Fowler v. Smith County, Texas et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Lane Fowler
Defendant: Scott Smith, Smith County, Texas, Terry Brunk, Michael W Pehl and Josh Joplin
Case Number: 4:2019cv00687
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order) by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
November 20, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT. Document # 28, SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 28 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - PROPOSED ORDER FILED AS A STAND ALONE DOCUMENT***Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas . (Davis, Robert) Modified on 11/20/2019 (baf, ).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying without prejudice #22 Motion to Stay by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 11/19/2019. (bas)
November 19, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2019 re #22 Emergency MOTION to Stay (Agreed Emergency Motion to Stay, in part, State Courts Order of Expungement Pending the Final Judgment in this Case) filed by Smith County, Texas, Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl. (Court Reporter Anna Lafrenz) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stefanie Martin Klein on behalf of Kevin Lane Fowler (Klein, Stefanie)
November 15, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Davis, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Davis, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION #22 Emergency MOTION to Stay (Agreed Emergency Motion to Stay, in part, State Courts Order of Expungement Pending the Final Judgment in this Case) : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2019 at 2:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/15/2019. (baf, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 22 Emergency MOTION to Stay (Agreed Emergency Motion to Stay, in part, State Courts Order of Expungement Pending the Final Judgment in this Case) by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Kevin Lane Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Frank)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Kevin Lane Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Frank) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/12/2019) (baf, ).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is therefore ORDERED Defendant has up to and including November 25, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/4/2019. (baf, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading by Scott Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cowden, George)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - GRANTING #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue , #13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) ; GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue , #13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Responses due by 11/8/2019. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/30/2019. (baf, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Kevin Lane Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Frank)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Kevin Lane Fowler. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Frank)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Terry Brunk, Josh Joplin, Michael W Pehl, Smith County, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) against All Defendants, filed by Kevin Lane Fowler.(Hill, Frank)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lane Fowler. Terry Brunk served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hill, Frank)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lane Fowler. Smith County, Texas served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hill, Frank)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lane Fowler. Scott Smith served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Hill, Frank)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lane Fowler. Michael W Pehl served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hill, Frank)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Lane Fowler. Josh Joplin served on 9/25/2019, answer due 10/16/2019. (Hill, Frank)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Michael W Pehl. (baf, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Smith County, Texas. (baf, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Terry Brunk. (baf, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Josh Joplin. (baf, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Scott Smith. (baf, )
September 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
September 23, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (baf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7447294.), filed by Kevin Lane Fowler.(Hill, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Smith County, Texas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Smith
Represented By: George Philip Cowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith County, Texas
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Brunk
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Pehl
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Joplin
Represented By: Robert Scott Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lane Fowler
Represented By: Frank Warren Hill
Represented By: Stefanie Martin Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?