Rowland v. Southwestern Correctional LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Alan Rowland
Defendant: Southwestern Correctional, LLC doing business as LaSalle Corrections LLC doing business as LaSalle Southwest Corrections, Stacey King, John Does 1-5, Mark Johnson, Texas Fannin County, Jane Does 1-5, LaSalle Management Company LLC, John M Garrison and Juan Baltazar, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00847
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Issued as to Juan Baltazar, Jr. (baf, )
December 18, 2020 Filing 33 SUMMONS Issued as to John M Garrison. (baf, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion of Plaintiff for Leave to Amend and Supporting Brief [Dkt. #27 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Original Complaint Jury Demanded [Dkt. #28 ] is deemed properly filed before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/16/2020. (las)
December 4, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Supporting Brief filed by Texas Fannin County, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional, LLC. (Moos, Marvin)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - GRANTING #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Supporting Brief. Responses due by 12/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 12/1/2020. (baf, )
November 27, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Supporting Brief by Texas Fannin County, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moos, Marvin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/30/2020) (baf, ).
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT -JURY DEMANDED against Texas Fannin County, Jane Does 1-5, John Does 1-5, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional, LLC, John Garrison, Juan Baltazar, filed by Dustin Alan Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Lippe, Emil)
November 13, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Supporting Brief by Dustin Alan Rowland. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lippe, Emil) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/14/2020) (baf, ).
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. The Court notes that prior to transfer, there were several motions pending before the court [Dkts. 14; 22; 23]. Pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(j), any motions are "considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court." Therefore, the Parties must re-file any motion on which they seek relief from this Court. Accordingly, It is therefore ORDERED that the Parties shall refile any motions on or before Wednesday, November 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/5/2020. (baf, )
October 28, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (daj, )
October 28, 2020 Case reassigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (daj, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01590. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/27/2020) (svc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Original Complaint filed by Dustin Alan Rowland with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendment, #2 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Strike #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dustin Alan Rowland with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Dustin Alan Rowland re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #19 Second Unopposed Motion of Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is now due on or before October 23, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/16/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time TO FILE RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Dustin Alan Rowland (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC. (Moos, Marvin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion of Plaintiff for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is now due on or before October 16, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/6/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dustin Alan Rowland (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 Appendix in Support filed by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC re #14 MOTION to Dismiss. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits in Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support. (Unless the documents have already been filed, clerk to enter Documents 12-1, 12-2, and 12-3 as of the date of this Order.) (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 9/15/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File to Exceed Page Limits in Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support filed by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit(s) B - proposed Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Defendants' Appendix to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave) (Moos, Marvin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleading(s) are now due on or before September 14, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 8/18/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moos, Marvin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Defendants' responsive pleadings are now due on or before August 17, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/15/2020) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #1 Complaint filed by Fannin County Texas, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Marvin C Moos added to party Fannin County Texas (pty:dft), Mark Johnson (pty:dft), Stacey King (pty:dft), LaSalle Management Company LLC (pty:dft), Southwestern Correctional LLC (pty:dft). (Moos, Marvin) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LaSalle Management Company LLC ; served on 6/29/2020. (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Southwestern Correctional LLC ; served on 6/26/2020. (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fannin County Texas, Jane Does 1-5, John Does 1-5, Mark Johnson, Stacey King, LaSalle Management Company LLC, Southwestern Correctional LLC. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dustin Alan Rowland. (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Dustin Alan Rowland. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10919541) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O, #16 Exhibit(s) P, #17 Exhibit(s) Q, #18 Exhibit(s) R, #19 Exhibit(s) S, #20 Exhibit(s) T, #21 Cover Sheet) (Lippe, Emil) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR ORDER re: 43 Joint Status Report. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1, the Court hereby ADOPTS the parties' proposals as stated in their joint status report and as discussed above delineating the content and manner in which notice is to be delivered. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/15/2020) (axm) Modified on 6/16/2020 (axm). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/28/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowland v. Southwestern Correctional LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Correctional, LLC doing business as LaSalle Corrections LLC doing business as LaSalle Southwest Corrections
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey King
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Johnson
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Fannin County
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Management Company LLC
Represented By: Marvin C Moos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Baltazar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Alan Rowland
Represented By: Emil Lippe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?