Arps v. Johnson
Petitioner: Eboni Simone Arps
Respondent: Mr. Mark Johnson and Mark Johnson
Case Number: 4:2021cv00807
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Referring Judge: Christine A Nowak
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. After reviewing the petition, the Court concludes that an answer from Respondent is required. Accordingly, it is ORDERED the Clerk of Court shall issue process and Respondent shall have sixty days to show cause why the writ should not be granted or to otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 11/1/2021. (baf, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FLED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY***NOTICE by Eboni Simone Arps Civil Case Information Sheet (Morgan, Nathan) Modified on 10/13/2021 (baf, ).
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. It is accordingly ORDERED Petitioner has fourteen days in which to submit the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis with a copy of the trust inmate data sheet with the last six months' financial history. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/13/2021. (baf, )
October 13, 2021 Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number TXE100021218 (tkd, )
October 13, 2021 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY. Document # 4, NOTICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Referral) (baf, )
October 8, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241, filed by Eboni Simone Arps.(Morgan, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arps v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eboni Simone Arps
Represented By: Nathan Chad Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mr. Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?