Herbert v. Lumpkin
Petitioner: Brandon Herbert
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 9:2021cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Referring Judge: Keith F Giblin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Brandon Herbert on 1/25/21 as to #8 Report and Recommendations & #7 Report and Recommendations. (ljw, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus should be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/12/2021. (bjc, )
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending Petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis should be denied. Petitioner should be allowed 30 days to submit a filing fee of $5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin on 1/12/2021. (bjc, )
January 7, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Keith F. Giblin. (ljw, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:20-cv-04347. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 6, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to ED/TX - Lufkin Div. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 1/6/21, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE - Herbert was convicted of murder in Tarrant County which is in the ND/TX, Fort Worth Div. Herbert is presently confined at the Polunsky Unit, which is in Polk County, in the ED/TX, Lufkin Div. Because neither place is within the SD/TX, this Court has no jurisdiction over Herbert's pending habeas corpus petition. ORDERED to TRANSFER this habeas corpus proceeding to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas, Lufkin Division, and to TERMINATE all pending motions. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Herbert, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Brandon Herbert, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/11/2021. (BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Brandon Herbert.(BrendaLacy, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 1/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herbert v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Herbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?