In re: Eric Drake Permission to File Suit
Plaintiff: Eric Drake
Defendant: Eric Drake Permission to File Suit and Harrison County
Case Number: 2:2018cv00400
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 USCA 5th Circuit Notice - Original record on appeal has been accepted. (nkl, )
October 17, 2018 NOTICE of certification of eROA provided to 5th Circuit Court of Appeals as to Eric Drake. (nkl, )
October 17, 2018 NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA re #3 Notice of Appeal filed by Eric Drake, #6 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Notice of Appeal by Eric Drake. USCA Case Number 18-40949. (nkl, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Notice of Appeal by Eric Drake (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(nkl, )
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/04/2018. (nkl, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Drake. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(nkl, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion Requesting Permission to File Suit for Miscellaneous Relief by Eric Drake. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(nkl, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER denying #1 Motion Requesting Permission to File Suit. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/19/2018. (nkl, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION Requesting Permission to File Suit by Eric Drake. (nkl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Eric Drake Permission to File Suit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Drake Permission to File Suit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?