Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cellular Communications Equipment LLC
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Exedea, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Boost Mobile, LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Verizon Communications, Inc., HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., AT&T Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc. and Sprint Nextel Corporation
Consolidated Defendant: BlackBerry Limited, BlackBerry Corporation, Apple Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Microsoft Corporation, LG Electronics, Inc., ZTE Corporation, Amazon.com, Inc., Dell, Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., Cellco Partnership, NEC Corporation of America, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc. and Cellco Partnership Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251 doing business as Verizon Wireless
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: Acacia Research Corporation
Special Master: David Folsom
Not Classified By Court: David Keyzer
Case Number: 6:2013cv00507
Filed: June 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2016 Filing 634 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office). (gsg)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting #631 Motion to Dismiss. The remaining earliest filed civil action (Civil Action No. 6:14-cv-251) shall now serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/6/2016. (gsg)
July 5, 2016 Filing 632 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Charles Molster by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 24, 2016 Filing 631 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER re Letter Briefs #616 - #625 . Having considered the parties arguments and the applicable law, all nine requests are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/22/2016. (gsg)
June 20, 2016 Filing 629 SEALED RESPONSE to #618 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Responsive Letter Brief)(Findlay, Eric)
June 20, 2016 Filing 628 RESPONSE to #617 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Letter Brief (Daubert) Regarding Fuja Invalidity Report)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 20, 2016 Filing 627 RESPONSE to #616 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Response to Letter Brief Regarding Prior Art Priority)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 8, 2016 Filing 626 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa K Nguyen on behalf of Apple Inc. (Nguyen, Lisa)
June 4, 2016 Filing 625 Letter Brief Requesting Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter Brief)(Craft, Roger)
June 3, 2016 Filing 624 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE #625 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT*** Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric) Modified on 6/6/2016 (mll, ).
June 3, 2016 Filing 623 SEALED Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Nicole)
June 3, 2016 Filing 622 SEALED Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cunningham, Nicole)
June 3, 2016 Filing 621 Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief Regarding No Willful Infringement)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 3, 2016 Filing 620 Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Brief Regarding No Indirect Infringement)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 3, 2016 Filing 619 SEALED Letter Brief (Daubert) Regarding Mr. Philip Green filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric).
June 3, 2016 Filing 618 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief (Daubert) Regarding Acampora Invalidity Report)(Nelson, Edward)
June 3, 2016 Filing 617 SEALED Letter Brief filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief (Daubert) Regarding Fuja Invalidity Report)(Nelson, Edward)
June 3, 2016 Filing 616 Letter Brief filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief Regarding Prior Art Priority)(Nelson, Edward)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 614 ORDER granting #613 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William P Atkins terminated as counsel for ZTE (USA) Inc., and ZTE Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/1/16. (mjc, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 613 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney William P. Atkins by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
May 25, 2016 Filing 615 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2016 re #599 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Limits on Invalidity References and to Strike Portions of the Acampora Invalidity Report filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Court Reporter Shawna Hicks.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
May 25, 2016 Filing 612 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR TERMINATION OF ECF NOTICES (Hadden, J)
May 24, 2016 Filing 611 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lackey, Walter)
May 24, 2016 Filing 610 MOTION for Leave to File to File Brief In Support of Apple Inc.'s Opposition to CCE's Emergency Motion to Enforce Limits on Invalidity References by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaikovsky, Yar)
May 24, 2016 Filing 609 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allan M. Soobert on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Soobert, Allan)
May 24, 2016 Filing 608 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rene Elise Mai on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Mai, Rene)
May 24, 2016 Filing 607 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rene Elise Mai on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Mai, Rene)
May 23, 2016 Filing 606 RESPONSE in Opposition re #599 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Limits on Invalidity References and to Strike Portions of the Acampora Invalidity Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Findlay, Eric)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER granting #604 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiff's claims asserted against Defendants Amazon and AT&T Mobility LLC in Consolidated Case No. 6:13-cv-568 are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, and all defenses asserted by Amazon are hereby dismissed as moot. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/19/16. (mll, )
May 18, 2016 Filing 604 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 18, 2016 Filing 603 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., Boost Mobile, LLC, HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Exedea, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., and T-Mobile USA, Inc.)(Folsom, David)
May 18, 2016 Filing 602 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Apple Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless)(Folsom, David)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #599 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Limits on Invalidity References and to Strike Portions of the Acampora Invalidity Report : Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Defendant Apple shall file a response to the Motion by the close of business on 5-23-2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/17/16. (mll, )
May 17, 2016 Filing 600 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher S Stewart on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Stewart, Christopher)
May 16, 2016 Filing 599 Emergency MOTION to Enforce Limits on Invalidity References and to Strike Portions of the Acampora Invalidity Report by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2016: #11 Text of Proposed Order - CORRECTED) (mjc, ).
May 13, 2016 Filing 598 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie R Wood on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Wood, Stephanie)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER denying as moot #536 Sealed Motion to Compel; denying as moot #549 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/12/16. (mll, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER granting #587 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/04/16. (mll, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting #586 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/04/16. (mll, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER granting #585 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/04/16. (mll, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 593 ORDER granting #584 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 05/04/16. (mll, )
May 4, 2016 Filing 592 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/26/2016 before Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/5/2016. (sms, )
April 27, 2016 Filing 591 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Acacia Research Corporation for proceedings held on Motion to Compel before Judge K. Nicole MItchell. (Ram, Stephen)
April 27, 2016 Filing 590 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY.*** PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Acacia Research Corporation for proceedings held on April 26, 2016 Motion to Compel before Judge Jacqueline Hamer. (Ram, Stephen) Modified on 4/27/2016 (mll, ).
April 26, 2016 Filing 589 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 4/26/2016 re #549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents and #536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
April 26, 2016 Filing 588 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen L Ram for Acacia Research Corporation. PHV filing fee of $100.00 paid, receipt no. 6-29863. (mjc, ) Modified on 4/26/2016 (mjc, ).
April 25, 2016 Filing 587 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Nicole)
April 25, 2016 Filing 586 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Nicole)
April 22, 2016 Filing 585 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Nicole)
April 22, 2016 Filing 584 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Nicole)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ORDER granting #579 Motion to Stay. All deadlines as to Consolidated Civil Action 6:13-cv-568 are stayed for 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/22/16. (mll, )
April 22, 2016 Filing 582 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yar R Chaikovsky on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251), AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv1155 ), AT&T Mobility LLC (Chaikovsky, Yar)
April 20, 2016 ***Claims pertaining to US Patent No. 7,218,923 SEVERED from this cause and assigned to Civil Action 6:16cv363.*** (mll, )
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER granting #577 Motion to Sever. All claims pertaining to U.S. Patent No. 7,218,923 are hereby severed from the above-captioned cases into separate causes of action. The Clerk of the Court is ORDERED to assign a new case number for each of the severed actions. The Clerk is ORDERED to consolidate the new actions for pre-trial purposes, with the first case opened to serve as the lead case. Upon consolidation, the Clerk is ORDERED to stay the consolidated proceedings pending the resolution of IPR2015-01927 by the Patent Trial and Appeal Board. The Clerk shall docket this Order as well as the most recent Complaint in each newly-created case. The parties have 5 days from the date of entry of this Order to agree on what documents they will designate to be carried over from the above-captioned actions and docketed in the newly-created causes of action. The filing fee for the severed cases are waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/20/16. (mll, )
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #578 Motion for Leave to Supplement Disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/18/16. (mll, )
April 18, 2016 Filing 579 Joint MOTION to Stay and Notice of Resolution by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
April 15, 2016 Filing 578 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
April 15, 2016 Filing 577 Joint MOTION to Sever by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
April 12, 2016 Filing 576 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Clarification of Representation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
April 11, 2016 Filing 575 ANSWER to #563 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC.(Nelson, Edward)
April 11, 2016 Filing 574 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Parker Ainsworth on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
April 7, 2016 Filing 573 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry Lee Gillam, Jr on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251), AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv1155 ), AT&T Mobility LLC (Gillam, Harry)
April 7, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on #536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents, and #549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents :Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2016 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell.(leh, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 572 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251), AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv1155 ), AT&T Mobility LLC (Bjurstrom, Callie)
April 6, 2016 Filing 571 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Sara Cunningham on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251), AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv1155 ), AT&T Mobility LLC (Cunningham, Nicole)
April 5, 2016 Filing 570 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Arthur Moore on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251), AT&T Mobility LLC(Consolidated Civil Action 6:15cv1155 ), AT&T Mobility LLC (Moore, Steven)
April 4, 2016 Filing 569 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Nelson Supplemental Declaration)(Nelson, Edward)
March 31, 2016 Filing 568 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Joseph McCarty, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (McCarty, Warren)
March 31, 2016 Filing 567 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Curry, John)
March 31, 2016 Filing 566 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Dodd Cassady on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cassady, Jason)
March 31, 2016 Filing 565 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradley Wayne Caldwell on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 26, 2016 Filing 564 AMENDED ANSWER to SECOND #390 Amended Complaint, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless. (Kalemeris, Sarah)
March 25, 2016 Filing 563 AMENDED ANSWER to Cellular Communications Equipment LLC 's Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Filed in Original Cause Number 6:14-cv-00251-KNM Docket Number 73 , COUNTERCLAIM against Cellular Communications Equipment LLC by Apple Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
March 25, 2016 Filing 562 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey D. Comeau, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28)(Kennerly, Christopher)
March 25, 2016 Filing 561 AMENDED ANSWER to Second #390 Amended Complaint, by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Weber, Robert)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER denying #471 Sealed Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/24/2016. (tlh, )
March 21, 2016 Filing 559 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Apple Inc.. (Findlay, Eric).
March 21, 2016 Filing 558 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kennerly, Christopher)
March 21, 2016 Filing 557 SEALED Sur-REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Comeau, #2 Exhibit 6)(Kennerly, Christopher)
March 14, 2016 Filing 556 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Edward R. Nelson III, #4 Declaration of Thomas C. Cecil)(Nelson, Edward)
March 10, 2016 Filing 555 REPLY to Response to Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Griffin, Ryan)
March 10, 2016 Filing 554 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S, #2 Exhibit T, #3 Exhibit U, #4 Exhibit V)(Griffin, Ryan)
March 10, 2016 Filing 553 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I, #2 Exhibit J)(Nelson, Edward)
February 29, 2016 Filing 552 RESPONSE to Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
February 29, 2016 Filing 551 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit N, #3 Exhibit O, #4 Exhibit P, #5 Exhibit Q, #6 Exhibit R)(Findlay, Eric)
February 29, 2016 Filing 550 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 2/18/16, before Judge Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shawna Gauntt-Hicks, Telephone number: 903/276-1090. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2016. (dlc, )
February 26, 2016 Filing 549 SEALED MOTION to Compel CCE to Produce Patent License Agreements and Related Documents by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey D. Comeau, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
February 26, 2016 Filing 548 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Decl. of J. Comeau, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Kennerly, Christopher)
February 24, 2016 Filing 547 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Dacus, Deron)
February 23, 2016 Filing 546 JOINT NOTICE regarding #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Request for International Judicial Assistance)(Findlay, Eric)
February 18, 2016 Filing 545 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2016 re Plaintiff's #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory. (Court Reporter Shawna Hicks.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (leh, )
February 17, 2016 Filing 544 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward R. Nelson III, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Edward)
February 15, 2016 Filing 543 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER re #530 Stipulation filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Source code, schematics, or documents that incorporate confidential information belonging to Qualcomm produced in connection with the above-captioned matters shall be subject to the restrictions set forth in Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order #447 . Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/11/16. (mll, )
February 10, 2016 Filing 541 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Ex. E to Plaintiff's 2nd Supplemental Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit B - 1st Email Chain re Supplemental Contentions, #3 Exhibit C - Apple's 1st Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's 2nd Individual Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit D - Email chain re Code Review, #5 Exhibit E - 2nd Email Chain re Supplemental Contentions, #6 Exhibit F - 3rd Email Chain re Supplemental Contentions, #7 Exhibit G - Excerpts - Wiley Electrical and Electronics Engineering Dictionary, #8 Exhibit H - Exerpts - Apple Preliminary Election of Prior Art, #9 Exhibit I - Exerpts - Apple IPR Petition, #10 Exhibit J - Excerpts - 820 Patent, #11 Exhibit K - Excerpts - Defendants Technology Tutorial Deskbook, #12 Exhibit L - Excerpts - Expert Declaration in Support of Apple IPR Petition, #13 Exhibit M - 4th Email Chain re Supplemental Contentions, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER granting #532 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven Brannon Latimer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/10/16. (mll, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER re #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. The Court ORDERS expedited briefing on the Motion. Defendants opposing the Motion shall file a response to the Motion within 5 days of entry of this Order. The Court also sets a hearing on this Motion for 2-18-2016 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/10/16. (mll, )
February 10, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2016 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
February 8, 2016 Filing 538 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward K Chin on behalf of Acacia Research Corporation (Chin, Edward)
February 8, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of Acacia Research Corporation (Albritton, Eric)
February 8, 2016 Filing 536 SEALED MOTION to Compel Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC to Produce Documents by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Preliminary Infringement Contentions (HTC devices), #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Preliminary Infringement Contentions (HTC devices), #3 Exhibit C - Consent Order - DA-14-1457A1, #4 Exhibit D - FCC Press Release, #5 Exhibit E - Discovery Letter to AT&T 12.9.2015, #6 Exhibit F - CCE Production Letter to all Defendants, #7 Exhibit G - Email to AT&T 1.4.2016, #8 Exhibit H - AT&T Responsive Email 1.12.2016, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 8, 2016 Filing 535 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Saad, Terry)
February 8, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan)
February 8, 2016 Filing 533 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Ray Bragalone on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2016 Filing 532 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney S. Brannon Latimer by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 4, 2016 Filing 531 SEALED MOTION for Issuance of Letter Rogatory by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 3, 2016 Filing 530 STIPULATION Regarding Protection of Qualcomm Information by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting #528 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 6:15-cv-1155 is consolidated with Case No. 6:13-cv-507. Case No. 6:13-cv-507 shall serve as the lead case for future filings regarding Case No. 6:15-cv-1155. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/02/16. (mll, )
January 28, 2016 Filing 528 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Comeau, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 527 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 4/15/2016. Jury Selection set for 9/6/2016 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Trial set for 9/6/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/19/16. (mll, )
January 18, 2016 Filing 526 Submission of Proposed Amended Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
January 13, 2016 Filing 525 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Joseph Gerardi on behalf of Apple Inc. (Gerardi, Michael)
January 8, 2016 Filing 524 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph H Lee on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lee, Joseph)
January 8, 2016 Filing 523 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sims, Cassius)
January 8, 2016 Filing 522 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey G. Homrig on behalf of Apple Inc. (Homrig, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2016 Filing 521 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas E Lumish on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lumish, Douglas)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #518 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 01/07/16. (mll, )
January 6, 2016 Filing 519 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC re #518 Joint MOTION to Stay Claims Pertaining to the '8923 Patent and to Amend Docket Control Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
December 31, 2015 Filing 518 Joint MOTION to Stay Claims Pertaining to the '8923 Patent and to Amend Docket Control Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 517 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/30/15. (mll, )
December 24, 2015 Filing 516 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #514 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael K Sheen terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 12/23/15. (mll, )
December 21, 2015 Filing 514 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael K. Sheen by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 9, 2015 Filing 513 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent)
December 7, 2015 Filing 512 ANSWER to #503 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC.(Nelson, Edward)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 511 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 3/1/2016. Jury Selection set for 6/20/2016 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/30/15. (mll, )
November 23, 2015 Filing 510 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting #508 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Dell Inc are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, witheach party bearing and being responsible for its own costs and fees. No claims remain in Civil Action No. 6:13-cv-569 and it shall be closed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/20/15. (mll, )
November 19, 2015 Filing 508 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #498 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/16/15. (mll, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #497 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/16/15. (mll, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER granting #496 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/16/15. (mll, )
November 13, 2015 Filing 504 ANSWER to #390 Amended Complaint, by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc..(Elsea, Zachary)
November 13, 2015 Filing 503 Corrected ANSWER to Complaint [Dkt 390] and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cellular Communications Equipment LLC by HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Exedea, Inc..(Cunningham, Nicole)
November 13, 2015 Filing 502 ANSWER to #390 Amended Complaint, by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 13, 2015 Filing 501 ANSWER to #390 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Cellular Communications Equipment LLC by HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc., Exedea, Inc..(Cunningham, Nicole)
November 13, 2015 Filing 500 ANSWER to #390 Amended Complaint, by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless.(Kalemeris, Sarah)
November 13, 2015 Filing 499 ANSWER to #390 Amended Complaint, by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P..(Redmond, Megan)
November 11, 2015 Filing 498 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 11, 2015 Filing 497 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 11, 2015 Filing 496 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting #455 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Orders and for New Trial Settings. Within 10 business days of the entry of this order, the parties are ordered to submit an up-to-date Docket Control Order incorporating the settings as stated by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/9/15. (mjc, )
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting #493 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Civil Action 6:13-cv-508 is SEVERED from this Consolidated Lead Case and, from this point forward, is consolidated with Case No. 6:14-cv-982. Case No. 6:14-cv-982 shall serve as the lead case for future filings regarding Case No. 6:14-cv-982 and/or Case No. 6:13-cv-508. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 11/04/15. (mll, )
November 4, 2015 **Consolidated Defendants LG Electronics Inc and LG Electronics USA Inc are SEVERED from this civil action and CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action 6:14cv982 designated as the Lead Case. (mll, )
November 3, 2015 Filing 493 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Beaber, Jamie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2015: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #396 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/30/15. (mll, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting #489 Motion to Sever. Case No. 6:13-cv-509 is SEVERED from thisConsolidated Lead Case and, from this point forward, is CONSOLIDATED with Case No. 6:15-cv-853. Civil Action 6:15-cv-853 shall serve as the lead case for future filings regarding Case No.6:15-cv-853 and/or Case No. 6:13-cv-509, and such consolidated action shall remain stayed pending conclusion of the Pantech Co. Ltd. bankruptcy proceedings in accordance with the Court's Order of 9-14-2015 (Case No. 6:15-cv-853, Docket No. 1) entered therein. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/22/15. (mll, )
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 490 FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/22/15. (mll, )
October 22, 2015 **Consolidated Defendant Pantech Wireless Inc (6:13cv509) SEVERED and CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action 6:15cv853. (mll, )
October 19, 2015 Filing 489 Joint MOTION to Sever 509 Case and Consolidate Same with 853 Case by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER assigning case to Judge K Nicole Mitchell by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/14/15. (mll, )
October 15, 2015 Filing 487 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by all parties. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
October 13, 2015 Filing 486 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #471 SEALED MOTION To Prevent Disclosure of Protected Information and for Disqualification of Dr. Alon Konchitsky filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
October 9, 2015 Filing 484 AT&T Mobility's SEALED REPLY to Response In Support of Motion re #471 SEALED MOTION To Prevent Disclosure of Protected Information and for Disqualification of Dr. Alon Konchitsky filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Comeau, #2 Ex. H, #3 Ex. I, #4 Ex. J)(Kennerly, Christopher)
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting #437 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. ORDERED that the Supplemental Invalidity Contentions served on April 28, 2015 by Defendants Sprint, T-Mobile, LG, Amazon, and Verizon are hereby struck. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/6/2015. (gsg)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER granting #458 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/5/2015. (gsg)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 481 ORDER granting #460 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/5/2015. (gsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2015: #1 Printable Order (gsg).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER granting #459 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/5/2015. (gsg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/5/2015: #1 Printable Order (gsg).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa Richards Smith terminated as counsel for Defendant Pantech Wireless Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/05/15. (mll, )
October 1, 2015 Filing 478 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/22/15 before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Butler, CSR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_butler@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2016. (bhb, )
September 30, 2015 Filing 476 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Melissa R. Smith by Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 475 ORDER granting #472 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David A Bailey and Everett McClyde Upshaw terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/29/2015. (gsg)
September 29, 2015 Filing 474 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #471 SEALED MOTION To Prevent Disclosure of Protected Information and for Disqualification of Dr. Alon Konchitsky filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Konchitsky Declaration, #2 Nelson Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Nelson Declaration)(Nelson, Edward)
September 25, 2015 Filing 473 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #96 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief - Discovery Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
September 25, 2015 Filing 472 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailey, David)
September 23, 2015 Filing 471 SEALED MOTION To Prevent Disclosure of Protected Information and for Disqualification of Dr. Alon Konchitsky by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Nicholas Fung, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2, #4 Affidavit Jeffrey Comeau, #5 Ex. A, #6 Ex. B, #7 Ex. C, #8 Ex. D, #9 Ex. E, #10 Ex. F, #11 Ex. G, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER granting #469 Motion to Stay All Claims and Issues Pertaining toU.S. Patent No. 7,941,174 Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/23/15. (mjc, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 477 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2015 re #455 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #453 Docket Control Order; #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions; and the #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims. (Court Reporter Brenda Butler.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-in Sheets) (leh, )
September 22, 2015 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2015 re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. See original minutes docketed at #477 . (leh, )
September 22, 2015 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Motion Hearing held on 9/22/2015 re #455 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #453 Docket Control Order. See original minutes at DE #477 . (leh, )
September 22, 2015 Filing 469 Joint MOTION to Stay All Claims and Issues Pertaining to U.S. Patent No. 7,941,174 Pending Inter Partes Review by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
September 21, 2015 Filing 468 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christy Samansky Hawkins on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Hawkins, Christy)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #463 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/21/15. (mll, )
September 16, 2015 Filing 466 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr on behalf of Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Noteware, Daniel)
September 14, 2015 Consolidated Defendant Pantech Co Ltd is SEVERED from this civil action and assigned to cause 6:15cv853. (mll, )
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER that Defendant Pantech Co. Ltd. is SEVERED into a separate case, and that case is STAYED. Pantech Co. Ltd. shall file a notice that the bankruptcy proceedings have concluded within ten days of their completion. Pantech Co. Ltd. is thereby excused from the 9-22-2015 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/14/15. (mll, )
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER granting #461 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 09/14/15. (mll, )
September 11, 2015 Filing 463 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at September 22, 2015 Hearing by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Park, Hae-Chan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2015: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
September 11, 2015 Filing 462 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan P Griffin on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Griffin, Ryan)
September 11, 2015 Filing 461 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions with respect to Apple Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
September 4, 2015 Filing 460 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
September 4, 2015 Filing 459 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
September 4, 2015 Filing 458 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Letter Rogatory), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
September 1, 2015 NOTICE OF HEARING on #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims, #455 Joint MOTION to Amend Docket Control Order and for New Trial Settings, and #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions. MOTION HEARING set for 9/22/2015 at 1:30 PM, Courtroom 300, in Tyler, TX before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
August 31, 2015 Filing 457 NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd. OF FILING OF CHAPTER 15 BANKRUPTCY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Park, Hae-Chan)
August 28, 2015 Filing 456 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address for T. Mavrakakis, B. Kwok, H. Levin, and C. Lubeck (Mavrakakis, Thomas)
August 26, 2015 Filing 455 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #453 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,, by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 ORDER that Defendants' #426 Motion for Reconsideration of and Objections to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Claim Construction are OVERRULED and that the Magistrate Judge's #413 Memorandum Opinion and Order is hereby ADOPTED. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 08/21/15. (mll, )
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 453 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 8/31/2015. Dispositive Motion/Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/13/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Jury Selection set for 4/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 3/22/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/21/15. (mll, )
August 21, 2015 Filing 452 Submission of Proposed Agreed Amended Docket Control/Scheduling order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 451 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/19/15. (mll, )
August 17, 2015 Filing 450 NOTICE by Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Scarsi, Mark)
August 17, 2015 Filing 449 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beaber, Jamie)
August 14, 2015 Filing 448 Agreed MOTION To Amend Docket Control Order by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 447 STIPULATED SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #440 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated's Confidential Information filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/14/15. (mjc, )
August 7, 2015 Filing 446 REPLY to Response to Motion re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
August 7, 2015 Filing 445 REPLY to Response to Motion re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
July 31, 2015 Filing 444 NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Cadwell, Kevin)
July 30, 2015 Filing 443 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #442 Response in Opposition to Motion,.. (Beaber, Jamie)
July 30, 2015 Filing 442 RESPONSE in Opposition re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Beaber, Jamie)
July 30, 2015 Filing 441 RESPONSE in Opposition re #437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions filed by Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
July 30, 2015 Filing 440 Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated's Confidential Information by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Supplemental Protective Order Regarding Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated's Confidential Information)(Nelson, Edward)
July 20, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline Ann Bader on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Bader, Caroline)
July 16, 2015 Filing 438 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Megan Joanna Redmond on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Redmond, Megan)
July 13, 2015 Filing 437 MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions and to Strike Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23)(Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2015: #24 Text of Proposed Order) (ch, ).
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #424 Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its contentions with the charts served 4-08-2015. No additional changes to its contentions shall be permitted at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #423 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Dell is granted leave to supplement its contentions with the charts and prior art served on 4-28-2015 and the Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art served on 5-13-2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #419 Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER granting #418 Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff is granted leave to supplement its contentions with the charts served 4-08-2015. No additional changes to its contentions shall be permitted at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting #417 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Plaintiff's claims of infringement of U.S. PatentNo. 6,819,923 are DISMISSED from all cases comprising this consolidated lead action with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER granting #415 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lawrence A Rouse terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/09/15. (mll, )
July 8, 2015 Filing 430 RESPONSE in Opposition re #426 MOTION for Reconsideration re #413 Memorandum & Opinion and Order Regarding Claim Construction filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
July 6, 2015 Filing 429 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. Notice of Mark W. McGrory's Change of Firm Affiliation and Contact Information (Weber, Robert)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell for all pretrial purposes. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/30/15. (mll, )
June 30, 2015 All Pending Motions REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, )
June 29, 2015 Filing 427 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Regarding Cancellation of Asserted Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
June 22, 2015 Filing 426 MOTION for Reconsideration re #413 Memorandum & Opinion and Order Regarding Claim Construction by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 22, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 422, Motion is now Terminated. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Markman Hearing held on 4/9/2015 before Judge Nicole Mitchell. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jill McFadden,Telephone number: (903)530-3163. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2015. (tlh, )
June 19, 2015 Filing 424 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
June 19, 2015 Filing 423 Unopposed MOTION Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
June 18, 2015 Filing 422 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE*** MOTION re #413 Memorandum & Opinion by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 6/22/2015 (sm, ).
June 18, 2015 Filing 421 NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Cadwell, Kevin)
June 16, 2015 Filing 420 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC re #371 MOTION for Reconsideration re #363 Memorandum & Opinion Construing the '019 Patent (Nelson, Edward)
June 12, 2015 Filing 419 AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 12, 2015 Filing 418 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
June 12, 2015 Filing 417 STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,819,923 by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
June 5, 2015 Filing 416 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims Plaintiff Cellular Communications Equipment LLC's Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Contributory Infringement Claims filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
June 5, 2015 Filing 415 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (on behalf of Lawrence A. Rouse due to his retirement) by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/02/15. (mll, )
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The court hereby ADOPTS the claim constructions as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/01/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 412 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hae-Chan Park on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Park, Hae-Chan)
May 26, 2015 Filing 411 REPLY to Response to Motion re #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher)
May 14, 2015 Filing 410 RESPONSE in Opposition re #396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 5, 2015 Filing 409 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Request for Termination of Electronic Notices Pursuant to Local Rule CV 11(f) (Rambo, Rick)
May 4, 2015 Filing 408 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #371 MOTION for Reconsideration re #363 Memorandum & Opinion Construing the '019 Patent filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher)
May 1, 2015 Filing 407 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
May 1, 2015 Filing 406 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Chester Giza on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Giza, Alexander)
April 30, 2015 Filing 405 NOTICE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Beaber, Jamie)
April 30, 2015 Filing 404 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Kennerly, Christopher)
April 30, 2015 Filing 403 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy)
April 30, 2015 Filing 402 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Smith, Melissa)
April 30, 2015 Filing 401 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
April 29, 2015 Filing 400 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple Inc. regarding Compliance with Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Findlay, Eric)
April 29, 2015 Filing 399 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless regarding Compliance with Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Jones, Michael)
April 29, 2015 Filing 398 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Compliance Regarding Defendants' Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Weber, Robert)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, )
April 27, 2015 Filing 396 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Contributory Infringement Claims by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/28/2015) (mll, ).
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER that the Court CANCELS its Request for International Judicial Assistance with respect to Nokia in this case. Plaintiff is ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to the Ministry of Justice of Finland. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/23/15. (mll, )
April 22, 2015 Filing 394 REPLY to Response to Motion re #371 MOTION for Reconsideration re #363 Memorandum & Opinion Construing the '019 Patent filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER granting #392 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brendan Padraig O'Shea terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/20/15. (mll, )
April 16, 2015 Filing 392 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brendan P. O'Shea by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Shea, Brendan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2015: #2 REVISED ORDER (no lines)) (sm, ).
April 13, 2015 Filing 391 RESPONSE in Opposition re #371 MOTION for Reconsideration re #363 Memorandum & Opinion Construing the '019 Patent filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Markman Hearing Transcript, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 10, 2015 Filing 390 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Edward)
April 9, 2015 Filing 389 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell: Markman Hearing held on 4/9/2015. (Court Reporter Jill McFadden.) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (leh, )
April 9, 2015 Filing 388 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Dell's Notice of Service of Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy)
April 9, 2015 Filing 387 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Defendants' Notice of Filing of Presentation Slides (April 9, 2015 Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Smith, Melissa)
April 7, 2015 Filing 386 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Cunningham, Nicole)
April 7, 2015 Filing 385 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Cunningham, Nicole)
April 7, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Findlay, Eric)
April 7, 2015 Filing 383 NOTICE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Beaber, Jamie)
April 7, 2015 Filing 382 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Doan, Jennifer)
April 7, 2015 Filing 381 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election Of Asserted Prior Art (Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2015 Filing 380 NOTICE by Cellco Partnership of Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Gardner, Allen)
April 7, 2015 Filing 379 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Weber, Robert)
April 7, 2015 Filing 378 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Smith, Melissa)
April 1, 2015 Filing 377 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zachary Truman Elsea on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5129810. (Elsea, Zachary)
March 31, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Regarding Letter of Request (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
March 30, 2015 Filing 375 Joint Claim Construction Chart Pursuant to P.R. 4-5(d) by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER granting #372 Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline. ORDERED that the Parties deadline to conduct mediation is extended up to and including August 31, 2015. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/30/2015. (gsg)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER denying as moot #107 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #109 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #110 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #111 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #112 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #113 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #114 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #116 Motion to Dismiss; denying #233 Motion to Sever. The Court orders Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/27/15. (mjc, )
March 27, 2015 Filing 372 Joint MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Doan, Jennifer)
March 27, 2015 Filing 371 MOTION for Reconsideration re #363 Memorandum & Opinion Construing the '019 Patent by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
March 24, 2015 Filing 370 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
March 23, 2015 Filing 369 REPLY to #362 Claim Construction Brief,, #361 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit I)(Nelson, Edward)
March 23, 2015 Filing 368 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Estimated Amount of Time for Markman Hearing (Joint Notice) (Nelson, Edward)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER for payment of Special Master for services through 3/18/2015 in the amount of $23,057.90, with each side to pay half. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/23/15. (mjc, )
March 23, 2015 Filing 366 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Carrier-Retailers' Notice of Request to Respond to the New Arguments in Plaintiff's Response to The Carrier-Retailers' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Motion to Sever and Stay (Smith, Melissa)
March 16, 2015 Filing 365 SEALED RESPONSE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC to #279 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Nelson, Edward)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER granting #278 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff shall file a response to Carrier-Retailers' Supplemental Brief #279 on or before 3-16-2015. Plaintiff's response shall be limited to 3 pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/10/15. (mll, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court adopts the claim constructions as set forth in this Order. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness #287 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/09/15. (mll, )
March 9, 2015 Filing 362 DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 820 Patent, #2 Exhibit - Dictionaries, #3 Exhibit - Table of Dictionary Definitions, #4 Exhibit - 8923 Patent, #5 Exhibit - IPR Response)(Kennerly, Christopher)
February 23, 2015 Filing 361 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 820 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - Dictionaries, #3 Exhibit C - 8923 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - IPR Petition, #5 Exhibit E - Prelim. Resp., #6 Exhibit F - Dictionary)(Nelson, Edward)
February 20, 2015 Filing 360 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Yarbrough, Herbert)
February 20, 2015 Filing 359 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Hill, Jack)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #356 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Barry Bumgardner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/15. (mll, )
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting #355 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brent Nelson Bumgardner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/19/15. (mll, )
February 18, 2015 Filing 356 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Barry Bumgardner by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 18, 2015 Filing 355 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Brent Bumgardner by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 17, 2015 Filing 354 STATUS REPORT Report of the Special Master by David Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Folsom, David)
February 5, 2015 Filing 353 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #350 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, NEC Corporation of America. Civil Action No. 6:13-cv-584 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as set forth in the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/28/15. (mll, )
January 28, 2015 Filing 351 NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Request for Termination of Electronic Notices) (Pankratz, Kurt)
January 27, 2015 Filing 350 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
January 23, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #345 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/15. (mll, )
January 21, 2015 Filing 347 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation (Request for Termination of Electronics Notices for Case #'s 13-cv-507 and 13-cv-738) (Ainsworth, Jennifer)
January 20, 2015 Filing 346 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Case Filing Notices for I. Neel Chatterjee Regarding Case Numbers 13-CV-507 and 13-CV-738 (Chatterjee, Indra)
January 20, 2015 Filing 345 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, #262 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
January 20, 2015 Filing 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dallas William Tharpe on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Tharpe, Dallas)
January 20, 2015 Filing 343 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for David T. Pritikin for Case #'s 13CV 507 and 13CV 738 (Pritikin, David)
January 20, 2015 Filing 342 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for Nathaniel C. Love for Case #'s 13CV 507 and 13CV 738 (Love, Nathaniel)
January 20, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for Ellen S. Robbins for Case #'s 13CV 507 and 13CV 738 (Robbins, Ellen)
January 20, 2015 Filing 340 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for John W. McBride in Case #'s 13CV 507 and 13CV 738 (McBride, John)
January 20, 2015 Filing 339 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for Richard A. Cederoth for Case #'s 13CV 507 and 13CV 738 (Cederoth, Richard)
January 15, 2015 Filing 338 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. TO BE REFILED IN CORRECT CASE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom AG, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 1/15/2015 (mjc, ).
January 15, 2015 Filing 337 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. TO BE REFILED IN CORRECT CASE.***CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Other Affiliate T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) Modified on 1/15/2015 (mjc, ).
January 15, 2015 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #337 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #338 Corporate Disclosure Statement. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED IN CORRECT CASE. DOCUMENTS SEALED BY COURT AS UNRELATED TO THIS CASE.*** (mjc, )
January 14, 2015 Filing 336 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing Proceedings held on 12/16/14 before Judge Leonard Davis, Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2015. (sms, )
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #334 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Plaintiff's claims of infringement of U.S. Patent No. 7,215,962 are DISMISSED from all cases comprising this consolidated lead action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/14/15. (mll, )
January 13, 2015 Filing 334 STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding U.S. Patent No. 7,215,962 by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER that parties meet and confer and submit, within 7 days from the date of this Order, a joint revised Docket Control Order wherein all briefing relevant to the second Markman Hearing is completed by 4-02-2015. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/15. (mll, )
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting #327 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Microsoft Corporation. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Microsoft Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and that each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/08/15. (mll, )
January 9, 2015 Filing 330 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C Hueston on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Hueston, John)
January 9, 2015 Filing 329 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation and Address (Smith, Melissa)
January 9, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing:Markman Hearing re-set for 4/9/2015 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell for purposes of Claim Construction only. The undersigned will continue to oversee all other matters. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/08/15. (mll, )
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/08/15. (mll, )
January 7, 2015 Filing 327 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 31, 2014 Filing 326 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC of Defendants' Joint Notice of Compliance Regarding Patent Rule 4-1(a) (Kennerly, Christopher)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting #324 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to comply with P.R. 4-1 is extended to 12-30-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/30/14. (mll, )
December 23, 2014 Filing 324 Joint MOTION to Extend The Deadline For Compliance With P.R. 4-1 by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting #321 Sealed Motion to Stay. All deadlines in Case No. 6:13-cv-584, are hereby STAYED to 1-21-2015. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/22/14. (mll, )
December 17, 2014 Filing 321 Joint SEALED MOTION to Stay all Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 16, 2014 Filing 320 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc. Of Filing of Defendants' Presentation Slides from December 16, 2014 Claim Construction Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Presentation Slides (12-16-14))(Yarbrough, Herbert)
December 16, 2014 Filing 319 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Filing of Plaintiff's Presentation Slides (12.16.14 Hearing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Presentation Slides (12.16.14 Hearing))(Nelson, Edward)
December 16, 2014 Filing 318 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #312 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by BlackBerry Corporation, Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, BlackBerry Limited. All claims in Consolidated Civil Action 6:13-cv-510 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as set forth in the Stipulated Dismissal, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees associated with filing the dismissal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/14. (mll, )
December 15, 2014 Filing 323 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 12/15/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Sign In Sheets) (cwk)
December 15, 2014 Filing 316 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc. of Order of Presentation for Markman Hearing (Nelson, Edward)
December 15, 2014 Filing 315 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit T - Excerpts from '9923 IPR)(Nelson, Edward)
December 12, 2014 Filing 314 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eman Sojoodi on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Sojoodi, Eman)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting #311 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/12/14. (mll, )
December 11, 2014 Filing 312 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 11, 2014 Filing 311 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 310 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/14. (mll, )
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting #306 Motion to Amend/Correct Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/14. (mll, )
December 9, 2014 Filing 308 REPLY to Response to Motion re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15)(Kennerly, Christopher)
December 9, 2014 Filing 307 Claim Construction Chart by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 4-5(d) Chart)(Nelson, Edward)
December 9, 2014 Filing 306 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #115 Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
December 2, 2014 Filing 305 Plaintiff's REPLY Brief on Claim Construction re: #288 Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief, re: #277 Plaintiff's Opening Brief on Claim Construction, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
December 2, 2014 Filing 304 RESPONSE in Opposition re #287 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- Dinan Declaration, #3 Exhibit B- 9923 Patent, #4 Exhibit C- 9923 FH Excerpts, #5 Exhibit D- 019 Patent, #6 Exhibit E- 174 Patent, #7 Exhibit F- 820 Patent, #8 Exhibit G- 820 FH Excerpts 11-5-08, #9 Exhibit H- 820 FH Excerpts 9-30-10, #10 Exhibit I- 820 FH Excerpts 5-10-11, #11 Exhibit J- 820 IPR Excerpts, #12 Exhibit N- Kaplan Dictionary Excerpts, #13 Exhibit O- Weik Dictionary Excerpts, #14 Exhibit P- Petersen Dictionary Excerpts, #15 Exhibit Q- 174 IPR Excerpts, #16 Exhibit R- Williams Declaration Excerpts, #17 Exhibit S- 820 FH Excerpts 12-2-10)(Nelson, Edward)
December 2, 2014 Filing 303 NOTICE by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. of Estimated Amount of Time for Markman Hearing (Nelson, Edward)
December 1, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Justin Barrow on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Barrow, William)
December 1, 2014 Filing 301 NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-3 & 3-4 (Smith, Melissa)
November 24, 2014 Filing 300 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Dell, Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy)
November 24, 2014 Filing 299 NOTICE by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Beaber, Jamie)
November 24, 2014 Filing 298 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Compliance regarding P.R. 3-4(a) (Weber, Robert)
November 24, 2014 Filing 297 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. regarding Compliance with PR 3-4(a) (Jones, Michael)
November 21, 2014 Filing 296 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Benson, Robert)
November 21, 2014 Filing 295 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
November 21, 2014 Filing 294 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance (Cunningham, Nicole)
November 21, 2014 Filing 293 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Compliance with P.R. 3-4(a) (Dixon, Douglas)
November 21, 2014 Filing 292 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance (Cunningham, Nicole)
November 21, 2014 Filing 291 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Local Rule 3-4(a) (Ranganath, Ravi)
November 21, 2014 Filing 290 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc. of Compliance (Cunningham, Nicole)
November 21, 2014 Filing 289 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC of Compliance Regarding P.R. 3-4(a) Disclosure (Kennerly, Christopher)
November 14, 2014 Filing 288 RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 14, 2014 Filing 287 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation. Responses due by 12/2/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #272 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief requesting leave to file a Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/14. (mll, )
November 12, 2014 Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re #278 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and Exhibits to Carrier Retailers' Motion to Sever and Stay #233 filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - IGS v. Onstar (Davis) Dkt. 71, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
November 10, 2014 Filing 284 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
November 6, 2014 Filing 283 RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #272 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief,, filed by Sprint Solutions, Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Dell, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., Apple Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Cellco Partnership Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Exedea, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., AT&T Mobility LLC, ZTE (USA) Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief regarding Indefiniteness)(Nelson, Edward)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #270 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/30/14. (mll, )
November 3, 2014 Filing 280 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Joyce Kalemeris on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4910273. (Kalemeris, Sarah)
October 30, 2014 Filing 279 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Carrier-Retailers Supplemental Brief in Support of the Carrier-Retailers Motion to Sever and Stay #233 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kennerly, Christopher)
October 30, 2014 Filing 278 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing and Exhibits to Carrier Retailers' Motion to Sever and Stay #233 by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
October 30, 2014 Filing 277 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Dinan Declaration, #2 Exhibit B 9923 Patent, #3 Exhibit C 9923 Response Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D 019 Patent, #5 Exhibit E 174 Patent, #6 Exhibit F 820 Patent, #7 Exhibit G 820 Application Excerpts, #8 Exhibit H 820 Office Action Excerpts, #9 Exhibit I 820 Response Excerpts, #10 Exhibit J 820 Petition Excerpts, #11 Exhibit K 8923 Patent, #12 Exhibit L 8923 Petition Excerpts, #13 Exhibit M 4-2 Disclosures, #14 Exhibit N Kaplan Dictionary Excerpts, #15 Exhibit O Weik Dictionary Excerpts, #16 Exhibit P Petersen Dictionary Excerpts)(Nelson, Edward)
October 30, 2014 Filing 276 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC re #270 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Notice of Corrected Letter Rogatory) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected Letter Rogatory)(Hill, Jack)
October 28, 2014 Filing 275 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Submission of Technology Tutorial (Hill, Jack)
October 28, 2014 Filing 274 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendants' Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial filed on behalf of Defendants (Findlay, Eric)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting #232 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Plaintiff's claims of infringement of U.S. PatentNo. 6,377,804 are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/14. (mll, )
October 22, 2014 Filing 272 Letter Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kennerly, Christopher)
October 21, 2014 Filing 271 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. re #233 MOTION to Sever and Stay re Subsequent Authority: In re Google, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dixon, Douglas)
October 17, 2014 Filing 270 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Rogatory, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #268 Motion for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/14. (mll, )
October 15, 2014 Filing 268 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement Infringement Contentions by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #263 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael T Pieja terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/14. (mll, )
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER granting #259 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/14/14. (mll, )
October 14, 2014 Filing 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher R Lubeck on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4880354. (Lubeck, Christopher)
October 10, 2014 Filing 263 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael T. Pieja by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mavrakakis, Thomas)
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #258 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/14. (mll, )
October 6, 2014 Filing 261 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonas P Herrell on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4869088. (Herrell, Jonas)
October 1, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Compliance of Service of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Weber, Robert)
October 1, 2014 Filing 259 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter Rogatory, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
September 30, 2014 Filing 258 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
September 30, 2014 Filing 257 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tiffany A Miller on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Miller, Tiffany)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #255 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties are given to 9-30-2014, to submit their proposed, revised briefing schedule attendant to claim construction proceedings to accommodate the new Markman hearing dates. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/14. (mll, )
September 26, 2014 Filing 255 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule with respect to Claim Construction Proceedings by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
September 22, 2014 Filing 254 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #233 MOTION to Sever and Stay filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #154 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order; granting in part and denying in part #196 Motion for Joinder; denying as moot #252 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/19/14. (mll, )
September 19, 2014 First Markman Hearing reset for 12/16/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Second Markman Hearing set for 4/21/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mll, )
September 18, 2014 Filing 252 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadline for Technology Tutorials by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ranganath, Ravi)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER appointing David Keyzer as technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/14. (mll, )
September 16, 2014 Filing 250 JOINT NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Regarding Technical Advisor (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A- CV of David Keyzer)(Nelson, Edward)
September 12, 2014 Filing 249 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #233 MOTION to Sever and Stay filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Dixon, Douglas)
September 12, 2014 Filing 248 CORRECTED Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kennerly, Christopher)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #246 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to propose a technical advisor to the Court shall be extended to 9-16-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/11/14. (mll, )
September 9, 2014 Filing 246 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposal for Technical Advisor by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dixon, Douglas)
September 8, 2014 Filing 245 Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward)
September 2, 2014 Filing 244 RESPONSE in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Sever and Stay filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of S. Brannon Latimer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26)(Nelson, Edward)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #241 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/02/14. (mll, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 242 NOTICE by Apple Inc. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING EARLY PRODUCTION OF AGREEMENTS AND SUMMARY SALES DATA (Findlay, Eric)
August 29, 2014 Filing 241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Regarding Early Production of Agreements by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Craft, Roger)
August 29, 2014 Filing 240 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Kennerly, Christopher)
August 29, 2014 Filing 239 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data in Civil Action No. 6:14-cv-251 (Dixon, Douglas)
August 29, 2014 Filing 238 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless - Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Jones, Michael)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/28/14. (mll, )
August 27, 2014 Filing 236 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 18, 2014 Filing 235 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward)
August 18, 2014 Filing 234 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. Regarding Compliance with Joint P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
August 13, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION to Sever and Stay by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Ultimatepointer v Nintendo (Davis), #2 Ex B - Micro Enhanced v. Videx, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 13, 2014 Filing 232 STIPULATION of Dismissal Regarding U.S. Patent No. 6,377,804 by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
August 11, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Regarding Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Edward)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #229 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are given to and including August 15, 2014 to comply with P.R. 4-2 -Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/11/2014. (gsg)
August 8, 2014 Filing 229 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Comply with P.R. 4-2 - Exchange of Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
August 6, 2014 Filing 228 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
August 5, 2014 Filing 227 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC Regarding Compliance With Initial Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
August 5, 2014 Filing 226 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. regarding Compliance with First Amended Initial Disclosures (Dixon, Douglas)
August 5, 2014 Filing 225 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership regarding Compliance with First Amended Initial Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
August 5, 2014 Filing 224 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Weber, Robert)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/01/14. (mll, )
July 24, 2014 Filing 222 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scarsi, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 221 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Proposed Modifications to Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Scarsi, Mark)
July 16, 2014 Filing 220 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey D Comeau on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Mobility LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4749413. (Comeau, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Howard E Levin on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741045. (Levin, Howard)
July 11, 2014 Filing 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Brian Kwok on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741035. (Kwok, Brian)
July 11, 2014 Filing 217 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael T Pieja on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4741026. (Pieja, Michael)
July 10, 2014 Filing 216 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas C Mavrakakis on behalf of Apple Inc. (Mavrakakis, Thomas)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #214 Motion for Extension of Time for Apple Inc. to Submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order. The deadline to file objections to the existing Protective Order #115 is 7/16/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/10/14. (mjc, )
July 9, 2014 Filing 214 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
July 9, 2014 Filing 213 Sealed Document (Plaintiff's Surreply Regarding Defendant Apple's Joinder to Motion to modify docket control order (No. 154). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) Modified on 7/9/2014 (sm, ).
July 7, 2014 Filing 212 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #196 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #209 Motion for Extension of Time. Apple shall have to 7-09-2014 to submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order #96 , Order Regarding E-Discovery #97 , and Protective Order #115 . No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/14. (mll, )
July 2, 2014 Filing 209 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 30, 2014 Filing 208 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership, Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. re Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
June 30, 2014 Filing 207 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
June 30, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #206 Notice of Discovery Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED BY ATTY TO CORRECT PARTY LINKS.** (mjc, )
June 27, 2014 Filing 206 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Apple Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc. re Service of P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 6/30/2014 (mjc, ).
June 27, 2014 Filing 205 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #196 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward)
June 26, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashlee Lin on behalf of Apple Inc. (Lin, Ashlee)
June 26, 2014 Filing 203 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael K Sheen on behalf of Apple Inc. (Sheen, Michael)
June 26, 2014 Filing 202 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miguel Ruiz on behalf of Apple Inc. (Ruiz, Miguel)
June 26, 2014 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Eugene Cadwell on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Cadwell, Kevin)
June 26, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harrison Gheens Rich on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Rich, Harrison)
June 26, 2014 Filing 199 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Mansinghani, Roshan)
June 26, 2014 Filing 198 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Mansinghani, Roshan) Modified on 6/26/2014 (mjc, ).
June 26, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #198 Notice of Appearance. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED AND LINKED TO NEW PARTY.*** (mjc, )
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Extension of Time. Apple shall have to 7-02-2014 to submit its objections to the existing Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/14. (mll, )
June 24, 2014 Filing 196 MOTION for Joinder to Defendants' Motion to Modify Docket Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Scarsi, Mark)
June 24, 2014 Filing 195 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Discovery Order, Order Regarding E-Discovery, and Protective Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. Cause No. 6:14cv251 shall be consolidated with the existing consolidated cases in Cause No. 6:13cv507 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Cause No. 6:13cv507 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. The existing Docket Control Order (Cause No. 6:13-cv-507, Docket No. 123) shall govern as to all parties in the consolidated action. The parties may meet and confer and file the appropriate motion to amend the Docket Control Order for any dates or deadlines prior to the 11-18-2014 Markman hearing as necessary. The existing Discovery Order (Docket No. 96), Order Regarding E-Discovery (Docket No. 97), and Protective Order (Docket No. 115) shall govern as to all parties in the consolidated action barring objection by any newly consolidated party within seven days of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/17/14. (mll, )
June 17, 2014 Added Consolidated Defendants: Apple Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership, Sprint Solutions Inc, Sprint Spectrum LP, Boost Mobile LLC, T-Mobile USA Inc, T-Mobile Inc (6:14cv251). (mll, )
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendants to join additional parties, assert counterclaims, and assert inequitable conduct allegations without leave of court is extended to the date upon which Defendants file their answers. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/16/14. (mll, )
June 13, 2014 Filing 192 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadline for Defendants to 1) Join Additional Parties, 2) Assert Counterclaims, and 3) Add Inequitable Conduct Allegations to Pleadings by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/14. (mll, )
June 12, 2014 Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert)
June 9, 2014 Filing 189 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Nelson, Edward)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney S Christian Platt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg)
June 6, 2014 Filing 187 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney S. Christian Platt by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
June 6, 2014 Filing 186 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #154 MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #184 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Daniel John Galligan terminated as counsel for Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/6/14. (mjc, )
June 5, 2014 Filing 184 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Daniel Galligan by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Galligan, Daniel)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER that Microsoft's original motion to dismiss or transfer, Cause No. 6:13-cv-738, Docket No. 9, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/03/14. (mll, )
June 2, 2014 Filing 182 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael E Jones (Jones, Michael)
May 30, 2014 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina Marie Von der Ahe on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Von der Ahe, Christina)
May 30, 2014 Filing 180 RESPONSE in Support re #154 MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett)
May 30, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole S Cunningham on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Cunningham, Nicole)
May 30, 2014 Filing 178 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge Larish on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Larish, Inge)
May 30, 2014 Filing 177 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William P Atkins on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Atkins, William)
May 30, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven A Moore on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Moore, Steven)
May 30, 2014 Filing 175 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cederoth, Richard)
May 28, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE by Amazon.com, Inc. of Compliance re Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Ranganath, Ravi)
May 22, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Cunningham, Nicole)
May 20, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance with Court's Order Regarding Disclosure of Plaintiff's Position Regarding Asserted Patents and Other Related Disclosures (Nelson, Edward)
May 20, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation Notice of Compliance with Court's Order Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Bailey, David)
May 19, 2014 Filing 170 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #153 Motion for Extension of Time and to Expand Number of Terms. The Motion is GRANTED as to extending the deadline to comply with P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 and it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline extended to 8-04-2014. The Motion is DENIED as to expanding the number of terms for the first Markman hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/19/14. (mll, )
May 19, 2014 Filing 168 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. of Service of Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Weber, Robert)
May 19, 2014 Filing 167 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #154 MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
May 16, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Benson, Robert)
May 16, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Dixon, Douglas)
May 16, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Sales Data (Maas, Michael)
May 16, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. regarding Compliance with Early Damages Disclosures (Jones, Michael)
May 16, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. Of Compliance Regarding Early Production Of Agreements And Summary Sales Data (Smith, Melissa)
May 16, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Defendants NEC Corporation of America, Inc., NEC Casio Mobile Communications, Ltd., and AT&T Mobility LLC's Notice of Compliance Regarding Early Production of Agreements and Summary Sales Data (Rambo, Rick)
May 16, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited Notice of Compliance (Pankratz, Kurt)
May 16, 2014 Filing 159 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Compliance Regarding Early Production Of Agreements And Summary Sales Data (Kennerly, Christopher)
May 15, 2014 Filing 158 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward)
May 5, 2014 Filing 157 REPLY to Response to Motion re #107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher)
May 5, 2014 Filing 156 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David A Bailey on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation (Bailey, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Dell, Inc.. (Fulghum, Roger)
May 2, 2014 Filing 154 MOTION to Amend/Correct #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Upshaw, Everett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2014: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 2, 2014 Filing 153 Joint MOTION to (1) Extend the Deadline to Comply With P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 and (2) Expand the Number of Terms/Phrases for the First Markman by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Dell, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
May 1, 2014 Filing 152 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re #52 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #123 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, of Compliance re Microsoft's Initial Disclosures (Cederoth, Richard)
May 1, 2014 Filing 151 SEALED MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Nathaniel C. Love, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Supplement Z, #30 Text of Proposed Order)(Cederoth, Richard)
May 1, 2014 Filing 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel C Love on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4640523. (Love, Nathaniel)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have an extension to 5-02-2014, in which to modify the Docket Control Order regarding limits established for the first Markman. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/14. (mll, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 148 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File , Unopposed MOTION Motion to Extend The Deadline To Submit Motion to Modify DCO Regarding Limits Established For the First Markman by AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Dell, Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America, Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc., Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER denying as moot #53 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, )
April 24, 2014 Filing 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re #107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim, #112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim, #113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, #111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit motions to modify the Docket Control Order regarding limits established for the first Markman is extended to 4-28-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/22/14. (mll, )
April 21, 2014 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order Regarding Limits Established for the First Markman by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dixon, Douglas)
April 21, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Oluwaseun Olugbolade Ajayi on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Ajayi, Oluwaseun)
April 18, 2014 Filing 142 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Larish, Inge)
April 18, 2014 Filing 141 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC Of Compliance Regarding Service Of Initial Disclosures (Kennerly, Christopher)
April 18, 2014 Filing 140 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. (Jones, Michael)
April 18, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Amazon.com, Inc. re Service of Initial Disclosures (Ranganath, Ravi)
April 18, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Beaber, Jamie)
April 18, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation for Serving Initial Disclosures pursuant to Paragraph 1 of the Docket Control Order (Bailey, David)
April 18, 2014 Filing 136 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Cellco Partnership Inc. (Notice of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures) (Pankratz, Kurt)
April 18, 2014 Filing 135 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (BlackBerry's Notice of Compliance regarding Initial Disclosures) (Pankratz, Kurt)
April 18, 2014 Filing 134 NOTICE by Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. of Compliance Regarding Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
April 18, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE by T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. Notice of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Dixon, Douglas)
April 18, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE by Dell, Inc. Notice of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Fulghum, Roger)
April 18, 2014 Filing 131 NOTICE by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. Notice of Compliance of Service of Initial Disclosures (Weber, Robert)
April 18, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America Notice of Compliance re Service of Initial Disclosures (Rambo, Rick)
April 18, 2014 Filing 129 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
April 17, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE by David Folsom re #127 Notice (Other) ORDER OF CONTINUANCE (Folsom, David)
April 17, 2014 Filing 127 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Joint Notice Regarding Special Master Status Conference (Nelson, Edward)
April 17, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Killough on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Killough, David)
April 16, 2014 Filing 125 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Indra Neel Chatterjee on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Chatterjee, Indra)
April 16, 2014 Filing 124 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J Benson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Benson, Robert)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 4/4/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. First Markman Hearing set for 11/18/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Second Markman Hearing set for 3/19/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/14. (mll, )
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER that the curret stay in this case be lifted either when settlement negotiations between Microsoft and Acacia Research Corp. reach an impasse or on 5-01-2014, whichever is earlier. At that time, all deadlines applicable to Microsoft in this case shall resume. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/14/14. (mll, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 121 Joint MOTION For Entry Of Docket Control Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
April 13, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Arthur Wright on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (Wright, Alan)
April 13, 2014 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brendan Padraig O'Shea on behalf of Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc. (O'Shea, Brendan)
April 10, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammy M Pennington Rhodes on behalf of Dell, Inc. (Pennington Rhodes, Tammy)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re #85 Notice of Competing Docket Control Order Proposals. The Court adopts the Plaintiff's position. The Markman hearing previously scheduled for 1-22-2015 in these cases is hereby CANCELLED. The Markman hearings set for 11-18-2014 and 3-19-2015 remain as scheduled. The parties are hereby ORDERED to meet and confer and submit a joint proposed Docket Control Order incorporating this change and all previously set dates by 4-14-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, )
April 8, 2014 Filing 116 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pankratz, Kurt)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/08/14. (mll, )
April 7, 2014 Filing 114 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Pantech Co., Ltd., Pantech Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2014 Filing 113 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Corporation, ZTE Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2014 Filing 112 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc., Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2014 Filing 111 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2014 Filing 110 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher)
April 7, 2014 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Dell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger)
April 7, 2014 Filing 108 NOTICE by David Folsom NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE (MONDAY, APRIL 28, 2014) (Folsom, David)
April 7, 2014 Filing 107 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambo, Rick) Modified on 4/8/2014 (mll, ).
April 7, 2014 Filing 106 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #105 Status Report. (Folsom, David)
April 7, 2014 Filing 105 STATUS REPORT REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER by David Folsom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of David Folsom)(Folsom, David)
April 4, 2014 Filing 104 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective order)(Nelson, Edward)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the parties to submit proposed Protective Order is extended to 4-04-2014. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, )
March 28, 2014 Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
March 27, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael W Maas on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Maas, Michael)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Special Master. David Folsom appointed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/26/14. (mll, )
March 24, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference Proceedings held on 2/26/14 before Chief Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2014. (sms, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' deadline to submit proposed Protective Order is extended to 3-28-2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, )
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/14. (mll, )
March 21, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Compliance (Nelson, Edward)
March 21, 2014 Filing 94 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
March 21, 2014 Filing 93 Joint MOTION For Entry Of Discovery Order And Order Regarding E-Discovery by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Order, #2 Exhibit B - E Discovery Order)(Nelson, Edward)
March 21, 2014 Filing 92 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Nelson, Edward)
March 19, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John D Zele on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4570786. (Zele, John)
March 19, 2014 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremy D Peterson on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4570757. (Peterson, Jeremy)
March 19, 2014 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Robert W Busby on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4570722. (Busby, Robert)
March 18, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bradford A Cangro on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Cangro, Bradford)
March 18, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rick L. Rambo on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Rambo, Rick)
March 18, 2014 Filing 86 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd., NEC Corporation of America (Allgood, Adam)
March 17, 2014 Filing 85 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC of Competing Docket Control Order Proposals (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiff Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit B (Defendants Proposed Order))(Nelson, Edward)
March 11, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roshan Suresh Mansinghani on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Mansinghani, Roshan)
March 11, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Eugene Cadwell on behalf of BlackBerry Corporation, BlackBerry Limited (Cadwell, Kevin)
March 11, 2014 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Corrine M Saylor on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4559156. (Saylor, Corrine)
March 7, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Gary Pluta on behalf of LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (Pluta, Robert)
March 6, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John W McBride on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (McBride, John)
March 6, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ellen S Robbins on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Robbins, Ellen)
March 6, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard A Cederoth on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Cederoth, Richard)
March 6, 2014 Filing 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David T Pritikin on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Pritikin, David)
March 6, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel John Galligan on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Galligan, Daniel)
March 3, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravi R Ranganath on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Ranganath, Ravi)
March 3, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Shamilov, Saina)
February 28, 2014 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2014. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: #1 Sign in Sheets) (cwk)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, )
February 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, )
February 19, 2014 Filing 70 JOINT NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) Modified on 2/20/2014 (sm, ).
February 19, 2014 Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, )
January 30, 2014 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas)
January 30, 2014 Filing 66 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom AG, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Zwischenholding GmbH, Corporate Parent Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Dixon, Douglas)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT SPRINT NEXTEL CORPORATION granting #64 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/26/13. (mjc, )
December 19, 2013 Filing 64 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Sprint Nextel Corporation (N/K/A Sprint Communications, Inc.) by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
November 25, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward)
November 22, 2013 Filing 62 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #53 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward)
November 14, 2013 Filing 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lawrence A Rouse on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4402827. (Rouse, Lawrence)
November 12, 2013 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #53 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 11/13/2013 (mll, ).
November 5, 2013 Filing 59 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Bennett Molster, III on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Molster, Charles)
October 31, 2013 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re #53 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
October 30, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M Dunham on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc. (Dunham, Thomas)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #46 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, it is hereby ordered that Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. is dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/13. (mll, )
October 15, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Douglas James Dixon on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4359977. (Dixon, Douglas)
October 15, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark W McGrory on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4358910. (McGrory, Mark)
October 14, 2013 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2013: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
October 14, 2013 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher)
October 14, 2013 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc, Corporate Parent Vodafone Group PLC for Cellco Partnership Inc.; Corporate Parent None for Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
October 14, 2013 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation identifying Corporate Parent HTC Corporation for Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Larish, Inge)
October 14, 2013 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Sprint Corporation for Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P.. (Weber, Robert)
October 14, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge Larish on behalf of Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Larish, Inge)
October 14, 2013 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile Global Holding GmbH for T-Mobile US, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2013 Filing 46 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Verizon Communications Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
October 14, 2013 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc. for T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2013 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nicole S Cunningham on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4357735. (Cunningham, Nicole)
October 11, 2013 Filing 42 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven A Moore on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4357590. (Moore, Steven)
October 11, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Boost Mobile, LLC, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum L.P. (Weber, Robert)
October 10, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Inge Larish on behalf of HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Larish, Inge)
October 10, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Gunter, Debra)
October 10, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Yarbrough, Herbert)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AT&T Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. AT&T Inc is hereby DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/13. (mll, )
September 17, 2013 Filing 36 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by AT&T Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
September 12, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S Christian Platt on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Platt, S)
September 12, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Kennerly, Christopher)
August 2, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Clutter, Patrick)
July 31, 2013 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed as to Boost Mobile, LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 31 Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 30 Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Spectrum L.P. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 29 Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile US, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed as to Cellco Partnership Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 24 Return of Service Executed as to Verizon Communications, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 23 Return of Service Executed as to Exedea, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 22 Return of Service Executed as to HTC America, Inc. on 7/10/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed as to Sprint Nextel Corporation on 7/9/2013, by personal service. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Answer Due Deadline Extended to 10-14-2013 for All Defendants per Orders #19 and #20 . (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No more extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/13. (mll, )
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No more extensions will be granted absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/30/13. (mll, )
July 29, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Cellco Partnership Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (Jones, Michael)
July 26, 2013 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Defendants AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Verizon Communications, Inc., Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Solutions, Inc., Sprint Spectrum, L.P., Boost Mobile, LLC, T-Mobile USA, Inc. and T-Mobile US Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
July 22, 2013 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Defendants HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc. and Exedea, Inc. by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward)
July 2, 2013 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael)
July 1, 2013 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas)
July 1, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward)
July 1, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent)
July 1, 2013 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven)
July 1, 2013 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry)
June 28, 2013 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance- Barry J. Bumgardner, #2 Notice of Appearance- Brannon Latimer, #3 Notice of Appearance- Brent N. Bumgardner, #4 Notice of Appearance- Michael J. Fagan, Jr., #5 Notice of Appearance- Thomas C. Cecil)(Nelson, Edward)
June 27, 2013 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Boost Mobile, LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Exedea, Inc., HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation, Sprint Nextel Corporation, Sprint Spectrum L.P., T-Mobile US, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es))(klb)
June 27, 2013 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Sprint Solutions, Inc. (gsg)
June 26, 2013 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas)
June 26, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire)
June 26, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack)
June 26, 2013 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas)
June 26, 2013 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas)
June 25, 2013 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4197549.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - '804 Patent, #3 Exhibit B - '923 Patent, #4 Exhibit C - '962 Patent, #5 Exhibit D - '174 Patent, #6 Exhibit E - '820 Patent, #7 Exhibit F - '923 Patent)(Ward, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Truman Elsea
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: John Charles Hueston
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: Roshan Suresh Mansinghani
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Mark W McGrory
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Caroline Ann Bader
Represented By: Lawrence A Rouse
Represented By: Megan Joanna Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exedea, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Inge A Larish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Spectrum L.P.
Represented By: Mark W McGrory
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Caroline Ann Bader
Represented By: Lawrence A Rouse
Represented By: Megan Joanna Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boost Mobile, LLC
Represented By: Mark W McGrory
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Caroline Ann Bader
Represented By: Lawrence A Rouse
Represented By: Megan Joanna Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Allan M. Soobert
Represented By: Callie McCarthy Bjurstrom
Represented By: Sean Christian Platt
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Jonas P Herrell
Represented By: Dallas William Tharpe
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Christopher Wood Kennerly
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: John D Zele
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Represented By: Harry Lee Gillam, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey David Comeau
Represented By: Debra Elaine Gunter
Represented By: Steven Arthur Moore
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Herbert A Yarbrough, III
Represented By: Yar R Chaikovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Sarah Joyce Kalemeris
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Thomas M Dunham
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Represented By: Corrine Saylor Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Rene Elise Mai
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Steven Arthur Moore
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Inge A Larish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Rene Elise Mai
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Steven Arthur Moore
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Inge A Larish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.
Represented By: Sean Christian Platt
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Christopher Wood Kennerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Truman Elsea
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: John Charles Hueston
Represented By: Alexander Chester Giza
Represented By: Roshan Suresh Mansinghani
Represented By: Douglas James Dixon
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Mark W McGrory
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Lawrence A Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BlackBerry Limited
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Roshan Suresh Mansinghani
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Harrison Gheens Rich
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: BlackBerry Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Roshan Suresh Mansinghani
Represented By: Kurt Max Pankratz
Represented By: Harrison Gheens Rich
Represented By: Kevin Eugene Cadwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lisa K Nguyen
Represented By: Brian Kwok
Represented By: Thomas Christos Mavrakakis
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Homrig
Represented By: Ashlee Lin
Represented By: Mark C Scarsi
Represented By: Joseph H Lee
Represented By: Walter Wayne Lackey, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Gerardi
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Michael T Pieja
Represented By: Howard E Levin
Represented By: Michael K Sheen
Represented By: Douglas E Lumish
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims
Represented By: Miguel Ruiz
Represented By: Christopher R Lubeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ZTE Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: David A Bailey
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pantech Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Oluwaseun Olugbolade Ajayi
Represented By: Alan Arthur Wright
Represented By: Brendan Padraig O'Shea
Represented By: Hae-Chan Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Pantech Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Oluwaseun Olugbolade Ajayi
Represented By: Alan Arthur Wright
Represented By: Brendan Padraig O'Shea
Represented By: Hae-Chan Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Christina Marie Von der Ahe
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: David T Pritikin
Represented By: Richard A Cederoth
Represented By: Robert J Benson
Represented By: Nathaniel C Love
Represented By: David E Killough
Represented By: Daniel John Galligan
Represented By: John W McBride
Represented By: Ellen S Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael W Maas
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Tiffany A Miller
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Represented By: Robert Gary Pluta
Represented By: Jamie B Beaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ZTE Corporation
Represented By: William P Atkins
Represented By: Rene Elise Mai
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: David A Bailey
Represented By: Steven Arthur Moore
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Inge A Larish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Represented By: Ravi R Ranganath
Represented By: Christy Samansky Hawkins
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Joshua Reed Thane
Represented By: J David Hadden
Represented By: Saina Shamilov
Represented By: Eman Sojoodi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Dell, Inc.
Represented By: Tammy M Pennington Rhodes
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Roger Joseph Fulghum
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: NEC CASIO Mobile Communications, Ltd.
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: John D Zele
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: NEC Corporation of America
Represented By: Rick L. Rambo
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Robert W Busby
Represented By: Bradford A Cangro
Represented By: John D Zele
Represented By: Jeremy D Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Michael W Maas
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Tiffany A Miller
Represented By: William Justin Barrow
Represented By: Robert Gary Pluta
Represented By: Jamie B Beaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: ZTE (USA) Inc.
Represented By: William P Atkins
Represented By: Rene Elise Mai
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Everett McClyde Upshaw
Represented By: David A Bailey
Represented By: Steven Arthur Moore
Represented By: Nicole Sara Cunningham
Represented By: Inge A Larish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Cellco Partnership Consolidated Civil Action 6:14cv251 doing business as Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Charles Bennett Molster, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party defendant: Acacia Research Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Represented By: Stephen L Ram
Represented By: Edward K Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: David Folsom
Represented By: David Folsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellular Communications Equipment LLC
Represented By: Bradley Wayne Caldwell
Represented By: Edward R Nelson, III
Represented By: Christopher S Stewart
Represented By: Brent Nelson Bumgardner
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Barry Bumgardner
Represented By: Jonathan Hart Rastegar
Represented By: Jason Dodd Cassady
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Cecil
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Michael James Fagan, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Bragalone
Represented By: Warren Joseph McCarty, III
Represented By: Terry Afif Saad
Represented By: Stephanie R Wood
Represented By: John Austin Curry
Represented By: Ryan P Griffin
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Represented By: Steven Brannon Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Keyzer
Represented By: David Michael Keyzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?