Navarrete v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Neibi Melani Navarrete
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00553
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Target Corporation.(Herring, Danielle)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ali, Reema)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Neibi Melani Navarrete (Ali, Reema)
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Target Corporation (Flores, Mark)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Target Corporation, filed by Neibi Melani Navarrete.(Ali, Reema)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/4/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 03:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/31/2020. (rpc, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Target Corporation (Flores, Mark)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND ADVISORY re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Target Corporation. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/21/2020. (baf, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Target Corporation.(rpc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against Target Corporation, filed by Neibi Melani Navarrete.(rpc, )
July 17, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
July 17, 2020 Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Anthony Flores on behalf of Target Corporation (Flores, Mark)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from 462nd District Court, Denton County, Texas, case number 20-4611-462. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7898613), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(Herring, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarrete v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Danielle Kujawa Herring
Represented By: Mark Anthony Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neibi Melani Navarrete
Represented By: Reema H. Ali
Represented By: Brian Paul Sanford
Represented By: Aaron Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?