WIAV Networks, LLC v. 3Com Corporation et al
Plaintiff: WIAV Networks, LLC
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Belkin, Inc., Brother International Corporation, Fujitsu America, Inc., Option, Inc., 3Com Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., ZTE Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Sony Corporation, Canon Inc., Lenovo (United States), Inc., Lenovo Holding Company, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Brother Industries, LTD., Nintendo of America, Inc., U.S. Epson, Inc., Gateway, Inc., Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Nokia Corporation, D-Link Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Novatel Technology, Inc., Nokia, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Apple Inc., Dell Inc., Franklin Wireless Corporation, Hewlett Packard Company, Option NV, Lenovo Group, Ltd., Asus Computer International, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Option Wireless USA, Inc., Palm, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Acer America Corporation, Belkin International, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Netgear, Inc., Asustek Computer, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Huawei America, Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, Sony Electronics Inc., Epson America, Inc., Acer Inc., HP Development Company LLC, Utstarcom Personal Communications, LLC, General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Xerox Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Fujitsu Ltd., Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Panasonic Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation and Linksys Corporation
Case Number: 5:2009cv00101
Filed: July 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2010 Filing 451 NOTICE by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ELECTRONIC NOTICES (Wilcox, Melvin)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER, granting #449 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc., Attorney Robert William Weber terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/8/10. (mrm, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER, granting #444 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc.., Attorney James Rodney Gilstrap terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/17/10. (mrm, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER, granting #443 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Canon U.S.A., Inc., Canon Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Attorney Andy Tindel terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/13/10. (mrm, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER, granting #442 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by General Dynamics Itronix Corporation., Attorney J Thad Heartfield and M. Dru Montgomery terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/13/10. (mrm, )
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 445 ORDER, granting #437 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Palm, Inc. filed by Palm, Inc., Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/13/10. (mrm, )
August 13, 2010 Filing 444 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James)
August 11, 2010 Case transferred from Texas Easternhas been opened in California Northern Districtas case 3:10-cv-03448, filed 08/06/2010. (rml, )
August 11, 2010 Filing 443 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Lexmark International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
August 9, 2010 Filing 442 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by General Dynamics Itronix Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 441 ORDER, granting: #426 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Corporation., Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER, granting #425 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brian Craft and Eric Findlay filed by Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson America, Inc., Attorney Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDER, granting #424 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brian Craft and Eric Findlay filed by Gateway, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation., Attorney Roger Brian Craft and Eric Hugh Findlay terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 438 ORDER, granting #423 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc.., Attorney Sean Fletcher Rommel terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Filing 437 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant Palm, Inc. by Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER, granting #431 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Nintendo of America, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Attorney Roger Brian Craft terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER, granting #430 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Attorney Robert William Weber terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER, granting #429 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and Allen F. Gardner and the firm of Potter Minton, P.C. filed by Motorola, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner and Michael E Jones terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER, granting #428 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Utstarcom, Inc., Attorney Otis W Carroll, Jr and Collin Michael Maloney terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER, granting #427 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB., Attorney Melvin R Wilcox, III terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/9/10. (mrm, )
August 6, 2010 Filing 431 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 6, 2010 Filing 430 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
August 6, 2010 Filing 429 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and Allen F. Gardner and the firm of Potter Minton, P.C. by Cisco Systems, Inc., Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 6, 2010 Filing 428 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
August 6, 2010 Filing 427 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 6, 2010 Filing 426 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 5, 2010 Filing 425 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brian Craft and Eric Findlay by Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 5, 2010 Filing 424 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brian Craft and Eric Findlay by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 5, 2010 Filing 423 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rommel, Sean)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER, granting #421 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by WIAV Networks, LLC., Attorney Daymon Jeffrey Rambin; Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III and Elizabeth L DeRieux terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/5/10. (mrm, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 421 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
August 4, 2010 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California San Francisco Division. (rml, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 420 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Answer and First Amended Counterclaims of Defendant Asustek Computers, Inc. to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER granting #418 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #414 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Responses due by 9/1/2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/28/10. (mrm, )
July 27, 2010 Filing 418 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #414 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #416 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #412 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim; Answer due by 8/9/2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/27/10. (mrm, )
July 26, 2010 Filing 416 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #412 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #350 Sealed Patent Motion to transfer venue. Signed by Judge David Folsom on July 15, 2010. (rml, )
July 14, 2010 Filing 414 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by D-Link Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Duncan Palmatier w/Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit of Henghsin Liao, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
June 30, 2010 Filing 413 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asustek Computer, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott)
June 30, 2010 Filing 412 Answer and Counterclaims of Defendant Asustek Computers, Inc. to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Asustek Computer, Inc..(Stevens, Scott)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER; Accordingly, the Court hereby CANCELS the scheduling conference set for 6/30/10 at 10:00 am, and will reset the conference at a time to be determined. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/28/10. (mrm, )
June 22, 2010 Filing 410 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 3, 2010, Motion Hearing before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 OR lcrawford@cableone.net.

< Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2010. (aec, )

June 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asustek Computer, Inc. to 7/6/2010. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
June 17, 2010 Filing 409 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asustek Computer, Inc..( Stevens, Scott)
June 11, 2010 Filing 408 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Duncan Palmatier on behalf of D-Link Corporation (Palmatier, Duncan)
June 11, 2010 Filing 407 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Yang on behalf of D-Link Corporation (Yang, Christine)
June 11, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for D-Link Corporation to 7/14/2010. 27 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
June 10, 2010 Filing 406 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re D-Link Corporation.( Weber, Robert)
June 10, 2010 Filing 405 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of D-Link Corporation (Weber, Robert)
June 7, 2010 Filing 404 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert J Barrett (RECEIPT 5-1-1912),Dana D McDaniel for Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 PHV McDaniel RECEIPT 5-1-1913)(rml, )
June 4, 2010 Filing 403 (WIAV Networks, LLC's Answer to Motorola, Inc.'s Counterclaims as Presented in Motorola's Answer to WIAV's Amended Complaint) ANSWER to #385 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Rambin, Daymon)
June 3, 2010 Filing 402 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2010 re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California filed by Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Nintendo of America, Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Belkin, Inc., Asus Computer International, Novatel Wireless Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Fujitsu America, Inc., Panasonic Corporation of North America, Nintendo Company, Ltd., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Palm, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Gateway, Inc.. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
June 2, 2010 Filing 401 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Epson America, Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, U.S. Epson, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
June 2, 2010 Filing 400 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc. (Craft, Roger)
June 2, 2010 Filing 399 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc. (Craft, Roger)
June 1, 2010 Filing 398 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel A DeVito on behalf of 3Com Corporation (DeVito, Daniel)
June 1, 2010 Filing 397 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael D Saunders on behalf of 3Com Corporation (Saunders, Michael)
June 1, 2010 Filing 396 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of 3Com Corporation (Hawes, Clay)
June 1, 2010 Filing 395 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 3Com Corporation (Levy, David)
June 1, 2010 Filing 394 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Jack Levy on behalf of 3Com Corporation (Levy, David)
June 1, 2010 Filing 393 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clay Erik Hawes on behalf of Hewlett Packard Company (Hawes, Clay)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California : Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have twenty (20) minutes total to present argument on the matter. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/20/10. (mrm, )
May 3, 2010 Filing 391 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael D Saunders for Hewlett Packard Company,Michael D Saunders for Hewlett Packard Company (RECEIPT 5-1-1907). (rml, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #386 Motion for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO WIAV NETWORKS, LLC'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, )
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #384 Motion for Leave to File ITS SECOND AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO WIAV NETWORKS, LLC'S AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/29/10. (mrm, )
April 28, 2010 Filing 388 NOTICE by Motorola, Inc. of Change of Firm Name for Hogan & Hartson, LLP (Jones, Michael)
April 28, 2010 Filing 387 AMENDED ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by 3Com Corporation. (Cornelius, William)
April 28, 2010 Filing 386 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Answer and Counterclaims to WIAV Networks, LLC's Amended Complaint by 3Com Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cornelius, William)
April 22, 2010 Filing 385 Motorola, Inc,'s Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint / Amended Complaint Dkt 107, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Motorola, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
April 22, 2010 Filing 384 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File its Second Amended Answer and Counterclaims to Wiav Networks, LLC's Amended Complaint by Motorola, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 22, 2010 Filing 383 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #381 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion,.. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER granting #380 Motion to Seal Surreply. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/22/2010. (sm, )
April 21, 2010 Filing 381 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #371 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion filed by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rambin Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5 part 1, #8 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 21, 2010 Filing 380 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Sur-Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2010 Filing 379 ANSWER to #368 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2010 Filing 378 ANSWER to #366 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2010 Filing 377 NOTICE by Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc. of Consent to #350 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California (Gilstrap, James) Modified on 4/9/2010 (sm, ).
April 9, 2010 Filing 376 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Option Wireless USA, Inc. (Gilstrap, James)
April 9, 2010 Filing 375 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Option NV (Gilstrap, James)
April 9, 2010 Filing 374 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..(Gilstrap, James)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #372 Motion to Seal Document #371 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/2/10. (mrm, )
April 1, 2010 Filing 372 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Case, MOTION to Seal Document #371 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,,,, by 3Com Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Asus Computer International, Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Canon Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Hewlett Packard Company, Lexmark International, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2010 Filing 371 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California filed by 3Com Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Asus Computer International, Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Hewlett Packard Company, Lexmark International, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Appendix)(Jones, Michael)
April 1, 2010 Filing 370 NOTICE by Seiko Epson Corporation re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California Notice of Joinder (Findlay, Eric)
March 24, 2010 Filing 369 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE Corporation (Fry, John)
March 24, 2010 Filing 368 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by ZTE Corporation.(Fry, John)
March 24, 2010 Filing 367 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Seiko Epson Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Seiko Epson Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
March 24, 2010 Filing 366 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Seiko Epson Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
March 18, 2010 Filing 365 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Motorola, Inc. (Gardner, Allen)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #362 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California Replies due by 4/1/2010.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/18/2010. (sm, )
March 18, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Sixth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Option NV to 4/12/2010; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 4/12/2010. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
March 18, 2010 Filing 363 Defendant's Unopposed Sixth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James)
March 16, 2010 Filing 362 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California [to Extend the Remaining Briefing Schedule] by Acer America Corporation, Acer Inc., Asus Computer International, Belkin International, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
March 8, 2010 Filing 361 RESPONSE in Opposition re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California filed by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Rambin, #4 Exhibit 1A, #5 Exhibit 1B, #6 Exhibit 2A, #7 Exhibit 2B, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12A, #18 Exhibit 12B, #19 Exhibit 12C, #20 Exhibit 13A, #21 Exhibit 13B, #22 Exhibit 13C, #23 Exhibit 14, #24 Exhibit 15, #25 Exhibit 16, #26 Exhibit 17, #27 Exhibit 18, #28 Exhibit 19, #29 Exhibit 20, #30 Exhibit 21, #31 Exhibit 22A, #32 Exhibit 22B, #33 Exhibit 23A, #34 Exhibit 23B, #35 Exhibit 24, #36 Exhibit 25A, #37 Exhibit 25B, #38 Exhibit 26, #39 Exhibit 27, #40 Exhibit 28, #41 Exhibit 29, #42 Exhibit 30, #43 Exhibit 31, #44 Exhibit 32, #45 Exhibit 33, #46 Exhibit 34, #47 Exhibit 35, #48 Exhibit 36, #49 Exhibit 37, #50 Exhibit 38, #51 Exhibit 39, #52 Exhibit 40, #53 Exhibit 41, #54 Exhibit 42, #55 Exhibit 43, #56 Exhibit 44, #57 Exhibit 45, #58 Affidavit Declaration of Curtis Bradford, #59 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen LeBlanc, #60 Affidavit Declaration of Truong Dinh, #61 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER granting #359 Motion to Seal Document #358 Sealed Patent Document. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/8/10. (mrm, )
March 5, 2010 Filing 359 MOTION to Seal Document #358 Sealed Patent Document DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANYS NOTICE OF JOINDER TO THE JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Hewlett Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeVito, Daniel)
March 5, 2010 Filing 358 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. DEFENDANT HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANYS NOTICE OF JOINDER TOTHE JOINT MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) TOTHE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robin Castell)(DeVito, Daniel)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heather Eve Abelson terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/5/2010. (sm, )
March 4, 2010 Filing 356 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Heather E. Abelson by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER granting #312 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/23/2010. (sm, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 354 NOTICE by 3Com Corporation re #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California NOTICE OF JOINDER (Cornelius, William)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting #351 Motion to Seal Document #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/10. (mrm, )
February 22, 2010 Filing 352 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS [Appendix Exhibit Q] to Main Document: #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit Q)(Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 351 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document #350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of CaliforniaJoint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California by Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Acer Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Asus Computer International, Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 350 Joint SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) to the Northern District of California by Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Lexmark International, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Acer Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Asus Computer International, Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix Ex A, #3 Appendix Ex B, #4 Appendix Ex C, #5 Appendix Ex D, #6 Appendix Ex E, #7 Appendix Ex F, #8 Appendix Ex G, #9 Appendix Ex H, #10 Appendix Ex I, #11 Appendix Ex J, #12 Appendix Ex K, #13 Appendix Ex L, #14 Appendix Ex M, #15 Appendix Ex N, #16 Appendix Ex O, #17 Appendix Ex P, #18 Exhibit 1, #19 Exhibit 2, #20 Exhibit 3, #21 Exhibit 4, #22 Exhibit 5, #23 Exhibit 6, #24 Exhibit 7, #25 Exhibit 8, #26 Exhibit 9, #27 Exhibit 10, #28 Exhibit 11, #29 Exhibit 12, #30 Exhibit 13, #31 Exhibit 14, #32 Exhibit 15, #33 Exhibit 16, #34 Exhibit 17, #35 Exhibit 18, #36 Exhibit 19, #37 Exhibit 20, #38 Exhibit 21, #39 Exhibit 22, #40 Exhibit 23, #41 Exhibit 24, #42 Exhibit 25, #43 Exhibit 26, #44 Exhibit 27, #45 Exhibit 28, #46 Exhibit 29, #47 Exhibit 30, #48 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 19, 2010 Filing 349 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric R Lamison for Cisco Systems, Inc., Ryan J Casamiquela for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Casamiquela RECEIPT 6-1-21129)(rml, )
February 17, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE Corporation to 3/24/2010. 33 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
February 16, 2010 Filing 348 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE Corporation.( Fry, John)
February 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Option NV to 3/22/2010; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 3/22/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
February 16, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Seiko Epson Corporation to 3/24/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bas)
February 16, 2010 Filing 347 Defendant's Unopposed Fifth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James)
February 16, 2010 Filing 346 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Seiko Epson Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
February 15, 2010 Filing 345 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Osborn Taylor on behalf of Fujitsu Ltd. (Taylor, David)
February 15, 2010 Filing 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of Fujitsu Ltd. (Pankratz, Kurt)
February 15, 2010 Filing 343 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barton Earl Showalter on behalf of Fujitsu Ltd. (Showalter, Barton)
February 15, 2010 Filing 342 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fujitsu Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent None for Fujitsu Ltd.. (Showalter, Barton)
February 15, 2010 Filing 341 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Fujitsu Ltd..(Showalter, Barton)
February 4, 2010 Filing 340 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIAV Networks, LLC. Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB served on 12/30/2009, answer due 2/1/2010. (rml, )
February 2, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB to 2/1/2010. (mrm, )
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #337 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, have until and through February 1, 2010, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/2/2010. (mrm, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 338 Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses to WIAV Networks' Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB.(Wilcox, Melvin)
February 1, 2010 Filing 337 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER, granting #335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sony Corporation of America and Sony Electronics Inc. filed by WIAV Networks, LLC., Sony Electronics Inc. and Sony Corporation of America terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/2010. (mrm, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 335 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Sony Corporation of America and Sony Electronics Inc. by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Tae)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER granting #333 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Sony Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/29/10. (mrm, )
January 28, 2010 Filing 333 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Tae)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #327 Motion to Dismiss Futurewei Technologies without prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER re #326 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC ; Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is now terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #325 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Apple Inc. is now terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 19, 2010 Defendant's Unopposed 4th Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Option NV to 2/18/2010; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 2/18/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
January 19, 2010 Filing 329 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James)
January 15, 2010 Filing 328 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin P.B. Johnson (Johnson, Kevin)
January 12, 2010 Filing 327 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Futurewei Technologies by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
January 12, 2010 Filing 326 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
January 11, 2010 Filing 325 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER, granting #314 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lenovo Group Limited, Lenovo (United States) Inc., and Lenovo Holding Co., Inc. filed by WIAV Networks, LLC., Lenovo Group, Ltd.; Lenovo Holding Company, Inc.; and Lenovo (United States), Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/10. (mrm, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER granting #313 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/2010. (mrm, )
January 5, 2010 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc. to 1/15/2010. (mrm, )
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #311 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/5/2010. (mrm, )
December 29, 2009 Filing 321 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Fletcher Rommel on behalf of Nokia Corporation (Rommel, Sean)
December 28, 2009 Filing 320 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by D-Link Systems, Inc..(Weber, Robert)
December 28, 2009 Filing 319 ANSWER to #283 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 318 ANSWER to #284 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 317 ANSWER to #292 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 316 ANSWER to #293 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 315 ANSWER to #285 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by WIAV Networks, LLC.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2009 Filing 314 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Lenovo Group Limited, Lenovo (United States) Inc., and Lenovo Holding Co., Inc. by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
December 23, 2009 Filing 313 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
December 23, 2009 Filing 312 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
December 23, 2009 Filing 311 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Unopposed Motion of Defendant Apple Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
December 23, 2009 Filing 310 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Holly Anne Hogan for Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc. and Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc. (RECEIPT 5-1-1833). (rml, )
December 22, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Option, Inc. to 1/19/2010; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 1/19/2010. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 22, 2009 Filing 309 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James)
December 22, 2009 Filing 308 NOTICE by WIAV Networks, LLC of Acknowledgment of Email Service of Amended Complaint on UTStarcom (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Choung, Andrew)
December 22, 2009 Filing 307 NOTICE by WIAV Networks, LLC of Acknowledgment of Email Service of Amended Complaint on Option NV (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Choung, Andrew)
December 22, 2009 Filing 306 NOTICE by WIAV Networks, LLC of Acknowledgment of Email Service of Amended Complaint on Fujitsu America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Choung, Andrew)
December 22, 2009 Filing 305 NOTICE by WIAV Networks, LLC of Acknowledgment of Email Service of Amended Complaint on Dell Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Choung, Andrew)
December 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. to 1/15/2010. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( bas)
December 15, 2009 Filing 304 Defendant's Unopposed Fourth Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc..( Weber, Robert)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER denying #205 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/15/2009. (sm, )
December 14, 2009 Filing 302 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sushila Chanana for Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. and Sierra Wireless America, Inc. (RECEIPT 2-1-5186). (rml, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 301 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher L Ogden for Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. and Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 RECEIPT 5-1-1820)(rml, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 300 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Frank Lopez on behalf of Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sierra Wireless, Inc. (Lopez, Ronald)
December 8, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc. to 12/23/2009. (mrm, )
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #296 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Apple Inc. shall have until and including December 23, 2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/8/09. (mrm, )
December 7, 2009 Filing 298 ANSWER to #273 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Futurewei by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
December 7, 2009 Filing 297 ANSWER to #270 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Belkin, Inc. by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
December 3, 2009 Filing 296 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Unopposed Motion of Defendant Apple Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
December 3, 2009 Filing 295 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Canon Inc. for Canon U.S.A., Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Heit, Warren)
December 3, 2009 Filing 294 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Canon Inc. (Heit, Warren)
December 3, 2009 Filing 293 Canon U.S.A., Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Canon U.S.A., Inc..(Heit, Warren)
December 3, 2009 Filing 292 Canon Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Canon Inc..(Heit, Warren)
December 3, 2009 Filing 291 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gateway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acer Inc. for Gateway, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
December 3, 2009 Filing 290 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Acer Inc.; Corporate Parent Acer Inc. for Acer America Corporation. (Findlay, Eric)
December 3, 2009 Filing 289 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation for Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Wilcox, Melvin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 288 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Panasonic Corporation identifying Corporate Parent None for Panasonic Corporation. (Wilcox, Melvin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 287 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Gateway, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation.(Findlay, Eric)
December 3, 2009 Filing 286 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sierra Wireless, Inc. for Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
December 3, 2009 Filing 285 Defendants' Panasonic Corporation and Panasonic Corporation of North America Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America.(Wilcox, Melvin)
December 3, 2009 Filing 284 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Sierra Wireless, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
December 3, 2009 Filing 283 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Sierra Wireless America, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
December 3, 2009 Filing 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc. (Brigham, Matthew)
December 3, 2009 Filing 281 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc..(Brigham, Matthew)
December 3, 2009 Filing 280 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nokia Corporation for Nokia, Inc.. (Cook, Jason)
December 3, 2009 Filing 279 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nokia Corporation (Cook, Jason)
December 3, 2009 Filing 278 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and Defenses by Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc..(Cook, Jason)
December 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Option NV to 12/23/2009; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 12/23/2009. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 2, 2009 Filing 277 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James)
November 16, 2009 Filing 276 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed to Toshiba Corp on August 19, 2009 by WIAV Networks, LLC; Toshiba terminated 11/9/2009. (rml, )
November 16, 2009 Filing 275 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIAV Networks, LLC. Nintendo Company, Ltd. served on 8/19/2009, answer due 12/3/2009. (rml, )
November 13, 2009 Filing 274 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Futurewei Technologies, Inc. (Conrad, Daniel)
November 13, 2009 Filing 273 Defendant Futurewei Technologies, Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Futurewei Technologies, Inc..(Conrad, Daniel)
November 13, 2009 Filing 272 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Belkin International, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
November 13, 2009 Filing 271 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Belkin, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Belkin International, Inc. for Belkin, Inc.. (Weber, Robert)
November 13, 2009 Filing 270 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc..(Weber, Robert)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #266 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Sharp Corporation and Sharp Electronics Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/13/09. (mrm, )
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER granting #224 Motion to APPOINT INTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/13/09. (mrm, )
November 12, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. to 12/16/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
November 12, 2009 Filing 267 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc..( Weber, Robert)
November 12, 2009 Filing 266 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #258 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Xerox Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/09. (mrm, )
November 12, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 259, Notice of change of address. REFILED AS DOC 260 (incorrect signature used) PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
November 11, 2009 Filing 264 Amended ANSWER to Complaint to Palm's Counterclaims by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 11, 2009 Filing 263 Amended Answer ANSWER to Complaint to Motorola's Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 11, 2009 Filing 262 Amended ANSWER to Complaint Epson America's Counterclaims by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 11, 2009 Filing 261 Amended ANSWER to Complaint to Cisco's Counterclaims by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 11, 2009 Filing 260 NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven R Trybus (Trybus, Steven)
November 11, 2009 Filing 259 **PLEASE IGNORE REFILED AS DOC 260 ** NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven R Trybus (Trybus, Steven) Modified on 11/12/2009 (rml, ). Modified on 11/12/2009 (rml, ).
November 10, 2009 Filing 258 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
November 10, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 252, Answer. REFILED as DOC 257 PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
November 9, 2009 Filing 257 ANSWER to #228 Motorola's Amended Counterclaims by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew) Modified on 11/10/2009 (rml, ).
November 9, 2009 Filing 256 ANSWER to #176 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 255 ANSWER to #172 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 254 ANSWER to #168 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 253 ANSWER to #221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 252 ***PLEASE IGNORE - ATTY REFILED AS DOC 257 *** ANSWER to #228 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew) Modified on 11/10/2009 (rml, ).
November 9, 2009 Filing 251 ANSWER to #165 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 250 ANSWER to #164 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 249 ANSWER to #191 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 248 ANSWER to #202 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 247 ANSWER to #178 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 246 ANSWER to #174 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 245 ANSWER to #185 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 244 ANSWER to #187 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 243 ANSWER to #177 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 242 ANSWER to #170 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 241 ANSWER to #197 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 240 ANSWER to #162 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Filing 239 ANSWER to #195 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by WIAV Networks, LLC.(Choung, Andrew)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER re #236 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC that DefendantsToshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., and ToshibaCorporation are hereby dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on November 9, 2009. (rml, )
November 9, 2009 Filing 237 REPLY to Response to Motion re #205 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F,R,Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F,R,Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) filed by D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Palmatier, Duncan)
November 6, 2009 Filing 236 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion to Withdraw Adrian M. Pruetz and Erica J. Pruetz as attorneys of record and that Andrew Choung, Tae Hyung Kim and Heather Eve Abelson of Echelon Law Group, P.C. and Daymon Jeffrey, Rambin Elizabeth L DeRieux and Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III of Capshaw DeRieux, LLP will continue as counsel of record for WiAV.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on November 5, 2009. (rml, )
November 4, 2009 Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Adrian M. Pruetz and Erica J. Pruetz as Counsel of Record by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Pruetz, Erica)
November 4, 2009 Filing 233 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #232 Notice of Attorney Appearance.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tierney, Erica)
November 3, 2009 Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Carol Tierney on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc. (Tierney, Erica)
November 3, 2009 Filing 231 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIAV Networks, LLC. Hewlett Packard Company served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Huawei America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Lenovo (United States), Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Novatel Technology, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Lexmark International, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Motorola, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Netgear, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Nintendo of America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Nokia, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Novatel Wireless Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Option Wireless USA, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Palm, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Sierra Wireless America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Sony Corporation of America served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Sony Electronics Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc. served on 10/2/2009, answer due 10/22/2009; Toshiba America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; U.S. Epson, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Utstarcom, Inc., served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Utstarcom Personal Communications, LLC served on 8/11/2009, answer due 10/26/2009; Xerox Corporation served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; ZTE USA, Inc. served on 8/11/2009, answer due 10/15/2009. (rml, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 230 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by WIAV Networks, LLC. Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Canon U.S.A., Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Dell Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; D-Link Systems, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Epson America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Fujitsu America, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Gateway, Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; General Dynamics Itronix Corporation served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; 3Com Corporation served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Acer Inc. served on 8/26/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Futurewei Technologies, Inc. served on 10/7/2009, answer due 11/16/2009; Acer America Corporation served on 8/10/2009, answer due 12/3/2009; Apple Inc. served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009; Asus Computer International served on 8/10/2009, answer due 10/15/2009. (rml, )
November 2, 2009 Filing 229 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kristopher R Kiel (main document) for General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Steven R Trybus for General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Jamie B Keating for General Dynamics Itronix Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PHV Steven R Trybus, #2 PHV Jamie Keating, #3 RECEIPT 5-1-1802)(rml, )
October 30, 2009 Filing 228 AMENDED ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Motorola, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Filing 227 RESPONSE in Opposition re #205 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F,R,Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F,R,Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) filed by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
October 28, 2009 Filing 226 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William E Devitt on behalf of Epson America, Inc. (Devitt, William)
October 27, 2009 Filing 225 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David A Garr for Palm, Inc. (RECEIPT 2-1-4992). (rml, )
October 26, 2009 Filing 224 Second MOTION to Appoint International Process Server by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
October 26, 2009 Filing 223 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Thomas Haslam, III on behalf of Palm, Inc. (Haslam, Robert)
October 26, 2009 Filing 222 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael M Markman on behalf of Palm, Inc. (Markman, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Filing 221 Palm Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Palm, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
October 26, 2009 Filing 220 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by Utstarcom, Inc.,.(Maloney, Collin)
October 22, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robin M Davis on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Davis, Robin)
October 22, 2009 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arun Chandra on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Chandra, Arun)
October 22, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theodore J Mlynar on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Mlynar, Theodore)
October 22, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ira James Schaefer on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Schaefer, Ira)
October 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Futurewei Technologies, Inc. to 11/16/2009. 20 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
October 20, 2009 Filing 215 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Thomas O'Brien on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc. (O'Brien, Daniel)
October 20, 2009 Filing 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel T Conrad on behalf of Futurewei Technologies, Inc. (Conrad, Daniel)
October 20, 2009 Filing 213 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Futurewei Technologies, Inc..( O'Brien, Daniel)
October 19, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Palm, Inc. to 10/26/2009. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #206 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; ORDERED that Defendant PALM, INC. be and is hereby GRANTED an extension of time within which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint in the above cause up to and including October 26, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Apple Inc. to 12/3/2009. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #201 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Apple Inc. shall have until and including December 3, 2009, to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Xerox Corporation to 11/15/2009. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #158 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the deadline for Xerox to respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is extended up to and ncluding November 15, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/19/09. (mrm, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J Lobenfeld on behalf of Motorola, Inc. (Lobenfeld, Eric)
October 16, 2009 Filing 207 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark C Scarsi for Apple Inc., Chris Holm for Apple Inc., Jennifer Miremadi for Apple Inc., Miguel Ruiz for Apple Inc.. RECEIPT 2-1-4964 (Attachments: #1 PHV Chris Holm, #2 PHV Jennifer L Miernadi, #3 PHV Miguel Ruiz)(rml, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 206 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Second Amended Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Utstarcom, Inc., to 10/26/2009. 10 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ljw, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 205 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (F,R,Civ.P. 12(b)(6)) by D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9/2/2009 Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exh A to 9/2/2009 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exh B to 9/2/2009 Amended Complaint, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Palmatier, Duncan)
October 15, 2009 Filing 204 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Second Opposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer by Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 15, 2009 Filing 203 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lexmark International, Inc. (Heit, Warren)
October 15, 2009 Filing 202 Lexmark International Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Lexmark International, Inc..(Heit, Warren)
October 15, 2009 Filing 201 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Unopposed Motion of Defendant Apple Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Apple Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark) Modified on 10/16/2009 (ljw, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/16/2009: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (ljw, ).
October 15, 2009 Filing 200 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Netgear, Inc. (Smith, Ryan)
October 15, 2009 Filing 199 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darrell Glyn Dotson on behalf of Asus Computer International (Dotson, Darrell)
October 15, 2009 Filing 198 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Asus Computer International (Stevens, Scott)
October 15, 2009 Filing 197 Defendant Asus Computer International's ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Asus Computer International.(Stevens, Scott)
October 15, 2009 Filing 196 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ZTE Corporation for ZTE USA, Inc.. (Fry, John)
October 15, 2009 Filing 195 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by ZTE USA, Inc..(Fry, John)
October 15, 2009 Filing 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Dynamics Itronix Corporation identifying Corporate Parent General Dynamics Corporation for General Dynamics Itronix Corporation. (Heartfield, J)
October 15, 2009 Filing 193 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and Affirmative Defenses by General Dynamics Itronix Corporation.(Heartfield, J)
October 15, 2009 Filing 192 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Avin P Sharma for 3Com Corporation, Stephen C Steinberg for 3Com Corporation, Craig E Davis for 3Com Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PHV Stephen C Steinberg RECEIPT 6-1-19676, #2 PHV Craig Davis)(rml, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 191 NETGEAR Inc.'s ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Netgear, Inc..(Smith, Ryan)
October 15, 2009 Filing 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Joseph Hertko on behalf of Epson America, Inc. (Hertko, Matthew)
October 15, 2009 Filing 189 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John R Lastova (RECEIPT 5-1-1796)for Nintendo Company, Ltd. and Nintendo of America, Inc., Robert W Faris for Nintendo Company, Ltd. and Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Robert Faris RECEIPT 5-1-1797)(rml, )
October 15, 2009 Filing 188 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Epson America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Epson, Inc. for Epson America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
October 15, 2009 Filing 187 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Epson America, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
October 15, 2009 Filing 186 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fujitsu America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fujitsu Limited, Corporate Parent Fujitsu North America Holdings, Inc. for Fujitsu America, Inc.. (Showalter, Barton)
October 15, 2009 Filing 185 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Fujitsu America, Inc..(Showalter, Barton)
October 15, 2009 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Osborn Taylor on behalf of Fujitsu America, Inc. (Taylor, David)
October 15, 2009 Filing 182 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kurt Max Pankratz on behalf of Fujitsu America, Inc. (Pankratz, Kurt)
October 15, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barton Earl Showalter on behalf of Fujitsu America, Inc. (Showalter, Barton)
October 15, 2009 Filing 180 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lenovo Technology (United Kingdom) Limited for ; Corporate Parent Lenovo Technology (United Kingdom) Limited for. (Klein, Eric)
October 15, 2009 Filing 179 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dell Inc. (Jivani, Kamran)
October 15, 2009 Filing 178 Defendant Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Lenovo Holding Company Inc.'s Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims in Response to WIAV Networks, LLC's Amended Complaint ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Lenovo (United States), Inc., Lenovo Holding Company, Inc..(Klein, Eric)
October 15, 2009 Filing 177 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Dell Inc..(Jivani, Kamran)
October 15, 2009 Filing 176 SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO WIAV NETWORKS' AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT, AND SONY ELECTRONICS INC.'S COUNTERCLAIMS ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 15, 2009 Filing 175 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hewlett Packard Company (DeVito, Daniel)
October 15, 2009 Filing 174 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Hewlett Packard Company.(DeVito, Daniel)
October 15, 2009 Filing 173 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Sharp Corporation for Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Heartfield, J)
October 15, 2009 Filing 172 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Sharp Electronics Corporation.(Heartfield, J)
October 15, 2009 Filing 171 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Cisco Systems, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2009 Filing 170 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, Affirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Cisco Systems, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2009 Filing 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by D-Link Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent D-Link Corporation for D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Palmatier, Duncan)
October 15, 2009 Filing 168 SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS (USA) INC.'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO WIAV NETWORKS' AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 15, 2009 Filing 167 NOTICE of Disclosure by Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc. (Williams, Roderick)
October 15, 2009 Filing 166 NOTICE of Disclosure by Novatel Wireless Inc. (Williams, Roderick)
October 15, 2009 Filing 165 Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc..(Williams, Roderick)
October 15, 2009 Filing 164 Novatel Wireless, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Novatel Wireless Inc..(Williams, Roderick)
October 15, 2009 Filing 163 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 3Com Corporation (Cornelius, William)
October 15, 2009 Filing 162 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, AND, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by 3Com Corporation.(Cornelius, William)
October 15, 2009 Filing 161 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Utstarcom, Inc.,.( Carroll, Otis)
October 15, 2009 Filing 160 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Motorola, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Motorola, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 15, 2009 Filing 159 ANSWER to #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, and, COUNTERCLAIM against WIAV Networks, LLC by Motorola, Inc..(Jones, Michael)
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to 12/3/2009. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 12/3/2009. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba Corporation to 12/3/2009. Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. to 11/16/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 14, 2009 Filing 158 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Xerox Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunt, Robert)
October 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Belkin, Inc. to 11/13/2009; Belkin International, Inc. to 11/13/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 184 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin P.B. Johnson (Main Doc) for Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Corporation of America and Sony Electronics Inc., Eric Huang for Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Corporation of America and Sony Electronics Inc., Alexander Rudis for Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Sony Corporation of America and Sony Electronics Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Eric Huang, #2 PHV Alexander Rudis, #3 RECEIPT 5-1-1793)(rml, )
October 13, 2009 Filing 157 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #107 Amended Complaint,,,,,, by Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heit, Warren)
October 13, 2009 Filing 156 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
October 13, 2009 Filing 155 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba America, Inc..( Gillam, Harry)
October 13, 2009 Filing 154 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toshiba Corporation.( Gillam, Harry)
October 13, 2009 Filing 153 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc..( Weber, Robert)
October 13, 2009 Filing 152 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy S Teter on behalf of Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc. (Teter, Timothy)
October 13, 2009 Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas J Friel, Jr on behalf of Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc. (Friel, Thomas)
October 13, 2009 Filing 150 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
October 6, 2009 Filing 149 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. (rml, )
October 2, 2009 Filing 148 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Joseph Klein on behalf of Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Klein, Eric)
September 28, 2009 Filing 147 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James A DiBoise for Netgear, Inc (phv fee $25.00 paid - #5-1-001780.) (sm, )
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER, granting #145 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Motion to Withdraw Greenberg Traurig, LLP filed by Canon U.S.A., Inc.., Attorney Warren S Heit for Canon U.S.A., Inc. added. Attorney Mary-Olga Lovett; Eric Jason Maiers; Kevin J O'Shea; James J DeCarlo and Richard D Harris terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/28/09. (mrm, )
September 25, 2009 Filing 145 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Motion to Withdraw Greenberg Traurig, LLP by Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lovett, Mary-Olga)
September 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for D-Link Systems, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 16 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
September 24, 2009 Filing 144 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re D-Link Systems, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
September 18, 2009 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
September 18, 2009 Filing 142 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2009 Filing 141 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
September 18, 2009 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation (Gillam, Harry)
September 17, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kamran Jivani on behalf of Dell Inc. (Jivani, Kamran)
September 17, 2009 Filing 137 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacey Garrett White on behalf of Dell Inc. (White, Stacey)
September 17, 2009 Filing 136 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Dell Inc. (Newton, Michael)
September 16, 2009 Filing 140 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dwayne C Norton for Nokia, Inc. (PAID $25.00 PHV fee - Receipt #5-1-001771) (sm, )
September 15, 2009 *Docket Correction. Lenovo Holding Co. was also listed on the 9/1/09 unopposed application for extension.* Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lenovo Holding Company, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mrm, )
September 15, 2009 Filing 135 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Option NV to 12/3/2009. (mrm, ) Modified on 9/15/2009 (mrm, ).
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Option NV, has until and through December 3, 2009 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/15/09. (mrm, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Option NV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Brother International Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/09. (mrm, )
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting #129 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Brother Industries, LTD. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/09. (mrm, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 130 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
September 11, 2009 Filing 129 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
September 11, 2009 Filing 128 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey T Lindgren for 3Com Corporation, Eric W Benisek for 3Com Corporation, Richard C Vasquez for 3Com Corporation. RECEIPT 6-1-19280 (Attachments: #1 PHV Eric Benisek, #2 PHV Richard Vasquez)(rml, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 127 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel Ebenstein for Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company and Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Abraham Kasdan for Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company and Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Joseph M Casino for Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company and Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Marc J Jason for Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company and Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 PHV Abraham Kasdan, #2 PHV Joseph Casino, #3 PHV Marc Jason, #4 RECEIPT 5-1-1766)(rml, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 126 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Lenovo Group, Ltd.. (rml, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 124 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Lenovo Group, Ltd., Seiko Epson Corporation, Sony Corporation, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Seiko Epson Corp summons, #2 Sony summons, #3 Sony Ericsson Mobile summons, #4 ZTE Summons)(rml, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 123 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Canon Inc., D-Link Corporation, Fujitsu Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Asustek Computer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Canon Summons, #2 D Link Summons, #3 Fujitsu ltd summons, #4 Huawei Techn summons)(rml, )
September 9, 2009 Filing 125 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Bettinger for Novatel Technology, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc. and Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc..RECEIPT 2-1-4904 (rml, )
September 9, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Sierra Wireless, Inc. to 12/3/2009; Sierra Wireless America, Inc. to 12/3/2009. (rml, )
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, until 12/3/2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on September 9, 2009. (rml, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
September 3, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren S Heit on behalf of Lexmark International, Inc. (Heit, Warren)
September 3, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren S Heit on behalf of Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc. (Heit, Warren)
September 3, 2009 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
September 3, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, NOT A MOTION, ATTY MUST SUBMIT APPLICATION AND PHV FEE TO CLERK FOR FILING, MOTION TERMINATED. Document # 113, Motion for leave. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 3, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Brother Industries, LTD. to 12/3/2009; Brother International Corporation to 12/3/2009; Nokia Corporation to 12/3/2009; Nokia, Inc. to 12/3/2009; Option NV to 12/3/2009; Option Wireless USA, Inc. to 12/3/2009; Panasonic Corporation to 12/3/2009; Panasonic Corporation of North America to 12/3/2009; Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company to 12/3/2009; Sierra Wireless, Inc. to 11/30/2009; Sierra Wireless America, Inc. to 11/30/2009; Sony Corporation of America to 10/15/2009; Sony Electronics Inc. to 10/15/2009; Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc. to 10/15/2009. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Corporation of America, and Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA) Inc., have until and through October 15, 2009, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Panasonic have until and through December 3, 2009, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Sierra Wireless, Inc. and Sierra Wireless America, Inc. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is November 30, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant Option Wireless USA, Inc. has until and through December 3, 2009 to answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 113 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mike Bettinger by Novatel Wireless Inc.. (Williams, Roderick) Modified on 9/3/2009 (sm, ).
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #93 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #86 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re: Canon Inc., and Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re: Canon Inc. filed 8/28/09 no dkt number;. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #85 (Brother's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File ; Defendants BROTHER INDUSTRIES, LTD. and BROTHER INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION have up to, and including, December 3, 2009 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/090. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendants Nokia, Inc. and Nokia Corporation have until and through December 3, 2009 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/3/09. (mrm, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 109 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Edward V Filardi for Hewlett Packard Company, Daniel A DeVito for Hewlett Packard Company. (Attachments: #1 PHV Daniel Devito, #2 RECEIPT 5-1-1762)(rml, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 108 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Futurewei Technologies, Inc.. (rml, )
September 2, 2009 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Futurewei Technologies, Inc., Brother Industries, LTD., Brother International Corporation, Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Dell Inc., D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc., Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Hewlett Packard Company, Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Lenovo Group, Ltd., 3Com Corporation, Lenovo (United States), Inc., Lenovo Holding Company, Inc., Novatel Technology, Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Motorola, Inc., Netgear, Inc., Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Acer Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc., Palm, Inc., Panasonic Corporation, Acer America Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Apple Inc., Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc., Toshiba America, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Utstarcom, Inc.,, Xerox Corporation, Asus Computer International, ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc., Asustek Computer, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc., filed by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Choung, Andrew)
September 2, 2009 Filing 106 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James J DeCarlo (main doc) for Canon U.S.A., Inc., Richard D Harris for Canon U.S.A., Inc., Eric Jason Maiers for Canon U.S.A., Inc., Kevin J O'Shea for Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV Richard Harris, #2 PHV Eric Maiers, #3 PHV Kevin O'Shea, #4 RECEIPT 5-1-1761 for all 4 PHVs)(rml, )
September 2, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Palm, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 48 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 105 Defendant, Palm, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. (Smith, Melissa)
September 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lenovo (United States), Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 1, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Xerox Corporation to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 1, 2009 Filing 104 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lenovo (United States), Inc..( Williams, Fred)
September 1, 2009 Filing 103 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Irvin Williams on behalf of Lenovo (United States), Inc. (Williams, Fred)
September 1, 2009 Filing 102 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Xerox Corporation.( Bunt, Robert)
August 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hewlett Packard Company to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 101 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hewlett Packard Company.( Levy, David)
August 31, 2009 Filing 100 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James H Lin (main Doc) for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation, Kai Tseng for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation, Michael C Ting for Acer Inc. and Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 PHV Kai Tseng, #2 PHV Michael Ting, #3 RECEIPT 5-1-1760)(rml, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 99 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2009 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 31, 2009 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
August 31, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint isGRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell Inc. to 10/15/2009; Fujitsu America, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 31, 2009 Filing 96 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilstrap, James)
August 28, 2009 Filing 95 Fujitsu America, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant) re WIAV Networks, LLC.( Choung, Andrew)
August 28, 2009 Filing 94 Dell's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Plaintiff filing on behalf of Defendant) re WIAV Networks, LLC.( Choung, Andrew)
August 28, 2009 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #86 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Canon Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Warren Heit, #2 Exhibit First email, #3 Exhibit Second email, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
August 28, 2009 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Michael Hill on behalf of Asus Computer International (Hill, Matthew)
August 28, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, OVER 45 DAYS SO ATTY WILL REFILE AS MOTION. Document # 89, Unopposed Application to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Canon Inc. to 10/15/2009; Canon U.S.A., Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 28, 2009 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle Joseph Nelson on behalf of Asus Computer International (Nelson, Kyle)
August 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Novatel Technology, Inc. to 10/15/2009; Novatel Wireless Inc. to 10/15/2009; Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 28, 2009 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary-Olga Lovett on behalf of Canon U.S.A., Inc. (Lovett, Mary-Olga)
August 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Asus Computer International to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 28, 2009 Filing 89 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, OVER 45 DAYS SO ATTY WILL REFILE AS A MOTION***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Option Wireless USA, Inc..( Gilstrap, James) Modified on 8/28/2009 (sm, ).
August 28, 2009 Filing 88 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Canon U.S.A., Inc..( Lovett, Mary-Olga)
August 28, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT, MOTION TERMINATED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT***. Document # 77, Motion to extend time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
August 28, 2009 Filing 87 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Canon U.S.A., Inc..( Tindel, Andy)
August 28, 2009 Filing 86 *Withdrawn per Order #112 * Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Canon Inc..( Tindel, Andy) Modified on 9/3/2009 (mrm, ).
August 28, 2009 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Brother's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) by Brother Industries, LTD., Brother International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pankratz, Kurt)
August 28, 2009 Filing 84 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc..( Bettinger, Michael)
August 28, 2009 Filing 83 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Novatel Wireless Inc..( Bettinger, Michael)
August 28, 2009 Filing 82 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Novatel Technology, Inc..( Bettinger, Michael)
August 28, 2009 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cook, Jason)
August 28, 2009 Filing 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Maya Miriam Eckstein for Option, Inc., Option NV and Option Wireless USA, Inc.. RECEIPT 2-1-4888 (rml, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2009: #1 RECEIPT 2-1-4888) (rml, ).
August 28, 2009 Filing 79 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Asus Computer International.( Stevens, Scott)
August 28, 2009 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott English Stevens on behalf of Asus Computer International (Stevens, Scott)
August 28, 2009 Filing 77 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Option Wireless USA, Inc.. (Gilstrap, James) Modified on 8/28/2009 (sm, ).
August 28, 2009 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Rodney Gilstrap on behalf of Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc. (Gilstrap, James)
August 28, 2009 Filing 75 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christine Yang for D-Link Systems, Inc., Duncan Palmatier for D-Link Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 PHV D Palmatier, #2 Receipt 5-1-1757)(rml, )
August 28, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sharp Electronics Corporation to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Sharp Electronics Corporation (Montgomery, M.)
August 27, 2009 Filing 73 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sharp Electronics Corporation.( Heartfield, J)
August 27, 2009 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Sharp Electronics Corporation (Heartfield, J)
August 27, 2009 Filing 71 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of General Dynamics Itronix Corporation (Montgomery, M.)
August 27, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Gateway, Inc. to 12/3/2009; Acer Inc. to 12/3/2009; Acer America Corporation to 12/3/2009. (mrm, )
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re #65 Stipulation Regarding Response Time For Defendants Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, and Gateway Incfiled by Gateway, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. It is further ordered that the date by which Acer, Acer America, and Gateway shall move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is December 3, 2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/27/09. (mrm, )
August 27, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Epson America, Inc. to 10/15/2009; U.S. Epson, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J Newton on behalf of Nokia, Inc. (Newton, Michael)
August 27, 2009 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Woodard Cook on behalf of Nokia, Inc. (Cook, Jason)
August 27, 2009 Filing 67 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re U.S. Epson, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
August 27, 2009 Filing 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Epson America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
August 26, 2009 Filing 65 STIPULATION Regarding Response Time for Defendants Acer, Inc., Acer America Corporation, and Gateway Inc. by Gateway, Inc., Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 26, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America, Inc. to 12/3/2009. 80 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 26, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba Corporation to 12/3/2009. 80 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 26, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc. to 12/3/2009. 80 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 26, 2009 Filing 64 Defendant, Toshiba, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint.(Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2009 Filing 63 Defendant, Toshiba Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2009 Filing 62 Defendant, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint. (Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2009 Filing 61 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED (again) as to Brother Industries, LTD., Acer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 amd Brother Ind Ltd sum)(rml, )
August 26, 2009 Filing 60 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED again as to Panasonic Corporation. (rml, )
August 25, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Lexmark International, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 25, 2009 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adrian Mary Pruetz on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Pruetz, Adrian)
August 25, 2009 Filing 58 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lexmark International, Inc..( Tindel, Andy)
August 25, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Amended Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE USA, Inc.. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 25, 2009 NOTICE FROM CLERK re: dkt #55 - answer deadline for ZTE Corporation has been updated to reflect no answer due. (bas)
August 25, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ZTE Corporation per dkt. #55.(bas)
August 25, 2009 Filing 57 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Gewirtz for Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 RECEIPT 5-1-1752)(rml, )
August 25, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Netgear, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 25, 2009 Filing 56 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Netgear, Inc..( Smith, Ryan)
August 25, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #53, Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. PLEASE IGNORE. Wrong event was used. Attorney to refile in one business day*** (bas)
August 25, 2009 Filing 55 Defendant's Unopposed Amended First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE USA, Inc..( Harrison, Bryan)
August 25, 2009 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan R Smith on behalf of Netgear, Inc. (Smith, Ryan)
August 25, 2009 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Netgear, Inc.. (Smith, Ryan) Modified on 8/25/2009 (bas).
August 25, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # none, Application for extension of time to answer by ZTE USA & Corp. Atty will refile PLEASE IGNORE.*** (rml, )
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for 3Com Corporation to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for General Dynamics Itronix Corporation to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ZTE Corporation to 10/15/2009; ZTE USA, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Buffalo Technology USA),Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 24, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Joseph Cornelius, Jr on behalf of 3Com Corporation (Cornelius, William)
August 24, 2009 Filing 51 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 3Com Corporation.( Cornelius, William)
August 24, 2009 Filing 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re General Dynamics Itronix Corporation.( Heartfield, J)
August 24, 2009 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of General Dynamics Itronix Corporation (Heartfield, J)
August 24, 2009 Filing 48 ***Please Ignore - no service yet on ZTE Corp Please ignore*****NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John P Fry on behalf of ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. (Fry, John) Modified on 8/25/2009 (rml, ).
August 24, 2009 Filing 47 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc..( Harrison, Bryan)
August 24, 2009 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Guy Harrison on behalf of ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc. (Harrison, Bryan)
August 24, 2009 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc..( Weber, Robert)
August 24, 2009 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Nintendo Company, Ltd. to 12/3/2009; Nintendo of America, Inc. to 12/3/2009. (mrm, )
August 24, 2009 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc. (Weber, Robert)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants NINTENDO CO., LTD. and NINTENDO OF AMERICA INC. have up to and including December 3, 2009 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/24/09. (mrm, )
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, Franklin Wireless Corporation terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/24/09. (mrm, )
August 24, 2009 Filing 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ryan R Smith for Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 RECEIPT 5-1-1751)(rml, )
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First/Corrected Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Dkt. #40) is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cisco Systems, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Answer deadline updated per this Application.)(bas)
August 24, 2009 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed First/ CORRECTED Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
August 24, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Utstarcom, Inc., to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 21, 2009 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond, by Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brigham, Matthew)
August 21, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Brigham on behalf of Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc. (Brigham, Matthew)
August 21, 2009 Filing 37 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint for UTStarcom, Inc (plaintiff filed on behalf of defendant) re WIAV Networks, LLC.( Choung, Andrew)
August 20, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Apple Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
August 20, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 20, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc..( Albritton, Eric)
August 19, 2009 Filing 34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
August 19, 2009 Filing 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Brother International Corporation, Nintendo Company, Ltd., Toshiba Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons Nintendo, #2 Summons Toshiba)(rml, )
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #27 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by WIAV Networks, LLC, HP Development Company LLC terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/19/09. (mrm, )
August 19, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Motorola, Inc. to 10/15/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 18, 2009 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Motorola, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
August 17, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed AMENDED First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for D-Link Systems, Inc. to 9/29/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
August 17, 2009 Filing 30 Defendant's Unopposed First (Amended) Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re D-Link Systems, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
August 17, 2009 Filing 29 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re D-Link Systems, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
August 17, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of D-Link Systems, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
August 14, 2009 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Tae)
August 14, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Dkt. #26) is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cisco Systems, Inc. to 10/19/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 14, 2009 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cisco Systems, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER; granting #21 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing #20 Motion TO APPOINTINTERNATIONAL PROCESS SERVER;. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/13/09. (mrm, )
August 13, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Belkin, Inc. to 10/14/2009; Belkin International, Inc. to 10/14/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(bas)
August 13, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
August 13, 2009 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
August 13, 2009 Filing 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS ReIssued as to Panasonic Corporation. (rml, )
August 12, 2009 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw Request to Appoint International Process Server by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
August 11, 2009 Filing 20 MOTION Appoint International Process Server by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Choung, Andrew)
August 5, 2009 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tae Hyung Kim on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Kim, Tae)
August 5, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heather Eve Abelson on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Abelson, Heather)
August 4, 2009 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Choung on behalf of WIAV Networks, LLC (Choung, Andrew)
August 4, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Panasonic Corporation. (rml, )
July 28, 2009 Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham no longer assigned to case due to new presiding judge. (sm, )
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge T. John Ward recused. Case reassigned to Judge David Folsom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on July 28, 2009. (rml, )
July 14, 2009 Filing 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to Option Wireless USA, Inc.. (rml, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 13 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America, Inc.. (rml, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to 3Com Corporation, Acer Inc., Acer America Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Acer summons, #2 Acer summons)(rml, )
July 9, 2009 Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham added. Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven no longer assigned to case. (rml, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, U.S. Epson, Inc., Utstarcom, Inc.,, Utstarcom Personal Communications, LLC, Xerox Corporation, ZTE Corporation, ZTE USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Toshiba summons, #2 UPEpson summons, #3 utstarcom inc summons, #4 utstar personal summons, #5 Xerox summons, #6 zte corp summons, #7 zte inc)(rml, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sierra Wireless, Inc., Sierra Wireless America, Inc., Sony Corporation, Sony Corporation of America, Sony Electronics Inc., Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB, Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Sierra wireless inc summons, #2 Sony Corp summons, #3 Sony Corp summons, #4 Sony Electronics summons, #5 Sony Ericsson foreign summons, #6 Sony Ericsson summons)(rml, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Panasonic Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company, Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America, Seiko Epson Corporation, Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 panasonic corp summons, #2 Panasonic corp summons, #3 panasonic corp of NA, #4 Panasonic elect, #5 Sharp corp summons, #6 Sharp electronics summons, #7 Sieko summons)(rml, )
July 9, 2009 Filing 8 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Nintendo Company, Ltd., Nintendo of America, Inc., Nokia Corporation, Nokia, Inc., Novatel Wireless Inc., Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc., Option, Inc., Option NV, Option Wireless USA, Inc., Palm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 nintento of am summons, #2 Nokia summons, #3 Nokia, #4 novatel summons, #5 novatel wireless summons, #6 novatel wireless tech summons, #7 option summons, #8 option nv summons, #9 option wireless summons, #10 Palm inc summons)(rml, )
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Judge T. John Ward on July 8, 2009. (rml, )
July 8, 2009 Judge T. John Ward added. (rml, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei America, Inc., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Lenovo Group, Ltd., Lenovo (United States), Inc., Lenovo Holding Company, Inc., Lexmark International, Inc., Linksys Corporation, Motorola, Inc., Netgear, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Huawei Tech summons, #2 Lenovo Holding summons, #3 Lenovo Summons, #4 Lenovo US summons, #5 Lexmark summons, #6 Linksys summons, #7 Motorola Summons, #8 Netgear summons)(rml, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Franklin Wireless Corporation, Fujitsu America, Inc., Fujitsu Ltd., Gateway, Inc., General Dynamics Itronix Corporation, Hewlett Packard Company, HP Development Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Fujitsu Am summons, #2 fujitsu summons, #3 Gateway summons, #4 Gen Dyn summons, #5 HP Company summons, #6 HP Development)(rml, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Brother International Corporation, Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc., Canon Inc., Canon U.S.A., Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc., Dell Inc., D-Link Corporation, D-Link Systems, Inc., Epson America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Buffalo Tech summons, #2 cannon summons, #3 canon usa summons, #4 cisco summons, #5 d-link summons, #6 D Link Systems, #7 dell summons, #8 Epson summons)(rml, )
July 8, 2009 Filing 4 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Brother Industries, LTD., Apple Inc., Asus Computer International, Asustek Computer, Inc., Belkin, Inc., Belkin International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 ASUS Summons, #2 ASUSTEK summons, #3 Belkin Summons, #4 Belkins summons, #5 Brother ind summons)(rml, )
July 7, 2009 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Pruetz, Erica)
July 7, 2009 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WIAV Networks, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pruetz, Erica)
July 7, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000002065529.), filed by WIAV Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pruetz, Erica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2009: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljw, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WIAV Networks, LLC v. 3Com Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkin, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother International Corporation
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu America, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Barton Earl Showalter
Represented By: David Osborn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option, Inc.
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3Com Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T Lindgren
Represented By: Avin P Sharma
Represented By: Richard C Vasquez
Represented By: Daniel A DeVito
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Michael David Saunders
Represented By: Stephen C Steinberg
Represented By: William Joseph Cornelius, Jr
Represented By: Craig E Davis
Represented By: Eric W Benisek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Rudis
Represented By: Eric Hui-chieh Huang
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Guy Harrison
Represented By: John P Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexmark International, Inc.
Represented By: Warren S Heit
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Ryan J Casamiquela
Represented By: Eric R Lamison
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Frank Lopez
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Christopher L Ogden
Represented By: Sushila Chanana
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Represented By: Warren S Heit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States), Inc.
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Joseph Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Theodore J Mlynar
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Robin M Davis
Represented By: Eric J Lobenfeld
Represented By: Ira James Schaefer
Represented By: Arun Chandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Futurewei Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel T Conrad
Represented By: Daniel Thomas O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brother Industries, LTD.
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Brigham
Represented By: Timothy S Teter
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: Robert W Faris
Represented By: John R Lastova
Represented By: Erica Carol Tierney Atwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Epson, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway, Inc.
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Electronic Devices Corporation of America
Represented By: Marc J Jason
Represented By: Abraham Kasdan
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Represented By: Daniel Ebenstein
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Corporation
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Duncan Palmatier
Represented By: Christine Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Wireless America, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald Frank Lopez
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Christopher L Ogden
Represented By: Sushila Chanana
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novatel Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Roderick B Williams
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia, Inc.
Represented By: Dwayne Cuthbert Norton
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Sean Fletcher Rommel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D-Link Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Duncan Palmatier
Represented By: Christine Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novatel Wireless Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Roderick B Williams
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: Jennifer Miremadi
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Chris Holm
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dell Inc.
Represented By: Stacey Garrett White
Represented By: Michael J Newton
Represented By: Kamran Jivani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Wireless Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Edward V Filardi
Represented By: Daniel A DeVito
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Represented By: Michael David Saunders
Represented By: David Jack Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option NV
Represented By: James Rodney Gilstrap
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asus Computer International
Represented By: Kyle Joseph Nelson
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Represented By: Matthew Michael Hill
Represented By: Darrell Glyn Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Consumer Electronics Company
Represented By: Marc J Jason
Represented By: Abraham Kasdan
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Represented By: Daniel Ebenstein
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option Wireless USA, Inc.
Represented By: James Rodney Gilstrap
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Haslam, III
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: David A Garr
Represented By: Michael M Markman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Represented By: Alexander Rudis
Represented By: Eric Hui-chieh Huang
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer America Corporation
Represented By: Michael C Ting
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Kai Tseng
Represented By: Hsiang James H. Lin
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belkin International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: Marc J Jason
Represented By: Abraham Kasdan
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Represented By: Daniel Ebenstein
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: James A DiBoise
Represented By: Ryan R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asustek Computer, Inc.
Represented By: Scott English Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZTE USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Guy Harrison
Represented By: John P Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novatel Wireless Inc.
Represented By: Roderick B Williams
Represented By: Holly Anne Hogan
Represented By: Michael J Bettinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huawei America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Andy Tindel
Represented By: Warren S Heit
Represented By: Mary-Olga Lovett
Represented By: Eric Jason Maiers
Represented By: James J DeCarlo
Represented By: Kevin John O'Shea
Represented By: Richard D Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Electronics Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Rudis
Represented By: Eric Hui-chieh Huang
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson America, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: William E Devitt
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Hertko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Inc.
Represented By: Michael C Ting
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Kai Tseng
Represented By: Hsiang James H. Lin
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Development Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utstarcom Personal Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Itronix Corporation
Represented By: Steven R Trybus
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: Kristopher R Kiel
Represented By: Jamie B Keating
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xerox Corporation
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utstarcom, Inc.,
Represented By: Collin Michael Maloney
Represented By: Dana D McDaniel
Represented By: Robert J Barrett
Represented By: Otis W Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujitsu Ltd.
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Barton Earl Showalter
Represented By: David Osborn Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalo Technology (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Gregory S Gewirtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew J Brigham
Represented By: Timothy S Teter
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Thomas J Friel, Jr
Represented By: Robert W Faris
Represented By: John R Lastova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation
Represented By: Marc J Jason
Represented By: Abraham Kasdan
Represented By: Joseph M Casino
Represented By: Daniel Ebenstein
Represented By: Melvin R Wilcox, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linksys Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WIAV Networks, LLC
Represented By: Erica Jean Van Loon
Represented By: Andrew Choung
Represented By: Adrian Mary Pruetz
Represented By: Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Represented By: Heather Eve Abelson
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III
Represented By: Tae Hyung Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?