Watson v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Rachel Watson
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv00512
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Referring Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 NOTICE CANCELLING Rule 16 Management Conference set 9/10/2019 before Judge Amos Mazzant. (ldm)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL CASES. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Upon transfer, any pretrial referral to a Magistrate Judge is REVOKED except in Social Security cases, Pro Se Non-Prisoner/Habeas cases, and mortgage cases, where the pretrial referral will stay in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by United States District Judge Amos L. Mazzant. District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III no longer assigned to the case. (kls, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan by Target Corporation. (Peavler, Donna) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order) (rpc, ). Modified on 8/26/2019 (rpc, ).
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sara Kimbrough Scudday on behalf of Target Corporation (Scudday, Sara)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/26/2019. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/22/2019. (rpc, )
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/15/2019. (rpc, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Target Corporation Certificate of Interested Persons (Peavler, Donna)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Petition by Target Corporation.(rpc, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against Target Corporation, filed by Rachel Watson.(rpc, )
July 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from 219th District Court, Collin County, case number 219-03179-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7345888), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index, #2 Exhibit Case Information Sheet, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Original Petition, #6 Exhibit Original Answer)(Peavler, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Donna Cay Peavler
Represented By: Sara Kimbrough Scudday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Watson
Represented By: Sam Almasri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?