K.Mizra LLC v. AT&T Corp. et al
Plaintiff: K.Mizra LLC
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp. and AT&T Mobility II LLC
Consolidated Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Corp., Verizon Communications Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc. and Verizon Online LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer
Case Number: 2:2021cv00241
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #85 Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/12/2022. (nkl, )
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER to Pay Technical Advisor. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/11/2022. (nkl, )
May 4, 2022 Filing 86 Joint Claim Construction Chart by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leffler, Cristofer)
May 4, 2022 Filing 85 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer)
May 2, 2022 Filing 84 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Leffler, Cristofer)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - Court hereby appoints Mr. David Keyzer as the Courts technical advisor. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/2022. (ch, )
April 25, 2022 Filing 82 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Ericsson Inc., Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Defts' Tech Tutorial, #2 Exhibit 2 61/735,875 Provisional app, #3 Exhibit 3 Article by Arulampalam, #4 Exhibit 4 Prosecution history, #5 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Djuric, #6 Exhibit 6 Petition for IPR of 819 patent, #7 Exhibit 7 Ex 1009 Declaration of Bambos)(Baron, Jacob)
April 12, 2022 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shaun William Hassett on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC (Hassett, Shaun)
April 6, 2022 Filing 80 NOTICE by K.Mizra LLC of Lodging of Technology Tutorial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leffler, Cristofer)
April 6, 2022 Filing 79 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leffler, Cristofer)
April 6, 2022 Filing 78 NOTICE by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
April 4, 2022 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by J Daniel Kang on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8859546. (Kang, J)
March 23, 2022 Filing 76 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ericsson Inc. (Baron, Jacob)
March 23, 2022 Filing 75 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint by Ericsson Inc..(Baron, Jacob)
March 23, 2022 Filing 74 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by Ericsson Inc..(Baron, Jacob)
March 23, 2022 Filing 73 ANSWER to #69 Amended Complaint by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc..(Howland, Mark)
March 16, 2022 Filing 72 ANSWER to #70 Amended Complaint by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Lowery, Justin)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 FIRST AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER granting #68 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/11/2022. (ch, )
March 9, 2022 Filing 70 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ericsson Inc., Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., filed by K.Mizra LLC.(Leffler, Cristofer)
March 9, 2022 Filing 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc., filed by K.Mizra LLC.(Leffler, Cristofer)
March 2, 2022 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leffler, Cristofer)
February 28, 2022 Filing 67 Amended Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by K.Mizra LLC. (Leffler, Cristofer)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/2022. (ch, )
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/25/2022. (ch, )
February 23, 2022 Filing 64 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by K.Mizra LLC. (Leffler, Cristofer)
February 22, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Franklin Dewberry on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Dewberry, Timothy)
February 18, 2022 Filing 62 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Brian Davis on behalf of Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Davis, George)
December 27, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph Michael Abraham (Abraham, Joseph)
December 2, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Justin Ray on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Ray, Chad)
December 2, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Justin Ray on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Ray, Chad)
December 1, 2021 Filing 58 NOTICE by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. of Compliance (Dacus, Deron)
November 30, 2021 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob K Baron on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc. (Baron, Jacob)
November 30, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ji Mao on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8689361. (Mao, Ji)
November 29, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jacob W. S. Schneider on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8688401. (Schneider, Jacob)
November 29, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joshua C Krumholz on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc., Ericsson Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8688107. (Krumholz, Joshua)
October 27, 2021 Filing 53 ANSWER to Complaint re Verizon's Counterclaims (Dkt. 31) by K.Mizra LLC.(Leffler, Cristofer)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2021. (ch, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DISCOVERY ORDER granting #47 Motion For Entry of Discovery Order. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2021. (ch, )
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - GRANTING #46 Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2022., Jury Selection set for 10/31/2022 09:00AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Markman Hearing set for 5/18/2022 09:00 AM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 9/6/2022., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2022.). Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/25/2021. (ch, )
October 21, 2021 Filing 49 NOTICE by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Initial and Additional (Smith, Melissa)
October 20, 2021 Filing 48 Agreed MOTION For Entry of Proposed Protective Order by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Leffler, Cristofer)
October 13, 2021 Filing 47 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Discovery Order by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Order)(Leffler, Cristofer)
October 13, 2021 Filing 46 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Proposed Docket Control Order by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Docket Control Order)(Leffler, Cristofer)
October 7, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ericsson Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2021 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Baron, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2021 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ericsson Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2021 Filing 42 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #41 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Defendant.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Baron)(Dacus, Deron)
October 7, 2021 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Ericsson Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
October 6, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Christopher Howland on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Howland, Mark)
October 4, 2021 Filing 39 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Dacus, Deron)
October 4, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
October 1, 2021 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Dacus, Deron)
October 1, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc..(Dacus, Deron)
October 1, 2021 Filing 36 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Lowery, Justin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V., Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for Sprint Corp., T-Mobile USA, Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Lowery, Justin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 34 RESPONSE to (Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendants T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Sprint Corporation to Plaintiff's Complaint (2:21-cv-241)) filed by Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Lowery, Justin)
October 1, 2021 Filing 33 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 1, 2021 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (Jones, Michael)
October 1, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to [2:21cv243 Dkt. 7] Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. (Jones, Michael)
September 30, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles J Monterio, Jr on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8606573. (Monterio, Charles)
September 30, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC (Cimino, Frank)
September 30, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE by K.Mizra LLC of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. (Win, Cliff)
September 29, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap: Scheduling Conference held on 9/29/2021. Counsel for the parties appeared. Court asked whether they consented to a trial before the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court then gave the parties Markman and Jury Selection dates. (Court Reporter Shawn McRoberts, RMR, CRR) (aeb)
September 23, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl Glenn Thames, Jr on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Online LLC (Thames, Earl)
September 23, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon Marie Dacus on behalf of AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Dacus, Shannon)
September 14, 2021 Filing 25 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
September 14, 2021 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.( Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc..( Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Communications Inc..( Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Filing 21 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Verizon Online LLC.( Jones, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc. to 10/1/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Services Inc. to 10/1/2021; AT&T Communications LLC to 10/1/2021; AT&T Corp. to 10/1/2021; AT&T Mobility to 10/1/2021; AT&T Mobility II LLC to 10/1/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless to 10/1/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Online LLC to 10/1/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 14, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Verizon Communications Inc. to 10/1/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Claire Abernathy Henry (Henry, Claire)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2021 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/26/2021. (ch, )
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin R Lowery on behalf of Sprint Corp., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Lowery, Justin)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned case is hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues with the LEAD CASE, Case No. 2:21-cv-00241. All parties are instructed to file any future filings in the LEAD CASE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/24/2021. (ch, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc..(Outland, Henry)
August 12, 2021 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Services Inc. to 9/16/2021; AT&T Mobility to 9/16/2021; AT&T Communications LLC to 9/16/2021; AT&T Corp. to 9/16/2021; AT&T Mobility II LLC to 9/16/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( nkl, )
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. AT&T Mobility II LLC served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021. (Fair, Andrea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. AT&T Communications LLC served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Fair, Andrea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. AT&T Services Inc. served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Fair, Andrea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. AT&T Corp. served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Fair, Andrea)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K.Mizra LLC. AT&T Mobility served on 7/27/2021, answer due 8/17/2021. (Fair, Andrea)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Thomas Skelley on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Skelley, Steven)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cliff Win, Jr on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Win, Cliff)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es))(ch, )
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Henry, Claire)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cristofer Ivan Leffler on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Leffler, Cristofer)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Michael Abraham on behalf of K.Mizra LLC (Abraham, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by K.Mizra LLC (Fair, Andrea)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by K.Mizra LLC. (Fair, Andrea)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fair, Andrea)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Communications LLC, AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility, AT&T Mobility II LLC, AT&T Services Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8477653.), filed by K.Mizra LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent No. 8,958,819, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fair, Andrea)
June 30, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
June 30, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.Mizra LLC v. AT&T Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services Inc.
Represented By: Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Chad Justin Ray
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Chad Justin Ray
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Communications LLC
Represented By: Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Chad Justin Ray
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Represented By: Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Chad Justin Ray
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility II LLC
Represented By: Henry Leon (Lon) Outland, III
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Mark Christopher Howland
Represented By: Chad Justin Ray
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.Mizra LLC
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Cristofer Ivan Leffler
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Cliff Win, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Abraham
Represented By: Steven Thomas Skelley
Represented By: Timothy Franklin Dewberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Justin R Lowery
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: George Brian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Justin R Lowery
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: George Brian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sprint Corp.
Represented By: David E Finkelson
Represented By: Justin R Lowery
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: George Brian Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: J Daniel Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Frank C Cimino, Jr
Represented By: Charles J Monterio, Jr.
Represented By: J Daniel Kang
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Charles J Monterio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Frank C Cimino, Jr
Represented By: Charles J Monterio, Jr.
Represented By: J Daniel Kang
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Charles J Monterio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Verizon Online LLC
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Earl Glenn Thames, Jr
Represented By: Frank C Cimino, Jr
Represented By: Charles J Monterio, Jr.
Represented By: J Daniel Kang
Represented By: Shaun William Hassett
Represented By: Charles J Monterio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Ericsson Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Represented By: Jacob K Baron
Represented By: Jacob W. S. Schneider
Represented By: Ji Mao
Represented By: Joshua C Krumholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?