Ingle v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Donald Wayne Ingle, Jr
Defendant: Director TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 6:2022cv00243
Filed: June 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2022 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00132. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, TYLER DIVISION: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Tyler Division, at Waco, Texas. See Misc. Order No. 6, R. 2a.(3), May 5, 2005. No other rulings have been entered in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 6/27/2022) (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Donald Wayne Ingle, Jr re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Donald Wayne Ingle, Jr. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]
June 24, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. (Copy of first page of file-marked petition also mailed to petitioner.) Fri Jun 24 15:45:27 CDT 2022 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 6/29/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingle v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Wayne Ingle, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?