Tucker v. Livingston et al
Plaintiff: George Lee Tucker, II
Defendant: Brad Livingston, John A Rupert, Bill Pierce, Don Lacy, Akbar N Shabazz, Patrick Cooper, Danial Rose, Bennie J Coleman, Jr, Dovie C Turner and Albert Taylor
Case Number: 6:2014cv00659
Filed: July 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: K. Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 175 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's objections are OVERRULED. The findings of fact and conclusions of law of the magistrate judge are correct and the report of the magistrate j udge is ADOPTED. The Defendant's motion for summary judgment based on mootness 156 is GRANTED and the lawsuit is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. A final judgment will be entered in this case in accordance with the magistrate judge's recommendations. All motions not previously ruled upon are hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge Thad Heartfield on 03/04/20. (mll, )
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Report and Recommendation 109 is ADOPTED. Defendant Gaddis' motion for summary judgment 86 is GRANTED. The complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. All motions not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/28/15. (mll, )
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Report and Recommendation 37 is ADOPTED. Tucker is permitted to proceed with his claims against former Director of Chaplaincy Operations Bill Pierce, Region II Chaplain Don Lacy, Islamic Chaplain Akbar N. Shabazz and Coffield Unit Chaplain Danial Rose. Tucker's claims against all of the remaining defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/04/15. (mll, )
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Report and Recommendation 14 is ADOPTED. The civil rights complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for want of prosecution and failure to obey an order. All motions not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/14/14. (mll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Livingston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee Tucker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Rupert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akbar N Shabazz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danial Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie J Coleman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovie C Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?