Dixon v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Audrey Dixon
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, FBI TikTok Task Force and FBI Psychological Warfare Team
Case Number: 4:2023cv00383
Filed: May 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kimberly C Priest Johnson
Referring Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2023 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #9 Order and Report and Recommendation by Jennifer Audrey Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(mcg, )
May 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Audrey Dixon. FBI Psychological Warfare Team served on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023; FBI TikTok Task Force served on 5/15/2023, answer due 7/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mcg, )
May 30, 2023 Exhibit #2 to Dkt. #12 (Thumb Drive) described as Videos Catalogued in Exhibit #1 placed in Plano Clerk's Office vault. (mcg)
May 22, 2023 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Jennifer Audrey Dixon as to #9 Order and Report and Recommendation. (mcg, )
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court recommends the TRO Motion (Dkt. 5) be DENIED. The Court also finds the IFP Motion #3 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson on 5/15/2023. (mmc)
May 11, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jmb)
May 11, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to FBI TikTok Task Force. (jmb)
May 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to FBI Psychological Warfare Team. (jmb)
May 11, 2023 Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 6-64349 (gsm)
May 10, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jennifer Audrey Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(jmb)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #1 Complaint. (rpc, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Audrey Dixon. (mcg, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly C Priest Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Referral) (mcg, )
May 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation, FBI TikTok Task Force, FBI Psychological Warfare Team, filed by Jennifer Audrey Dixon. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3, #4 Appendix 4, #5 Appendix 5 Pages 01-53, #6 Appendix 5 Pages 54-76, #7 Appendix 6, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(mcg, )
May 1, 2023 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Mailed Consent form to Plaintiff** (mcg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Audrey Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI TikTok Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI Psychological Warfare Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?