Grimes V. Lumpkin
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 6:2022cv00214
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Address from Cotulla Unit to Tyler, TX by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, )
July 18, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address from Cotulla Unit to Tyler, TX by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(wea, )
June 27, 2022 Filing 30 RESPONSE to #26 Order to Show Cause, filed by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope(s))(wea, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 29 RESPONSE to #26 Order to Show Cause, filed by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(jbe, )
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/10/2022. (wea, )
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as redundant #3 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal; denying #10 Motion for Arrest of Judgment; denying #17 Motion for Exoneration; denying #22 Motion for Judgment of Acquittal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/10/2022. (wea, )
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Petitioner John Grimes shall have thirty days from the date of receipt of this order in which to respond to the issue of whether his petition should be dismissed as time-barred. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/9/2022. (wea, )
June 8, 2022 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00126. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Eastern District of Texas, Tyler division (Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(RaulGamas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
June 8, 2022 Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Texas, Tyler division. Case transferred electronically, filed. (RaulGamas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
May 20, 2022 Filing 23 Letter from John Grimes, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MargaretPeregoy, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
May 6, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Judgment of Acquittal.Motions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MargaretPeregoy, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Local Rules, as well as a copy of the Southern District of Texas Guidelines for Litigants Without Lawyers.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
January 7, 2022 Filing 18 Letter from John Grimes, filed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
January 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION Exoneration or in the alterative motion attacking sentence or motion to vacate, set aside or correct the sentence. Motions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of John Alfred Grimes re: #15 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Motions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Petition of Writ of Habeus Corpus Filing fee: $5, receipt number LAR019445, filed. (RobertTenorio, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion Requesting Extra Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(dgonzalez, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION Requesting Extra Extension of Time to Pay Filing FeeMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Bobby Lumpkin, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Facts Statement #2 Envelope)(bmendoza, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of John Alfred Grimes re: #10 MOTION arresting judgment, filed.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for arresting judgmentMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 cover and envelope)(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga(Signed by Judge Diana Saldana) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Bobby Lumpkin, filed.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. For his case to proceed, Petitioner must pay the full amount of the filing fee for a civil action ($5.00) or submit a properly supported motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), which must include a certified inmate trust fund account statement or similar documentation within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from John A. Grimes re: Habeas Corpus case, filed. (RaulGamas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Judgment Of Acquital by John Alfred Grimes, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/22/2021. (RaulGamas, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #1 Affidavit) (RaulGamas, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RaulGamas, 5) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by John Alfred Grimes. (Attachments: #1 attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Letter)(RaulGamas, 5) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2021: #4 Attachment C) (RaulGamas, 5). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 6/8/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes V. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Alfred Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?