Carr v. Director TDCJ-CID
Defendant: Director TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Willie Ty'rone Carr
Case Number: 2:2020cv00366
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Referring Judge: Roy S Payne
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from Willie Ty'rone Carr (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s)) (nkl, )
December 17, 2020 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Willie Ty'rone Carr as to #3 Order. (nkl, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2020. (nkl, ) Modified on 11/30/2020 (nkl, ).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 11/25/2020. (nkl, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Data Sheet by Willie Ty'rone Carr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Willie Ty'rone Carr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carr v. Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willie Ty'rone Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?