 1 (Previously Filed as Dkt. 176)(Davis, William)
January 2, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1, 3-2 and 3-6 (Re: Dkts. 55, 68 and 165) (Davis, William)
January 2, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC - Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance Regarding Payment to Technical Advisor (Re: Dkt. 182) (Davis, William)
December 29, 2017 Filing 211 Joint MOTION re #144 Markman Hearing, #147 Transcript,,,, Joint Stipulation Extending the Deadline for the Parties to Participate in Mediation by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 29, 2017 Filing 210 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #184 MOTION to Strike #175 Response in Opposition to Motion, #172 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #176 Response in Opposition to Motion, #173 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #174 Response in Opposition to Motion, "Defendants Re: Dkt. Nos. 184, 194, 205 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Nowierski, Lauren)
December 26, 2017 Filing 209 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER, a petition for Writ of Mandamus has been filed. Any response to petitioners motion to stay district court proceedings, pending mandamus petition is due no later than December 29, 2017. Issued: December 26, 2017. (dlc, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting as modified #164 Motion for Additional Deposition Time. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/22/2017. (nkl, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc... Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/22/2017. (nkl, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #162 MOTION For Entry Of Model Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs, And Temporary Stay Of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Election Of Claims filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc... Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/22/2017. (nkl, )
December 22, 2017 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion re #184 MOTION to Strike #175 Response in Opposition to Motion, #172 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #176 Response in Opposition to Motion, #173 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #174 Response in Opposition to Motion, "Defendants filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, Email dated 2017.12.17 from L. Nowierski)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2017 Filing 204 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c) (Re: Dkts. 140, 174, and 191) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 203 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c) (Re: Dkts. 139, 175, and 192) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 202 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c) (Re: Dkts. 137, 172, and 189) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 201 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c) (Re: Dkts 136, 176, and 193) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
December 20, 2017 Filing 200 SEALED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to Motion re #177 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT AND DEPOSITION DISCOVERY filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, FDXIV00405155 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, FDXIV00614671 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Exhibit 3, FDXIV00610110 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #4 Exhibit 4, FDXIV00014734 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #5 Exhibit 5, FDXIV00620681 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2017 Filing 199 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Compliance of Service Regarding Expert Reports [Dkt. 187] (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2017 Filing 198 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance of Service Regarding Expert Reports (Re: Dkt. 187) (Davis, William)
December 19, 2017 Filing 197 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2017 re #164 Opposed MOTION for Additional Deposition Time (Re: Dkts. 55 and 142) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC, #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
December 18, 2017 Filing 196 REPLY to Response to Motion re #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2017 Filing 195 RESPONSE in Opposition re #184 MOTION to Strike #175 Response in Opposition to Motion, #172 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #176 Response in Opposition to Motion, #173 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #174 Response in Opposition to Motion, "Defendants filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from J. Berkowitz to A. Kellman - Dated December 12, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - E.D. of Texas Standing Order Regarding Motions Under 35 U.S.C. 101, #3 Exhibit C - Script v. ADT - September 4, 2015 - First Amended Docket Control Order, #4 Exhibit D - Tyco v. Applied Medical - January 18, 2011 - Order on Defendant's Letter Brief, #5 Exhibit E - Tyco v. Applied Medical - June 10, 2010 - Amended Complaint, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 15, 2017 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #164 Opposed MOTION for Additional Deposition Time (Re: Dkts. 55 and 142), #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" : Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
December 14, 2017 Filing 194 RESPONSE in Opposition re #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" (Re: Dkts. 185 and 186) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EchoStar Techs. Corp. v. TiVo Inc., #2 Exhibit 2 - In re Asustek (Dkt. No. 9), #3 Exhibit 3 - In re Aurobindo (Dkt. No. 10), #4 Exhibit 4 - In re Cray (Dkt. No. 7), #5 Exhibit 5 - In re Cutsforth (Dkt. No. 7), #6 Exhibit 6 - In re Deca (Dkt. No. 4), #7 Exhibit 7 - In re FedEx (Dkt. No. 17), #8 Exhibit 8 - In re FedEx (Dkt. No. 2-1), #9 Exhibit 9 - In re HTC America (Dkt. No. 8), #10 Exhibit 10 - In re Micron (Dkt. No. 3), #11 Exhibit 11 - In re Nintendo (Dkt. No. 4), #12 Exhibit 12 - In re Techtronic (Dkt. No. 3), #13 Exhibit 13 - Invensys Sys. Inc. v. Emerson Electric, #14 Exhibit 14 - Lennon Image Techs LLC v Macys Retail Holdings Inc., #15 Exhibit 15 - Lodsys LLC v. Brother Intern. Corp., #16 Exhibit 16 - Luv N Care Ltd. v. Jackel Int'l Ltd, #17 Exhibit 17 - Personalweb Techs. v. IBM, #18 Exhibit 18 - Queens Univ. at Kingston v. Samsung, #19 Exhibit 19 - Singleton v. Volkswagen, #20 Exhibit 20 - St. Lawrence Commnc'ns v. ZTE Corp., #21 Exhibit 21 - Williams v. Toyota, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 13, 2017 Filing 193 REPLY to Response to Motion re #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2017 Filing 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2017 Filing 191 REPLY to Response to Motion re #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2017 Filing 190 REPLY to Response to Motion re #138 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,633,900 - Rule 12(c) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2017 Filing 189 REPLY to Response to Motion re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Barbosa (Excerpts of U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581), #2 Exhibit B, Dussell (U.S. Patent No. 5,938,721), #3 Exhibit C, Alexander (U.S. Patent No. 6,083,353), #4 Exhibit D, Treyz (Excerpts of U.S. Patent No. 6,587,835), #5 Exhibit E, Devitt (Excerpts of U.S. Patent No. 6,947,976), #6 Exhibit F, Rappaport (Excerpts of U.S. Patent No. 6,971,063), #7 Exhibit G, Enmei (Excerpts of U.S. Patent No. 7,064,749), #8 Exhibit H, Dussell (U.S. Application 2001-0018663 A1))(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2017 Filing 188 RESPONSE in Opposition re #164 Opposed MOTION for Additional Deposition Time (Re: Dkts. 55 and 142) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Order (2009.06.02) LML Patent Corp. v. JP Morgan Chase & Co., #2 Exhibit 2, Memo Opinion and Order (2017.01.12) Allergan, Inc. v. Teva Pharms. USA, Inc., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" : Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2017 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2017. (nkl, )
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re #185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/12/2017. (nkl, )
December 11, 2017 Filing 185 MOTION to Stay "Defendants' Urgent Motion To Stay All Deadlines Pending Appeal" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 11, 2017 Filing 184 MOTION to Strike #175 Response in Opposition to Motion, #172 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, #176 Response in Opposition to Motion, #173 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #174 Response in Opposition to Motion, "Defendants' Motion To Strike Over-Length Opposition Briefs" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Order (2015.01.23) Parallel Separation Networks LLC v Schlumberger N.V., #2 Exhibit 2, Order (2011.01.18) Tyco Healthcare Group LP v Applied Med. Res. Corp, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2017 Filing 183 REDACTION to #177 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT AND DEPOSITION DISCOVERY by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from L. Nowierski to Defendants - Dated November 3, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #2 Exhibit B - Email from A. Steinmetz to E. Cook - Dated December 1, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #3 Exhibit C - Email from L. Nowierski to Defendants - Dated December 4, 2017 (REDACTED IN FULL), #4 Exhibit D - Excerpts from December 1, 2017 Rough Transcript of M. Petrosky (REDACTED IN FULL), #5 Exhibit E - Genco Supply Chain Solutions (PUBLIC VERSION), #6 Text of Proposed Order - (PUBLIC VERSION))(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/08/2017. (nkl, )
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying as moot #154 Sealed Motion Defendants' Motion To Compel Discovery On "Logistics" Patents That Intellectual Ventures Licenses Together With The Asserted Patents. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/08/2017. (nkl, ) Modified on 12/8/2017 (nkl, ).
December 7, 2017 Filing 179 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #175 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel W. Engels, #9 Exhibit 1 (US Patent 9,047,586), #10 Exhibit 2 (US Patent 6,909,356), #11 Exhibit 3 (US Patent 8,285,607), #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 7, 2017 Filing 178 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #176 Response in Opposition to Motion.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Excerpts 2017-03-14 FedEx Invalidity Contentions), #2 Exhibit C (Excerpts FedEx Petition for IPR of US 9,047,586, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel W. Engels, #4 Exhibit 1 (US Patent 9,047,586), #5 Exhibit 2 (US Patent 6,909,356), #6 Exhibit 3 (US Patent 8,285,607), #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 7, 2017 Filing 177 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENT AND DEPOSITION DISCOVERY by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 6, 2017 Filing 180 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT ORDER: Intellectual Ventures is directed to respond to the petition for a writ of mandamus no later than December 12, 2017. Any reply must be filed no later than December 15, 2017. Entered: December 6, 2017. (dlc, )
December 6, 2017 Filing 176 RESPONSE in Opposition re #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Nowierski, Lauren)
December 6, 2017 Filing 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Kellman, Alan)
December 6, 2017 Filing 174 RESPONSE in Opposition re #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 6, 2017 Filing 173 RESPONSE in Opposition re #138 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,633,900 - Rule 12(c) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 900 Excerpt of 2017-03-14 FedEx Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - 900 IPR Petition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit - Declaration of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #4 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 6,633,900, #5 Exhibit 2 - US Patent 8,494,581, #6 Exhibit 3 - Sharony CV, #7 Exhibit 4 - July 24, 2003 Press Release - iQue 3600 (IV-FEDEX00151773), #8 Exhibit 5 - Mitac Mio 168 Review, #9 Exhibit 6 - July 8, 2003 BusinessWire Article, #10 Exhibit 7 - Emtac Bluetooth GPS Receiver Review, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 6, 2017 Filing 172 RESPONSE in Opposition re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 581 Excerpt of 2017-03-14 FedEx Invalidity Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - 581 IPR Petition Excerpts, #3 Exhibit C - Dec. 2001 SatNav News Article, #4 Exhibit - Declaration of Dr. Jacob Sharony, #5 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 6,633,900, #6 Exhibit 2 - US Patent 8,494,581, #7 Exhibit 3 - Sharony CV, #8 Exhibit 4 - July 24, 2003 Press Release - iQue 3600 (IV-FEDEX00151773), #9 Exhibit 5 - Mitac Mio 168 Review, #10 Exhibit 6 - July 8, 2003 BusinessWire Article, #11 Exhibit 7 - Emtac Bluetooth GPS Receiver Review, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 6, 2017 Filing 171 Sealed Defendants' Notice Of Mootness Of Motion To Compel Discovery On "Logistics" Patents That Intellectual Ventures Licenses Together With The Asserted Patents #154 by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution Systems, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 5, 2017 Filing 170 USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed. USCA-FEDERAL CIRCUIT NO. 18-117. (dlc, )
December 5, 2017 Filing 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re #162 MOTION For Entry Of Model Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs, And Temporary Stay Of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Election Of Claims filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 1, 2017 Filing 168 Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE in Opposition to #154 Defendants' SEALED Motion To Compel Discovery On "Logistics" Patents That Intellectual Ventures Licenses Together With The Asserted Patents filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Excerpt of Correspondence), #2 Exhibit B (Excerpt of Discovery Response), #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nowierski, Lauren)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #150 Opposed MOTION re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Plead filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/01/2017. (nkl, )
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #163 Motion For Expedited Briefing On Defendants' Motion For Entry Of Model Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs, And Temporary Stay Of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Election Of Claims 162. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/01/2017. (nkl, )
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/29/2017. (nkl, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 164 Opposed MOTION for Additional Deposition Time (Re: Dkts. 55 and 142) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain Between Counsel - Dated October 16, 19, 20, and 23, 2017, #2 Exhibit B - Email Chain Between Counsel - Dated November 10, 11, and 15, 2017, #3 Exhibit C - Email from J. Berkowitz to A. Kellman - Dated November 27, 2017, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
November 28, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION to Expedite "Motion For Expedited Briefing On Defendants' Motion For Entry Of Model Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs, And Temporary Stay Of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Election Of Claims #162 " by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 28, 2017 Filing 162 MOTION For Entry Of Model Order Focusing Patent Claims And Prior Art To Reduce Costs, And Temporary Stay Of Proceedings Pending Plaintiff's Election Of Claims by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, IV's 4th Am. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit 2, IV's 2d Am. Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit 3, Memorandum Opinion and Order (Allergan, Inc. v Teva Pharms. USA, #4 Exhibit 4, Order (VirnetX, Inc. v. Apple, Inc), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc... Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/22/2017. (nkl, )
November 21, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Timothy Li on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6562393. (Li, Timothy)
November 21, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jordan N Malz on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6562373. (Malz, Jordan)
November 20, 2017 Filing 158 RESPONSE to #157 Notice (Other), - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Re: Dkts. 84, 85, and 157) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
November 17, 2017 Filing 157 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) ,"Notice Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dimiss Under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a)" (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph M. Schaffner on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6558448. (Schaffner, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2017: #1 Sealed Attachment) (jmv, ).
November 17, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Notice Of Plaintiff's Failure To Timely File Responses To Pending Rule 12(C) Motions (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 17, 2017 Filing 154 SEALED MOTION Defendants' Motion To Compel Discovery On "Logistics" Patents That Intellectual Ventures Licenses Together With The Asserted Patents by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, IV-FEDEX00129601 [FILED UNDER SEAL], #2 Exhibit 2, Excerpts of T. Choi's Depo Transcript [FILED UNDER SEAL], #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 13, 2017 Filing 153 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #150 Opposed MOTION re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Plead FedEx Defendants' Sur-Reply To Plaintiff's Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Treat The FedEx Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motions As Summary Judgment Motions And Deny As Exceeding The Page Limits, Or In The Alternative To Extend Intellectual Ventures' Time To Respond filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2017 Filing 152 REPLY to Response to Motion re #150 Opposed MOTION re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Plead Plaintiff's Reply in Support of it's Motion to Treat Fedex's Rule 12(c) Motions as Summary Judgment Motions and Deny Them as Exceeding the Page Limits, or in the Alternative to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Nowierski, Lauren)
November 8, 2017 Filing 151 RESPONSE in Opposition re #150 Opposed MOTION re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Plead FedEx Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion To Treat FedEx's Rule 12(c) Motions As Summary Judgment Motions And Deny Them As Exceeding The Page Limits, Or In The Alternative To Extend Intellectual Ventures' Time To Respond filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Email from A. Kellman to J. Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit 2, Defs' Joint Initial and Additional Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3, Defs' Second Set of ROGs (Nos. 14-15), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2017 Filing 150 Opposed MOTION re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c), #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c), #138 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,633,900 - Rule 12(c) - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Treat FedEx's Rule 12(C) Motions as Summary Judgment Motions and Deny Them as Exceeding the Page Limits, or in the Alternative to Extend Intellectual Ventures Time to Respond by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/7/2017: #2 Revised Proposed Order) (nkl, ).
November 6, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Andrea Grace Klock Mills on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6540839. (Mills, Andrea)
November 6, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c), #139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c), #140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c), #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c), #138 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,633,900 - Rule 12(c) JOINT LETTER PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER ON MOTIONS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Joint Letter re motions under 35 U.S.C. 101)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/26/17 (Claim Construction Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 11/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2018. (sholmes, )

November 3, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c) JOINT LETTER PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S STANDING ORDER ON MOTIONS UNDER 35 U.S.C. 101 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kevin K. McNish on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6538209. (McNish, Kevin)
October 27, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alexander M. Boyer on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6528011. (Boyer, Alexander)
October 26, 2017 Filing 144 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Markman Hearing held on 10/26/2017. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #113 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC.. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2017. (nkl, )
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #104 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc... Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/24/2017. (nkl, )
October 24, 2017 Filing 140 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715 - Rule 12(c) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpt of IV's Tech Tutorial, Slides 1, 18, #2 Exhibit B, Excerpt of IV's 1st Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 2nd Set of Rogs, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2017 Filing 139 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,909,356 - Rule 12(c) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpt of IV's 1st Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 2nd Set of Rogs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2017 Filing 138 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 6,633,900 - Rule 12(c) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint - IV v. FTD, #2 Exhibit B, Complaint - IV v. Sally Beauty, #3 Exhibit C. Excerpt of IV's 1st Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 2nd Set of Rogs, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2017 Filing 137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent 8,494,581 - Rule 12(c) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpt of IV's 1st Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 2nd Set of Rogs, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2017 Filing 136 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, Rule 12(c) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpt of IV's Tech Tutorial, Slide 1, 34, #2 Exhibit B, Excerpt of IV Tech Tutorial Slide 1, 37, #3 Exhibit C, Excerpt of IPR2017-00859_Exhibit 2002, #4 Exhibit D, U.S. Patent 7,070,103, #5 Exhibit E, Excerpt of IV's 1st Suppl. Resp. to Defs' 2nd Set of Rogs, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 10/26/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #128 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2018 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 12/8/2017.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/19/2017. (ch, )
October 19, 2017 Filing 134 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Wueste on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6515096. (Wueste, Michael)
October 17, 2017 Filing 133 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #114 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Add Claims of Willful Infringement filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Complaint - Plano Encryption Techs., LLC v. Alkami Tech.)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER finding as moot #87 Sealed Motion to Compel Interrogatory Response. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/16/2017. (nkl, )
October 13, 2017 Filing 131 FedEx Defendants' SEALED SUR-REPLY to Motion re #113 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2017 Filing 130 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #114 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Add Claims of Willful Infringement filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14 - Plano Encryption Technologies, LLC v. Alkami Technology, Inc, et al., Civil Action No. 2:16-cv-1032-JRG - Memorandum Opinion and Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6), #2 Exhibit 15 - Imperium IP Holdings (Cayman), Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Slip Copy (2017), #3 Exhibit 16 - Sycamore IP Holdings LLC v. AT&T Corp., Slip Copy (2017), #4 Exhibit 17 - T-Rex Property AB v. Regal Entertainment Group, Slip Copy (2017) (Davis, William)
October 6, 2017 Filing 129 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED REPLY to Response and in Support of its Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions re #113 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22 - Third Amended Infringement Contentions - Served October 6, 2017, #2 Exhibit 23 - Excerpts of FedEx's 01-23-2017 Petition for IPR of U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356, #3 Exhibit 24 - Excerpts of FedEx's 01-27-2017 Petition for IPR of U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715, #4 Exhibit F - Adaptix Inc. v. T-Mobile USA, Inc., #5 Exhibit G - Imperium IP Holdings (CAYMAN) Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., #6 Exhibit H - Raytheon Co. v. Indigo Systems Corp., #7 Exhibit I - Realtime Data LLC v. Metropcs Texas LLC) (Davis, William)
October 4, 2017 Filing 128 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #108 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A, Second Amended Docket Control Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 2, 2017 Filing 127 RESPONSE to #123 Notice (Other), - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Re: Dkt. 123) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
September 29, 2017 Filing 126 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #114 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Add Claims of Willful Infringement filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Chart for '356, #2 Exhibit B, Chart for '715, #3 Exhibit C, SenseAware Doc, FDXIV00014116, #4 Exhibit D, SenseAware Doc, FDXIV00014154, #5 Exhibit E, SenseAware Doc, FDXIV00042272, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2017 Filing 125 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #104 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
September 29, 2017 Filing 124 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #113 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Chart for '356, #2 Exhibit B, Chart for '715, #3 Exhibit C, July Infr. Disclosures, #4 Exhibit D, IV Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E, Ortiz-Barb, #6 Exhibit F, Chart for '900, #7 Exhibit G, Source Code Email, #8 Exhibit H, FDXIV00112497, #9 Exhibit I, FDXIV00015533, #10 Exhibit J, FDXIV00015437, #11 Exhibit K, May 15 Email, #12 Exhibit L, Industry News, #13 Exhibit M, Intermec User Manual, #14 Exhibit N, FDXIV00015445, #15 Exhibit O, FDXIV00015508, #16 Exhibit P, Annual Report, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 25, 2017 Filing 123 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) "Notice Of Supplemental Authority In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Dimiss Under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a)" (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 122 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT to Main Document: #121 Reply to Response to Motion, Exhibit 4, 2nd Am. Contentions,. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2017 Filing 121 REPLY to Response to Motion re #104 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review "FedEx Defendants' Reply In Support Of Motion To Stay Pending Inter Partes Review" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, General Order, #2 Exhibit 4, 2nd Am. Contentions, #3 Exhibit 5, Uniloc v. Samsung Eles. Am., Inc.)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #117 Unopposed Motion to File Sur-Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/22/2017. (slo, )
September 21, 2017 Filing 119 RESPONSE to #91 Claim Construction Brief "Defendants' SUR-REPLY To Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/21/2017 (slo, ).
September 21, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 118, Sur-Reply. WRONG EVENT USED. Attorney must refile. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (slo, )
September 20, 2017 Filing 118 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #117 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief "Defendants' Sur-Reply To Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/21/2017 (slo, ).
September 20, 2017 Filing 117 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2017 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Motions hearing previously set on September 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. (jml)
September 18, 2017 Filing 116 Joint Claim Construction Chart by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart) (Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 115 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,633,900, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581, #5 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586) (Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 114 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Complaint to Add Claims of Willful Infringement by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of 2017-03-31 FedEx Resp to IV's 1st Set of Rogs, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of FedEx Document, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of FedEx Document, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of FedEx Document, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of 2017-03-01 IV's 1st Set of Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit F - 2017-04-21 Email Correspondence, #7 Exhibit G - 2017-05-11 Email Correspondence, #8 Exhibit H - 2017-04-28 Email Correspondence, #9 Exhibit I - 2017-05-24 Email Correspondence, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpt of 2017-07-18 FedEx 4th Suppl Resps to IV's 1st Set of Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit K - 2017-08-14 Email Correspondence, #12 Exhibit L - 2017-08-14 Email Correspondence, #13 Exhibit M - 2017-08-21 Email Correspondence, #14 Exhibit N - 2016-12-22 Letter, #15 Exhibit O - Excerpt of FedEx Document, #16 Exhibit P - Excerpt of FedEx 2017 Annual Report, #17 Exhibit Q - Complaint Redline, #18 Exhibit 1 - Architettura v. DSGN Assocs., #19 Exhibit 2 - Blue Calypso Inc. v. Groupon Inc., #20 Exhibit 3 - Bush Seismic Technologies LLC v. American Gem Society, #21 Exhibit 4 - EEOC v. Serv. Temps Inc., #22 Exhibit 5 - H and R Block Tax Services Inc. v. Jackson Hewitt Tax Service Inc., #23 Exhibit 6 - Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US Inc. - Adoption, #24 Exhibit 7 - Huawei Technologies Co. Ltd v. T-Mobile US Inc., #25 Exhibit 8 - Panoptis Patent Management LLC v. Blackberry Corporation - Adopt, #26 Exhibit 9 - Panoptis Patent Management LLC v. Blackberry Corporation, #27 Exhibit 10 - Raytheon Co. v. Indigo Systems Corp., #28 Exhibit 11 - Raytheon Company v. Cray Inc - Adopt, #29 Exhibit 12 - Raytheon Company v. Cray Inc., #30 Exhibit 13 - T-Rex v. Regal - 16-cv-00927, Dkt. No. 83, #31 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 113 Opposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2016-12-22 Letter from Steinmetz to Skoyles, #2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of 2017-03-01 IV's 1st Set of Rogs to Defs (Nos. 1-20), #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpt of 2017-03-31 Defs' Resp to IV's 1st Set of Rogs (Nos.1-20), #4 Exhibit 4 - 2017-04-21 Email from Nowierski to Young, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2017-05-11 Email from Steinmetz to Tucker, #6 Exhibit 6 - 2017-04-28 Email from Tucker to Nowierski, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2017-05-22 Email from Nowierski to Tucker, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpt of 2017-07-18 - Defs' 4th Suppl Resps to IV's 1st Set of Rogs (No. 10), #9 Exhibit 9 - 2017-08-14 Email from Young to Nowierski, #10 Exhibit 10 - 2017-08-21 Email from Young to Nowierski, #11 Exhibit 11 - Excerpt of 2017-05-12 FedEx 1st Suppl Resps to IV's 1st Set of Rogs (Nos. 2, 7-9, 15), #12 Exhibit 12 - 2017-06-05 Letter from Nowierski to Tucker, #13 Exhibit 13 - Excerpt of 2017-07-27 IV's 2nd Set of Rogs to Defs (Nos. 21-33), #14 Exhibit 14 - Defs' Doc FDXIV00608879, #15 Exhibit 15 - Excerpt of Defs' Doc FDXIV00611062, #16 Exhibit 16 - Excerpt of 2017-08-28 FedEx Resp to IV's 2nd Set of Rogs (Nos. 21-33), #17 Exhibit 17 - 2017-07-27 Letter from Cook to Nowierski, #18 Exhibit 18 - Defs' Doc FDXIV00609467-68, #19 Exhibit 19 - Defs' Doc FDXIV00610077-78, #20 Exhibit 20 - Excerpt of FedEx 2017 Annual Report, #21 Exhibit 21 - IVs' Third Amended Infringement Contentions - Cover, #22 Exhibit 21 - A - Exhibit A to IV's Third Amended Contentions, #23 Exhibit 21 - B - Exhibit B to IV's Third Amended Contentions, #24 Exhibit 21 - C - Exhibit C to IV's Third Amended Contentions, #25 Exhibit 21 - D - Exhibit D to IV's Third Amended Contentions, #26 Exhibit 21 - E - Exhibit E to IV's Third Amended Contentions, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #104 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of 2017-08-31 IPR2017-02039 Petition re '715 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - IPR2016-01357 et al - Paper No. 19, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of 2017-01-27 IPR2017-00787 Petition re '715 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of 2017-01-24 IPR2017-00741 Petition re '900 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of IPR2017-00729 Paper No. 7 - Institution Decision, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpt of IPR2017-00741 Paper No. 7 - Institution Decision, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of IPR2017-00787 Paper No. 7 - Institution Decision, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of IPR2017-00859 Paper No. 7 - Institution Decision, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Defs' Preliminary Invalidity Contentions, #10 Exhibit J - Appendix F - Defs' PICs, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpt of 2017-08-31 IPR2017-02028 Petition re '356 Patent, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpt of Defs' Rog Resps, #13 Exhibit M - Law360 Article, #14 Exhibit N - Excerpt of IPR2017-00750 Paper No. 9 - Decision, #15 Exhibit 1 - Cellular Commc'ns Equipment LLC v. Samsung, #16 Exhibit 2 - Comcast Cable Commc'ns Corp. LLC v. Finisar, #17 Exhibit 3 - EchoStar v. TiVo Inc., #18 Exhibit 4 - IV II LLC v. BITCO General Ins., #19 Exhibit 5 - Invensys Systems Inc. v. Emerson Electric, #20 Exhibit 6 - Lodsys LLC v. Brother Intern Corp., #21 Exhibit 7 - Parthenon Unified Memory Artchv HTC, #22 Exhibit 8 - Perdiemco LLC v. Telular, #23 Exhibit 9 - Personal Audio LLC v. Google, #24 Exhibit 10 - Saint Lawrence Commc'ns LLC v. ZTE, #25 Exhibit 11 - TracBeam LLC v. T-Mobile US Inc., #26 Exhibit 12 - Trover Group Inc. v. Dedicated Micros USA, #27 Exhibit 13 - Unifi Scientific Batteries LLC v. Sony Mobile Commc'ns AB, #28 Exhibit 14 - Versata Software Inc. v. SAP America Inc., #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with Second Supplemental P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Re: Dkt. 55) (Davis, William)
September 15, 2017 Filing 110 STATUS REPORT Joint Report On Meeting Regarding FedEx's Motion To Compel [Dkt. 87] by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
September 13, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John Derek McCorquindale on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6462693. (McCorquindale, John)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #103 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/12/2017. (nkl, )
September 12, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), #87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Response : Motions Hearing set for 9/21/2017 10:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
September 11, 2017 Filing 107 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures' SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #106 Plaintiff's REPLY to Claim Construction Brief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA-1 - Excerpt of FedEx Prod Doc, #2 Exhibit AA-2 - Excerpt of FedEx Prod Doc) (Davis, William)
September 11, 2017 Filing 106 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures' REPLY Claim Construction Brief to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief #102 and to Opening Claim Construction Brief #91 filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Y - Excerpt of Provisional Application 60-245767, #2 Exhibit Z - 2016-01-11 Forbes Article, #3 Exhibit AA-1 - Excerpt of FedEx Prod Doc, #4 Exhibit AA-2 - Excerpt of FedEx Prod Doc, #5 Exhibit AA-3 - Excerpt of MC9500-K User Guide, #6 Exhibit AA-4 - Excerpt of Zebra Application Brief, #7 Exhibit BB - IV's Amended Constructions, #8 Exhibit 1 - Blast Motion Inc. v. Zepp Labs Inc., #9 Exhibit 2 - Grantley Patent Holdings Ltd. v. Clear Channel, #10 Exhibit 3 - Lodsys LLC v. Brother Intern Corp., #11 Exhibit 4 - Medversant v. Morrisey No. 09-5031, Dkt. No. 247, #12 Exhibit 5 - SimpleAir Inc. v. Google Inc.) (Davis, William)
September 8, 2017 Filing 105 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Service of Second Amended Initial Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 55) (Davis, William)
September 1, 2017 Filing 104 MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, USPTO Trial Statistics (July 2017), #2 Exhibit 2, Defs' Invalidity Contentions (3/14/2017))(Berkowitz, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2017: #3 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ).
August 31, 2017 Filing 103 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #54 Scheduling Order,, - Unopposed Motion to Amend Docket Control Order (Dkt. 54) to Permit Plaintiff Additional Time to Comply with P.R. 4-5(c) and for the Parties to Comply with P.R. 4-5(d) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Docket Control Order)(Davis, William)
August 30, 2017 Filing 102 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF to #91 Claim Construction Brief,,,,,,,, filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6, #7 Exhibit A7, #8 Exhibit B1, #9 Exhibit B2, #10 Exhibit B3, #11 Exhibit B4, #12 Exhibit B5, #13 Exhibit B6, #14 Exhibit B7, #15 Exhibit B8, #16 Exhibit B9, #17 Exhibit B10, #18 Exhibit C1, #19 Exhibit C2, #20 Exhibit C3, #21 Exhibit C4, #22 Exhibit C5, #23 Exhibit C6, #24 Exhibit C7, #25 Exhibit C8, #26 Exhibit C9, #27 Exhibit D1, #28 Exhibit D2, #29 Exhibit D3, #30 Exhibit E1, #31 Exhibit E2, #32 Exhibit E3, #33 Exhibit E4, #34 Exhibit E5, #35 Exhibit E6, #36 Exhibit E7, #37 Exhibit E8, #38 Exhibit E9, #39 Exhibit E10, #40 Exhibit E11, #41 Exhibit E12, #42 Exhibit E13)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #96 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR P.R. 4-5(B) AND 4-5(C) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/29/2017. (slo, )
August 29, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 10/27/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 29, 2017 Filing 100 Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's SEALED RESPONSE to Defendants' #87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Response filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of May 4, 2017 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of July 17, 2017 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Excerpt of July 26, 2017 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Excerpt of E-mail IV-FEDEX00111651, #5 Exhibit E - Excerpt of Spreadsheet IV-FEDEX00124558, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William)
August 29, 2017 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the Sealed Document submitted document #99 does not contain a Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal per Local Rule CV-5(a)(7)(A). Correction should be made by One Business Day. (slo, )
August 28, 2017 Filing 99 *DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. ATTORNEY MUST REFILE* SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Response filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order) (Davis, William) Modified on 8/29/2017 (slo, ).
August 25, 2017 Filing 98 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) (Re: Dkt. 84) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Donald F. Colleran - FedEx Company Profile, #2 Exhibit 2 - Rajesh Subramaniam - FedEx Company Profile)(Davis, William)
August 25, 2017 Filing 97 Joint MOTION TO RESCHEDULE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 25, 2017 Filing 96 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages FOR P.R. 4-5(B) AND 4-5(C) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Elliot)
August 24, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aliza George Carrano on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Carrano, Aliza)
August 23, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kyle George Petrie on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6438562. (Petrie, Kyle)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/18/2017. (nkl, )
August 18, 2017 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
August 16, 2017 Filing 91 PLAINTIFF INTELLECTUAL VENTURES II LLC'S OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified U.S. Patent No. 6,633,900, #2 Exhibit B - Certified U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356, #3 Exhibit C - Certified U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715, #4 Exhibit D - Certified U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581, #5 Exhibit E - Certified U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #6 Exhibit F - Excerpt of McGraw-Hill Illustrated Telecom Dictionary (1998), #7 Exhibit G - Excerpt of Webster's II New College Dictionary (1995), #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt of The New Oxford American Dictionary (2001), #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt of Oxford American Dictionary of Current English (1999), #10 Exhibit J - Excerpt of Merriam-Webster Dictionary, New Edition (1994), #11 Exhibit K - Excerpt of Oxford English Dictionary, 2nd Edition (1989), #12 Exhibit L - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 File History - 2012-03-23 Office Action, #13 Exhibit M - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 File History - 2012-06-21 Amendment, #14 Exhibit N - U.S. Patent No. 7,070,103, #15 Exhibit O - Excerpt of IEEE Standard Dictionary of Electrical and Electronics Terms, 6th Edition., #16 Exhibit P - Excerpt of Barron Dictionary of Computer & Internet Terms, 7th Edition (2000), #17 Exhibit Q - Excerpt of Microsoft Computer Dictionary, 4th Edition (1999), #18 Exhibit R - Excerpt of The Computer Desktop Encyclopedia, 2nd Edition (1999), #19 Exhibit S - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 File History - 2014-07-01 Response, #20 Exhibit T - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 File History - 2013-03-20 Office Action, #21 Exhibit U - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 File History - 2012-04-19 Amendment, #22 Exhibit V - Excerpt from U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 FH EXCERPT - 2014-03-17 RCE and Response, #23 Exhibit W - Excerpt of FedEx Petition for IPR re U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581 - 2017-01-19, #24 Exhibit X - Excerpt of FedEx Petition for IPR re U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586 - 2017-02-07) (Davis, William)
August 16, 2017 Filing 90 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance Regarding Privilege Log (Re: Dkt. 54) (Davis, William)
August 16, 2017 Filing 89 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Re: Dkt. 54) (Davis, William)
August 16, 2017 Filing 88 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial and Privilege Log (Findlay, Eric)
August 15, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing RESET for 9/21/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
August 14, 2017 Filing 87 SEALED MOTION to Compel Interrogatory Response by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Findlay, Eric)
August 11, 2017 Filing 86 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #85 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 4A, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 5A, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 6A, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 7A, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 8A, #15 Exhibit 9, #16 Exhibit 10, #17 Exhibit 11, #18 Exhibit 12, #19 Exhibit 13, #20 Exhibit 14, #21 Exhibit 15, #22 Exhibit 16, #23 Exhibit 17, #24 Exhibit 18, #25 Exhibit 19, #26 Exhibit 20, #27 Exhibit 21, #28 Exhibit 22, #29 Exhibit 23, #30 Exhibit 24, #31 Exhibit 25, #32 Exhibit 26, #33 Exhibit 27, #34 Exhibit 28, #35 Exhibit 29, #36 Exhibit 30, #37 Exhibit 31, #38 Exhibit 32, #39 Exhibit 33)(Davis, William)
August 11, 2017 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cobalt Boats LLC v Sea Ray Boats Inc, #2 Exhibit B - Diem LLC v Bigcommerce Inc, #3 Exhibit C - Elbit Sys Land v Hughes Network Sys LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Indivior Inc v Mylan Tech, #5 Exhibit E - Infogation Corp v HTC Corp, #6 Exhibit F - Koninklijke Philips NV v AsusTeK Computer, #7 Exhibit G - Luci Bags LLC v Younique LLC, #8 Exhibit H - Magnacoustics Inc v Resonance Tech Co, #9 Exhibit I - Mainstay Bus Sols v Industrial Staffing Svcs, #10 Exhibit J - McRo Inc v Valve Corp, #11 Exhibit K - Orthosie Sys LLC v Actsoft Inc, #12 Exhibit L - Raytheon Co v Cray Inc, #13 Exhibit M - Restoration Hardware Inc v Haynes Furniture Co, #14 Exhibit N - Roach v Bloom, #15 Exhibit O - Soverain IP LLC v Apple Inc, #16 Exhibit P - WiLan Inc v Lenovo Inc, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
July 27, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elliot C Cook on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Cook, Elliot)
June 30, 2017 Filing 82 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Joint Claim Construction Chart, #2 Exhibit B - Intellectual's Constructions of Disputed Terms and Support, #3 Exhibit C - Defendants' Constructions of Disputed Terms and Support) (Davis, William)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER finding as moot #75 Sealed Motion- Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Compel Defendants' Non-Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/28/2017. (slo, )
June 28, 2017 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Motion hearing set on July 6, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. on #75 Opposed Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Compel Defendants' Non-Infringement Contentions is CANCELLED. (jml)
June 28, 2017 Filing 80 STATUS REPORT - Second Joint Status Report Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Re: Dkt. 75) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
June 21, 2017 Filing 79 STATUS REPORT - Joint Status Report Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Re: Dkt. 75) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
June 14, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, David Folsom, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
June 14, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-2 (Re: Dkt. 54) (Davis, William)
June 13, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #75 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Compel Defendants' Non-Infringement Contentions : Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
June 9, 2017 Filing 76 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #75 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Compel Defendants' Non-Infringement Contentions filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Defs' First Supplemental Rog Responses)(Findlay, Eric)
May 25, 2017 Filing 75 Opposed SEALED MOTION - Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Motion to Compel Defendants' Non-Infringement Contentions by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' First Supplemental Interrogatory Responses (Excerpted), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
May 25, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
May 25, 2017 Filing 73 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Re: Dkt. 54) (Davis, William)
May 23, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with First Amended P.R. 3-1 (Re: Dkts. 55 and 68) (Davis, William)
May 2, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference RESET for 4/16/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/18/2017. (slo, )
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/12/2017. (slo, )
April 10, 2017 Filing 69 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit - Proposed Protective Order)(Davis, William)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC to Update its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Re: Dkt. 55) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Plaintiffs deadline to update its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions is extended up to and including April 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/7/2017. (slo, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend - Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC to Update its Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions (Re: Dkt. 55) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re #59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (With Disputed Provisions Noted) filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Parties are ORDERED to submit a final proposed Protective Order within three days of this order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/5/2017. (slo, )
March 24, 2017 Filing 65 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, David Folsom, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. of First Amended Joint Initial Disclosures (Young, Michael)
March 23, 2017 Filing 64 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Service of First Amended Initial and Additional Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 55) (Davis, William)
March 14, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, David Folsom, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER REGARDING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/7/2017. (slo, )
March 2, 2017 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery Order by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed E-Discovery Order)(Davis, William)
February 22, 2017 Filing 60 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/16/17 (Motion to Transfer Hearing) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR,Telephone number: (903) 923-7464 (Shelly_Holmes@txed.uscourts.gov).

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2017. (sholmes, )

February 21, 2017 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (With Disputed Provisions Noted) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order (with competing proposals))(Davis, William)
February 21, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. Regarding Initial and Additional Disclosures (Craft, Roger)
February 21, 2017 Filing 57 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Service of Initial and Additional Disclosures (Re: Dkt. 55) (Davis, William)
February 16, 2017 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Attendance Sheet) (jml)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/16/2017. (slo, )
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2017. Jury Selection set for 5/7/2018 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Mediation Completion due by 10/25/2017. Markman Hearing set for 9/27/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Motions in Limine due by 3/23/2018. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2018. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/16/2017. (slo, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order (Re: Dkt. 43) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order)(Davis, William)
February 14, 2017 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order (Re: Dkt. 43) by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order - Exhibit A - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Davis, William)
February 10, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" : Motion Hearing RESET for 2/16/2017 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/6/2017. (slo, )
February 1, 2017 Filing 50 NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Honorable David Folsom, filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. - Parties' Joint Notice of Mediator Selection (Davis, William)
January 31, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2017. Counsel for the parties appeared and were asked if they consented to a trial before the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave Markman and Jury Selection dates; deadlines for submitting Mediator names (3 days); and deadlines for submitting Agreed Scheduling and Discovery Orders (14 days). (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes, CSR-TCRR.)(jml)
January 30, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward Chin on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Chin, Edward)
January 30, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" : Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2017 11:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (jml)
January 27, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
January 17, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE by Intellectual Ventures II LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 (Re: Dkt. 43) (Davis, William)
January 13, 2017 Filing 46 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
January 13, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document # 45, Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
January 13, 2017 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. Document # 45, SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (nkl, )
January 12, 2017 Filing 45 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William) Modified on 1/13/2017 (ch, ).
January 5, 2017 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/30/2016. (ch, )
December 12, 2016 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Declaration of Adam Steinmetz in Support of Plaintiff Intellectual Ventures II LLC's Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer, #2 Exhibit 1 - med fusion case study, #3 Exhibit 2 - FedEx Office Headquarters, #4 Exhibit 3 - GENCO warehouse jobs, #5 Exhibit 4 - U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715, #6 Exhibit 5 - ABB Headquarters, #7 Exhibit 6 - 6,633,900 first page, #8 Exhibit 7 - SeeControl, #9 Exhibit 8 - 6,909,356 first page, #10 Exhibit 9 - Kimberly-Clark Company Profile, #11 Exhibit 10 - 7,199,715 first page, #12 Exhibit 11 - Field Data Management Solutions, #13 Exhibit 12 - 8,494,581 first page, #14 Exhibit 13 - TripleTail Ventures - Iowa Dept. of State, #15 Exhibit 14 - 9,047,586 first page, #16 Exhibit 15 - Woodcock Washburn Article, #17 Exhibit 16 - draft 1-GB, #18 Exhibit 17 - Senniger Powers Home Page, #19 Exhibit 18 - Stolowitz Ford Cowger Home Page, #20 Exhibit 19 - Meyertons, Hood, Kivlin, Kowert & Goetz. Home Page, #21 Exhibit 20 - FedEx Corporation Lawyers Martindale, #22 Exhibit 21 - Jim Ferguson LinkedIn, #23 Exhibit 22 - Excerpted 2016 District Court Statistics, #24 Exhibit 23 - Office Fact Sheet - About FedEx, #25 Exhibit 24 - PACER Case Locator - WD Tenn Patent Cases 2016, #26 Exhibit 25 - PACER Case Locator - EDTX Patent Cases 2016, #27 Exhibit 26 - Rockwell Automation_ Inc. v. 3S-Smart Software Solution, #28 Exhibit 27 - Empire Indem. Ins. Co. v. N_S Corp., #29 Exhibit 28 - Cummins-Allison Corp. v. Glory Ltd., #30 Exhibit 29 - Virtualagility Inc. v. Salesforce.com_ Inc., #31 Exhibit 30 - Sonix Tech. Co. v. VTech Elecs. N. Am. LLC, #32 Exhibit 31 - Thomas Swan Co. v. Finisar Corp., #33 Exhibit 32 - Innovative Global Sys. LLC v. OnStar LLC, #34 Exhibit 33 - IV2 v. BITCO Gen. Ins., #35 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, William)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" Responses due by 12/12/2016. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/05/2016. (nkl, )
December 5, 2016 Filing 40 Intellectual Ventures II LLC's ANSWER to #32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Defendants FedEx Corporation, Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., and FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. by Intellectual Ventures II LLC.(Davis, William)
November 22, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam Steinmetz on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6041841. (Steinmetz, Adam)
November 22, 2016 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Alan Kellman on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6041821. (Kellman, Alan)
November 22, 2016 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 18, 2016 Filing 36 RESPONSE to #35 Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
November 15, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Davis, William)
November 11, 2016 Filing 34 MOTION to Change Venue "Motion to Transfer" by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2016 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2016 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Intellectual Ventures II LLC by FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., FedEx Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc..(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GENCO Distribution System, Inc. to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Freight, Inc. to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Corporation to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Federal Express Corporation to 11/10/2016. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GENCO Distribution System, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.(Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 28 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Freight, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 27 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Corporation. (Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Federal Express Corporation. (Findlay, Eric).
October 20, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aidan C Skoyles on behalf of GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Skoyles, Aidan)
October 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for GENCO Distribution System, Inc. to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
October 20, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Daniel C Tucker on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5991302. (Tucker, Daniel)
October 19, 2016 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
October 19, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael V Young, Sr on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5990807. (Young, Michael)
October 19, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aidan C Skoyles on behalf of FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5965651. (Skoyles, Aidan)
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Freight, Inc. to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Federal Express Corporation to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for FedEx Corporation to 10/26/2016. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 18 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
September 20, 2016 Filing 17 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
September 20, 2016 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Freight, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
September 20, 2016 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. (Findlay, Eric).
September 20, 2016 Filing 14 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Federal Express Corporation. (Findlay, Eric).
September 20, 2016 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re FedEx Corporation. (Findlay, Eric).
September 19, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Michelle Nowierski on behalf of Intellectual Ventures II LLC (Nowierski, Lauren)
September 9, 2016 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. GENCO Distribution System, Inc. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. FedEx Freight, Inc. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. FedEx Custom Critical, Inc. served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. FedEx Corporation served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
September 9, 2016 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. Federal Express Corporation served on 9/1/2016, answer due 9/22/2016. (ch, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) FedEx Corporation, #2 Summons(es) FedEx Custom Critical Inc, #3 Summons(es) FedEx Freight Inc, #4 Summons(es) FedEx Ground Package System Inc, #5 Summons(es) FedEx Office and Print Services Inc, #6 Summons(es) GENCO Distribution System Inc)(nkl, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William)
August 31, 2016 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, )
August 31, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, )
August 31, 2016 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC identifying Corporate Parent Invention Investment Fund II, LLC for Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Davis, William)
August 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against FedEx Corporation, FedEx Custom Critical, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, GENCO Distribution System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5913248.), filed by Intellectual Ventures II LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,633,900, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 6,909,356, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 7,199,715, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,494,581, #5 Exhibit E - U.S. Patent No. 9,047,586, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intellectual Ventures II LLC v. FedEx Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By: Alan Kellman
Represented By: Edward Chin
Represented By: William Ellsworth Davis, III
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Nowierski
Represented By: Kevin K. McNish
Represented By: Tom BenGera
Represented By: Timothy Li
Represented By: Jordan N Malz
Represented By: Michael A. Wueste
Represented By: Kyle George Petrie
Represented By: Adam Steinmetz
Represented By: Jennifer Przybylski
Represented By: Christian J Hurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENCO Distribution System, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Office and Print Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Custom Critical, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Represented By: Daniel C Tucker
Represented By: Aliza George Carrano
Represented By: Andrea Grace Klock Mills
Represented By: Joseph M. Schaffner
Represented By: Michael V Young, Sr.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Gerald F Ivey
Represented By: Elliot C Cook
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Aidan C Skoyles
Represented By: John Derek McCorquindale
Represented By: Alexander M. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Wm Stephen Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Scott Woloson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?