Johnson et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson and Kimberly Johnson
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Jason Carter
Case Number: 2:2020cv00265
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 Second Amended ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint of Mark and Kimberly Johnson by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Burke, Melinda)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Corrected Paragraphs 18 and 21 of Defendant's Notice of Removal Docket 1; granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. ORDERED that this case except for Travelers deadline to answer the Amended Complaint is hereby STAYED until Defendant Jason Carter files his answer. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/24/2020. (ch, ) Modified on 9/24/2020 (ch, ).
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Issued as to Jason Carter. (ch, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mark Johnson.(Woellner, Andrew)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woellner, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Corrected Paragraphs 18 and 21 of Defendant's Notice of Removal Docket 1 by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Corrected Paragraphs 18 & 21, #2 Text of Proposed Order On Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Notice)(Burke, Melinda)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/18/2020. (ch, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2021 10:00 AM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2021., Discovery due by 3/12/2021., Jury Selection set for 6/21/2021 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Trial set for 6/21/2021 09:00 AM in (Marshall) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Mediation Completion due by 12/1/2020., Motions due by 5/28/2021.). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/18/2020. (ch, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - cancelling the Scheduling Conference for 9/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/18/2020. (ch, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to enter Joint proposed docket control order and joint proposed discovery order by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Joint proposed docket control order, #2 Joint proposed discovery order)(Burke, Melinda)
September 17, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER TWO EVENTS Document # 9, Joint MOTION for Limited Admission Joint Motion to Enter Docket Control Order and Discovery Order, Joint MOTION Proposed Docket and Discovery Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR***Joint MOTION for Limited Admission Joint Motion to Enter Docket Control Order and Discovery Order, Joint MOTION Proposed Docket and Discovery Order by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Docket Control Order, #2 Joint Proposed Discovery Order)(Burke, Melinda) Modified on 9/17/2020 (ch, ).
September 17, 2020 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER THE WRONT EVENT Document # 8, Submission of Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company joint filing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Burke, Melinda) Modified on 9/17/2020 (ch, ).
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mark Johnson (Woellner, Andrew)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 02:00 PM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/24/2020. (ch, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Order - Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 02:00 PM in (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/24/2020. (ch, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(Burke, Melinda)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (ch, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Burke, Melinda)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed in Morris County Texas Cause No 26896 by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company.(ch, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jason Carter, The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company filed in Morris County Texas Cause No 26896, filed by Mark Johnson, Kimberly Johnson.(ch, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from 76/276th Judicial District Court, Morris County, Texas, case number 26896. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7944685), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Burke, Melinda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Amberg Woellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Johnson
Represented By: Andrew Amberg Woellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Melinda R Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?